Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMARINO v. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2006cv01255
Date Filed2006-07-12
Date Closed2021-08-26
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffCARLOS MARINO
TERMINATED: 12/05/2013
PlaintiffGRISELLE MARINO
Case DescriptionCarlos Marino, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the DEA for records concerning Jose Everth Lopez, an informant who Marino alleged had been publicly identified through testimony at his trial. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Marino filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (DEA) as a component of the Department of Justice (DOJ)
DefendantSTEVEN GOLDBLATT
AppealD.C. Circuit 10-5354
Documents
Docket
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [25]
Opinion/Order [89]
Opinion/Order [95]
FOIA Project Annotation: After insisting on invoking a Glomar response to neither confirm nor deny the identity of an agency informant during seven years of litigation, Judge Gladys Kessler has ruled that the DEA must process Carlos Marino's request for records pertaining to Jose Everth Lopez because he was identified as a government informant at several related trials. Marino had been convicted of being the Miami money man for a drug operation run by Colombian Pastor Parafan-Homen, based largely on Lopez's testimony. Lopez subsequently testified at Parafan-Homen's trial that he had lied multiple times during Marino's trial, and that while he had claimed at Marino's trial to be a low-level participant in Parafan-Homen's operation, he actually had met Parafan-Homen on several occasions at meetings of high-level conspirators in Bogota. Marino made a FOIA request for records indexed under Lopez's DEA informant file. The agency denied Marino's request, claiming it could neither confirm nor deny that it had records pertaining to the informant file. Judge Ricardo Urbina, the original judge assigned to Marino's case, upheld the government's position. However, the D.C. Circuit reversed, noting that by arguing that Lopez's informant status had been publicly confirmed, Marino had raised a defense to the Glomar response. Marino subsequently died of cancer and his ex-wife was substituted as plaintiff in his place. The case was reassigned to Kessler and she noted that, after some equivocation, the DEA conceded that Lopez's status as an informant was a matter of public record and withdrew its Glomar response. Instead, the agency took the position that it had responded to Marino's request by producing a single document and that, to the extent that Marino's request was broader, all records were protected by Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). The agency argued that Marino's request was limited to documents in Lopez's informant file that were made public at the trials of Marino and Parafan-Homen, and documents indexed to the informant number that were "required to be made public" at the trials, but were not. Marino argued his request was for all records indexed under the informant number. Kessler agreed. She noted that in the third sentence of his request, Marino asked for "any documents indexed under NADDIS No. 3049901 [and that the agency] send Marino any segregable portion of such documents. This expansive language is fully consistent with Marino's interpretation and inconsistent with the narrow reading urged by the Government." Kessler indicated the agency still was arguing that it was entitled to categorical protection under Exemption 7(C). But she noted that to prevail the agency had to show that it conducted a good faith effort to find responsive records and that those records fell within the exemption. DEA contended it could not search for responsive records on Lopez's role as an informant at trial because its records were not searchable by case name or court file number. Rejecting that argument, Kessler observed that "this explanation is totally unconvincing in light of the Court's ruling that Marino seeks all documents indexed to NADDIS number 3049901, and not simply those that were made public or required to be made public at the two trials." Kessler found the privacy interest in Lopez's records was diminished by the agency's performance. She pointed out that "even if the Government did not definitively know that Lopez was perjuring himself at Marino's trial, its failure to investigate and learn all of the facts about its key witness, and to disclose exculpatory evidence to Carlos Marino, reasonably suggest that it 'might' have acted negligently or otherwise improperly during Marino's prosecution." Kessler dismissed the agency's categorical protection claim. She noted that "while it is both reasonable and consistent with this Circuit's case law to assume that some portion of the responsive records may implicate the privacy interests of Lopez and others who may be mentioned in them this does not supply a basis to withhold the records in their entirety. The DEA puts forth no reason why redactions or selective withholding will not suffice to protect any existing privacy interests."
Issues: Determination - Glomar response, Exemption 7(C) - Invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records
Opinion/Order [152]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2006-07-121COMPLAINT against DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Filing fee $ 350) filed by CARLOS MARINO.(Complaint is unavailable due to Privacy Information) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(jf, ) Modified on 1/23/2009 (jeb, ). (Entered: 07/13/2006)
2006-07-12SUMMONS (2) Issued as to DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION and U.S. Attorney (jf, ) (Entered: 07/13/2006)
2006-07-272NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Henault, Jr on behalf of DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Henault, John) (Entered: 07/27/2006)
2006-08-073Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henault, John) (Entered: 08/07/2006)
2006-08-07MINUTE ORDER granting 3 the consent motion for extension of time. The defendant's response to the plaintiff's complaint is due on or before September 14, 2006. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 8/7/2006. (md) (Entered: 08/07/2006)
2006-08-07Set Deadlines/Hearings: Answer due by 9/14/2006. (jwd) (Entered: 08/07/2006)
2006-09-124Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henault, John) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
2006-09-18MINUTE ORDER granting 4 the consent motion for extension of time nunc pro tunc. The defendant's response to the plaintiff's complaint is due on or before October 5, 2006. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 9/18/2006. (md) (Entered: 09/18/2006)
2006-09-18Set Deadlines/Hearings: Answer due by 10/5/2006. (jwd) (Entered: 09/18/2006)
2006-10-055MOTION for Summary Judgment by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Myrick Declaration# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Henault, John) (Entered: 10/05/2006)
2006-11-276MOTION for Extension of Time to file by CARLOS MARINO. (Shaughnessy, Brian) (Entered: 11/28/2006)
2006-11-28MINUTE ORDER granting 6 consent motion for extension of time. The plaintiff's opposition to the defendant's motion for summary judgment is due on or before Tuesday, December 5, 2006. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 11/28/06. (md) (Entered: 11/28/2006)
2006-11-28Set Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/5/2006. (jwd) (Entered: 11/28/2006)
2006-12-067Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Summary Judgment by CARLOS MARINO. (Shaughnessy, Brian) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
2006-12-06MINUTE ORDER granting 7 consent motion for extension of time. The plaintiff's opposition to the defendant's motion for summary judgment is due on or before Friday, December 29, 2006. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 12/6/06.(md) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
2006-12-06Set Deadline: Response to defendant's motion for summary judgment due by 12/29/2006. (mm) (Entered: 12/07/2006)
2006-12-11Set Deadlines/Hearings: The plaintiff's opposition to the defendant's motion for summary judgment is due on or before Friday, December 29, 2006. (jwd) (Entered: 12/11/2006)
2006-12-298Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Summay Judgment by CARLOS MARINO. (Shaughnessy, Brian) (Entered: 12/29/2006)
2007-01-03MINUTE ORDER granting 8 nunc pro tunc the consent motion for extension of time. The plaintiff's opposition is due on or before January 8, 2007. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 1/3/2007.(md) (Entered: 01/03/2007)
2007-01-03Set Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's Opposition due by 1/8/2007 (jwd) (Entered: 01/03/2007)
2007-03-16MINUTE ORDER granting 5 the defendant's motion for summary judgment. On October 5, 2006, the defendant filed a motion for summary judgment. Despite the court's previous extensions of time, the plaintiff has failed to oppose the motion; the court deems this failure a concession of the motion. LCvR 7(b); Fox v. American Airlines, Inc., 389 F.3d 1291, 1295 (D.C. Cir. 2004) ("as we have often observed, '[w]here the district court relies on the absence of a response as a basis for treating the motion as conceded, we honor its enforcement of the rule'"). Signed by Judge Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 3/16/07. (md) (Entered: 03/16/2007)
2007-03-289ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION for Reconsideration by CARLOS MARINO (Shaughnessy, Brian) Modified on 4/5/2007 (nmw, ). (Entered: 03/28/2007)
2007-03-2910ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Summary Judgment by CARLOS MARINO (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Opposaitiion and Motion Summary Judgment)(Shaughnessy, Brian) Modified on 4/5/2007 (nmw, ). (Entered: 03/29/2007)
2007-04-0211ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION for Extension of Time to file reconsideration by CARLOS MARINO (Shaughnessy, Brian) Modified on 4/3/2007 (nmw, ). (Entered: 04/02/2007)
2007-04-03NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to file reconsideration was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (nmw, ) (Entered: 04/03/2007)
2007-04-05NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document Nos. 9 and 10 were entered in error with incorrect case numbers and counsel was instructed to refile said pleadings. (nmw, ) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
2007-04-0512MOTION for Reconsideration by CARLOS MARINO (Shaughnessy, Brian) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
2007-04-0513STRICKEN..... MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by CARLOS MARINO (Shaughnessy, Brian) Modified on 4/30/2007 (jwd, ). (Entered: 04/05/2007)
2007-04-1714Memorandum in opposition to re 12 MOTION for Reconsideration, 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henault, John) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
2007-04-30MINUTE ORDER striking the plaintiff's motion for leave to late file because it does not comply with the court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 4/30/07. (md) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
2007-09-1915NOTICE of Appearance by Fred Elmore Haynes on behalf of DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
2009-11-3016MOTION for relief from order or proceeding by CARLOS MARINO. "Let this be filed" by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(jf, ) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
2009-11-30Leave to File Denied by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. (jf, ) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
2009-12-0317MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Rule 60 Motion by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
2009-12-04MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File. It is hereby ordered that the defendant's opposition to the plaintiff's motion for reconsideration is due on or before December 17, 2009. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 12/4/09. (lcrmu2) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
2009-12-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration is due on or before 12/17/2009 (tg, ) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
2009-12-1018NOTICE of Change of Address by CARLOS MARINO (dr) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
2009-12-1719Memorandum in opposition to re 16 MOTION for relief from order or proceeding filed by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 12/17/2009)
2009-12-2920RESPONSE re 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Rule 60 Motion filed by CARLOS MARINO. "Let this be filed" by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina (jf, ) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
2010-01-0421MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 MOTION for relief from order or proceeding by CARLOS MARINO (jf, ) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
2010-01-08MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's 21 Motion for Extension of Time to File. It is hereby ordered that the plaintiff's reply to the defendant's opposition to his 16 motion for relief from order is due on or before January 11, 2010. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 1/8/10. (lcrmu2) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
2010-01-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Relief from Order is due on or before 1/11/2010. (tg, ) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
2010-01-0822REPLY to opposition to 16 MOTION for relief from order or proceeding filed by CARLOS MARINO. (jf) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
2010-01-1123REPLY to opposition to 16 MOTION for relief from order or proceeding filed by CARLOS MARINO. (jf, ) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
2010-08-0524ORDER denying the plaintiff's 12 first motion for reconsideration and 16 second motion for reconsideration. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 8/5/10.(lcrmu2) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
2010-08-0525MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 8/5/10. (lcrmu2) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
2010-09-0726MOTION to Alter as to 25 Memorandum & Opinion, 24 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by CARLOS MARINO. (jf, ) Modified on 9/9/2010 to note page no. 11 is missing (Entered: 09/09/2010)
2010-09-1627Memorandum in opposition to re 26 MOTION to Alter Judgment as to 25 Memorandum & Opinion, 24 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
2010-09-2028ERRATA by CARLOS MARINO 26 MOTION to Alter Judgment as to 25 Memorandum & Opinion, 24 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by CARLOS MARINO. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Document)(jf, ) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
2010-10-1229NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 25 Memorandum & Opinion, 24 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by CARLOS MARINO. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (jf, ) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
2010-10-1530Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court re 29 Notice of Appeal. (jf, ) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
2010-10-22USCA Case Number 10-5354 for 29 Notice of Appeal filed by CARLOS MARINO. (jf, ) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
2010-11-0431REPLY to opposition to motion re 26 MOTION to Alter Judgment as to 25 Memorandum & Opinion, 24 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by CARLOS MARINO. (dr) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
2010-12-10USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number 4616034807 re 29 Notice of Appeal filed by CARLOS MARINO (rdj) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
2010-12-1032Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 29 Notice of Appeal ;USCA Case Number 10-5354. (rdj) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
2011-07-0633MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 26 the plaintiff's motion to alter and to amend the findings and to alter or amend the judgment. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 7/6/2011. (lcrmu2) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
2011-07-0834ORDER of USCA as to 29 Notice of Appeal filed by CARLOS MARINO ; USCA Case Number 10-5354. ORDERED, on the court's own motion, that appellee file a motion to govern future proceedings herein within 30 days of the date of this order. (kb) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
2011-12-0835ORDER of USCA as to 29 Notice of Appeal filed by CARLOS MARINO ; USCA Case Number 10-5354. ORDERED that this case be removed from abeyance and remand case be dismissed as moot. It is further ordered that the motions for summary disposition be denied. (ls, ) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
2011-12-0936ORDER of USCA as to 29 Notice of Appeal filed by CARLOS MARINO ; ORDERED that the case be removed from abeyance; FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to hold case in abeyance and remand case be dismissed as moot; FURTHER ORDERED that the motions for summary disposition be denied; It is FURTHER ORDERED that Steven Goldblatt a member of the Bar of this court, be appointed as amicus curiae to present arguments in favor of appellant's position. USCA Case Number 10-5354. (mmh, ) (Entered: 12/27/2011)
2012-07-1337USCA JUDGMENT as to 29 Notice of Appeal filed by CARLOS MARINO. ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in this cause with respect to Marinos Rule 60(b)(6) motion be reversed and the case be remanded for further proceedings, in accordance with the opinion of the court filed herein this date. (Attachments: # 1 USCA Opinion)(kb) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
2012-09-0438MOTION to Appoint Counsel by CARLOS MARINO (rdj) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
2012-09-0539MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 29 Notice of Appeal filed by CARLOS MARINO; ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgement of the District Court appealed from in this cause with respect to Marino's Rule 60(b)(6) motion be reversed and the case be remanded for further proceedings, in accordance with the opinion of the court filed herein this date. USCA Case Number 10-5354. (md, ) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
2012-09-0740Case randomly reassigned to Judge Gladys Kessler. Judge Ricardo M. Urbina has retired and is no longer assigned to the case. (gt, ) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
2012-09-1241ORDER granting 38 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel; Steven H. Goldblatt is hereby appointed as Plaintiff's counsel (see Order for briefing schedule). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 9/12/12. (CL, ) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
2012-09-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 11/15/2012. Responses due by 12/14/2012 Replies due by 12/21/2012. (CL, ) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
2012-09-2142NOTICE of Appearance by Steven H. Goldblatt on behalf of STEVEN GOLDBLATT, CARLOS MARINO (Goldblatt, Steven) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
2012-09-2743NOTICE of Change of Address by CARLOS MARINO (rdj) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
2012-11-1444SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 12 MOTION for Reconsideration, 16 MOTION for relief from order or proceeding Pursuant to Remand filed by STEVEN GOLDBLATT, CARLOS MARINO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Goldblatt, Steven) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
2012-12-1445Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of His Rule 60 Motion by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
2012-12-17MINUTE ORDER granting 45 the Consent Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including December 21, 2012, in which to respond to Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of his Rule 60 Motion; Plaintiff shall have up to and including January 11, 2013, in which to file any reply. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/17/12. (CL, ) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
2012-12-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 12/21/2012 Replies due by 1/11/2013. (CL, ) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
2012-12-2146RESPONSE re 44 Supplemental Memorandum, filed by STEVEN GOLDBLATT, CARLOS MARINO by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Haynes, Fred) Modified on 12/26/2012 to edit event (dr). (Entered: 12/21/2012)
2012-12-2647REPLY re 46 Memorandum re Rule 60 Motion filed by STEVEN GOLDBLATT, CARLOS MARINO. (Goldblatt, Steven) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
2013-01-1848ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler authorizing law students Kelly Lyall and Daniel Solomon to appear in court or at other proceedings and prepare documents on behalf of the plaintiff in this matter. Signed on 1/18/2013. (tth) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
2013-01-24MINUTE ORDER: A Motions Hearing will be held in this case on February 4, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/24/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
2013-01-24Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CL, ) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
2013-01-30MINUTE ORDER: The time for the Motion Hearing on February 4, 2013, is hereby changed to 11:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/30/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
2013-01-30Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2013 11:30 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CL, ) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
2013-02-04Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gladys Kessler: Motions Hearing held on 2/4/2013 re: SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to 12 MOTION for Reconsideration, 16 MOTION for relief from order or proceeding Pursuant to Remand filed by STEVEN GOLDBLATT, CARLOS MARINO; order to be issued setting forth the Court's rulings. (Court Reporter: Susan Tyner) (tth) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
2013-02-0449ORDER that Plaintiff's Rule 60(b)(6) Motion is granted without objection from Defendant; Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is denied; Defendant shall file its Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by March 1, 2013; Plaintiff shall submit its Request for Written Discovery by March 1, 2013; Defendant shall submit Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Written Discovery by May 1, 2013; the parties shall agree to a protective order that will remain in force until any potential discovery disputes are resolved; a Status Conference is hereby set for May 7, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/4/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
2013-02-04Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer due by 3/1/2013. Plaintiff's Request for Written Discovery due by 3/1/2013. Defendant's Response to Request for Written Discovery due by 5/7/2013. Status Conference set for 5/7/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CL, ) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
2013-03-0150Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
2013-03-04MINUTE ORDER granting 50 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time; Defendnat shall have up to and including March 11, 2013, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/4/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
2013-03-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 3/11/2013, (CL, ) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
2013-03-1151Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 03/11/2013)
2013-03-13MINUTE ORDER granting 51 Deendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including March 18, 2013, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/13/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
2013-03-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 3/18/2013 (CL,). (Entered: 03/13/2013)
2013-03-1852Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint (Final Motion for Extension of Time) by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
2013-03-19MINUTE ORDER granting 52 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including March 25, 2013, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/19/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
2013-03-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 3/25/2013 (CL, ). (Entered: 03/19/2013)
2013-03-2553ANSWER to 1 Complaint by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION.(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
2013-05-0754ORDER that the Government shall file its Motion for Summary Jjdgment with respect to its Glomar response no later than May 28, 2013; Plaintiff shall file his Opposition no later than June 18, 2013; the Government shall file its reply no later than June 28, 2013; if the Government intends to withdraw its Glomar response, it shall notify Plaintiff and the Court no later than May 14, 2013; if Plaintiff's condition changs in any manner that could affect this case, Plaintiff's counsel shall notify the Court and the Government promptly (see Order for more details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/7/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
2013-05-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 5/28/2013. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/18/2013. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/28/2013. (CL, ) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
2013-05-07Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gladys Kessler: Status Conference held on 5/7/2013. (Court Reporter: Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller) (tth) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
2013-05-0755Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
2013-05-08MINUTE ORDER granting 55 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; Defendant shall have up to and including May 15, 2012, to respond to Plaintiff's Request for Documents. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/8/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
2013-05-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Plaintiff's Request for Documents due by 5/15/2013. (CL, ) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
2013-05-1456Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Report to the Court on the Continued Assertion of the Glomar Response by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
2013-05-15MINUTE ORDER granting 56 the Consent Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including May 17, 2013, in which to report to the Court as to whether Defendant will continue to assert the Glomer response in this case. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/15/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
2013-05-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Court due by 5/17/2013 (CL, ). (Entered: 05/15/2013)
2013-05-1557MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Discovery Request by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
2013-05-16MINUTE ORDER granting 57 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including May 28, 2013, in which to respond to Plaintiff's request for documents. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/16/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
2013-05-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 5/28/2013 (CL, ) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
2013-05-1658MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Discovery Responses by CARLOS MARINO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Goldblatt, Steven) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
2013-05-1659ORDER granting 58 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; Defendant shall complete discovery forthwith, and in no event later than May 21, 2013, whether by producing the remaining documents to Plaintiff or by making them available for Plaintiff's counsel's inspection. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/16/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
2013-05-1760NOTICE to the Court Concerning Defendant's Glomar Response by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
2013-05-2861MOTION for Extension of Time to File Renewed Motion For Summary Judgment by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
2013-05-29MINUTE ORDER granting 61 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including June 4, 2013, in which to file its renewed Motion for Summary Judgment; no further extensions shall be granted. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/29/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
2013-05-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Renewed Summary Judgment motion due by 6/4/2013. (CL, ) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
2013-05-2962NOTICE (Further) to the Court Concerning Defendant's Glomar Response by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
2013-05-2963MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to, File Summary Judgment by CARLOS MARINO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Goldblatt, Steven) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
2013-05-3064ORDER granting 63 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; the Government shall file its Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment no later than Friday, May 31, 2013, at 8:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/30/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
2013-05-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Renewed Summary Judgment motion due by 5/31/2013 at 8:00 a.m. (CL, ) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
2013-05-3165Second MOTION for Summary Judgment by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Declaration of Fred E. Haynes, # 2 Exhibit B -- Supplemental Declaration of Katherine L. Myrick)(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
2013-06-1466Memorandum in opposition to re 65 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEA filed by CARLOS MARINO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A Part 1, # 3 Exhibit A Part 2, # 4 Exhibit A Part 3, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit L)(Goldblatt, Steven) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
2013-06-1467RESPONSE re 63 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to, File Summary Judgment filed by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
2013-06-2468REPLY to opposition to motion re 65 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
2013-06-2669MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by CARLOS MARINO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A)(Goldblatt, Steven) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
2013-06-26MINUTE ORDER granting 69 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Surreply; the Surreply that was attached to Plaintif's Motion shall be filed with the Court as of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/26/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
2013-06-2670SURREPLY to re 65 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CARLOS MARINO. (znmw, ) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
2013-07-0871ORDER setting a Motion Hearing for August 8, 2013, at 10:00 a.m.; the Parties shall be prepared to discuss the issues set out in this Order. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/8/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
2013-07-08Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CL, ) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
2013-07-1872SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Plaintiff Carlos Marino by STEVEN GOLDBLATT. (Goldblatt, Steven) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
2013-07-1873Mail Returned as undeliverable: sent to Carlos Marino; Type of Document Returned: Minute Order filed on 6/26/2013; Plaintiff is now deceased. (tth) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
2013-07-2374ORDER that counsel advise the Court, no later than August 5, 2013, at 12 noon, whether they wish to keep the August 8, 2013 date as a Motion Hearing, or whether they wish to use it as a Status Conference only, or whether they wish some other date to be set. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/23/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
2013-07-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to the Court from counsel due by 8/5/2013. (tth) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
2013-07-3075STATUS REPORT Response to July 23, 2013 Order (ECF No. 74) by STEVEN GOLDBLATT. (Goldblatt, Steven) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
2013-07-3076ORDER that the Motion Hearing now scheduled for August 8, 2013, is hereby cancelled; Plaintiff shall have up to and including September 23, 2013, in which to either file a motion to substitute plaintiff or advise the Court that no such motion will be filed; if counsel for Plaintiff files the motion to substitute plaintiff, Defendant shall file a response within 17 days of the filing of the motion. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/30/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
2013-07-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 9/23/2013. (CL, ) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
2013-09-2377MOTION to Substitute Party Griselle Marino for Deceased Plaintiff Carlos Marino by STEVEN GOLDBLATT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Notice Regarding Filing of Sealed Material, # 3 Notice Regarding Filing of Sealed Material)(Goldblatt, Steven) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
2013-09-2378MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by STEVEN GOLDBLATT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldblatt, Steven) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
2013-09-23MINUTE ORDER granting 78 Griselle Marino's Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 9/23/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
2013-09-2379Amended MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal [Corrected] Dkt No 78 by STEVEN GOLDBLATT (Goldblatt, Steven) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
2013-09-2380SEALED DOCUMENT filed by STEVEN GOLDBLATT. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Part 1 of 1, # 2 Declaration Part 2 of 3, # 3 Declaration Part 3 of 3)(ztd, ) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
2013-10-1081NOTICE of Appearance by Mercedeh Momeni on behalf of DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
2013-10-1082Consent MOTION to Stay re 77 MOTION to Substitute Party Griselle Marino for Deceased Plaintiff Carlos Marino by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
2013-10-1083MINUTE ORDER granting 82 Motion to Stay. The Government's time to respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute [#77] is STAYED until five days after the end of the Government shutdown. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/10/2013. (lcgk3, ) Modified event title on 10/11/2013 (znmw, ). (Entered: 10/10/2013)
2013-10-2284Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 77 MOTION to Substitute Party Griselle Marino for Deceased Plaintiff Carlos Marino by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
2013-10-23MINUTE ORDER granting 84 the Consent Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including October 25, 2013, in which to file its Response to the Motion to Substitute. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/23/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
2013-10-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 10/25/2013 (CL, ) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
2013-10-2485NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. Attorney Mercedeh Momeni terminated. (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
2013-10-2586Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 77 MOTION to Substitute Party Griselle Marino for Deceased Plaintiff Carlos Marino by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
2013-10-28MINUTE ORDER granting 86 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including October 28, 2013, in which to file its Response to the Motion to Substitute Griselle Marino. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/28/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
2013-10-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/28/2013 (CL, ) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
2013-10-2887RESPONSE re 77 MOTION to Substitute Party Griselle Marino for Deceased Plaintiff Carlos Marino filed by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
2013-11-0388REPLY to opposition to motion re 77 MOTION to Substitute Party Griselle Marino for Deceased Plaintiff Carlos Marino filed by STEVEN GOLDBLATT. (Goldblatt, Steven) (Entered: 11/03/2013)
2013-12-0589ORDER granting 77 Motion to Substitute Party. CARLOS MARINO terminated. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/5/13. (lcgk3, ) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
2013-12-0590SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/5/2013.(tth) (Main Document 90 replaced on 12/6/2013) (ztth, ). (Entered: 12/05/2013)
2013-12-1291Unopposed MOTION for Scheduling Order for Summary Judgment Hearing by GRISELLE MARINO (Goldblatt, Steven) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
2013-12-1392ORDER granting 91 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Govern Further Proceedings; a Motion Hearing on the pending Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby set for January 21, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/13/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
2013-12-13Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CL, ) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
2013-12-13MINUTE ORDER: The time for the Motion Hearing on January 21, 2014, is hereby changed to 10:15 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/13/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
2014-01-03ENTERED IN ERROR.....Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara Jacobs Rothstein: Initial Status Conference held on 1/3/2014. Initial Disclosure due by 2/5/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 2/26/2014. Expert disclosure (Plaintiff) due 4/30/14. Expert disclosure (Defendant) due 6/26/2014. Discovery due by 9/16/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 10/30/2014. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 12/5/2014. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 1/9/2015. (Court Reporter: Scott Wallace) (tth) Modified on 1/3/2014 (tth, ). (Entered: 01/03/2014)
2014-01-03NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re Initial Status Conference was entered in error. (tth) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
2014-01-23MINUTE ORDER: The Motion Hearing that was set for January 21, 2014, is hereby rescheduled to January 28, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/23/14. (CL, ) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
2014-01-23Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CL, ) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
2014-01-23MINUTE ORDER: Due to a last-minute change in the Court's calendar, the Motion Hearing that was just rescheduled to January 28, 2014, is hereby now set on Wednesday, February 5, 2014, at 10:00 a.m.; the Court apologizes for any confusion. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/23/14. (CL, ) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
2014-01-23Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CL, ) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
2014-02-05Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gladys Kessler: Motion Hearing held on 2/5/2014 re 65 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION; heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones) (tth) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
2014-02-1093NOTICE of Authority by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
2014-02-1994ORDER denying 65 Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment, denying Plaintiff's request for summary judgment in her favor under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f), ordering the Government to file a Vaughn Index by April 1, 2014, and ordering that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before April 15, 2014, proposing a schedule for further resolution of this case. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/19/14. (CL, ) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
2014-02-1995MEMORANDUM OPINION to the Order denying Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/19/14. (CL, ) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
2014-02-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Vaughn Indes due by 4/1/2014. Joint Status Report due by 4/15/2014. (CL, ) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
2014-03-3196Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve the Vaughn Index and for the Filing of the Status Report by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
2014-04-01MINUTE ORDER granting 96 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including April 8, 2014, in which to serve the Vaughn Index; the parties shall file their Status Report no later than April 22, 2014. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/1/14. (CL, ) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
2014-04-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/22/2014, Vaughn Index due by 4/8/2014, (CL, ) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
2014-04-0397NOTICE of Referral of Documents to the Defense Intelligence Agency and the Department of Defense by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
2014-04-0498WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 4/4/2014.....NOTICE of Withdrawal of Docket Entry No. 97 by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION re 97 Notice (Other) (Haynes, Fred) Modified on 4/7/2014 (znmw, ). (Entered: 04/04/2014)
2014-04-0899Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve the Vaughn Declaration and the Documents Being Released by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
2014-04-09MINUTE ORDER granting 99 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including April 11, 2014, at noon, to serve the Vaughn Index; the Parties shall file their Status Report by April 25, 2014. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/9/14. (CL, ) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
2014-04-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/25/2014. Vaughn Index due by 4/11/2014. (CL, ) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
2014-04-25100STATUS REPORT by GRISELLE MARINO. (Goldblatt, Steven) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
2014-04-28101ORDER setting a schedule for the filing of motions as set out in the Joint Status Report (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/28/14. (CL, ) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
2014-04-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 5/27/2014. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/26/2014. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/24/2014. Cross Motions due by 6/26/2014. Response to Cross Motions due by 7/10/2014. Reply to Cross Motions due by 7/24/2014. (Entered: 04/28/2014)
2014-05-21102NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Alan R. Burch on behalf of DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION Substituting for attorney Fred Haynes (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
2014-05-27103Third MOTION for Summary Judgment , supporting Memorandum of Law, and Statement of Material Facts by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Third Supp. Declaration of Katherine L. Myrick)(Burch, Alan) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
2014-06-26104Memorandum in opposition to re 103 Third MOTION for Summary Judgment , supporting Memorandum of Law, and Statement of Material Facts filed by GRISELLE MARINO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Goldblatt, Steven) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
2014-06-26105MOTION For In Camera Review Pursuant To 5 U.S.C. 552(a)(4)(B) by GRISELLE MARINO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldblatt, Steven) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
2014-07-02106Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 103 Third MOTION for Summary Judgment , supporting Memorandum of Law, and Statement of Material Facts by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
2014-07-11107RESPONSE re 105 MOTION For In Camera Review Pursuant To 5 U.S.C. 552(a)(4)(B) filed by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burch, Alan) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
2014-07-15108REPLY to opposition to motion re 105 MOTION For In Camera Review Pursuant To 5 U.S.C. 552(a)(4)(B) filed by GRISELLE MARINO. (Goldblatt, Steven) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
2014-07-24109REPLY to opposition to motion re 103 Third MOTION for Summary Judgment , supporting Memorandum of Law, and Statement of Material Facts filed by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Fourth Supp. Myrick Declaration)(Burch, Alan) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
2015-02-18110ORDER denying without prejudice 103 Defendant's Third Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 105 Plaintiff's Motion for In Camera Review; Defendant shall produce the 128 pages for in camera review no later than two weeks from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/18/15. (CL, ) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
2015-02-18Set/Reset Deadlines: In-Camera Submission due by 3/4/2015. (CL, ) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
2015-02-20111NOTICE of In Camera Filing by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION re 110 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
2015-02-23112ERRATA re Notice of In Camera Filing by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION 111 Notice (Other) filed by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
2015-03-09113ORDER that the Government appear on March 13, 2015, at 2:30 p.m., for an ex parte, in camera, on-the-record hearing to address issues the Court has after having read the redacted and unredacted versions of information the Parties asked it to examine. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/8/15. (CL, ) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
2015-03-09Set/Reset Hearings: Ex parte, in camera, on-the-record hearing set for 3/13/2015, at 2:30 p.m., in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler (CL, ) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
2015-03-11MINUTE ORDER: The date for the ex parte, in camera, on-the-record hearing in this case is changed to March 30, 2015, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/11/15. (CL, ) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
2015-03-11Set/Reset Hearings: Ex parte, in camera hearing set for 3/30/2015, in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler (CL, ) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
2015-03-25MINUTE ORDER that the ex parte, on-the-record hearing now set for Monday, March 30, 2015, is hereby rescheduled to Thursday, April 2, 2015, at 2:00 p.m.; if this date and time are not convenient, a Motion to Continue may be filed. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/25/15. (CL, ) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
2015-03-25Set/Reset Hearings: Ex parte, in camera on the record hearing set for 4/2/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CL, ) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
2015-04-01114NOTICE of Filing Second Supplemental Myrick Declaration by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Second Supplemental Declaration of Katherine L. Myrick Including Vaugh Index)(Burch, Alan) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
2015-04-06MINUTE ORDER: The ex parte, in camera, on-the-record hearing that was set for April 2, 2015, is hereby rescheduled to April 28, 2015, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/6/15. (CL, ) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
2015-04-06Set/Reset Hearings: Ex parte, in camera, on-the-record hearing set for 4/28/2015 at 10:30 a.m. (CL, ) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
2015-04-07Set/Reset Hearings: Ex Parte, In Camera Hearing set for 4/28/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (zmm, ) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
2015-04-28Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gladys Kessler: (SEALED) Ex Parte, In Camera Hearing held on 4/28/2015. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim.) (tth) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
2015-04-28115NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. Attorney John F. Henault, Jr terminated. (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
2015-05-28116NOTICE of Production by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
2015-06-09117NOTICE of In Camera Filing of Fifth Supplemental Myrick Declaration by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
2015-06-11MINUTE ORDER: The Court approves the May 28, 2015, production of documents as redacted, including the five redactions at issue in the Fifth Supplemental Myrick Declaration. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/11/15. (CL) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
2015-07-14MINUTE ORDER: An on-the-record telephone conference is hereby scheduled in this case for July 27, 2015, at 4:00 p.m.; counsel are requested to let Chambers know the best number where they can be reached for this conference. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/14/15. (CL) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
2015-07-14Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 7/27/2015 04:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CL) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
2015-07-15MINUTE ORDER: The on-the record telephone conference date is JULY 23, 2015, not July 27, 2015; the time is the same: 4:00 p.m.; the Court apologizes for any confusion. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/15/15. (CL) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
2015-07-15Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 7/23/2015 at 04:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CL) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
2015-07-22MINUTE ORDER: Because of an on-going trial, the on-the-record telephone conference set for July 23, 2015, at 4:00 p.m. is hereby cancelled; the Court will reschedule this telephone conference at a later date. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/22/15. (CL) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
2015-07-27MINUTE ORDER: The telephone conference that was set for July 23, 2015, has been rescheduled for Tuesday, July 28, 2015, at 3:00 p.m.; this call will be on-the-record. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/27/15. (CL) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
2015-07-27Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 7/28/2015 03:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Gladys Kessler. This telephone conference is on-the-record. (CL) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
2015-07-28MINUTE ORDER: The Parties shall file a Statement of Remaining Issues no later than August 15, 2015. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/28/15. (CL) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
2015-07-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Statement of Remaining Issues due 8/15/2015 (CL) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
2015-07-28Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gladys Kessler: Telephone Conference held on 7/28/2015. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (tth) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
2015-08-10118RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order DEFENDANT'S STATEMENT OF REMAINING ISSUES filed by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
2015-08-14119NOTICE RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT -PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF REMAINING ISSUES by STEVEN GOLDBLATT (Goldblatt, Steven) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
2015-11-23120NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Jeremy S. Simon on behalf of DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION Substituting for attorney Alan Burch (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
2017-04-28121MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Its Statement of Remaining Issues by GRISELLE MARINO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Its Statement of Remaining Issues, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldblatt, Steven) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-04-28122MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Amit R. Vora, :Firm- Appellate Litigation Program, Georgetown University Law Center, :Address- 111 F St. NW., Room 306, Washington, DC 20001. Phone No. - 202-662-9557. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4932892. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GRISELLE MARINO (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Amit R. Vora, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Goldblatt, Steven) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-05-02MINUTE ORDER granting 122 the Motion for Leave of Amit R. Vora to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/2/17. (CL) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-11123Memorandum in opposition to re 121 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Its Statement of Remaining Issues filed by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 4/13/16 Mem. Op. (Bloomgarden v. DOJ))(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-12124REPLY to opposition to motion re 121 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Its Statement of Remaining Issues filed by GRISELLE MARINO. (Goldblatt, Steven) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
2017-06-05125ORDER granting 121 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of the Statement of Remaining Issues; the Supplemental Memorandum may not exceed six pages. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/5/17. (CL) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-05126SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re 125 Order on Motion for Leave to File, by GRISELLE MARINO. (Goldblatt, Steven) Modified event title on 6/6/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-08-15127ORDER that each Party shall submit a current Motion for Summary Judgment no later than October 1, 2017; any Oppositions shall be filed no later than November 1, 2017, and any Replies shall be filed no later than November 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/15/17. (CL) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 10/1/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/1/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/20/2017. (CL) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-09-14Case directly reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. Judge Gladys Kessler is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-22128Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and for Revised Briefing Schedule by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-09-26129Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by GRISELLE MARINO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit student practice forms, # 2 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Goldblatt, Steven) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-28MINUTE ORDER granting 129 Consent Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: It is hereby ORDERED, that the motion to allow Kevin Birney to withdraw his appearance as student counsel in this matter is granted and the Clerk is directed to remove his appearance from the active docket. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/28/2017. (ad) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
2017-09-28MINUTE ORDER granting 128 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and for Revised Briefing Schedule. It is hereby ORDERED, that the motion and briefing schedule set forth in the Court's order dated August 15, 2017, is modified as follows: Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before October 2, 2017; Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before November 9, 2017; Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's cross-motion and reply to Defendant's opposition to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before December 8, 2017; and Defendant's reply to Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before January 10, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/28/2017. (ad) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
2017-10-02130MOTION for Summary Judgment by GRISELLE MARINO (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support memorandum of pts and authorities and statement of facts not in dispute, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldblatt, Steven) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-25131ORDER authorizing law students John Douglass and Simone Marton to appear in court or at other proceedings and prepare documents on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/25/2017. (kh) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-11-06132Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Cross-Motion and Opposition and for Adjustment of Remaining Briefing Deadlines by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-07MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 132 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Cross-Motion and Opposition and for Adjustment of Remaining Briefing Deadlines. It is hereby ORDERED that, for good cause shown, the schedule is modified as follows: Defendant shall file any opposition to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and cross-motion for summary judgment by December 5, 2017. Plaintiff shall file any reply in support of her motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment by January 22, 2018. Defendant shall file any reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment by February 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/7/2017. (lctjk1) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
2017-11-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross Motion due by 12/5/2017. Plaintiff's Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Cross Motion due by 1/22/2018. Defendant's Reply to Cross Motion due by 2/13/2018. (kh) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
2017-12-05133Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion and for Adjustment of Remaining Briefing Deadlines by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-05MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 133 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that, for good cause shown, the briefing schedule is modified as follows: Defendant shall file any opposition to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and cross-motion for summary judgment by February 6, 2018. Plaintiff shall file any reply in support of her motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment by March 7, 2018. Defendant shall file any reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment by March 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/5/2017. (lctjk1) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2018-02-05134Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion and for Adjustment of Remaining Briefing Deadlines by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-06MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 134 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that, for good cause shown, the briefing schedule is modified as follows: Defendant shall file any opposition to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and cross-motion for summary judgment by March 21, 2018. Plaintiff shall file any reply in support of her motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment by May 7, 2018. Defendant shall file any reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment by June 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/6/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's opposition to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and cross-motion for summary judgment due by 3/21/2018. Plaintiff's reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment due by 5/7/2018. Defendant's reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment due by 6/7/2018. (kh) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-03-20135Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-20MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 135 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file any opposition to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and cross-motion for summary judgment by April 4, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/20/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-04-04136MOTION for Summary Judgment , Local Rule 7(h) Statement and Supporting Memorandum by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Sixth Supplemental Declaration of Katherine L. Myrick)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-04137Memorandum in opposition to re 130 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Response to Plaintiff's Local Rule 7(h) Statement (duplicate of Docket Entry No. 136) filed by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Sixth Supplemental Declaration of Katherine L. Myrick)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-05-07138RESPONSE re 136 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Local Rule 7(h) Statement and Supporting Memorandum filed by GRISELLE MARINO. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support opposition to DKT 136 and reply to DKT137, # 2 Statement of Facts statement of genuine issues, # 3 Exhibit exhibit A -documents in dispute, # 4 Exhibit exhibit B-affidavit, # 5 Exhibit exhibit C-selected documents with aliases for Lopez, # 6 Exhibit exhibit D-OCDETF letter, # 7 Text of Proposed Order, # 8 Certificate of Service)(Goldblatt, Steven) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-07139REPLY to opposition to motion re 130 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GRISELLE MARINO. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit documents in dispute, # 3 Exhibit affidavit, # 4 Exhibit selected documents with aliases for Lopez, # 5 Exhibit OCDETF letter, # 6 Certificate of Service)(Goldblatt, Steven) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-31140Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-05-31MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 150 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file any reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment by June 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/31/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-05-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Reply to Cross Motion due by 6/21/2018. (kh) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-06-21141REPLY to opposition to motion re 136 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Local Rule 7(h) Statement and Supporting Memorandum filed by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kelleigh A. Miller)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-06-26142MOTION for Hearing Motion for Oral Hearing on Outstanding Motions for Summary Judgment by GRISELLE MARINO (Goldblatt, Steven) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-07-02143NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GRISELLE MARINO. Attorney Amit R. Vora terminated. (Vora, Amit) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-09144Memorandum in opposition to re 142 MOTION for Hearing Motion for Oral Hearing on Outstanding Motions for Summary Judgment filed by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-12145REPLY to opposition to motion re 142 MOTION for Hearing Motion for Oral Hearing on Outstanding Motions for Summary Judgment filed by GRISELLE MARINO. (Goldblatt, Steven) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2020-02-12146NOTICE of Appearance by Erica Hashimoto on behalf of GRISELLE MARINO (Hashimoto, Erica) (Main Document 146 replaced on 2/13/2020) (ztth). (Entered: 02/12/2020)
2020-02-13NOTICE OF ERROR re 146 Notice of Appearance; emailed to eh502@georgetown.edu, cc'd 5 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please update your address in PACER. (ztth, ) (Entered: 02/13/2020)
2021-02-05MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 142 Motion for Hearing and ordering the submission of certain documents in camera . Whether to have an oral hearing on a motion is "within the discretion of the Court," LCvR 7(f), and the Court finds oral argument unnecessary in this instance. But the Court agrees with Plaintiff that she should have the opportunity to respond to Defendant's 141 Reply with a surreply. District courts have discretion in deciding whether to grant leave to file a surreply, although they are generally disfavored. Banner Health v. Sebelius , 905 F. Supp. 2d 174, 187 (D.D.C. 2012). "In exercising its discretion, the court should consider whether the movant's reply in fact raises arguments or issues for the first time, whether the nonmovant's proposed surreply would be helpful to the resolution of the pending motion, and whether the movant would be unduly prejudiced were leave to be granted." Id. Here, Defendant submitted a new factual declaration with its Reply, ECF No. 141-1, that asserts new facts regarding resolution of an indexing backlog issue and the reprocessing of thirty-four pages. Further, the Court finds that a surreply would be helpful to resolving the pending motion and not prejudice Defendant. Accordingly, Plaintiff may file a surreply by March 8, 2021, addressing the new facts raised in Defendant's 141 Reply about the indexing backlog issue and the re-processing of thirty-four pages. The surreply shall not exceed ten pages. It is further ORDERED that the Government shall, by March 8, 2021, submit to the Court for in camera segregability review any and all of the forty-five pages identified in Plaintiff's [138-3] [139-2] Exhibit A, that were, as Plaintiff represents, part of the 334 pages processed in 2018, and were not part of the 128 pages previously ruled on by Judge Kessler. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/5/2021. (lctjk1) (Entered: 02/05/2021)
2021-02-25147NOTICE Appearance of third year law student Grace Fuscoe by GRISELLE MARINO (Hashimoto, Erica) (Entered: 02/25/2021)
2021-02-26148NOTICE of Appearance of Third Year Law Student. Approved by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/26/2021. (lctjk1) (Entered: 02/26/2021)
2021-03-01NOTICE OF ERROR re 147 Notice (Other); emailed to eh502@georgetown.edu, cc'd 5 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Not an active member of this Court's Bar. Renewal needed: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal (ztth, ) (Entered: 03/01/2021)
2021-03-08149SURREPLY to Reply 141 filed by GRISELLE MARINO. (Hashimoto, Erica) (Entered: 03/08/2021)
2021-03-08150NOTICE of Compliance with Court Order Directing In Camera Submission by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/08/2021)
2021-03-08NOTICE OF ERROR re 149 Surreply; emailed to eh502@georgetown.edu, cc'd 5 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Not an active member of this Court's Bar. Renewal needed: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal (ztth, ) (Entered: 03/08/2021)
2021-08-26151ORDER denying Plaintiff's 130 Motion for Summary Judgment and granting Defendant's 136 Motion for Summary Judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/26/2021. (lctjk1) (Entered: 08/26/2021)
2021-08-26152MEMORANDUM OPINION in support of 151 Order denying Plaintiff's 130 Motion for Summary Judgment and granting Defendant's 136 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/26/2021. (lctjk1) (Entered: 08/26/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar