Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSUNBEAM TELEVISION CORPORATION v. FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2008cv00906
Date Filed2008-05-29
Date Closed2008-10-06
JudgeJudge Rosemary M. Collyer
PlaintiffSUNBEAM TELEVISION CORPORATION
DefendantFEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2008-05-291COMPLAINT against FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616012631) filed by SUNBEAM TELEVISION CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tg, ) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
2008-05-292LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SUNBEAM TELEVISION CORPORATION (tg, ) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
2008-05-29Summons (3) Issued as to FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (tg, ) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
2008-06-233NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Blake Harwood on behalf of FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION (Harwood, Christopher) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
2008-06-274Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harwood, Christopher) (Entered: 06/27/2008)
2008-06-30MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Defendant's consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than July 30, 2008. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/30/08. (KD) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
2008-07-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to complaint due by 7/30/2008. (cdw) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
2008-07-305Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint So Parties May Pursue Possibility of Settlement by FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harwood, Christopher) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
2008-07-30MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting 5 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than September 15, 2008. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 7/30/08. (lcrmc2) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
2008-07-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to complaint due by 9/15/2008. (cdw) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
2008-08-016STANDING ORDER directing counsel to register for electronic case filing. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 8/1/08. (KD) (Entered: 08/01/2008)
2008-08-127NOTICE of Appearance by Charles D. Tobin on behalf of SUNBEAM TELEVISION CORPORATION (Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
2008-09-158Joint MOTION to (1) extend deadline for Defendant to respond to complaint by 21 days; and (2) provide parties with 21 days to file stipulation of dismissal and, if necessary, briefing schedule for litigation as to costs and fees by SUNBEAM TELEVISION CORPORATION, FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harwood, Christopher) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
2008-09-16MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting 8 Joint Motion. Defendant shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than October 6, 2008. It is further ordered that, no later than October 6, 2008, the parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal and, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule for litigation of their respective claims for costs and/or fees. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/16/08. (lcrmc2) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
2008-09-16Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer to complaint due by 10/6/2008. Stipulation or Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 10/6/2008. (cdw) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
2008-10-039STIPULATION of Dismissal by SUNBEAM TELEVISION CORPORATION, FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Declaration))(Harwood, Christopher) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
2008-10-06MINUTE ORDER approving 9 the parties' joint stipulation of dismissal with prejudice. This case is closed. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 10/06/08. (lcrmc2) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff