Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleINSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES v. UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2006cv00960
Date Filed2006-05-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffINSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES
Case DescriptionThe Institute for Policy Studies submitted a FOIA request to the CIA for records concerning Pablo Escobar. The agency responded by disclosing 503 pages, primarily from foreign broadcasts. IPS filed an administrative appeal of the agency's response, arguing that the agency had not searched broadly enough for responsive records. The CIA to IPS that it was still working of its appeal. IPS then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [51]
Opinion/Order [101]
Opinion/Order [102]
Opinion/Order [179]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Royce Lamberth, while agreeing with most of the exemption claims made by the CIA and several other agencies pertaining to deceased drug cartel leader Pablo Escobar, has ruled the CIA cannot use a Glomar response for records on Escobar because it had already publicly acknowledged that the agency had records when it initially provided previously disclosed records to the Institute for Policy Studies. In response to the Institute's 2004 request for records on PEPES (People Persecuted by Pablo Escobar) and/or records pertaining to his death, the agency provided previously released records located by searching the terms "pepes" and "Escobar." The Institute finally filed suit, arguing the agency had improperly limited its search to only those records previously disclosed. The Institute argued that the agency "has previously publicly acknowledged that records do exist. Additionally, [the Institute] notes that documents that have already been released to plaintiff and the Court as well as noted in the Vaughn Index from defendant pertain to Escobar." The CIA contended that it had only released open source materials. But Lamberth noted that "defendant's argument that they only released 'open source' records is inaccurate. It is undisputed and defendant even shows, through its declarations that it has released information from other directorates within the agency. Additionally, defendant ran multiple searches for plaintiff using the term "Escobar" and not only disclosed responsive documents, but also created Vaughn Indices explaining their withholding of certain information. The Court finds it hard to believe that this was done solely for open source material that is open to the public. Because defendant has demonstrated the existence of documents pertaining to 'Pablo Escobar,' this Court finds that defendant has acknowledged their existence. The Court holds that defendant's Glomar response is invalid. . ." Lamberth then went on to affirm exemption claims made by the CIA and to claims made for records referred to the DEA under Exemption 1 (national security), Exemption 3 (other statutes), and Exemption 7 (law enforcement records). Both agencies claimed Exemption 2 (internal practices and procedures) for some records. The CIA claimed the exemption for the signature of an officer as well as internal filing instructions and administrative routing information. Lamberth pointed out that "narrow construction of § 552(b)(2), particularly the phrase 'personnel rules and practices of an agency' would include the signature of a CIA officer, internal filing instructions and an internal cover sheet with administrative routing information." However, the DEA had claimed Exemption 2 to withhold office phone numbers. Here, Lamberth observed that "narrow construal of §552(b)(2). . .demands that phone numbers fall out of its ambit. . .Since the phone numbers are neither 'rules' nor 'practices,' exemption 2 is [not applicable]." Since the Institute had previously indicated it was not interested in office phone numbers, Lamberth allowed the agency to withhold them anyway.
Issues: Determination - Glomar response
Opinion/Order [226]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Royce Lamberth has reconsidered his previous ruling that the CIA had acknowledged a special activity exception to its operational files exemption under the CIA Information Act and has concluded that his earlier ruling that the CIA had disclosed the existence of a special activity in conjunction with the hunt for Colombian drug lord Pablo Escobar was incorrect. He pointed out that "the Vaughn Indices' disclosure of special activities, whether or not those activities relate to Pablo Escobar, at most declassifies the mere existence of discussion of some sort of special activity in the Los Pepes Panel documents. And where nothing more has been declassified than the mere existence of some sort of special activity, the Court's rationale�"that '[special] activities (1) did exist, (2) were CIA-linked, and (3) have been declassified'�"does not apply." Explaining that such an argument would "allow FOIA plaintiffs to bootstrap themselves into the exception using the very transparency they crave," Lamberth noted that "plaintiff's argument takes the government's decision to explain in the Vaughn Indices the redaction of material from the Los Pepes Panel Reports, adds to that the government's decision to unredact portions of those reports, and infers that a special activity targeting Pablo Escobar has been disclosed and thus declassified. But if such an argument prevails in court, the government will be far more tempted to simply redact even more material, or provide even less detail in future Vaughn Indices. And who could blame it? Plaintiff's argument would, if accepted, punish the government for doing precisely what FOIA requires�"providing what disclosure it safely can, and where it cannot safely disclose, explaining why�"by creating a constant risk of inadvertent declassification."
Issues: Exemption 1 - Harm to national security
Opinion/Order [296]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Royce Lamberth has ruled that the CIA cannot claim that only the portion of a 1993 six-page daily intelligence report discussing Pablo Escobar's activities is responsive to the Institute for Policy Studies' FOIA request and that the remainder of the report can be withheld because it is non-responsive. In the aftermath of the D.C Circuit's decision in American Immigration Lawyers Association v. Executive Office for Immigration Review (AILA), 830 F.3d 667 (D.C. Cir. 2016), in which the court ruled that agencies could only withhold records based on an exemption claim and not because the agency contended they were non-responsive to the request, agencies have begun to divide traditional records into multiple records so that the smaller portions can be claimed as non-responsive. Lamberth noted that here "the government slices the definition of 'record' too thinly." He pointed out that "the AILA court concluded 'an individual sentence within a paragraph' could never 'be conceived of as a distinct, non-responsive "record."' He explained that "here, the government proposes carving pages into individual paragraphs and sentences. That contravenes not only the Justice Department's guidance, but AILA itself." Lamberth also noted this was a dramatic departure from agency practice. He observed that "throughout this litigation " which pre- and post-dates AILA " the government has failed to consistently explain when a document constitutes a single record and when it should be splintered into several. At the moment, the government wants to account for relevant information before mincing it into different records. But that puts the cart before the horse. § 552 requires identifying records based on responsiveness alone, regardless of what else the record contains. And it doubles back on how the government defined these records in its pre-AILA Vaughn indices, which treated composite intelligence reports as one record, not multiple. This midstream attempt to move the goalposts only underscores the weakness of the government's position. The government cannot retroactively rehash the meaning of 'record' to skirt AILA." Lamberth pointed out "here, the government dices these briefing summaries into discrete paragraphs and sentences in a way that disregards their original form and function. . .A daily or weekly intelligence summary " itself just a few pages long " is an unlikely candidate for piecemeal consumption." Lamberth acknowledged that requiring agencies to provide admittedly non-responsive information "saddles their evermore-burdened FOIA offices with busywork, delays responses for other FOIA requesters, and distracts subject matter experts from their primary mission." He concluded that "but those are problems for Congress. Bound by § 552's text and AILA's holding, the Court will grant IPS's cross-motion for partial summary judgment and deny CIA's."
Issues: Agency Record
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2006-05-231COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Filing fee $ 350) filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES.(lc, ) (Entered: 05/24/2006)
2006-05-232LCvR 7.1 - CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (lc, ) (Entered: 05/24/2006)
2006-05-23SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lc, ) (Entered: 05/24/2006)
2006-06-15Summons (1) Reissued as to UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (lc, ) (Entered: 06/15/2006)
2006-06-203NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea McBarnette on behalf of all defendants (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 06/20/2006)
2006-06-204RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General May 30, 2006. (Messineo, Carl) (Entered: 06/20/2006)
2006-06-205SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney on May 30, 23006 by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Messineo, Carl) Modified on 6/20/2006 (lc, ). (Entered: 06/20/2006)
2006-06-226MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 06/22/2006)
2006-06-307NOTICE (Praecipe) by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES re 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Messineo, Carl) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
2006-07-02MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Kennedy, Henry) (Entered: 07/02/2006)
2006-07-038SUMMONS Returned Executed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 5/30/2006, answer due 6/29/2006. (Messineo, Carl) (Entered: 07/03/2006)
2006-07-119ENTERED IN ERROR.....Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brian Gaffney. :Address- Law Offices of Brian Gaffney, 605 Market Street, Suite 505, San Francisco, CA 94105. Phone No. - (415) 442-0711. Fax No. - (415) 442-0713 by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian Gaffney# 2 Exhibit LCvR 7(m) Certification# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Messineo, Carl) Modified on 7/11/2006 (lc, ). (Entered: 07/11/2006)
2006-07-11NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 9 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brian Gaffney. :Address- Law Offices of Brian Gaffney, 605 Market Street, Suite 505, San Francisco, CA 94105. Phone No. - (415) 442-0711. Fax No. - (415) 442-0713 was entered in error at counsel's request and will be refiled by counsel. (lc, ) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
2006-07-1110Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brian Gaffney. :Address- Law Offices of Brian Gaffney, 605 Market Street, Suite 505, San Francisco, CA 94105. Phone No. - (415) 442-0711. Fax No. - (415) 442-0713 by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian Gaffney# 2 Exhibit LCvR 7(m) Certification# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Messineo, Carl) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
2006-07-11Minute order granting 10 consent motion for admission pro hac vice. Brian Gaffney is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiff, Institute of Policy Studies in the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on July 11, 2006. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
2006-07-2011Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 07/20/2006)
2006-07-2112Memorandum in opposition to re 11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Messineo, Carl) (Entered: 07/21/2006)
2006-07-24Minute order granting 11 defendant's motion for enlargement of time. Defendant shall have up to and including August 3, 2006, to answer, move or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on July 24, 2006. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 07/24/2006)
2006-07-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 8/3/2006. (adc) (Entered: 07/24/2006)
2006-08-0313ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES,.(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 08/03/2006)
2006-08-04Set Deadlines/Hearings: An Initital Status Conference is scheduled for 9/27/2006 at 11:30 A.M. in Courtroom 27, Annex Building, Sixth Floor before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. Parties are to meet and confer and file their Joint Local 16.3 Report prior to scheduled hearing date. (jwd) (Entered: 08/04/2006)
2006-08-0414NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea C Ferster on behalf of all plaintiffs (Ferster, Andrea) (Entered: 08/04/2006)
2006-08-0415NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. Attorney Carl L. Messineo terminated. (Messineo, Carl) (Entered: 08/04/2006)
2006-09-2516NOTICE of Telephonic Appearance by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 09/25/2006)
2006-09-2617NOTICE of Defendant's Case Management Plan by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
2006-09-2618NOTICE of Case Management Plan by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed CMC Order)(Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
2006-09-27NOTICE: Initial scheduling conference set for 9/27/06 @ 11:30am is canceled. The court will issue an order setting forth deadlines. (ztj, ) (Entered: 09/27/2006)
2006-10-1719Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on October 17, 2006. (FL, ) (Entered: 10/17/2006)
2006-10-17Set Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 1/15/2007. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 2/15/2007. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 3/2/2007. Cross Motions due by 2/15/2007. Response to Cross Motions due by 3/2/2007. Reply to Cross Motions due by 3/19/2007. (tj ) (Entered: 10/17/2006)
2006-11-2820MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Vaughn Index to Plaintiff by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 11/28/2006)
2006-12-11Minute order granting 20 defendant's motion for enlargement of time to produce Vaughn Index. Defendant shall have up to and including December 15, 2006, to produce a Vaughn Index to plaintiff. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on December 11, 2006. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 12/11/2006)
2007-01-1221MOTION to Stay Briefing by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 01/12/2007)
2007-01-13MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Motion to Stay briefing schedule. The parties shall be bound by the deadlines set forth in the proposed order that accomapnies the motion. SO ORDERED. (Kennedy, Henry) (Entered: 01/13/2007)
2007-02-2122Unopposed MOTION to Stay Briefing Schedule by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order re Motion to Stay SJ Briefing)(Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 02/21/2007)
2007-02-23Minute order granting 22 : The parties shall be bound by the deadlines set forth in the proposed order that accompanies the instant motion. SO ORDERED. (Entered: 02/23/2007)
2007-04-1323MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit First Dorn Declaration# 2 Affidavit Second Dorn Declaration# 3 Affidavit DEA Affidavit# 4 Exhibit A - M)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
2007-05-1124Unopposed MOTION to Stay Summary Judgment Briefing until Court rules on Motion for Leave to File First Supplemental Complaint by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
2007-05-1125AFFIDAVIT re 24 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Summary Judgment Briefing until Court rules on Motion for Leave to File First Supplemental Complaint by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
2007-05-1126Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental Complaint by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
2007-05-1127AFFIDAVIT re 26 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental Complaint by Declarant Brian Gaffney in Support of Motion by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B - Proposed First Supplemental Complaint)(Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
2007-05-14Minute order granting 24 plaintiff's unopposed motion to stay current briefing schedule until court rules on motion for leave to file first supplemental complaint; and granting 26 plaintiff's notice of motion and motion for leave to file first supplemental complaint. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on May 14, 2007. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
2007-05-1428First Supplemental COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES.(lc, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/16/2007 (nmw, ). (Entered: 05/15/2007)
2007-06-0129ANSWER to Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. Related document: 28 Amended Complaint filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES.(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
2007-06-0130NOTICE of Errata by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY re 29 Answer to Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Answer to Plaintiff's Supplemental Complaint)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
2007-06-1331MOTION to Adopt Subsequent Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
2007-06-1332MOTION for Summary Judgment by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Motion and In Opposition to Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion# 2 Statement of Facts Not in Genuine Dispute# 3 Text of Proposed Order # 4 Plaintiff's Objections to Declaration of Marilyn A. Dorn and Motion to Strike)(Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
2007-06-1333AFFIDAVIT re 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment In Support of Plaintiffs Summary Judgment Motion & In Opposition to Defendants Sum Jdgt Motion by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 # 4 Exhibit F# 5 Exhibit G# 6 Exhibit H# 7 Exhibit J# 8 Exhibit K# 9 Exhibit L# 10 Exhibit M# 11 Exhibit N# 12 Exhibit O# 13 Exhibit P# 14 Exhibit Q# 15 Exhibit R# 16 Exhibit S# 17 Exhibit T# 18 Exhibit I-1# 19 Exhibit I-2# 20 Exhibit C-1# 21 Exhibit C-2# 22 Exhibit D-1# 23 Exhibit D-2)(Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
2007-06-1434RESPONSE to 31 Plaintiff's Motion to Adopt Subsequent Briefing Schedule filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (McBarnette, Andrea) Modified on 6/15/2007 (lc, ). (Entered: 06/14/2007)
2007-06-1835REPLY to opposition to motion re 31 MOTION to Adopt Subsequent Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 06/18/2007)
2007-06-25Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff to file a cross motion and opposition by 7/13/07; Defendant to file a renewed summary judgment motion and opposition to cross motion by 8/6/07; Plaintiff to file its reply in support of cross motion and opposition to defendant's renewed summary judgment motion by 9/14/07; Defendant to file its reply in support of a renewed summary judgment motion by 10/1/07. (tj ) (Entered: 06/27/2007)
2007-06-2736Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on June 25, 2007. (FL, ) (Entered: 06/27/2007)
2007-08-0337MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Opposition and a Supplement to Summary Judgment Motion by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
2007-08-0838Order denying without prejudice 37 defendant's motion to enlarge the time to file an opposition to plaintiff's summary judgment motion and a supplement to its dispositive motion. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on August 8, 2007. (FL, ) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
2007-08-0939MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Supplement to Dispositive Motion by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 08/09/2007)
2007-08-10Minute order granting 39 defendant's renewed motion to extend. Defendant has up to and including August 21, 2007, to file an opposition and supplement to its dispositive motion. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on August 10, 2007. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
2007-08-14Reset Deadlines: Defendant has up to and including August 21, 2007, to file an opposition and supplement to its dispositive motion(tj ) (Entered: 08/14/2007)
2007-08-16Reset Deadlines: Defendant has up to and including 8/21/07 to file an opposition and supplement to its dispositive motion. (tj ) (Entered: 08/16/2007)
2007-08-2140SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit DiMaio Decl. and Vaughn)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 08/21/2007)
2007-08-2141Memorandum in opposition to re 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Motion to Strike Dorn Declaration filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit DiMaio Decl. and Vaughn)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 08/21/2007)
2007-08-3142Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Reply/Opposition by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
2007-08-3143STATUS REPORT of DEA by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit DEA Declaration 2)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
2007-09-04Minute order granting 42 plaintiff's motion to extend reply to defendant's opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and opposition to defendant's supplemental motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff shall have up to and including September 28, 2007, to file a reply and opposition. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on September 4, 2007. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
2007-09-04RESET DEADLINES: Plaintiff shall have up to and including September 28, 2007, to file a reply and opposition.(tj ) Modified on 9/13/2007 (nmw, ). (Entered: 09/12/2007)
2007-09-1344MOTION to Stay Summary Judgment Briefing and Permit Discovery by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in support of Motion to Stay Summary Judgment Briefing and Permit Discovery# 2 Text of Proposed Order to Stay Summary Judgment & Permit Discovery# 3 Text of Proposed Order to Shorten Time on Motion to Stay Summary Judgment and Permit Discovery)(Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
2007-09-22MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ordered that plaintiff is not required to file its reply brief until the court resolves plaintiff's motion to stay summary judgment briefing schedule and permit discovery [#44]. (Kennedy, Henry) (Kennedy, Henry) (Entered: 09/22/2007)
2007-09-2545Order of Referral to United States Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on September 25, 2007. (FL, ) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
2007-09-25CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola for motion to stay summary judgement motion. 44 . (ls, ) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
2007-10-0146ORDER re referral to Judge Facciola for the motion to stay the motion for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 10/1/07. (SP, ) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
2007-10-0147STRICKEN pursuant to Minute Order filed 10/9/2007.....Memorandum in opposition to re 44 MOTION to Stay Summary Judgment Briefing and Permit Discovery filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (McBarnette, Andrea) Modified on 10/10/2007 (lc, ). (Entered: 10/01/2007)
2007-10-09MINUTE ORDER striking defendant's 47 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's 44 Motion to Stay Summary Judgment Briefing and Permit Discovery. Because defendant's opposition was not filed in compliance with the time limitations set forth in Local Rule 7(b) and Rule 6(e) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and because it was not accompanied by a motion evidencing excusable neglect pursuant to Rule 6(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, I am powerless to accept it. See Smith v. District of Columbia, 430 F.3d 450, 457 (D.C. Cir. 2005). Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 10/9/07. (lcjmf1) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
2007-10-0948Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to 44 Motion for Discovery by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBarnette, Andrea) Modified on 10/10/2007 (lc, ). (Entered: 10/09/2007)
2007-11-2049STATUS REPORT by DEA of referred documents by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
2007-12-1850ORDER granting 44 Motion to Permit Limited Discovery, and denying 48 Unopposed Motion to Extend Nunc Pro Tunc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 12/18/07. (lcjmf1) (Entered: 12/18/2007)
2007-12-1851MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 44 Motion to Permit Limited Discovery, and 48 Unopposed Motion to Extend Nunc Pro Tunc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 12/18/07. (lcjmf1) (Entered: 12/18/2007)
2007-12-2852MOTION for Reconsideration by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 12/28/2007)
2008-01-1153Memorandum in opposition to re 52 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 01/11/2008)
2008-01-1754ORDER denying 52 defendant's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on January 17, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 01/17/2008)
2008-01-1855STATUS REPORT by DEA by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
2008-02-2456NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. Attorney Andrea McBarnette terminated. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 02/24/2008)
2008-02-2457NOTICE of Appearance by Fred Elmore Haynes on behalf of UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 02/24/2008)
2008-03-1058First MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents and First Set of Interrogatories by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
2008-03-1259Memorandum in opposition to re 58 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents and First Set of Interrogatories filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
2008-03-1760ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 58 "Defendant's First Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents" and any other discovery disputes that may arise in this case are hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola for his determination. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 17, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
2008-03-1761MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Request for the Production of Documents by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
2008-03-2162Memorandum in opposition to re 61 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Request for the Production of Documents filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
2008-04-03MINUTE ORDER granting 58 First Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents. Defendants shall have up to and including April 11, 2008, to respond to plaintiff's first request for the production of documents and first set of interrogatories. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 3, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 04/03/2008)
2008-04-10MINUTE ORDER granting 61 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents. Defendants shall have up to and including April 11, 2008, to respond to plaintiff's second request for the production of documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 04/10/08. (lcjmf1) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
2008-12-2963NOTICE of Change of Firm Name and Address by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 12/29/2008)
2011-11-1864Case reassigned to Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Judge Henry H. Kennedy no longer assigned to the case. (ds) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
2011-11-18NOTICE of Hearing:Status Conference set for 11/30/2011 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje, ) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
2011-11-2265NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
2011-11-30Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 11/30/2011. (Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen.) (rje, ) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
2011-12-02MINUTE ORDER setting schedule for additional briefing. As the parties agreed at the status conference held on November 30, 2011, plaintiff will submit its final brief in support of its motion for summary judgment on December 5, 2011. Defendant will submit its final brief in support of its motion for summary judgment on January 18, 2012. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on December 2, 2011. (lchhk1) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
2011-12-0566Memorandum in opposition to re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
2011-12-0567RESPONSE re 41 Memorandum in Opposition & Defendant's Declaration of Ralph S. DiMaio filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
2011-12-0568AFFIDAVIT re 66 Memorandum in Opposition by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh 1A to Gaffney Dec, # 2 Exhibit Exh 1B to Gaffney Dec, # 3 Exhibit Exh 2 to Gaffney Dec, # 4 Exhibit Exh 3 to Gaffney Dec, # 5 Exhibit Exh 4A to Gaffney Dec, # 6 Exhibit Exh 4B to Gaffney Dec, # 7 Exhibit Exh 4C to Gaffney Dec, # 8 Exhibit Exh 4D to Gaffney Dec, # 9 Exhibit Exh 5A to Gaffney Dec, # 10 Exhibit Exh 5B to Gaffney Dec, # 11 Exhibit Exh 5C to Gaffney Dec, # 12 Exhibit Exh 6 to Gaffney Dec)(Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
2011-12-0569AFFIDAVIT re 66 Memorandum in Opposition (Supplemental Declaration by Paul Paz y Mino) by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Paz y Mino Dec, # 2 Exhibit 2A to Paz y Mino Dec, # 3 Exhibit 2B to Paz y Mino Dec, # 4 Exhibit 2C to Paz y Mino Dec, # 5 Exhibit 2D to Paz y Mino Dec, # 6 Exhibit 2E to Paz y Mino Dec, # 7 Exhibit 2F to Paz y Mino Dec, # 8 Exhibit 2G to Paz y Mino Dec, # 9 Exhibit 2H to Paz y Mino Dec, # 10 Exhibit 2I to Paz y Mino Dec, # 11 Exhibit 2J to Paz y Mino Dec, # 12 Exhibit 3 to Paz y Mino Dec, # 13 Exhibit 4 to Paz y Mino Dec, # 14 Exhibit 5 to Paz y Mino Dec, # 15 Exhibit 6 to Paz y Mino Dec, # 16 Exhibit 7 to Paz y Mino Dec, # 17 Exhibit 8 to Paz y Mino Dec)(Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
2011-12-0570REPLY to opposition to motion re 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (See Docket Entry 66 to view document. Counsel is instructed to docket the reply as a separate docket entry in the future)(rdj) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
2011-12-0571MOTION to Strike 41 Memorandum in Opposition by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (See Docket Entry 67 to view document. Counsel is instructed to docket the motion as a separate docket entry in the future)(rdj) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
2012-01-0972Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Filings on December 5, 2011, R. 66 through R. 71. by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
2012-01-09MINUTE ORDER granting 72 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, defendant shall file its response to plaintiff's filings of December 5, 2011 on or before February 8, 2012. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on January 9, 2012. (lchhk1) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
2012-01-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Responses due by 2/8/2012. (rje, ) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
2012-01-1373NOTICE of Change of email Address by Brian Gaffney (Gaffney, Brian) Modified on 1/17/2012 to enhance text(rdj). (Entered: 01/13/2012)
2012-02-0374Final MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Final Brief in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
2012-02-0675RESPONSE re 74 Final MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Final Brief in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment Opposition filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
2012-02-0876REPLY to opposition to motion re 74 Final MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Final Brief in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
2012-02-1777Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Final Brief by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
2012-02-2478NOTICE of Filing of Final Brief by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Elizabeth A. Culver)(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
2012-02-2479Memorandum in opposition to re 71 MOTION to Strike 41 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Strike the DiMaio Declaration filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
2012-02-2480MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Summary Judgment Motion as to the One Document Referred to the DEA by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
2012-02-2981MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
2012-03-0182Memorandum in opposition to re 80 MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Summary Judgment Motion as to the One Document Referred to the DEA , 81 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion on the Document Referred to the DEA filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
2012-03-0583SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgmenet by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of William C. Little Jr.)(Haynes, Fred) Modified event title and link on 3/6/2012 (znmw, ). (Entered: 03/05/2012)
2012-03-07MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 74 Motion for Extension of Time and 77 Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, defendant's final brief was timely filed on February 24, 2012. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on March 7, 2012. (lchhk1) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
2012-03-0884REPLY to opposition to motion re 81 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
2012-03-1685MOTION for Scheduling Order by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
2012-04-05MINUTE ORDER granting 85 plaintiff's motion for a status conference. Accordingly, a status conference will be held on Friday, April 20, 2012 at 10:15 a.m. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on April 5, 2012. (lchhk1) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
2012-04-06Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/20/2012 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
2012-04-0986Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kelly Franger, :Firm- Lippe Gaffney Wagner LLP, :Address- 329 Bryant Street, Suite 3D. Phone No. - 415-777-5600, ext 210. Fax No. - 415 777-9809 by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kelly Franger, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferster, Andrea) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
2012-04-1687NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
2012-04-20Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 4/20/2012. (Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen.) (rje) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
2012-04-20MINUTE ORDER granting 86 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Kelly Franger is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent plaintiff in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on April 20, 2012. (lcrcl3/intrcl2) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
2012-04-2088SCHEDULING ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 80 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting nunc pro tunc 81 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on April 20, 2012.(lcrcl3) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
2012-05-0489REPLY to opposition to motion re 71 MOTION to Strike 41 Memorandum in Opposition filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
2012-05-0490MOTION to Strike 78 Notice (Other) Declaration of Elizabeth Anne Culver (DKT#78-1) by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
2012-05-0491MOTION to Strike 83 Memorandum Declaration of William C. Little (DKT#83-1) by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
2012-05-0492SURREPLY to DEFENDANTS FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEF (DOCKET NO. 78) AND SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM (DOCKET NO. 83) filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Dec of Gaffney)(Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
2012-05-1593NOTICE Of Filing of Response to Surreply by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY re 92 Surreply (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
2012-05-1594Memorandum in opposition to re 91 MOTION to Strike 83 Memorandum Declaration of William C. Little (DKT#83-1) filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
2012-05-1595Memorandum in opposition to re 90 MOTION to Strike 78 Notice (Other) Declaration of Elizabeth Anne Culver (DKT#78-1) filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
2012-05-2496NOTICE of Filing of Reply to Surreply by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES re 92 Surreply (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
2012-05-2497REPLY to opposition to motion re 90 MOTION to Strike 78 Notice (Other) Declaration of Elizabeth Anne Culver (DKT#78-1) filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
2012-05-2498REPLY to opposition to motion re 91 MOTION to Strike 83 Memorandum Declaration of William C. Little (DKT#83-1) filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
2012-05-2499NOTICE of Proposed Order by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES re 92 Surreply (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
2012-06-15100NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
2012-08-14101ORDER granting in part and denying in part Motion for Summary Judgment 23 ; granting in part and denying in part Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 32 ; denying Motions to Strike 71 , 90 , 91 . Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/14/2012. (lcrcl5). (Entered: 08/14/2012)
2012-08-14102MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/14/2012. (lcrcl5) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
2012-09-04103Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Schedule Governing Further Proceedings by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
2012-09-07104NOTICE of Proposed Order by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES re 101 Order, Memorandum & Opinion,, 102 Memorandum & Opinion (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
2012-09-07105MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
2012-09-07106Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Court's Order of August 14, 2012 by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
2012-09-17107Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Schedule to Govern Further Proceedings in this Case by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
2012-09-19108ORDER granting 103 Motion for Extension of Time to file a proposed schedule. Parties shall have to 9/7/2012, to file the proposed schedule, nunc pro tunc. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/18/12. (rje) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
2012-09-19109ORDER granting 106 Motion for Extension of Time to file a proposed schedule. Parties shall have to 9/17/2012, to file the proposed schedule, nunc pro tunc. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/18/12. (rje ) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
2012-09-19110ORDER granting 107 Motion for Extension of Time to file a proposed schedule. Parties shall have to 10/15/2012, to file the proposed schedule. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/18/12. (rje) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
2012-10-05111NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
2012-10-15112STATUS REPORT on Appeal and Preliminary Proposed Schedule by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
2012-10-24MINUTE ORDER. Per the defendants request in its Status Report 112 , the parties shall have until November 15, 2012 to submit a proposed schedule governing further proceedings in this case. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/24/2012. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
2012-10-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed scheduling Order due by 11/15/2012. (rje) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
2012-11-15113Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Schedule to Govern Further Proceedings in this Case by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
2012-11-26114Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File, by each Party, Its Proposed Schedule for Responding to Plaintiff's FOIA Request by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
2012-11-27115Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File, by Each Party, Its Proposed Schedule for Responding to Plaintiff's FOIA Request by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
2012-11-28116STATUS REPORT on Defendant's Proposed Search Schedule by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
2012-11-28117MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
2012-11-28118NOTICE of Proposed Order by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES re 101 Order, Memorandum & Opinion,, (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
2012-12-05MINUTE ORDER GRANTING NUNC PRO TUNC Consent Motion 113 for Extension of Time to File Proposed Schedule. The parties shall have until 11/26/2012 to file the proposed schedule. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/05/2012. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
2012-12-05MINUTE ORDER GRANTING NUNC PRO TUNC Consent Motion 114 for One-Day Extension of Time to File. The parties shall have until November 27, 2012 to file a proposed schedule. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/5/2012. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
2012-12-05MINUTE ORDER GRANTING NUNC PRO TUNC Consent Motion 115 for Extension of Time to File. The parties shall have until 11/27/2012 to file their proposed schedules. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/5/2012. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
2012-12-05NOTICE of Hearing:Status Conference set for 12/18/2012 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje, ) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
2012-12-07119NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
2012-12-18Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 12/18/2012. (Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen.) (rje) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
2013-01-07120MOTION to Clarify the Court's August 14, 2012, Order and Memorandum Opinion by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
2013-01-07121NOTICE of Filing of Search Declaration by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Martha M. Lutz)(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
2013-06-06Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 6/7/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (mpt, ) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
2013-06-07Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 6/7/2013. (Court Reporter Lisa Foradori.) (mpt, ) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
2013-06-10122RESPONSE re 120 MOTION to Clarify the Court's August 14, 2012, Order and Memorandum Opinion OBJECTION filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF BRIAN GAFFNEY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION AND NOTICE OF FILING SEARCH DECLARATION, # 2 Exhibit PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF MARTHA M. LUTZ, # 3 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER)(Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
2013-06-17123REPLY to opposition to motion re 120 MOTION to Clarify the Court's August 14, 2012, Order and Memorandum Opinion filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
2013-06-17124NOTICE Concerning Filing of a Supplemental Declaration by Martha M. Lutz by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
2013-07-29125NOTICE of Transcript by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
2013-08-30126STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
2013-09-09Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/18/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (mpt, ) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
2013-09-18127ORDER regarding status conference. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on September 18, 2013. (lcrcl4) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
2013-09-18Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 9/18/2013. (Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen) (mpt, ) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
2013-11-14128Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Paragraph 2 of the September 18, 2013, Order and Motion for Clarification of the Meaning of the Date referred to in Paragraph 3 of that Order by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
2013-12-03129NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian Gaffney (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
2014-01-13130Memorandum in opposition to re 128 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Paragraph 2 of the September 18, 2013, Order and Motion for Clarification of the Meaning of the Date referred to in Paragraph 3 of that Order filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
2014-01-17131NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. Attorney Kelly Franger terminated. (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
2014-01-23132REPLY to opposition to motion re 128 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Paragraph 2 of the September 18, 2013, Order and Motion for Clarification of the Meaning of the Date referred to in Paragraph 3 of that Order filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
2014-02-04133NOTICE of Referral of Documents to NSA by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
2014-03-22134NOTICE of Referral of Documents to the Department of State by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 03/22/2014)
2014-03-30135NOTICE of Referral to the Drug Enforcement Administration, the Executive Office for the United States Attorneys, the Federal Bureau of Investigation, the National Geospatial Intelligence Agency, and the United States Air Force by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 03/30/2014)
2014-04-03136NOTICE of Referral of Documents to the Defense Intelligence Agency and the Department of Defense by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
2014-05-09137MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Processing by the Department of State of the Documents Referred by the CIA by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Hackett Declaration)(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
2014-05-23138Memorandum in opposition to re 137 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Processing by the Department of State of the Documents Referred by the CIA filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
2014-05-27139MOTION for Extension of Time to June 6, 2014, for Several Federal Agencies to Comply with the Court's September 18, 2013, Order by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
2014-05-28140Memorandum in opposition to re 139 MOTION for Extension of Time to June 6, 2014, for Several Federal Agencies to Comply with the Court's September 18, 2013, Order filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
2014-05-29141First MOTION for Extension of Time to November 30, 2014, for the Defense Intelligence Agency to Process the Documents Referred to It and to May 31, 2015, for the Department of Defense to Process the Documents Referred to It by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of James P. Hogan)(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
2014-05-30142NOTICE of Referral to the United States Coast Guard and of a Further Referral to the Drug Enforcement Administration by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
2014-06-02143Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 137 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Processing by the Department of State of the Documents Referred by the CIA by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
2014-06-04144REPLY to opposition to motion re 137 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Processing by the Department of State of the Documents Referred by the CIA filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Second Declaration of John F. Hackett)(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
2014-06-06145MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with the Court's September 18, 2013, Order; Filed on Behalf of the Executive Office for the United States Attorneys and the United States Air Force by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
2014-06-13146RESPONSE re 142 Notice (Other) filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
2014-06-13147Memorandum in opposition to re 141 First MOTION for Extension of Time to November 30, 2014, for the Defense Intelligence Agency to Process the Documents Referred to It and to May 31, 2015, for the Department of Defense to Process the Documents Referred to It filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
2014-06-23148REPLY to opposition to motion re 141 First MOTION for Extension of Time to November 30, 2014, for the Defense Intelligence Agency to Process the Documents Referred to It and to May 31, 2015, for the Department of Defense to Process the Documents Referred to It filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
2014-06-25149Second MOTION for Extension of Time to July 2, 2014, for the Air Force and to July 25, 2014, for the Executive Office for the United States Attorneys to Comply with the Court's September 18, 2013, Order by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
2014-07-18150First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete the Processing of Referred Documents Filed by the CIA on behalf of the Drug Enforcement Administration (Second Referral of Documents) and the United States Coast Guard by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
2014-12-01151MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Review of Referred Documents by the Defense Intelligence Agency by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
2014-12-08152Memorandum in opposition to re 151 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Review of Referred Documents by the Defense Intelligence Agency filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
2014-12-29153REPLY to opposition to motion re 151 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Review of Referred Documents by the Defense Intelligence Agency filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
2014-12-30154MOTION for Order Setting Status Conference by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 12/30/2014)
2015-01-13155RESPONSE re 154 MOTION for Order Setting Status Conference filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
2015-04-30156Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply, by the Department of State, with the Court's Order Regarding Responding to Plaintiff's FOIA Request by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
2015-05-15157First MOTION for Extension of Time to Process Documents Referred to the Drug Enforcement Administration by the Department of State by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
2015-05-29158Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete, by the Department of Defense, the Processing of the Documents Referred to It by the CIA by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
2015-06-12159MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply, by the Department of Defense, wilth the Court's September 18, 2013, Order, and Status Report by the Department of Defense by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
2015-07-06Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/15/2015 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 22A before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (hs) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
2015-07-13160NOTICE of Telephonic Appearance by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
2015-07-13161Civil Statement from Plaintiff Institute for Policy Studies. (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
2015-07-15Minute Entry, Proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 7/15/2015. Oral Rulings given denying Defendant's 128 137 139 141 143 145 149 150 151 156 157 158 159 Motions for Extension of Time; (Court Reporter Lisa Foradori.) (hs) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
2015-07-15Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/20/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (hs) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
2015-07-17162ORDER that the 128 consent MOTION for Extension of Time filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY is DENIED for failure to show good cause, and clarification. (Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/15/15). (tj) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
2015-07-17163ORDER that the 137 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Processing by the Department of State of the Documents Referred by the CIA filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY is DENIED for failure to show good cause. (Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/15/15). (tj) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
2015-07-17164ORDER that the 139 MOTION for Extension of Time to June 6, 2014, for Several Federal Agencies to Comply with the Court's September 18, 2013, Order filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY is DENIED for failure to show good cause. (Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/15/15). (tj) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
2015-07-17165ORDER that the 141 First MOTION for Extension of Time to November 30, 2014, for the Defense Intelligence Agency to Process the Documents Referred to It and to May 31, 2015, for the Department of Defense to Process the Documents Referred to It filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY is DENIED for failure to show good cause. (Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/15/15) (tj) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
2015-07-17166ORDER that the 143 consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 137 filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY is DENIED for failure to show good cause. (Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/15/15). (tj) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
2015-07-17167ORDER that the 145 MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with the Court's September 18, 2013, Order; Filed on Behalf of the Executive Office for the United States Attorneys and the United States Air Force filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY is DENIED for failure to show good cause. (Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/15/15). (tj) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
2015-07-17168ORDER that the 149 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to July 2, 2014, for the Air Force and to July 25, 2014, for the Executive Office for the United States Attorneys to Comply with the Court's September 18, 2013, Order filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY is DENIED for failure to show good cause. (Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/15/15). (tj) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
2015-07-17169ORDER that the 150 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete the Processing of Referred Documents Filed by the CIA on behalf of the Drug Enforcement Administration (Second Referral of Documents) and the United States Coast Guard filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY is DENIED for failure to show good cause. (Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/15/15) (tj) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
2015-07-17170ORDER that the 151 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Review of Referred Documents by the Defense Intelligence Agency filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY is DENIED for failure to show good cause. (Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/15/15). (tj) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
2015-07-17171ORDER that plaintiff's motion 154 requesting a status conference is DENIED as moot, in light of the Status Conference held this date. (Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/15/15). (tj) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
2015-07-17172ORDER that the 156 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply, by the Department of State, with the Court's Order Regarding Responding to Plaintiff's FOIA Request filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY is DENIED for failure to show good cause. (Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/15/15). (tj) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
2015-07-17173ORDER that the 157 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Process Documents Referred to the Drug Enforcement Administration by the Department of State filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY is DENIED for failure to show good cause. (Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/15/15). (tj) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
2015-07-17174ORDER that the 158 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete, by the Department of Defense, the Processing of the Documents Referred to It by the CIA filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY is DENIED for failure to show good cause. (Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/15/15). (tj) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
2015-07-17175ORDER that the 159 MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply, by the Department of Defense, wilth the Court's September 18, 2013, Order, and Status Report by the Department of Defense filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY is DENIED for failure to show good cause. (Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/15/15). (tj) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
2015-08-13176NOTICE of In Camera Review of Classified Documents by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
2015-08-19177NOTICE of Correction of Statement by Defendant's Counsel at the July 15, 2015, Status Hearing by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
2015-08-19178STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
2015-08-19179MEMORANDUM AND OPINION, Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/19/2015. (hs) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
2015-08-19180ORDER; granting 120 Motion to Clarify Court's August 14, 2012, Order and Memorandum Opinion, Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/19/2015. (hs) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
2015-08-19181NOTICE of Telephonic Appearance August 20 2015 by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES re Set/Reset Hearings (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
2015-08-20NOTICE OF ERROR re 181 Notice (Other); emailed to brian@gaffneylegal.com, cc'd 6 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Improper format (landscape); In future, upload documents in proper format (portrait); Do not refile. (znmw) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
2015-08-20Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 8/20/2015. Further Status Conferences scheduled for 8/21/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Judge Royce C. Lamberth, and for 9/1/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (Court Reporter Lisa Foradori). (tg) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
2015-08-20182NOTICE of Proposed Order Concerning the Remaining Declarations and/or Vaughn Indices by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
2015-08-25Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 9/1/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 22A before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (hs) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
2015-08-25183VAUGHN INDEX SCHEDULING ORDER, Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/24/2015. (hs) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
2015-09-01184NOTICE of Telephonic Appearance September 1 2015 by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES re Set/Reset Hearings (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
2015-09-01Minute Entry; for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 9/1/2015. Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration due by 9/11/2015, Plaintiff's Response due by 10/1/2015, Reply due by 10/13/2015. Status Conference set for 10/15/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (Court Reporter Annette Montalvo) (hs) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
2015-09-09185First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's August 19, 2015, Memorandum Opinion and Order by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
2015-09-10186Memorandum in opposition to re 185 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's August 19, 2015, Memorandum Opinion and Order filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
2015-09-11187MOTION for Reconsideration re 179 Memorandum & Opinion, 180 Order on Motion to Clarify by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration by Deputy Director for Operations)(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
2015-09-16188ORDER denying as moot 187 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/15/15. (gdf) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
2015-09-28189MOTION for Attorney Fees (Interim) by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian Gaffney, # 2 Declaration of Paul Paz y Mino, # 3 Declaration of Andrea Ferster, # 4 Declaration of Carl Messineo, # 5 Declaration of Hilliard, # 6 Declaration of David Bahr, # 7 Declaration of Adam Isacson, # 8 Declaration of Lindsay-Poland, # 9 Declaration of Katherine Meyer, # 10 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Interim Fees)(Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
2015-09-29190ERRATA Motion for Award of Interim Attorneys Fees by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES 189 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Interim) filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Motion for Award of Interim Attorneys Fees)(Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 09/29/2015)
2015-09-29191MOTION for Extension of Time to Brief Motion for Reconsideration by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 09/29/2015)
2015-09-30192Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to October 30, 2015, for the Drug Enforcement Administration to Serve its Vaughn Index and to November 10, 2015, for Defendant to Complete its Analysis of the Referred Documents Using the CADRE Numbers by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
2015-10-12193Memorandum in opposition to re 187 MOTION for Reconsideration re 179 Memorandum & Opinion, 180 Order on Motion to Clarify filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 10/12/2015)
2015-10-14194ORDER; granting 191 Motion for Extension of Time to Brief Motion for Reconsideration; Plaintiff's Response due by 10/12/2015; Defendant's Reply due by 10/26/2015. Status Conference reset for 10/30/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A, Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/14/2015. (hs) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
2015-10-15195Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
2015-10-19196Memorandum in opposition to re 189 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Interim) filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Dr. Malowane)(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
2015-10-23197Consent MOTION for Order Extending Time to File Interim Fee Reply Brief by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
2015-10-26198REPLY to opposition to motion re 187 MOTION for Reconsideration re 179 Memorandum & Opinion, 180 Order on Motion to Clarify filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
2015-10-29199NOTICE of Telephonic Appearance by Brian Gaffney on behalf of INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Gaffney, Brian) Modified event title on 10/30/2015 (znmw). (Entered: 10/29/2015)
2015-10-29200Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief Interim Attorneys Fees by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
2015-10-30Minute Entry; for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 10/30/2015. Status Conference set for 12/18/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Judge Royce C. Lamberth, (Court Reporter Janice Dickman) (hs) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
2015-10-30201ORDER; granting 192 Motion for Extension of Time, Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/30/2015. (hs) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
2015-10-30202ORDER; granting 197 200 Motions for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief For Interim Attorneys Fees; Plaintiff's Reply/Supporting Papers due by 11/5/2015, Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/30/2015. (hs) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
2015-10-30203ORDER; granting Nunc Pro Tunc 195 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for interim fees, Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/30/2015. (hs) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
2015-10-30204MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve the Drug Enforcement Administration's Vaughn Index by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
2015-11-03205ORDER; granting 204 Motion for Extension of Time to Served Its Vaughn Index; Vaughn Index due by 12/17/2015, Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/3/2015. (hs) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
2015-11-05206REPLY to opposition to motion re 189 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Interim) filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Supplemental Gaffney, # 2 Declaration Supplemental Paz y Mio, # 3 Declaration Supplemental Messineo)(Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
2015-11-05207MOTION to Strike 196 Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of Laura Malowane [Dkt196-1] by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
2015-11-10208Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Analysis of the Referred Documents by CIA CADRE Number by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
2015-11-18209NOTICE of In Camera Ex Parte Submission of Classified CIA Declaration by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
2015-11-23210Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 207 MOTION to Strike 196 Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of Laura Malowane [Dkt196-1] by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
2015-11-30211ORDER; granting 210 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 207 MOTION to Strike 196 Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of Laura Malowane. Defendant's Response due by 11/30/2015, Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/25/2015. (hs) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
2015-11-30212Memorandum in opposition to re 207 MOTION to Strike 196 Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of Laura Malowane [Dkt196-1] filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
2015-12-06213REPLY to opposition to motion re 207 MOTION to Strike 196 Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of Laura Malowane [Dkt196-1] filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 12/06/2015)
2015-12-10214NOTICE of Telephonic Appearance by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES re Status Conference, Set Hearings (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
2015-12-11215MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete the CADRE Number Analysis by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 12/11/2015)
2015-12-17216MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
2015-12-17217MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete the Drug Enforcement Administration's Vaughn Index by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
2015-12-18Minute Entry; for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 12/18/2015. Status Conference set for 4/15/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (Court Reporter Lisa Moriera) (hs) (Entered: 12/18/2015)
2015-12-21218NOTICE of Proposed Order by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES re 217 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete the Drug Enforcement Administration's Vaughn Index , 215 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete the CADRE Number Analysis (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
2015-12-22219ORDER; granting 215 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete its Analysis; granting 217 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete its Vaughn Index. CIA Vaughn Index due by 1/22/2016, DEA Vaughn Index due by 2/16/2016 and CIA Vaughn Index due by 3/1/2016, Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/21/2015. (hs) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
2016-01-22220MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve the Defense Intelligence Agency's Supplemental Vaughn Index by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
2016-01-28221Memorandum in opposition to re 220 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve the Defense Intelligence Agency's Supplemental Vaughn Index filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
2016-01-28222ORDER denying 185 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on January 28, 2016. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
2016-01-28223ORDER granting 208 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on January 28, 2016. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
2016-01-28224ORDER granting 220 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on January 28, 2016. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
2016-01-28225ORDER granting defendant's Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on January 28, 2016. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
2016-01-28226MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on January 28, 2016. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
2016-03-01227WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO 228 NOTICE FILED 3/3/2016.....MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve a Supplemental Declaration from the Executive Office for the United States Attorneys that Addresses One Document and a Part of Another Document by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) Modified on 3/4/2016 (zrdj). (Entered: 03/01/2016)
2016-03-03228WITHDRAWAL of Motion by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY re 227 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve a Supplemental Declaration from the Executive Office for the United States Attorneys that Addresses One Document and a Part of Another Document filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY . (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
2016-03-22229NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Bahr on behalf of INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Bahr, David) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
2016-03-22230NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Gaffney on behalf of INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
2016-03-22231MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Bahr, David) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
2016-03-22232NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Bahr on behalf of INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Bahr, David) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
2016-03-23233TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 7-15-15; Page Numbers: 1-27. Date of Issuance:3-23-16. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa M. Foradori, Telephone number 202-354-3269, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <a href=http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/dcd/node/2189>Transcript Order Form.</a><P></P><P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P> NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 4/13/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2016.(Foradori, Lisa) (Entered: 03/23/2016)
2016-04-15Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 4/15/2016. Any Supplemental Memoranda from the parties regarding interim fees are due by 6/1/2016. Further Scheduling Order to be Issued. (Court Reporter: FTR Gold)(FTR Time Frame: 10:16 - 10:25) (jth) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
2016-04-20234ORDER directing the plaintiff and defendant to attempt to agree on an interim award of attorney's fees within thirty (30) days from today's date. If they cannot agree within that time, plaintiff and defendant shall file supplemental memoranda concerning interim attorney's fees by 6/1/2016. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall have until and including 10/15/2016 to file with the Court a list of documents they wish to challenge. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/18/2016. (tg) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
2016-06-01235Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Parties' Supplemental Memoranda on Interim Attorney's Fees by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
2016-06-06236Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
2016-06-06237MEMORANDUM by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
2016-10-06238Consent MOTION to Stay re 234 Order, Set Deadlines,,,, by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
2016-10-25239ORDER granting 235 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File the Parties' Supplemental Memoranda on Interim Attorney's Fees. It is ORDERED that the motion is granted; and it is further ORDERED that the parties will file their supplemental memoranda on interim attorney's fees by June 6, 2016, nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/24/2016. (ad) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-10-25240ORDER granting 238 Consent Motion to Stay re 234 Order. It is hereby ORDERED that this case shall be stayed until December 15, 2016, by which time the parties shall report to the Court regarding Defendant's progress in the review and possible release of information originally withheld as "non-responsive" to Plaintiff's FOIA request. It is further ORDERED that the October 15, 2016 deadline for Plaintiff to file a list of documents it wishes to challenge is extended until December 15, 2016, or such further time as the Court may allow on Motion. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/24/2016. (ad) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2016-12-09241Consent MOTION to Stay re 240 Order on Motion to Stay,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
2016-12-15242Joint STATUS REPORT by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Bahr, David) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
2017-03-23243STIPULATION re 189 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Interim) & Proposed Order by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
2017-03-27244STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-04-07245ORDER re 243 Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Interim Attorney's Fees filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/6/17. (zlsj) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-08-03246STATUS REPORT AND REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order PO setting status conference)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-03247NOTICE OF EXHIBIT A IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS STATUS REPORT AND REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE, DKT. # 246 by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES re 246 Status Report (Bahr, David) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-03248MOTION for Status Conference by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (See Docket Entry 246 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-08-17249Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for a Status Conference by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-24250RESPONSE re 248 MOTION for Hearing filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-09-11251REPLY to opposition to motion re 248 MOTION for Hearing and Status Conference filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration Of Paul Paz Y Mino In Support Of Status Report And Motion For Status Conference, # 2 Exhibit B in Support Of Status Report And Motion For Status Conference, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C In Support Of Status Report And Motion For Status Conference, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D In Support Of Status Report And Motion For Status Conference, # 5 Exhibit Ex. E In Support Of Status Report And Motion For Status Conference)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2018-10-04252ORDER denying 189 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 207 Motion to Strike ; denying 236 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 241 Motion to Stay; granting, nunc pro tunc 248 Motion for Hearing; granting 249 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court further ORDERS the parties to appear for a Status Conference set for 10/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/3/18. (lsj) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-10-08253NOTICE of Telephonice Appearance by David Alan Bahr on behalf of INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Bahr, David) Modified event title on 10/10/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 10/08/2018)
2018-10-11Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 10/11/2018. (Court Reporter: Scott Wallace) (zjd) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-11254SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant shall file a report on the State Department's voluntary release of documents within 10 days. Defendant shall file its partial motion for summary judgment within 30 days. Plaintiff shall file any response and crossmotion within 30 days of defendant's filing. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/11/2018. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-22255STATUS REPORT on the Department of State's Voluntary Reprocessing of Its Records by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-11-08256TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 10-11-18; Page Numbers: 1-11. Date of Issuance:11-8-18. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. Af ter 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/29/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2019.(Wallace, Scott) Modified on 11/8/2018 (zrdj). (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-11-12257Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on What Constitutes a Record Under the FOIA by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 11/12/2018)
2018-11-21258Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Question of What Constitutes a Record under the FOIA by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-11-26259ENTERED IN ERROR......ORDER directing the government to produce a Vaughn index and supporting motion within thirty (30) days of this date. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/21/2018. (lcrcl2) Modified on 11/29/2018 (zlsj). (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-11-26ENTERED IN ERROR.....Set/Reset Deadlines: Vaughn Index due by 12/21/2018 (lsj) Modified on 11/29/2018 (zlsj). (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-11-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Attorney Meet and Confer Conference due by 12/6/2018. Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 12/20/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-11-26260ORDER granting 258 Motion for Extension of Time to File; Defendant shall file its motion for partial summary judgment by 11/28/2018. The response to that motion and any cross-motion for partial summary judgment are due by 12/28/2018. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/26/2018. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-11-28261Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Question of What Is a Record by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-11-29NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Order 259 was entered in error. (lsj) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-11-29262ORDER granting 261 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant's Motion for partial Summary Judgment due by 12/3/2018. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/29/18. (lsj) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-12-03263Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Issue of What Constitutes a Record under the FOIA in the Context of Intelligence Reports Covering Multiple Subjects and Countries by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-04264MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Issue of What Constitutes a Separate Record in the Context of Intelligence Reports Addressing Multiple Subjects by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - DIA Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B - DOD Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C - CIA Declaration, # 4 Exhibit D - OIP Guidance on Determining What Is a Record)(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-14265Interim STATUS REPORT on the State Department's Reprocessing of Records by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
2018-12-27266Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 264 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Issue of What Constitutes a Separate Record in the Context of Intelligence Reports Addressing Multiple Subjects by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
2019-02-09267Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 264 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Issue of What Constitutes a Separate Record in the Context of Intelligence Reports Addressing Multiple Subjects by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 02/09/2019)
2019-02-19268STATUS REPORT Filed by Department of State by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-25269ORDER granting 263 Motion for Extension of Time to File, nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 02/25/2019. (lcrcl3) Modified on 2/26/2019 (zlsj). (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-25270ORDER granting 266 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 02/25/2019. (lcrcl3) Modified on 2/26/2019 (zlsj). (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-25271ORDER granting 267 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 02/25/2019. (lcrcl3) Modified on 2/26/2019 (zlsj). (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-03-10272Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File for ex for plaintiff to file its cross motion for partial summary judgment and its opposition to defendants motion for partial summary judgment by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order granting extension of time for plaintiff to file its cross motion for partial summary judgment and its opposition to defendants motion for partial summary judgment)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 03/10/2019)
2019-04-10273Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File for plaintiff to file its cross motion for partial summary judgment and its opposition to defendants motion for partial summary judgment by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-11274ORDER granting 273 Motion for Extension of Time to File; Plaintiff's cross motion for partial summary judgment and its opposition to defendant's motion for partial summary judgment due by 4/22/2019. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/11/2019. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-04-22275MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion For Partial Summary Judgment And Denying Defendants Motion For Partial Summary Judgment, # 2 Memorandum in Support PlaintiIn Support Of Plaintiff's Cross Motion For Partial Summary Judgment And Opposition To Defendants Motion For Partial Summary Judgment, # 3 Statement of Facts Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants Statement Of Material Facts And Plaintiffs Statement Of Material Facts As To Which There Is No Genuine Issue, # 4 Declaration Of Paul Paz Y Mino In Support Of Plaintiffs Cross Motion For Partial Summary Judgment And Opposition To Defendants Motion For Partial Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit APPENDIX I: Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Exhibits A1 to K, # 6 Exhibit APPENDIX II: Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Exhibits L1 to GG)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-04-22276SUPPLEMENT (Exhibit Appendices I & II containing Exhibits A1 through GG) re 275 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit PPENDIX II: Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Exhibits L1 to GG)(Bahr, David) Modified on 4/30/2019 to correct docket event/text/link (jf). (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-04-22277Memorandum in opposition to re 264 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Issue of What Constitutes a Separate Record in the Context of Intelligence Reports Addressing Multiple Subjects filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (See Docket Entry 275 to view document) (tth) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-05-06278Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and to File Defendant's Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
2019-05-20279ORDER granting in part and denying in part 278 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court orders the government to file its opposition by June 20, 2019; the Court further orders the plaintiff to file any reply by July 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 05/20/2019. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
2019-05-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/20/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/20/2019. (lsj) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
2019-05-31280Interim STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/31/2019)
2019-06-21281Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summay Judgment and Its Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-06-21282ORDER granting in part and denying in part 281 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The defendant shall file its opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment by June 21, 2019. The plaintiff's deadline to file any reply shall remain July 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/21/2019. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-06-21283Memorandum in opposition to re 275 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Hertel Declaration (DEA), # 2 Exhibit B - Morris Supplemental Declaration (DIA), # 3 Exhibit C - 2d Herrington Declaration (DOD))(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-06-21284REPLY to opposition to motion re 264 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Issue of What Constitutes a Separate Record in the Context of Intelligence Reports Addressing Multiple Subjects filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-06-23285ERRATA by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY 283 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment to ECF No. 283 - Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Six Statements of Material Facts Not In Genuine Dispute)(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/23/2019)
2019-06-23286ERRATA (Second) by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY 283 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/23/2019)
2019-06-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 7/20/2019. (lsj) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-06-24287NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-07-02288STATUS REPORT on Department of State's Voluntary Reprocessing of its Records by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-18289REPLY to opposition to motion re 275 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF PAUL PAZ Y MIO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, # 2 Declaration DECLARATION OF DAVID A. BAHR IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-18290MOTION to Strike 285 Errata, Defendants Response To Plaintiffs Statement Of Material Facts Not In Genuine Dispute (Dkt. # 285-1) by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES (Bahr, David) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-26291Memorandum in opposition to re 290 MOTION to Strike 285 Errata, Defendants Response To Plaintiffs Statement Of Material Facts Not In Genuine Dispute (Dkt. # 285-1) filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 07/26/2019)
2019-07-26292MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Facts (ECF No. 285-1) by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 07/26/2019)
2019-07-26295Memorandum in opposition to re 290 MOTION to Strike 285 Errata, Defendants Response To Plaintiffs Statement Of Material Facts Not In Genuine Dispute (Dkt. # 285-1) filed by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (See Docket Entry 292 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-30293REPLY to opposition to motion re 292 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Facts (ECF No. 285-1) filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Bahr, David) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-07-30294RESPONSE re 292 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Facts (ECF No. 285-1) filed by INSTITUTE FOR POLICY STUDIES. (Bahr, David) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-07-31296MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/31/2019. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-31297ORDER denying 264 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 275 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 290 Motion to Strike; granting 292 Motion for Extension of Time. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/31/2019. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Attorney Meet and Confer Conference due by 8/12/2019. (lsj) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-08-15298Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-09-19299NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Alan R. Burch on behalf of UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY Substituting for attorney Damon Taaffe (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-10-15300Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-16301Joint STATUS REPORT Correcting ECF #300 by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar