Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNatural Resources Defense Council, Inc. v. United States Food and Drug Administration et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2007cv00777
Date Filed2007-02-01
Date Closed2008-02-27
JudgeJudge John F. Keenan
PlaintiffNatural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
DefendantUnited States Food and Drug Administration
DefendantUnited States Environmental Protection Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2007-02-011COMPLAINT against United States Food and Drug Administration, United States Environmental Protection Agency. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 604491)Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc..(mbe) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
2007-02-01SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Food and Drug Administration, United States Environmental Protection Agency. (mbe) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
2007-02-01Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. (mbe) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
2007-02-01Case Designated ECF. (mbe) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
2007-02-012RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying No as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc..(mbe) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
2007-02-053NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Joseph Cmar on behalf of Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. (Cmar, Thomas) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
2007-03-164ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by United States Food and Drug Administration, United States Environmental Protection Agency.(Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 03/16/2007)
2007-07-245ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from Thomas Cmar dated 7/18/2007 re: request that the status conference that is presently scheduled for 8/13/2007 at 10:00a.m. be rescheduled. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned to 9/10/2007 at 09:45 AM before Judge John F. Keenan. Mr. Cmar is directed to notify all parties of this order. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/23/2007) (jar) (Entered: 07/25/2007)
2007-08-216NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Thomas Joseph Cmar on behalf of Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. New Address: Natural Resources Defense Council, 1200 New York Ave., NW, Suite 400, Washington, DC, USA 20005, (202) 289-6868. (Cmar, Thomas) (Entered: 08/21/2007)
2007-09-107ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 9/6/07 re: counsel for the FDA and EPA request an adjournment of the scheduled 9/10/07 status conference. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned until 9/18/07 at 10:00 a.m. Status Conference set for 9/18/2007 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John F. Keenan.(Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/10/07) (db) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
2007-11-268ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from Thomas Omar dated 11/20/07 re: Request to adjourn the 11/26/07 status conference. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned until 1/24/08 at 10:30 am., ( Status Conference reset for 1/24/2008 at 10:30 AM before Judge John F. Keenan.) (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 11/26/07) (cd) (Entered: 11/26/2007)
2008-01-179ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from Thomas Omar dated 1/14/08 re: Counsel for plaintiff Natural Resources Defense Counsel in the above captioned matter to request that the status conference scheduled before the Court on Thursday, January 24, 2008 be adjourned. Defendants' counsel consents to this request. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. The conference is adjourned until February 25, 2008 at 10:15 a.m. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 1/17/08) (js) (Entered: 01/17/2008)
2008-02-2510FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - NOTICE of Stipulation of Dismissal. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. (Cmar, Thomas) Modified on 2/26/2008 (db). (Entered: 02/25/2008)
2008-02-26***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Thomas Joseph Cmar to E-MAIL Document No. 10 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) to orders_and_judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. This document is not filed via ECF. (db) (Entered: 02/26/2008)
2008-02-2611ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from Thomas Omar dated 2/22/08 re: Request to adjourn the 2/25/08 status conference. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 2/25/08) (cd) (Entered: 02/26/2008)
2008-02-2712STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1), that this action is dismissed with prejudice, with each party bearing its own costs and attorney's fees. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 2/27/08) (cd) (Entered: 02/27/2008)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar