Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF INDIANA FOUNDATION v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
DistrictSouthern District of Indiana
CityIndianapolis
Case Number1:2007cv00208
Date Filed2007-02-20
Date Closed2008-03-20
JudgeJudge David Frank Hamilton
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF INDIANA FOUNDATION
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2007-02-201COMPLAINT against Defendant FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, filed by Plaintiff AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF INDIANA FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Letter to Ms. Hunt, Chief, FOIA Section, dated September 21, 2006# 2 Exhibit 2: Return of service (green card))(AAM) (Entered: 02/22/2007)
2007-02-202CIVIL COVER SHEET, filed by Plaintiff AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF INDIANA FOUNDATION. (AAM) (Entered: 02/22/2007)
2007-02-203RECEIPT #IP000094 in the amount of $ 350.00 (AAM) (Entered: 02/22/2007)
2007-02-204Summons Issued as to Attorney General of the United States, Department of Justice - Room B-103. (AAM) (Entered: 02/22/2007)
2007-02-205MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AAM) (Entered: 02/22/2007)
2007-03-026Summons Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (LSC) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
2007-04-057RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF INDIANA FOUNDATION. ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES served on 3/12/2007. (Falk, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
2007-04-058RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF INDIANA FOUNDATION. UNITED STATES ATTORNEY served on 3/27/2007. (Falk, Kenneth) Modified on 4/5/2007 (LSC). (Entered: 04/05/2007)
2007-04-059RETURN of Service, filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF INDIANA FOUNDATION. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 3/12/2007. (Falk, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
2007-04-2610NOTICE of Appearance by Shelese M. Woods on behalf of Defendant FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Woods, Shelese) (Entered: 04/26/2007)
2007-04-2611ANSWER to Complaint, filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A 9/27/06 letter# 2 Exhibit B 4/16/07 letter)(Woods, Shelese) (Entered: 04/26/2007)
2007-06-1112SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/2/2007 09:00 AM in room #277 before Magistrate Judge William T. Lawrence. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 06/11/2007. (TMA) (Entered: 06/11/2007)
2007-06-2113CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF INDIANA FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge CMP Summary)(Falk, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/21/2007)
2007-07-0214Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William T. Lawrence : Parties appear by counsel for initial pretrial conference. Conference held and concluded without further order. Case Management Plan is taken under advisement. (TMA) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
2008-03-1415SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/24/2008 01:00 PM in room #277 before Magistrate Judge William T. Lawrence. (TMA) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
2008-03-1916Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case , filed by Plaintiff AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF INDIANA FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Falk, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
2008-03-2017CLOSED - ORDER granting parties' 16 Joint MOTION to Dismiss, filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF INDIANA FOUNDATION. Signed by Judge David Frank Hamilton on 3/20/2008.(LSC) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar