Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNational Immigrant Justice Center v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2012cv04825
Date Filed2012-06-18
Date Closed2013-04-18
JudgeHonorable Gary Feinerman
PlaintiffNational Immigrant Justice Center
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
DefendantDepartment of the Army
DefendantDepartment of the Army
TERMINATED: 11/26/2012
DefendantExecutive Office for Immigration Review, The
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2012-06-17CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. (daj, ) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
2012-06-181COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by National Immigrant Justice Center; Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-7264027. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q)(Fifer, Samuel) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
2012-06-182CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fifer, Samuel) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
2012-06-183ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center by Samuel Fifer (Fifer, Samuel) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
2012-06-184ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center by James Andrew Klenk (Klenk, James) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
2012-06-185ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center by Maria Laucka Domanskis (Domanskis, Maria) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
2012-06-18SUMMONS Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney (jn, ) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
2012-06-226DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Department of the Army, Executive Office for Immigration Review, The, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
2012-07-137MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 8/20/2012 at 9:30 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 8/13/2012. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov, to "District Judges," to "Judge Gary Feinerman," to "Initial Status Hearings" under Case Management Procedures) for details on the initial status hearing and Initial Status Report.Mailed notice. (jlj) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
2012-07-208ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Department of the Army, Executive Office for Immigration Review, The, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement by Andrew L. Nolan (Nolan, Andrew) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
2012-07-209MOTION by Defendants Department of the Army, Executive Office for Immigration Review, The, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Nolan, Andrew) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
2012-07-2010NOTICE by Department of the Army, Executive Office for Immigration Review, The, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement of Presentment re: Agreed Motion to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Nolan, Andrew) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
2012-07-2011MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:Unopposed motion for extension of time to answer 9 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 9/12/2012. Initial status hearing scheduled for 8/20/2012 7 is stricken and re-set for 9/26/2012 at 9:30 a.m. Joint status report shall be filed by 9/19/2012. Motion hearing scheduled for 7/23/2012 10 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
2012-08-0312SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Immigrant Justice Center as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 6/20/2012, answer due 8/20/2012 (Fifer, Samuel) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
2012-08-0313SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Immigrant Justice Center as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 6/22/2012, answer due 8/21/2012 (Fifer, Samuel) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
2012-08-0314SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Immigrant Justice Center as to United States Department of Justice served on 6/20/2012, answer due 8/20/2012 (Fifer, Samuel) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
2012-08-0315SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Immigrant Justice Center as to Executive Office for Immigration Review, The served on 6/20/2012, answer due 8/20/2012 (Fifer, Samuel) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
2012-08-0316SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Immigrant Justice Center as to United States Department of Homeland Security served on 6/20/2012, answer due 8/20/2012 (Fifer, Samuel) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
2012-08-0317SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Immigrant Justice Center as to Department of the Army served on 6/20/2012, answer due 8/20/2012 (Fifer, Samuel) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
2012-08-0318AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center regarding Summons in a Civil Case served on U.S. Attorneys' Office for the Northern District of Illinois on 6/20/12 (Fifer, Samuel) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
2012-09-1219ANSWER to Complaint by Department of the Army, Executive Office for Immigration Review, The, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement(Nolan, Andrew) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
2012-09-1820MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:Due to the trial calendar of this court, status hearing scheduled for 9/26/2012 11 at 9:00 a.m. is re-set for 8:45 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
2012-09-1921STATUS Report Joint Intial Status Report by National Immigrant Justice Center (Domanskis, Maria) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
2012-09-2522MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman: Based on the parties' joint request (Doc. 21 at 5), status hearing scheduled for 9/26/2012 20 is stricken and re-set for 11/27/2012 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj) (Entered: 09/25/2012)
2012-11-2623NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Department of the Army, National Immigrant Justice Center Without Prejudice (Domanskis, Maria) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
2012-11-2724MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 1/30/2013 at 9:00 a.m. If dismissal papers are filed by 1/29/2013, the 1/30/2013 status hearing will be stricken and the case will be closed. If the matter is not resolved, a schedule will be entered at the 1/30/2013 status hearing.Mailed notice. (jlj) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
2013-01-0725WITHDRAWING Andrew L. Nolan as counsel for Defendants Executive Office for Immigration Review, The, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement and substituting Bradley Heath Cohen as counsel of record (Cohen, Bradley) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
2013-01-2426MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:By order of the court, status hearing scheduled for 1/30/2013 24 at 9:00 a.m. is re-set for 9:30 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
2013-01-3027MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 3/20/2013 at 9:30 a.m. The parties indicated that they generally are in agreement on the production of documents.Mailed notice. (jlj) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
2013-02-2028MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 3/20/2013 27 at 9:30 a.m. is re-set for 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
2013-03-2029MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing held and continued to 6/13/2013 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (clw, ) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
2013-03-2830Notice of Law Firm Name Change by National Immigrant Justice Center (Domanskis, Maria) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
2013-04-1831STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice (Domanskis, Maria) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
2013-04-1832MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman: The parties having filed a stipulation of dismissal with prejudice 31 , the status hearing scheduled for 6/13/2013 29 is stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (jlj) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
2013-04-1833MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman: Order entered 4/18/2013 32 having been entered in error, is vacated. The Clerk of the Court is requested to reinstate this case. The parties having filed a stipulation of dismissal with prejudice 31 as defendants United States Department of Justice and the Executive Office for Immigration Review. The Clerk of the Court is requested to terminate defendants United States Department of Justice and the Executive Office for Immigration Review as pending parties. Status hearing scheduled for 6/13/2013 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (mgh, ) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
2013-05-2834ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center by Katherine Lucille Staba (Staba, Katherine) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
2013-05-3135ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center by Eric J. Andalman (Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
2013-06-1336MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 9/26/2013 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
2013-07-0237MOTION by Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center to withdraw Appearance of Katherine L. Staba (Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
2013-07-0238NOTICE of Motion by Eric J. Andalman for presentment of motion to withdraw 37 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/8/2013 at 09:00 PM. (Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
2013-07-0339MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman: Motion to withdraw appearance 37 is granted. Attorney Staba is terminated as counsel for Plaintiff. The 7/8/2013 motion hearing 38 is stricken Mailed notice (lcw, ) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
2013-09-2640MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 12/11/2013 at 9:00 a.m. The parties reported that they are continuing to attempt to resolve this matter.Mailed notice. (jlj) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
2013-10-0241MOTION by counsel for Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center to withdraw as attorney Maria L. Domanskis (Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
2013-10-0242NOTICE of Motion by Eric J. Andalman for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 41 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/7/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
2013-10-0243MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to withdraw as attorney 41 is granted. Attorney Maria Laucka Domanskis is given leave to withdraw as counsel for plaintiff. Motion hearing scheduled for 10/7/2013 42 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
2013-10-0744GENERAL ORDER 13-0018 dated 10/7/13: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, effective October 1, 2013, that all civil litigation involving as a party the United States of America, is immediately suspended, postponed and held in abeyance continuing for a period of fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this General Order (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Chief Judge Ruben Castillo on 10/7/2013.(ym, ) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
2013-10-1745GENERAL ORDER 13-0019 dated 10/17/13: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, that the stay entered by General Order 13-0018 is hereby lifted, and any and all deadlines in the affected civil litigation (whether established by order, rule, or agreement), including but not limited to any scheduled discovery and pleading dates, are extended by 28 days. The Court warns litigants that this General Order does not purport to affect rights to or deadlines concerning appeal from any decision of this Court. Any litigant affected by this General Order may see relief from the order by motion. Trial dates in the affected cases will stand, although they may need to be adjusted in individual cases to account for the extension of other dates. The Court may, in any particular case, vary the effect or operation of this General Order by a separate ruling. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Chief Judge Ruben Castillo on 10/17/2013.(ym, ) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
2013-12-1146MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 3/18/2014 at 9:00 a.m. The parties reported that they soon will file a stipulation to dismiss the claims against USCIS, and further reported that ICE continues to make regular productions.Mailed notice. (jlj) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
2013-12-2047STIPULATION of Dismissal (Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
2013-12-2548MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: In light of the stipulation of dismissal 47 , the Clerk is requested to terminate U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Service as a party defendant.Mailed notice. (jlj) Modified on 1/3/2014 (jlj, ). (Entered: 12/25/2013)
2014-03-1849MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 6/5/2014 at 9:00 a.m. The parties reported that ICE, the sole remaining defendant, has continued to produce documents. The remaining parties shall submit a joint status report on or before 5/23/2014.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
2014-05-2350STATUS Report (Joint) by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Cohen, Bradley) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
2014-05-2751MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the parties' request 50 , the 6/5/2014 status hearing 49 is stricken and re-set for 6/30/2014 at 9:30 a.m. By 6/20/2014, the parties shall file a status report addressing whether any issues remain in dispute and, if so, a briefing schedule for cross-motions for summary judgment. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar