Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGerstein v. US Dept. of Defense
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Jose
Case Number5:2003cv05193
Date Filed2003-11-21
Date Closed2004-12-21
JudgeHon. Jeremy Fogel
PlaintiffJoshua Gerstein
DefendantUnited States Department of Defense
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2003-11-211COMPLAINT against United States Department of Defense ; summons issued; (Filing fee $ 150, receipt #5508889.). Filed by Joshua Gerstein. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2003) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
2003-11-21Summons Issued as to United States Department of Defense. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2003) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
2003-11-212STANDING ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT IN CIVIL CASES: Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2004 10:30 AM. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2003) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
2004-02-063SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Gerstein. United States Department of Defense served on 1/17/2004, answer due 2/6/2004. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2004) (Entered: 02/09/2004)
2004-02-064Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2004) (Entered: 02/09/2004)
2004-02-255STIPULATION extending time to 3/15/04 to Respond to Complaint by United States Department of Defense. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2004) (Entered: 02/26/2004)
2004-03-126ANSWER to Complaint by Defendant States Department of Defense. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2004) (Entered: 03/15/2004)
2004-03-16Received Stipulation to reset date of Case Management Conference and Proposed Order by Joshua Gerstein. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2004) (Entered: 03/17/2004)
2004-03-177STIPULATION AND ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2004 10:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/15/2004. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2004) (Entered: 03/19/2004)
2004-03-178Declaration of Joshua A. Gerstein in Support of 7 filed by Joshua Gerstein. (Related document(s) 7 ) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2004) (Entered: 03/19/2004)
2004-03-229MOTION for Leave to File Amended and Supplemental Complaint filed by Joshua Gerstein. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2004 09:00 AM. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2004) (Entered: 03/23/2004)
2004-03-2210NOTICE of Change of Address by Joshua Gerstein (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2004) (Entered: 03/23/2004)
2004-04-2611JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by United States Department of Defense. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2004) (Entered: 04/26/2004)
2004-04-2712Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/26/2004 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 4/27/2004), Motion Hearing held re 9 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, Court grants unopposed motion. Defendant to answer amended complaint within 30 days. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2004 09:00 AM. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/27/2004) (Entered: 04/28/2004)
2004-04-2813ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 9 Motion for Leave to File amended and supplemental complaint is Granted. The clerk shall file the 1st amended and supplemental complaint. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2004) (Entered: 04/28/2004)
2004-07-0614NOTICE of Change of Address by United States Department of Defense (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2004) (Entered: 07/06/2004)
2004-07-12Received Motion for extension of time and Proposed Order by United States Department of Defense. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2004) (Entered: 07/13/2004)
2004-07-1515ORDER granting Request to extend time to 8/10/04 to file dispositive motion. Signed by Judge Jermey Fogel on 7/13/2004. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2004) (Entered: 07/15/2004)
2004-07-1516Response Defendant's Motion for extension of time by Joshua Gerstein. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2004) (Entered: 07/16/2004)
2004-07-15Received Order re 16 by Joshua Gerstein. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2004) (Entered: 07/16/2004)
2004-08-10Received Motion for extension of time and Proposed Order by United States Department of Defense. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2004) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
2004-08-1917MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Department of Defense. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2004 09:00 AM. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2004) (Entered: 08/20/2004)
2004-08-1918MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for summary judgment 17 filed by United States Department of Defense. (Related document(s) 17 ) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2004) (Entered: 08/20/2004)
2004-08-1919Declaration of Stewart F. Aly in Support of 17 filed by United States Department of Defense. (Related document(s) 17 ) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2004) (Entered: 08/20/2004)
2004-08-1920Declaration of Charles A. Allen in Support of 17 filed by United States Department of Defense. (Related document(s) 17 ) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2004) (Entered: 08/20/2004)
2004-08-1921Declaration of Diane E. Beaver in Support of 17 filed by United States Department of Defense. (Related document(s) 17 ) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2004) (Entered: 08/20/2004)
2004-08-1922CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Department of Defense re 18 Memorandum in Support, 19 Declaration in Support, 20 Declaration in Support, 21 Declaration in Support, 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2004) (Entered: 08/20/2004)
2004-08-2023CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 9/13/04 is continued to 10/15/2004 at 9:00 AM., to be heard with the motion. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2004) (Entered: 08/20/2004)
2004-08-2024ORDER Granting Motion for extension of time to file dispositive moiton by 8/19/04. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/19/04. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2004) (Entered: 08/23/2004)
2004-08-2425Answer toFirst Amended and Supplemental Complaint by United States Department of Defense. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2004) (Entered: 08/25/2004)
2004-08-24Received Order re Motion for Summary Judgment 17 by United States Department of Defense. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2004) (Entered: 08/25/2004)
2004-09-2426Memorandum in Opposition re 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Joshua Gerstein. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2004) (Entered: 09/24/2004)
2004-09-2427Declaration of Joshua A.Gerstein in Support of 26 filed by Joshua Gerstein. (Related document(s) 26 ) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2004) (Entered: 09/24/2004)
2004-10-01Received Motion for extension of time and Proposed Order by United States Department of Defense. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2004) (Entered: 10/04/2004)
2004-10-0728REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment 17 filed by United States Department of Defense. (Related document(s) 17 ) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2004) (Entered: 10/08/2004)
2004-10-0729Second Declaration of Stewart F. Aly filed by United States Department of Defense. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2004) (Entered: 10/08/2004)
2004-10-0730ORDER granting extention of time to 10/7/04 to file a Reply Memorandum and Supplemental Declaration. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/5/04. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2004) (Entered: 10/08/2004)
2004-10-1531ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING re 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Department of Defense. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/15/04. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2004) (Entered: 10/15/2004)
2004-10-1532Minute Entry: Motion for Summary Judgment hearing and Case Management conference held on 10/15/2004 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 10/15/2004). Motion for Summary Judgment and Case Management conference are continued to 12/3/04 at 9:00 a.m. (see docket #31). (Court Reporter Peter Torreano.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/15/2004) (Entered: 10/15/2004)
2004-11-0533Declaration of Mark J. Gingras filed by United States Department of Defense. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2004) (Entered: 11/09/2004)
2004-11-0534Declaration of Karen L. Hecker filed by United States Department of Defense. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2004) (Entered: 11/09/2004)
2004-11-0535Second Declaration of Diane Beaver filed by United States Department of Defense. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2004) (Entered: 11/09/2004)
2004-11-0536Third Declaration of Stewart F. Aly filed by United States Department of Defense. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2004) (Entered: 11/09/2004)
2004-11-0837Amended Third Declaration of Sterart F. Aly filed by United States Department of Defense. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2004). (Entered: 11/09/2004)
2004-11-1738MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Joshua Gerstein. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2004) (Entered: 11/18/2004)
2004-11-17Proposed Order re 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response by Joshua Gerstein. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2004) (Entered: 11/18/2004)
2004-11-2339Supplemental Brief in Opposition to 17 defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byJoshua Gerstein. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2004) (Entered: 11/24/2004)
2004-11-2340Second Declaration of Joshua A. Gerstein in Support of 39 Supplemental Opposition filed byJoshua Gerstein. (Related document(s) 39 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2004) (Entered: 11/24/2004)
2004-11-3041ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 11/23/2004. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2004) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
2004-12-0142Amended Second Declaration of Diane A. Beaver 35 filed byUnited States Department of Defense. (Related document(s) 35 ) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2004) (Entered: 12/02/2004)
2004-12-0643Minute Entry: Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment held on 12/3/2004 before Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 12/6/2004). Motion is taken under submission. Case Management Conference continued to 2/4/2005 10:30 AM. (Court Reporter Peter Torreano.) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/6/2004) (Entered: 12/07/2004)
2004-12-0844Request for Judicial Notice filed byJoshua Gerstein. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2004) (Entered: 12/09/2004)
2004-12-0845Third Declaration of Joshua A. Gerstein filed byJoshua Gerstein. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2004) (Entered: 12/09/2004)
2004-12-2146ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 17 Motion for Summary Judgment (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2004) (Entered: 12/28/2004)
2004-12-2147JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/16/2004. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2004) (Entered: 12/28/2004)
2005-07-1348TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/3/2004 before Judge Jeremy Fogel. Court Reporter: Peter Torreano.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2005) (Entered: 07/15/2005)
2005-11-02FILE located at Federal Records Center (FRC) San Bruno, CA. Accession No:021-05-0044, Location No:84015, Box No:65. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2005) (Entered: 11/02/2005)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff