Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. United States Department of Treasury
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2008cv08341
Date Filed2008-09-29
Date Closed2009-04-17
JudgeJudge Paul G. Gardephe
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffRon Nixon
DefendantUnited States Department of Treasury
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2008-09-291COMPLAINT against United States Department of Treasury. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 664274)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Ron Nixon.(laq) (mbe). (Entered: 09/29/2008)
2008-09-29SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Treasury. (laq) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
2008-09-29Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger is so designated. (laq) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
2008-09-29Case Designated ECF. (laq) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
2008-09-292RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The New York Times Company.(laq) (mbe). (Entered: 09/29/2008)
2008-10-023CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. United States Department of Treasury served on 9/29/2008, answer due 10/20/2008. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by The New York Times Company; Ron Nixon. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
2008-10-034NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/10/2008 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 14C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/2/08) (mme) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
2008-11-10Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/10/2008. Next conference set for 11/24/08 at 9:30 a.m. in courtroom 11C. (tro) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
2008-11-24Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Status Conference held on 11/24/2008. Next conference set for 1/9/2009 at 11:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (mro) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
2009-01-09Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Status Conference held on 1/9/2009. Next Status Conference set for 2/11/2009 at 10:30 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (mro) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
2009-02-055ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the February 11, 2009 conference in the above-captioned action is adjourned until February 11, 2009 at 11:30 am in Courtroom 14C of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/5/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 02/05/2009)
2009-02-136ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the February 11, 2009 conference in the above-captioned action is adjourned until February 23, 2009 at 3:30 pm in Courtroom 14C of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/11/09) (js) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
2009-02-23Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Status Conference held on 2/23/2009. Next Conference set for 3/10/2009 at 03:00 PM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (mro) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
2009-03-097ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David E. McCraw dated 3/9/2009 re: Counsel writes on behalf of the parties to request that the Court adjourn the Status Conference scheduled for Tuesday, March 10, 2009 at 3 p.m. With the Court's permission the parties will notify the Court no later than March 24, 2009 as to whether the action has been settled or whether a status conference is needed. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/9/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
2009-03-248ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David E. McCraw dated 3/24/2009 re: Counsel writes on behalf of both parties to provide the Court with an update on the status of settlement discussions. With the Court's permission the parties will notify the Court no later than March 31, 2009 as to whether the actions has been settled or whether a status conferences is needed. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/24/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
2009-04-179ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the above-captioned action shall be dismissed with prejudice; provided, however, that either side may apply to this Court by letter before May 18, 2009 for restoration of this action to the Court's calendar. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/16/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
2009-05-1810ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David E. McCraw dated 5/15/2009 re: Request that the Court extend April 17 thirty-day order for an additional thirty days. ENDORSEMENT: The April 17, 2009 thirty day order is extended another thirty days. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/18/2009) (jpo) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
2009-06-2211STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL, that this matter is dismissed with prejudice, subject only to paragraph 8 below, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/22/09) (cd) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff