Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePamela Cooke et al v. Ronald Reagan Presidential Library et al
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2005cv06518
Date Filed2005-09-01
Date Closed2006-10-25
JudgeJudge Dale S. Fischer
PlaintiffPamela Cooke
PlaintiffJoanna Schwartz
DefendantRonald Reagan Presidential Library
DefendantAllen Weinstein
DefendantNational Archives and Records Administration
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2005-09-011COMPLAINT against defendants Ronald Reagan Presidential Library, Allen Weinstein, National Archives and Records Administration.(Filing fee $ 250), filed by plaintiffs Pamela Cooke, Joanna Schwartz.(rrey, ) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
2005-09-0160 Day Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Ronald Reagan Presidential Library, Allen Weinstein, National Archives and Records Administration. (rrey, ) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
2005-09-012CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Pamela Cooke, Joanna Schwartz. (rrey, ) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
2005-09-013APPLICATION for attorney Elliot M Mincberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID. filed by plaintiffs Pamela Cooke, Joanna Schwartz. Lodged proposed order. (rrey, ) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
2005-09-014NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PILOT PROGRAM filed.(rrey, ) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
2005-09-01FAX number for Attorney Aimee Elizabeth Dudovitz, Gregory G Luke, Michael J Strumwasser, Fredric D Woocher is 310-319-0156. (rrey, ) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
2005-09-01FAX number for Attorney Elliot M Mincberg is 202-293-2672. (rrey, ) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
2005-09-0110Receipt Re: APPLICATION for attorney Elliot M Mincberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID. (pbap, ) (Entered: 09/16/2005)
2005-09-025STANDING ORDER For Cases Assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer. Read This Order Carefully. It Controls This Case and Differs in Some Respects From the Local Rules. (pbap, ) (Entered: 09/08/2005)
2005-09-027ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer : granting 3 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Elliot M. Mineberg on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Aimee Dudovitz as local counsel. (pbap, ) (Entered: 09/12/2005)
2005-09-02FAX number for Attorney Elliot M Mincberg is (202) 293-2672. (pbap, ) (Entered: 09/12/2005)
2005-09-096EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and OSC Re: Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Pamela Cooke, Joanna Schwartz. Lodged proposed order. (pbap, ) (Entered: 09/12/2005)
2005-09-098PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Pamela Cooke, Joanna Schwartz, upon Ronald Reagan Presidential Library served on 9/6/2005, answer due 11/5/2005; Allen Weinstein served on 9/6/2005, answer due 11/5/2005; National Archives and Records Administration served on 9/6/2005, answer due 11/5/2005. The Summons and Complaint were served by Certified mail (no return receipt attached), by Federal statute. Service accepted by defendants on behalf of defendants. Original Summons not returned. (pbap, ) (Entered: 09/13/2005)
2005-09-099NOTICE of Change of Address by Elliot M Mincberg attorney for Plaintiffs Pamela Cooke, Joanna Schwartz, changing address to People for the American Way, 2000 M. Street, NW, Suite 400, Washington, DC 20036, telephone (202) 467-4999; Facsimile (202) 293-2672. Filed by plaintiff Pamela Cooke, Joanna Schwartz (pbap, ) (Entered: 09/13/2005)
2005-09-0913MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and order to show cause re preliminary injunction 6 filed by plaintiffs. (mg, ) (Entered: 09/19/2005)
2005-09-0914DECLARATION of Aimee Dudovitz in support of plaintiffs EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order 6 filed by plaintiffs. (mg, ) (Entered: 09/19/2005)
2005-09-1215OPPOSITION to Plaintiff's EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order 6 filed by defendants Ronald Reagan Presidential Library, Allen Weinstein, National Archives and Records Administration. (pbap, ) (Entered: 09/20/2005)
2005-09-1517PARTIAL List of Withheld documents to prioritize for Vaughn index filed by plaintiff Pamela Cooke, Joanna Schwartz. (jp, ) (Entered: 09/26/2005)
2005-09-1611NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error - Receipt Re: APPLICATION for attorney Elliot M Mincberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID 10 , received an item docket number of 10 in error. (pbap, ) (Entered: 09/16/2005)
2005-09-1612MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING IN Plaintiff's EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and an Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary against Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Rising Sun 6 . **see document for furthe details** IT IS ORDERED THAT NARA Show Cause, Hearing set for 9/26/2005 01:30 PM, or as soon thereafter as the matter can be heard, why a preliminary injunction should not issue.Court Reporter: not present. (pbap, ) (Entered: 09/19/2005)
2005-09-16PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED re [PROPOSED] Temporary Restraining Order and OSC Regarding Preliminary Injunction submitted by Plaintiff Pamela Cooke, Joanna Schwartz. (yl, ) (Entered: 09/28/2005)
2005-09-1622SUPPLEMENTAL list of withheld documents to prioritize for vaughn index filed by Plaintiffs Pamela Cooke, Joanna Schwartz. (ca, ) (Entered: 10/04/2005)
2005-09-1916MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Judge Dale S. Fischer Re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and OSC Re: Preliminary Injunction 6 . The matter is taken under submission and advises counsel that an order will follow. Court Reporter: Pamela Seijas. (pbap, ) (Entered: 09/21/2005)
2005-09-2118DECLARATION of JOANNA SCHWARTZ in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause regarding Preliminary Injunction 6 filed by plaintiffs Pamela Cooke, Joanna Schwartz. (jp, ) (Entered: 09/28/2005)
2005-09-2119DECLARATION of PAMELA COOKE in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause regarding Preliminary Injunction 6 filed by plaintiffs Pamela Cooke, Joanna Schwartz. (jp, ) (Entered: 09/28/2005)
2005-09-2320STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Ronald Reagan Presidential Library, Allen Weinstein, National Archives and Records Administration. (pbap, ) (Entered: 09/29/2005)
2005-09-2621MINUTES OF Proceedings: Hearing Re Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer that plaintff to serve the motion for an agreed upon date and this matter will be reset. Court Reporter: Pamela Seijas. (pbap, ) (Entered: 09/29/2005)
2005-10-0623ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by defendants Ronald Reagan Presidential Library, Allen Weinstein, National Archives and Records Administration.(pbap, ) (Entered: 10/07/2005)
2005-10-0624Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Ronald Reagan Presidential Library, Allen Weinstein, National Archives and Records Administration. (pbap, ) (Entered: 10/07/2005)
2005-10-06FAX number for Attorney Jacqueline E Coleman is (202) 616-8470. (pbap, ) (Entered: 10/07/2005)
2005-10-06FAX number for Attorney Peter D Keisler is (202) 616-8470. (pbap, ) (Entered: 10/07/2005)
2005-10-0725ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer Setting Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2005 11:00 AM.(pbap, ) (Entered: 10/11/2005)
2005-11-1027JOINT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE REPORT Pursuant to FRCP 26(f). (jp, ) (Entered: 11/17/2005)
2005-11-1526JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER Re Briefing Schedule by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (1). Plaintiff's and Defendants' respective motion for summary judgment due 3/15/06. (2) The parties' respective oppositions to the cross-motions for summary judgment due 3/29/06. The parties' respective replies or closing memoranda on the cross-motions for summary judgment due 4/10/06. (pbap, ) (Entered: 11/16/2005)
2005-11-1528MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGSIN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer : Re Scheduling Conference. The Court has reviewed the Joint Scheduling Conference Report, and has signed the Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Briefing Schedule. The hearing on the parties' cross-motion for summary judgment is set on 4/24/06 at 1:30 p.m. The Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/05 is removed form the Caourt's calendar.Court Reporter: not present. (pbap, ) (Entered: 11/17/2005)
2006-02-1029JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER Re Revised Briefing Schedule by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (1) Plaintiffs' and Defendants' respective motion for summary judgment due 4/21/06; Opposition due 5/12/06; Replies due 5/26/06.(pbap, ) (Entered: 02/13/2006)
2006-04-2430JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer to Remove Dates From Summary Judgment From Court Calendar. Specifcally, the dates to be taken off calendar re: (1). 4/21/06: Motions for summary Judgment; (2). 5/21/06: Oppositions to cross-motions for summary judgment; (3). 5/26/06: Replies or closing memoranda on th ecorss-motions for sumary judgment; Status Report due 5/3/06.(pbap, ) (Entered: 04/25/2006)
2006-05-0431STATUS REPORT AND STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer Setting Briefing Schedule: (1). Plaintiff's Motin for Attorney's Fees and Costs etc due on 6/1/06; (2). Defendant's Opposition due 6/28/06; Plaintif's reply memorandum due 7/12/06; and Motion set for hearing on 7/31/2006 at 01:30 PM.(pbap, ) (Entered: 05/10/2006)
2006-06-0132NOTICE OF MOTION for Award of Attorney Fees and Costs filed by plaintiffs Pamela Cooke, Joanna Schwartz. Motion set for hearing on 7/31/2006 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Lodged proposed order. (pbap, ) (Entered: 06/07/2006)
2006-06-0133MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of MOTION for Award of Attorney Fees and Costs 32 filed by plaintiffs Pamela Cooke, Joanna Schwartz. (pbap, ) (Entered: 06/07/2006)
2006-06-0134DECLARATION of Ellen Y. Yang in Support of MOTION for Award of Attorney Fees and Costs 32 filed by plaintiffs Pamela Cooke, Joanna Schwartz. (pbap, ) (Entered: 06/07/2006)
2006-06-0135DECLARATION of Elliot M. Mincberg in Support of MOTION for Award of Attorney Fees and Costs 32 filed by plaintiffs Pamela Cooke, Joanna Schwartz. (pbap, ) (Entered: 06/07/2006)
2006-06-0136DECLARATION of Fredric D. Woocher in support of MOTION for Award of Attorney Fees and Costs 32 filed by Plaintiffs Pamela Cooke, Joanna Schwartz. (pbap, ) (Entered: 06/07/2006)
2006-06-2937STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer Revising Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date as follows: (1). Defendants' opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs shall be filed with the Court and served on all opposing parties by facsimile and e-mail on Monday, 7/10/06. (2). Plaintiff's reply memorandum in support of their Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs shall be filed with the Court and served on all opposing parties by facsimile and e-mail on Wednes, August 2, 2006.(pbap, ) (Entered: 06/29/2006)
2006-07-1038OPPOSITION to Plaintiffs' MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs 32 filed by defendants Ronald Reagan Presidential Library, Allen Weinstein, National Archives and Records Administration. (pbap, ) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
2006-07-1039DECLARATION of Jacqueline Coleman in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiff's Award of Attorney Fees and Costs 32 filed by defendants Ronald Reagan Presidential Library, Allen Weinstein, National Archives and Records Administration. (pbap, ) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
2006-07-1040SECOND DECLARATION of Nancy Kegan Smith in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiff's Award of Attorney Fees and Costs 32 filed by defendants Ronald Reagan Presidential Library, Allen Weinstein, National Archives and Records Administration. (pbap, ) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
2006-08-0241REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for Award of Attorney Fees and Costs 32 filed by Plaintiffs Pamela Cooke, Joanna Schwartz. (pbap, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
2006-08-0242REPLY DECLARATION OF FREDRIC D. WOOCHER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for Award of Attorney Fees and Costs 32 filed by Plaintiffs Pamela Cooke, Joanna Schwartz. (pbap, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
2006-08-0243REPLY DECLARATION OF AIMEE DUDOVITZ IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for Award of Attorney Fees and Costs 32 filed by Plaintiffs Pamela Cooke, Joanna Schwartz. (pbap, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
2006-08-0244DECLARATION of Pamela Cooke IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for Award of Attorney Fees and Costs 32 filed by Plaintiffs Pamela Cooke, Joanna Schwartz. (pbap, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
2006-08-0245DECLARATION of Joanna Schwartz IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for Award of Attorney Fees and Costs 32 filed by Plaintiffs Pamela Cooke, Joanna Schwartz. (pbap, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
2006-08-0246SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Elliot M. Mincberg IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for Award of Attorney Fees and Costs 32 filed by Plaintiffs Pamela Cooke, Joanna Schwartz. (pbap, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
2006-08-1447MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Dale S. Fischer RE: Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs 32 . The Court advises counsel of its tentative ruling, invites oral argument and takes the motion under submission with a written order follow. Court Reporter: Pamela Seijas. (pbap, ) (Entered: 08/18/2006)
2006-09-0149MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Dale S. Fischer RE: Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees 32 . The Court awards total fees of $30,136.25. Court Reporter: none. *see document for further details* (pbap, ) (Entered: 09/01/2006)
2006-10-2550JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer Re Voluntary Dismissal on Mootness Grounds. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.)(pbap, ) (Entered: 10/26/2006)
2006-11-0951JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge Dale S. Fischer that final judgment be entered in this action. The Clerk Office is instructed to enter on the docket a Final Judgment dismissing this action with prejudice. (jp) (Entered: 11/13/2006)
2006-11-2252NOTICE OF APPLICATION to Tax Costs filed by plaintiffs Pamela Cooke, Joanna Schwartz. Application set for hearing on 12/7/2006 at 11:00 AM before Clerk of Court. Lodged Bill of Cost. (pbap, ) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
2006-12-0453STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer re settlement of Plaintiff's re APPLICATION for Bill of Costs 52 . Tax Costs in the amount of $1,600 in favor of Plaintiffs.(pbap, ) (Entered: 12/05/2006)
2006-12-0754BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $ $1,600.00 in favor of plaintiffs Pamela Cooke and Joanna Schwartz and against defendants. RE: Stipulation and Order 51 (pbap, ) (Entered: 12/26/2006)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff