Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGerstein v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Jose
Case Number5:2003cv04893
Date Filed2003-10-31
Date Closed2007-03-09
JudgeHon. Ronald M. Whyte
PlaintiffJoshua Gerstein
DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Opinion/Order [77]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2003-10-311COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Summons Issued) against United States Department of Justice (Filing fee $150 receipt number 5508770). Filed by pro se Joshua Gerstein. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/31/2003)
2003-10-312CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 3/2/2004 at 02:00 PM. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/31/2003)
2003-10-31Summons Issued as to United States Department of Justice (bw, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/31/2003)
2003-11-213SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Gerstein, United States Department of Justice. United States Department of Justice served on 11/12/2003, answer due 12/2/2003. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2003) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
2003-12-014MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by United States Department of Justice. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2003) (Entered: 12/01/2003)
2003-12-035Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2003) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
2003-12-156ANSWER to Complaint by United States Department of Justice. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2003) (Entered: 12/15/2003)
2004-01-067MOTION for VAUGHN INDEX and Notice of Motion filed by Joshua Gerstein. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2004 10:00 AM. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2004) (Entered: 01/06/2004)
2004-01-208Memorandum in Opposition to (7) Plaintiff's MOTION for Vaughn Index for Hearing filed by United States Department of Justice. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2004) (Entered: 01/20/2004)
2004-01-279PLAINTIFF'S Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Vaughn Index filed by Joshua Gerstein. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2004) (Entered: 01/27/2004)
2004-02-0910MOTION to Withdraw Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Withdraw Motion for Vaughn Index 7 Filed by Joshua Gerstein MOTION for Hearing set for 2/10/2004 at 10:00 AM. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2004) (Entered: 02/09/2004)
2004-02-0911ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull GRANTING (10) Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw his motion for Vaughn Index without prejudice. The hearing on the motion scheduled for February 10, 2004 is cancelled. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2004) (Entered: 02/11/2004)
2004-02-1112Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by United States Department of Justice. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2004) (Entered: 02/11/2004)
2004-02-1213CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. Please take notice that a Case Management Conference in the above-entitled matter which was previously set for March 2, 2004 before the Honorable Judge Patricia V. Trumbull has been continued to March 5, 2004 at 10:30a.m. before the Honorable Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Parties are to appear in courtroom #6, 4th floor of the United States Courthouse, 280 South First Street, San Jose, California. Parties are to submit a Joint Case Management Statement on February 27, 2004. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2004) (Entered: 02/12/2004)
2004-02-1214ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ronald M. Whyte for all further proceedings. Judge Patricia V Trumbull remains as the referral judge. Signed by Executive Committee on February 12, 2004. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2004) (Entered: 02/12/2004)
2004-02-2715JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT; ADR Certification,; (PROPOSED) ORDER filed by United States Department of Justice. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2004) (Entered: 02/27/2004)
2004-03-0816Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 3/5/2004 before Judge Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 3/8/2004). Plaintiff has submitted FOIA requests to OLA and EOUSA is awaiting for a response to his request. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2004 10:30 AM. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/8/2004) (Entered: 03/08/2004)
2004-03-2217NOTICE of Change of Address by Joshua Gerstein (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2004) (Entered: 03/22/2004)
2004-04-2318MOTION for leave to file amended supplemental complaint filed by Joshua Gerstein. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2004 09:00 AM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2004) (Entered: 04/23/2004)
2004-04-23Proposed Order re motion for leave to file amended supplemental complaint 18 by Joshua Gerstein. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2004) (Entered: 04/23/2004)
2004-04-23Received (Proposed) First Amended and Supplemental Complaint by Joshua Gerstein. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2004) (Entered: 04/23/2004)
2004-05-0719Statement of Non-Opposition to plaintiff's motion for leave to file amended and supplemental complaint re 18 filed by United States Department of Justice. (Related document(s) 18 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2004) (Entered: 05/07/2004)
2004-05-2620ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting 18 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2004) (Entered: 05/26/2004)
2004-05-2621FIRST AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice. Filed by Joshua Gerstein. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2004) (Entered: 05/26/2004)
2004-06-1022ANSWER to First Amended and Supplemental Complaint by United States Department of Justice. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2004) (Entered: 06/15/2004)
2004-06-1523SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by United States Department of Justice. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2004) (Entered: 06/16/2004)
2004-06-2224Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 6/18/2004 before Judge Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 6/22/2004). The Court continued this matter to allow the government to fully respond. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2004 10:30 AM. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/22/2004) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
2004-07-0625NOTICE of Change of Address by United States Department of Justice (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2004) (Entered: 07/06/2004)
2004-08-2326SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by United States Department of Justice. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2004) (Entered: 08/23/2004)
2004-09-0727Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/3/2004 before Judge Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 9/7/2004). The government advised the Court that a search is ongoing to plaintiff's request for information about warrants. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2004 10:30 AM. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/7/2004) Modified on 9/22/2004 (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/08/2004)
2004-09-2128ORDER RE FOIA REQUEST. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/21/2004. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2004) (Entered: 09/22/2004)
2004-09-2829Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/24/2004 before Judge Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 9/28/2004). Further Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2004 10:30 AM. () (mp, ) (Date Filed: 9/28/2004) (Entered: 09/28/2004)
2004-10-2230Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/15/2004 before Judge Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 10/22/2004). Government advised Court that more time is needed to complete the requested searches. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2004 10:30 AM. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/22/2004) (Entered: 10/22/2004)
2004-11-0131Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/29/2004 before Judge Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 11/1/2004). Plaintiff advised the Court that he has received the documents from the government and has reviewed the redacted documents. The government advised that there are two districts that have not responded to the request. Government to see what the time frame is for the referrals and the government to brief it to the Court. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2004 10:30 AM. (Court Reporter not reported.) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/1/2004) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
2004-12-0332Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/3/2004 before JUDGE RONALD M. WHYTE (Date Filed: 12/3/2004). () (mp, ) (Date Filed: 12/3/2004) (Entered: 12/03/2004)
2004-12-1633ORDER: Defendant's motion for partial summary jusgment due 1/28/2005, opposition due 2/11/2005, reply due 2/18/2005. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2005 09:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/16/2004. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2004) (Entered: 12/17/2004)
2005-01-2834NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by United States Department of Justice. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2005 09:00 AM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2005) (Entered: 01/29/2005)
2005-01-2835MEMORANDUM in Support re 34 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byUnited States Department of Justice. (Related document(s) 34 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2005) (Entered: 01/29/2005)
2005-01-2836Declaration of John F. Boseker in Support of 34 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byUnited States Department of Justice. (Related document(s) 34 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2005) (Entered: 01/29/2005)
2005-01-2837Declaration of Melanie Ann Pustay in Support of 34 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byUnited States Department of Justice. (Related document(s) 34 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2005) (Entered: 01/29/2005)
2005-01-2838Declaration of Kathy Hsu in Support of 34 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byUnited States Department of Justice. (Related document(s) 34 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2005) (Entered: 01/29/2005)
2005-01-28Proposed Order re 34 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by United States Department of Justice. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2005) (Entered: 01/29/2005)
2005-01-2839NOTICE of filing of proposed order by United States Department of Justice (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2005) (Entered: 01/29/2005)
2005-02-0940MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and to reset hearing and briefing schedule filed by Joshua Gerstein. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2005) (Entered: 02/14/2005)
2005-02-0941Declaration of Joshua A. Gerstein in Support of 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to File opposition and to reset hearing and briefing schedule filed byJoshua Gerstein. (Related document(s) 40 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2005) (Entered: 02/14/2005)
2005-02-09Proposed Order re 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Joshua Gerstein. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2005) (Entered: 02/14/2005)
2005-02-1442ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting 40 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to defendant's motion for partial summary judgmen and plaintiff's cross-motion if any;Plaintiff's Opposition due by 3/4/2005. Defendant's Replies due by 3/25/2005. Plaintiff's reply to defendant's opposition to cross-motion due 4/1/2005. Hearing on all pending motions set for 4/15/2005 at 9:00 AM (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2005) (Entered: 02/15/2005)
2005-02-14Set/Reset Deadline as to 34 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2005 09:00 AM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2005) (Entered: 02/15/2005)
2005-03-0443MOTION for More Definite Statement regarding scope of search and purportedly sealed records filed by Joshua Gerstein. Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2005 09:00 AM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2005) (Entered: 03/07/2005)
2005-03-0444MOTION to Strike 36 Declaration of John F. Boseker in part filed by Joshua Gerstein. Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2005 09:00 AM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2005) (Entered: 03/07/2005)
2005-03-0445MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in support of Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and in OPPOSITION to 34 defendant's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byJoshua Gerstein. (Related document(s) 34 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2005) (Entered: 03/07/2005)
2005-03-0446Third Declaration of Joshua A. Gerstein filed byJoshua Gerstein. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2005) (Entered: 03/07/2005)
2005-03-0847CROSS-MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and STATEMENT OF OPPOSITION and NON-OPPOSITION regarding defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Joshua Gerstein. Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2005 09:00 AM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2005) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
2005-03-08Proposed Order re 47 CROSS-MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Joshua Gerstein. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2005) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
2005-03-08Proposed Order re 44 MOTION to Strike 36 by Joshua Gerstein. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2005) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
2005-03-0848CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joshua Gerstein re Proposed Order, Proposed Order, 43 MOTION for More Definite Statement, 44 MOTION to Strike 36 Declaration in Support, 47 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2005) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
2005-03-24Stipulation & Proposed Order for enlargement of time and to reset hearing and briefing schedule by United States Department of Justice. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2005) (Entered: 03/24/2005)
2005-03-2449Declaration of Alan S. Modlinger in support of stipulation & proposed order filed byUnited States Department of Justice. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2005) (Entered: 03/24/2005)
2005-04-0150Memorandum in Opposition re 44 MOTION to Strike 36 Declaration of John F. Boseker in Part filed byUnited States Department of Justice. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2005) (Entered: 04/04/2005)
2005-04-0151Memorandum in Opposition to 43 MOTION for More Definite Statement by defendant regarding scope of search and purportedly sealed records filed byUnited States Department of Justice. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2005) (Entered: 04/04/2005)
2005-04-0152Memorandum in Opposition to 47 CROSS-MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and in reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion for partial summary judgment filed byUnited States Department of Justice. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2005) (Entered: 04/04/2005)
2005-04-0153Supplemental Declaration of John F. Boseker in Support of 34 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byUnited States Department of Justice. (Related document(s) 34 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2005) (Entered: 04/04/2005)
2005-04-01Proposed Order re 34 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by United States Department of Justice. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2005) (Entered: 04/04/2005)
2005-04-0154NOTICE by United States Department of Justice re Proposed Order (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2005) (Entered: 04/04/2005)
2005-04-01Proposed Order re 51 by United States Department of Justice. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2005) (Entered: 04/04/2005)
2005-04-0155NOTICE by United States Department of Justice of filing Proposed Order (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2005) (Entered: 04/04/2005)
2005-04-01Proposed Order re 50 by United States Department of Justice. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2005) (Entered: 04/04/2005)
2005-04-0156NOTICE by United States Department of Justice of filing of Proposed Order (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2005) (Entered: 04/04/2005)
2005-04-0657STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME Pending Motions Hearing set for 5/6/2005 09:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/31/2005. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2005) (Entered: 04/08/2005)
2005-04-2258Reply to Opposition re 44 MOTION to Strike 36 Declaration of John F. Boseker in part filed byJoshua Gerstein. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2005) (Entered: 04/25/2005)
2005-04-2259Reply to Opposition re 47 CROSS-MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byJoshua Gerstein. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2005) (Entered: 04/25/2005)
2005-04-2260Reply to Opposition re 43 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed byJoshua Gerstein. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2005) (Entered: 04/25/2005)
2005-04-2561Fourth Declaration of Joshua A. Gerstein filed byJoshua Gerstein. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2005) (Entered: 04/25/2005)
2005-04-2562CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joshua Gerstein re 59 Reply to Opposition, 60 Reply to Opposition, 61 Declaration in Support, 58 Reply to Opposition (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2005) (Entered: 04/25/2005)
2005-05-0563Fifth Declaration of Joshua A. Gerstein filed byJoshua Gerstein. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2005) (Entered: 05/06/2005)
2005-05-1064CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joshua Gerstein re 63 Declaration in Support (fifth declaration) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2005) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
2005-05-1165Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/6/2005 before Judge Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 5/11/2005) re 44 MOTION to Strike 36 filed by Joshua Gerstein,, 34 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by United States Department of Justice,, 47 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Joshua Gerstein,. The Court heard oral argument from both sides and the Court's tentative ruling is to grant in part and deny in part cross-motions for partial summary judgment; denying in part plaintiff's motion to strike; and denying plaintiff's motion for a more definite statement. Plaintiff to provide further briefing and defendant to respond within 5 days. Court to send out a written ruling to the parties. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/11/2005) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
2005-05-1366MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN RESPONSE to 63 Fifth Declaration of Joshua A. Gerstein by United States Department of Justice. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2005) (Entered: 05/16/2005)
2005-09-1467NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL CITATION by Joshua Gerstein in connection with re 34 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 47 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2005) (Entered: 09/18/2005)
2005-09-3068ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying 43 plaintiff's Motion for More Definite Statement, denying in part 44 plaintiff's Motion to Strike, granting in part and denying in part 34 , 47 , Cross Motions for Partial Summary Judgment. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2005) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
2006-01-1069MOTION for Reconsideration of 68 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Joshua Gerstein. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2006) (Entered: 01/11/2006)
2006-01-1070Sixth Declaration of Joshua A. Gerstein in Support of 69 MOTION for Reconsideration of 68 Order re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Joshua Gerstein. (Related document(s) 69 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2006) Modified text on 1/11/2006 (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/11/2006)
2006-01-1071MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Joshua Gerstein. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2006) (Entered: 01/11/2006)
2006-01-10Proposed Order re 69 MOTION for Reconsideration of 68 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and, 71 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration by Joshua Gerstein. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2006) (Entered: 01/11/2006)
2006-06-0872NOTICE of Additional Authority by Joshua Gerstein (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2006) (Entered: 06/09/2006)
2006-06-1573NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel for Defendant, United States Department of Justice (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2006) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
2006-06-3074RESPONSE to re 72 Notice (Other) by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DC Circuit Op. in Judicial Watch v. FDA)(Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 6/30/2006) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
2006-06-3075CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Department of Justice re 74 Response ( Non Motion ) (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 6/30/2006) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
2006-07-0676CLERK'S NOTICE re: Documents E-Filed on 6/30/2006 in a case not designated for ECF. (clerk's notice mailed to parties of record) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2006) (Entered: 07/06/2006)
2006-08-2577ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 71 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration & Setting Briefing Schedule (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2006) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
2006-09-05Stipulation and Proposed Order Revising Briefing Schedule by United States Department of Justice. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2006) (Entered: 09/07/2006)
2006-09-2778NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Marcia K. Sowles (Sowles, Marcia) (Filed on 9/27/2006) (Entered: 09/27/2006)
2006-10-0479MOTION for Leave to Withdraw 69 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Joshua Gerstein. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2006) (Entered: 10/05/2006)
2006-10-04Proposed Order re 79 MOTION for Leave to Withdraw 69 Motion for Reconsideration by Joshua Gerstein. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2006) (Entered: 10/05/2006)
2006-10-1080STIPULATION AND ORDER revising briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/4/2006. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2006) (Entered: 10/16/2006)
2006-10-1881ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 79 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Motion for Reconsideration (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2006) (Entered: 10/18/2006)
2007-10-17FILE located at Federal Records Center(FRC), San Bruno, CA: Accession No: 021-07-0061, Location No: 735434, Box No: 84. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2007) (Entered: 10/17/2007)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff