Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGERTH v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2008cv00593
Date Filed2008-04-08
Date Closed2009-06-24
JudgeJudge Ricardo M. Urbina
PlaintiffJEFF GERTH
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2008-04-081COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616011498) filed by JEFF GERTH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, ) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
2008-04-08SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jf, ) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
2008-04-142SUMMONS Returned Executed by JEFF GERTH. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 4/14/2008, answer due 5/14/2008. (O'Keefe, John) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
2008-04-143SUMMONS Returned Executed by JEFF GERTH. (O'Keefe, John) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
2008-04-144SUMMONS Returned Executed by JEFF GERTH. (O'Keefe, John) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
2008-05-155ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by JEFF GERTH.(Campbell, Isaac) (Entered: 05/15/2008)
2008-05-156STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on May 15, 2008. Read this Standing Order carefully, it will govern this case. Failure to follow the Standing Order will result in sanctions.(jwd) (Entered: 05/15/2008)
2008-05-16MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to submit a joint status report. To assure prompt and efficient resolution of the case, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties submit a joint status report on or before June 30, 3008, setting forth the status of the case and proposing any necessary briefing schedules. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 5/16/2008. (Entered: 05/16/2008)
2008-05-16Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: parties submit a joint status report on or before June 30, 3008 (jwd, ) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
2008-06-307STATUS REPORT Setting Forth Status of Action and Proposing Briefing Schedules by JEFF GERTH, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (O'Keefe, John) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
2008-07-10MINUTE ORDER setting schedule. Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report submitted on June 30, 2008, and the parties' requested schedule contained therein, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant complete its segregability review, provide the plaintiff with releasable portions of the requested materials, and report to the court on or before September 5, 2008. It is FURTHER ORDERED that on or before October 3, 2008, the plaintiff inform the defendant and the court whether he will challenge the withholding of responsive materials under FOIA. It is ORDERED that if the plaintiff elects to proceed with the challenge, on or before November 3, 2008 the defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff file its opposition or any cross-motion, or alternatively, a Rule 56(f) affidavit, on or before December 1, 2008. It is ORDERED that the defendant file any response or reply to the plaintiff's filing on or before December 15, 2008. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 7/10/2008. (Entered: 07/10/2008)
2008-07-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff inform Defendant if he will challenge the responsive materials under FOIA due by 10/3/08; Motion for Summary Judgement due on or before 11/3/08; Opposition, cross motion or alternatively a Rule 56(f) affidavit on or before 12/1/08; Response or reply to Plaintiff's filing due on or before 12/15/08; (mpt, ) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
2008-09-058NOTICE of Compliance by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE re Order,,,, (Campbell, Isaac) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
2008-10-039NOTICE Pursuant to July 10, 2008, Order by JEFF GERTH (O'Keefe, John) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
2009-06-2410STIPULATION of Dismissal and Settlement by JEFF GERTH, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (O'Keefe, John) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff