Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCOLLIERS INTERNATIONAL v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2008cv00880
Date Filed2008-05-23
Date Closed2009-02-17
JudgeJudge Henry H. Kennedy
PlaintiffCOLLIERS INTERNATIONAL
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2008-05-231COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616012562) filed by COLLIERS INTERNATIONAL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, ) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
2008-05-23SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jf, ) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
2008-05-232LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by COLLIERS INTERNATIONAL identifying Corporate Parent CMN, INC., Corporate Parent CMN HOLDINGS (USA) INC., Other Affiliate FIRSTSERVICE COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE SERVICES INC., Other Affiliate FIRSTSERVICE CORPORATION (USA) for. (jf, ) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
2008-05-303NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Aluotto on behalf of COLLIERS INTERNATIONAL (Aluotto, Christopher) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
2008-06-134ENTERED IN ERROR.....AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by COLLIERS INTERNATIONAL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Aluotto, Christopher) Modified on 6/16/2008 (tr). (Entered: 06/13/2008)
2008-06-16NOTICE re 4 Affidavit; emailed to cja@rendigs.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Document title does not match docketed event, 2. Counsel needs to refile Document as a Return of Service (tr, ) (Entered: 06/16/2008)
2008-06-175RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY served on 6/2/2008, answer due 8/1/2008. (Aluotto, Christopher) (Entered: 06/17/2008)
2008-06-246AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY filed by COLLIERS INTERNATIONAL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(nmw, ) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
2008-10-087ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff's Show Cause Response due by 10/24/2008. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on October 8, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
2008-10-088NOTICE of Appearance by Lanny James Acosta, Jr on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY (Acosta, Lanny) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
2008-10-089Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Acosta, Lanny) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
2008-10-09MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Defendant's Consent Motion for an Enlargement of Time Within Which to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Accordingly, defendant's response to the amended complaint is due November 13, 2008. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on October 9, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
2008-10-09The answer of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY is due November 13, 2008. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on October 9, 2008. (NP) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
2008-10-1010RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 7 Order to Show Cause filed by COLLIERS INTERNATIONAL. (Aluotto, Christopher) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
2008-11-1311ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY. Related document: 6 Amended Complaint filed by COLLIERS INTERNATIONAL.(Acosta, Lanny) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
2008-11-1312Joint MOTION for Order Joint Motion to Establish a Briefing Schedule by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Acosta, Lanny) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
2008-11-1713ORDER AMENDING THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on 11/17/08. (tj ) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
2008-12-0914NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to COLLIERS INTERNATIONAL. Attorney Christopher J. Aluotto terminated. (Aluotto, Christopher) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
2009-01-1615MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Acosta, Lanny) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
2009-02-1716STIPULATION of Dismissal (Stipulation to Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Acosta, Lanny) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff