Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLos Angeles Times Communications LLC v. United States Department of Labor et al
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2006cv01864
Date Filed2006-03-28
Date Closed2007-04-18
JudgeJudge Andrew J. Guilford
PlaintiffLos Angeles Times Communications LLC
DefendantUnited States Department of Labor
DefendantOffice of the Secretary of Labor
DefendantOffice of the Solicitor of Labor
DefendantEmployment Standards Adminsitration
DefendantOffice of Workers Compensation Programs
DefendantDivison of Longshore and Harbor Workers Compensation Program
DefendantDoes 1-10 inclusive
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2006-03-281COMPLAINT against defendants Employment Standards Adminsitration, Office of Workers Compensation Programs, Divison of Longshore and Harbor Workers Compensation Program, Does, United States Department of Labor, Office of the Secretary of Labor, Office of the Solicitor of Labor.(Filing fee $ 250 paid), filed by plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC.(pj, ) (Entered: 03/30/2006)
2006-03-2830 day Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Employment Standards Adminsitration, Office of Workers Compensation Programs, Divison of Longshore and Harbor Workers Compensation Program, Does, United States Department of Labor, Office of the Secretary of Labor, Office of the Solicitor of Labor. (pj, ) (Entered: 03/30/2006)
2006-03-282CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. (pj, ) (Entered: 03/30/2006)
2006-03-28FAX number for Attorney Karen A Henry, Kelli L Sager, Alonzo B Wickers, IV is 213-633-6899. (pj, ) (Entered: 03/30/2006)
2006-03-28FAX number for Attorney Karlene Worthington Goller is 213-237-3810. (pj, ) (Entered: 03/30/2006)
2006-03-293PROOF OF SERVICE Re Summons and Complaint Executed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC, upon Employment Standards Adminsitration served on 3/29/2006, answer due 5/28/2006; Office of Workers Compensation Programs served on 3/29/2006, answer due 5/28/2006; Divison of Longshore and Harbor Workers Compensation Program served on 3/29/2006, answer due 5/28/2006; United States Department of Labor served on 3/29/2006, answer due 5/28/2006; Office of the Secretary of Labor served on 3/29/2006, answer due 5/28/2006; Office of the Solicitor of Labor served on 3/29/2006, answer due 5/28/2006. The Summons and Complaint were served by Certified Mail (No Original Domestic Return Receipts attached), by Federal statute. Service accepted by No individual names specified on behalf of Office of the US Attorney, Attorney General of the United States; United States Department of Labor; Office of the Secretary of Labor; Office of the Solicitor of Labor; Employment Standards Administration; Office of Workers' Compensation Programs; Office of Longshore and Harbor Workers' Compensation Program. Original Summons not returned. (dw, ) (Entered: 04/04/2006)
2006-04-054NEW CASE ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson : This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court fully adheres to Rule 1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure which requires that the Rules be construed to secure the just, speedy and inexpensive determination of every action. (See Document for details.)(pc, ) (Entered: 04/05/2006)
2006-04-275STIPULATION To Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint; ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: IT IS SO ORDERED that Defendants shall have until 5/15/06 to respond to the Complaint.(dw, ) (Entered: 04/28/2006)
2006-05-156ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendants Employment Standards Adminsitration, Office of Workers Compensation Programs, Divison of Longshore and Harbor Workers Compensation Program, Does, United States Department of Labor, Office of the Secretary of Labor, Office of the Solicitor of Labor.(dw, ) Modified on 5/16/2006 (dw, ). (Entered: 05/16/2006)
2006-05-177ORDER RE: STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Status Conference be set for Monday, June 19, 2006 at 3:00 p.m. before the Honorable Stephen V. Wilson. The attorneys attending this conference MUST be those who are in charge of the conduct of the trial. Attendance is mandatory. This Court views this status conference as critical to its case management responsibilities. Counsel are required to approach it with the same seriousness. (See document for details.)(pc, ) (Entered: 05/17/2006)
2006-05-188NOTICE of Status Conference filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. (dw, ) (Entered: 05/23/2006)
2006-05-249[CORRECTED] ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendants Employment Standards Adminsitration, Office of Workers Compensation Programs, Divison of Longshore and Harbor Workers Compensation Program, United States Department of Labor, Office of the Secretary of Labor, Office of the Solicitor of Labor.(dw, ) (Entered: 05/25/2006)
2006-06-1910MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson : The Court sets the following dates for Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment: Filing of defendants Motion for Summary Judgment August 4, 2006; Plaintiffs Opposition & Motion for Summary Judgment September 1, 2006; Defendants Reply & Opposition September 25, 2006; Plaintiffs Reply October 4, 2006; Hearing on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment October 23, 2006 at 1:30 p.m.Court Reporter: None. (pc, ) (Entered: 06/27/2006)
2006-07-0711ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#06-047) approved by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the Creation of Calendar of Judge Andrew J. Guilford, this case is transfered from Judge Stephen V. Wilson to the calendar of Judge Andrew J. Guilford for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 06-1864 AG(CTx). (vp) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
2006-08-0413NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by defendants Employment Standards Adminsitration, Office of Workers Compensation Programs, Divison of Longshore and Harbor Workers Compensation Program, United States Department of Labor, Office of the Secretary of Labor, Office of the Solicitor of Labor. Motion set for hearing on 10/23/2006 at 01:30 PM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Lodged judgment. (dmjr, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
2006-08-0416DECLARATION of Edward Duncan filed by Defendant United States Department of Labor. (dmjr, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
2006-08-0417DECLARATION of Miranda Chiu filed by Defendant United States Department of Labor. (dmjr, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
2006-08-0418DECLARATION of J P McDermott filed by Defendant United States Department of Labor. (dmjr, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
2006-08-0812MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford : order on reassignment of action, please substitute the initials AG for the current initials. Cross motions for summary judgment to be heard on 10/23/06 10amCourt Reporter: none. (dmjr, ) (Entered: 08/10/2006)
2006-08-0814MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 13 filed by defendants. (dmjr, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
2006-08-0815EXHIBITS Filed filed by Defendant United States Department of Labor. as to Memorandum in Support of Motion 14 . (dmjr, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
2006-09-0119CONSOLIDATED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment filed by plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/23/2006 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Lodged Order and Statement of Uncontroverted Facts. Memorandum of Points and Authorities. (mu, ) (Entered: 09/11/2006)
2006-09-0120OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANTS IN SUPPORT OF Motion for Summary Judgment 13 filed by plalintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. (mu, ) (Entered: 09/11/2006)
2006-09-0121STATEMENT of Genuine Issues and Response to Defendants Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law filed by plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. (mu, ) (Entered: 09/11/2006)
2006-09-0122PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC, re Consolidated Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities 19 , Objections to Evidence Submitted by Defendants in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment 20 , Statement of Genuine Issues and Response to Defendants Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law 21 , were served on 9/1/06. (see document for further details) (mu, ) (Entered: 09/11/2006)
2006-09-2123STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: RE SCHEDULE FOR RESPONSE and Reply Briefs and the Hearing on Dispositive Motions; IT IS SO ORDERED that Defendant shall have until 10/16/06, to file its consolidated brief; that Plaintiff shall have until 10/30/06 to file its reply brief; and the parties cross-motions will be heard on 11/13/06.(rla, ) (Entered: 09/22/2006)
2006-10-1624DEFENDANTS' COMBINED OPPOSITION to plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment 19 and reply brief in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 13 filed by defendants United States Department of Labor, Office of the Secretary of Labor, Office of the Solicitor of Labor. (esa, ) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
2006-10-1625DECLARATION of Edward Duncan filed by Defendants United States Department of Labor, Office of the Secretary of Labor, Office of the Solicitor of Labor, et al. (esa, ) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
2006-10-1626DECLARATION of Miranda Chiu filed by Defendants United States Department of Labor, Office of the Secretary of Labor, Office of the Solicitor of Labor, et al. (esa, ) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
2006-10-1627STATEMENT of Genuine Issues filed by Defendants United States Department of Labor, Office of the Secretary of Labor, Office of the Solicitor of Labor, et al. (esa, ) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
2006-10-3028OBJECTIONS to Declarations of Miranda Chiu 26 and Edward Duncan 25 filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. (esa, ) (Entered: 11/01/2006)
2006-10-3029REPLY filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC to defendants' combined opposition and reply 24 ; Supplemental declaration of Karen A Henry with Exhibits 18-20. (esa, ) (Entered: 11/01/2006)
2006-11-0930MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford : Order Continuing hearing on Cross-Motions for summary judgment 19 13 from 11/13/2006 to 12/11/2006 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Supplemental briefs from both sides to be filed by 12:00 noon on 11/24/06. Court Reporter: None Present. (lb, ) (Entered: 11/09/2006)
2006-11-1437DECLARATION of S K Ullman re MOTION for Extension of Time to File MOTION for Hearing MOTION for Hearing 32 filed by derfendants. (dmjr, ) (Entered: 12/14/2006)
2006-11-1631MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford :, Set Deadlines as to MOTION for Summary Judgment 13 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 19 . Motion reset for hearing on 1/8/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Briefs filed by 12/15/06, responses by 12/28/06Court Reporter: none. (dmjr, ) Modified on 11/20/2006 (dmjr, ). (Entered: 11/20/2006)
2006-11-1632MOTION for Extension of Time for Additional Briefing and Hearing; filed by defendants Employment Standards Adminsitration, Office of Workers Compensation Programs, Divison of Longshore and Harbor Workers Compensation Program, United States Department of Labor, Office of the Secretary of Labor, Office of the Solicitor of Labor. Motion set for hearing on 12/11/2006 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (rla, ) (Entered: 12/02/2006)
2006-11-1636OPPOSITION to MOTION for Extension of Time to File MOTION for Hearing MOTION for Hearing 32 filed by plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. (dmjr, ) (Entered: 12/14/2006)
2006-11-2134DECLARATION of S K Ullman re MOTION for Extension of Time to File MOTION for Hearing MOTION for Hearing 32 filed by defendants. (dmjr, ) (Entered: 12/07/2006)
2006-11-2733MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford :, granting MOTION for Extension of Time to File MOTION for Hearing MOTION for Hearing 32 Order requesting additional documentation regarding FOIA exemptionCourt Reporter: none. (dmjr, ) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
2006-11-2735NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue motion hearing filed by defendants Employment Standards Adminsitration, Office of Workers Compensation Programs, Divison of Longshore and Harbor Workers Compensation Program, United States Department of Labor, Office of the Secretary of Labor, Office of the Solicitor of Labor. Motion set for hearing on 1/8/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (dmjr, ) (Entered: 12/13/2006)
2006-12-1538SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in support of Motion for Summary Judgment 19 ; Decalration of Karen A Henry with Exhibit 21-22 filed by plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. (esa, ) (Entered: 01/02/2007)
2006-12-1539SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Miranda Chiu filed by Defendants Employment Standards Adminsitration, Office of Workers Compensation Programs, Divison of Longshore and Harbor Workers Compensation Program, United States Department of Labor, Office of the Secretary of Labor, Office of the Solicitor of Labor. (esa, ) (Entered: 01/02/2007)
2006-12-1540SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Edward Duncan filed by Defendants Employment Standards Adminsitration, Office of Workers Compensation Programs, Divison of Longshore and Harbor Workers Compensation Program, United States Department of Labor, Office of the Secretary of Labor, Office of the Solicitor of Labor. (esa, ) (Entered: 01/02/2007)
2006-12-1541SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF filed by defendants Employment Standards Adminsitration, Office of Workers Compensation Programs, Divison of Longshore and Harbor Workers Compensation Program, United States Department of Labor, Office of the Secretary of Labor, Office of the Solicitor of Labor. (esa, ) (Entered: 01/02/2007)
2006-12-1542DECLARATION of Marc D Peltier filed by Defendants Employment Standards Adminsitration, Office of Workers Compensation Programs, Divison of Longshore and Harbor Workers Compensation Program, United States Department of Labor, Office of the Secretary of Labor, Office of the Solicitor of Labor. (esa, ) (Entered: 01/02/2007)
2006-12-1543DECLARATION of Christopher Albrycht filed by Defendants Employment Standards Adminsitration, Office of Workers Compensation Programs, Divison of Longshore and Harbor Workers Compensation Program, United States Department of Labor, Office of the Secretary of Labor, Office of the Solicitor of Labor. (esa, ) (Entered: 01/02/2007)
2006-12-2844DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief 38 filed by Defendants Employment Standards Adminsitration, Office of Workers Compensation Programs, Divison of Longshore and Harbor Workers Compensation Program, Does, United States Department of Labor, Office of the Secretary of Labor, Office of the Solicitor of Laborto.(ts, ) (Entered: 01/11/2007)
2006-12-2845OBJECTIONS to EVIDENCE Submitted by Defendant's in Support of Supplemental Brief 38 filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. (ts, ) (Entered: 01/11/2007)
2006-12-2846PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE to Defendants Supplemental Brief 41 ; Declaration of Karen A. Henry with Exhibits 23-24 filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications. (ts, ) (Entered: 01/11/2007)
2007-01-1148CORRECTED DECLARATION of Christopher J Albrycht 43 filed by Defendants. (mu, ) (Entered: 01/24/2007)
2007-01-1647MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford: 1) Defendant United States Department of Labors Motion for Summary Judgment; 2) Plaintiffs Consolidated Motion for Summary Judgment: Matter is argued and taken under submission.Court Reporter: Jane Sutton Rule. (rla, ) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
2007-03-3149ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Granting Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 13 and Denying Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment 19 . (See Order for details.) Counsel for the DOL is directed to prepare the judgment and serve it on the L.A. Times. The L.A. Times shall have 15 days from the date of service of the proposed judgment to object to the proposed judgment. If no objection is received within 15 days, the judgment will be entered immediately. IT IS SO ORDERED. (rla, ) (Entered: 04/02/2007)
2007-04-1850JUDGMENT by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, in favor of defendants Employment Standards Adminsitration, Office of Workers Compensation Programs, Divison of Longshore and Harbor Workers Compensation Program, United States Department of Labor, Office of the Secretary of Labor, Office of the Solicitor of Labor (MD JS-6, Case Terminated).(dmjr, ) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
2007-06-0451PLAINTIFF LOS ANGELES TIMES COMMUNICATIONS LLCS NOTICE OF APPEAL TO THE UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE NINTH CIRCUIT Appeal of Judgment, 50 Filed On: 4/18/07; Entered On: 4/19/07; Filing fee $455, Paid; receipt number 13202. cc: Kelli Sager; Susan K. Ullman.(car) Modified on 6/6/2007 (car, ). (Entered: 06/06/2007)
2007-06-0452REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 51 . (car) (Entered: 06/06/2007)
2007-06-04Civil Appeals Docketing Statement received from Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC forwarded to 9th CCA. RE: Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 51 (car) (Entered: 06/06/2007)
2007-06-06Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 51 (car) (Entered: 06/06/2007)
2007-06-0653TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM For Dates: 1/16/07; Court Reporter: Jane Sutton Rule; Re: Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 51 (dmap) (Entered: 06/12/2007)
2007-06-1554NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 07-55818, 9th CCA regarding Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 51 filed by Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. (car) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
2007-08-3055TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings held on 1/16/07. Court Reporter: Jane C S Rule. (ad) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
2007-09-1156CERTIFICATE OF RECORD Transmitted to USCA re Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 51 filed by Los Angeles Times Communications LLC; Court of Appeals Case Number: 07-55818; (car) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
2007-09-1257ORDER from 9th CCA filed as to Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 51 filed by Los Angeles Times Communications LLC, CCA # 07-55818. The court has determined that this appeal will not be selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including requests for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. Order received in this district on 9/14/07. (car) (Entered: 09/14/2007)
2008-01-2558ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 51 filed by Los Angeles Times Communications LLC, CCA # 07-55818. The Appeal is voluntarily dismissed. Appeal received in this district on 01/29/08. (cbr) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff