Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNational Immigrant Justice Center v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2012cv05358
Date Filed2012-07-09
Date Closed2015-02-10
JudgeHonorable Matthew F. Kennelly
PlaintiffNational Immigrant Justice Center
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Opinion/Order [95]
FOIA Project Annotation: A federal court in Illinois has ruled that the Department of Homeland Security must complete its processing of a voluminous request for records on immigrant detention facilities within 45 days of the court's order after Judge Matthew Kennelly found the agency had failed miserably to conduct an adequate search in the nearly four years since the National Immigrant Justice Center submitted its request. NIJC's request identified eight categories covering 250 detention facilities. During the course of the litigation, NIJC narrowed its request to the top 100 detention facilities and also agreed to accept summaries rather than checklists for facilities. Immigration and Customs Enforcement initially estimated the request would take 80 weeks to complete, but told Kennelly earlier in the litigation that it would complete the request within 40 weeks. However, by the time of Kennelly's ruling, the agency had already exceeded 80 weeks and was still nowhere near completion. Kennelly noted that "the agencies have provided only sketchy details of what they did in the two-and-one-half years preceding their [increased activity in the fall of 2013] to search for relevant records. The only reasonable conclusion that may be drawn is that they did not conduct a reasonable search. The gaping holes in the agencies' production of documents during that extraordinarily long delay are virtually impossible to justify." Kennelly was also incensed by what he believed was the government's misleading statements to him concerning when NIJC's request would be complete. He pointed out that "the agencies came nowhere near meeting the estimate‚Ä"indeed they did not even meet the original, much longer estimate even though the requests were narrowed after that. This strongly suggests that there was an extended period of hand-sitting, and that this changed only when, during the course of the litigation, the agencies perceived themselves, rightly, to be under the gun." The agencies asked Kennelly to allow continuing disclosure on a rolling basis. Noting that this process had already proven to be inadequate, Kennelly observed that "allowing even more time for an already extraordinarily protracted production of records based on problems faced by many, if not all, government agencies would undermine the purpose behind the FOIA." NIJC asked Kennelly to require the agency to provide more recent data rather than use the search cut-off date. But Kennelly pointed out that while "a date-of-search cut-off is not entirely satisfactory in the present case [because] it allows the defendants' delays to leave the NIJC with relatively dated information. . .a date-of-release cut-off would be counterproductive to the overall goal of completing the production as quickly as possible going forward."
Issues: Adequacy - Search
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2012-07-091COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. filed by National Immigrant Justice Center; Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-7327511. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Fifer, Samuel) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
2012-07-092CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fifer, Samuel) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
2012-07-093ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center by Samuel Fifer (Fifer, Samuel) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
2012-07-094ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center by James Andrew Klenk (Klenk, James) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
2012-07-095ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center by Maria Laucka Domanskis (Domanskis, Maria) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
2012-07-09CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. (nsf, ) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
2012-07-09SUMMONS Issued as to United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ef, ) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
2012-07-206DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
2012-08-037SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Immigrant Justice Center as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 7/9/2012, answer due 9/7/2012 (Fifer, Samuel) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office.) Modified on 8/7/2012 (ph, ). (Entered: 08/03/2012)
2012-08-038SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Immigrant Justice Center as to United States Department of Justice served on 7/9/2012, answer due 9/7/2012. (Fifer, Samuel) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office.) Modified on 8/7/2012 (ph, ). (Entered: 08/03/2012)
2012-08-039SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Immigrant Justice Center as to U.S. Attorneys' Office for the Northern District of Illinois served on 7/9/2012, answer due 9/7/2012. (Fifer, Samuel) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office.) Modified on 8/7/2012 (ph, ). (Entered: 08/03/2012)
2012-08-0310SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Immigrant Justice Center as to United States Department of Homeland Security served on 7/9/2012, answer due 9/7/2012 (Fifer, Samuel) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office.) Modified on 8/7/2012 (ph, ). (Entered: 08/03/2012)
2012-08-2011MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 9/17/12 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/Judges.aspx. Counsel for plaintiff(s) are ordered to cause a copy of this order to be delivered forthwith to each defendant in the same manner that summons has been or is being served on each defendant. (mk) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
2012-09-0712MOTION by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, 1 (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
2012-09-0713NOTICE of Motion by Craig Arthur Oswald for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief 12 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/17/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
2012-09-1714MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing pursuant to Rule 16(b) held. Motion for extension of time to answer 12 is granted. Response to complaint is to be filed by 10/25/2012. Status hearing continued to 11/19/2012 at 09:30 AM. (or, ) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
2012-10-2515MOTION by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement for extension of time to file answer (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
2012-10-2516NOTICE of Motion by Craig Arthur Oswald for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 15 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/31/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
2012-10-3017MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Defendants' agreed motion to extend answer and status hearing date is granted. The due date for defendants' answer is extended to 1/15/13. The status hearing date of 11/19/12 is vacated and reset to 1/17/13 at 9:00 a.m. These dates will not be extended again. The motion hearing date of 10/31/12 is vacated. Mailed notice (drw, ) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
2013-01-1518ANSWER to Complaint by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement(Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
2013-01-1719MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Status hearing held and continued to 3/21/2013 at 09:00 AM. (or, ) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
2013-03-2120MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:rule 16(b) status hearing held. Status hearing continued to 5/16/2013 at 09:00 AM. (or, ) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
2013-03-2821Notice of Law Firm Name Change by National Immigrant Justice Center (Domanskis, Maria) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
2013-04-3022MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing set for 5/16/2013 is vacated because Judge Kennelly will not be holding court. Status hearing is reset to 5/29/2013 at 09:00 AM. (or, ) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
2013-05-2823ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center by Katherine Lucille Staba (Staba, Katherine) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
2013-05-2925MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Rule 169b) Status hearing held with only plaintiff's attorney appearing. Defendant's attorney fails to appear. Status hearing continued to 6/3/2013 at 09:00 AM. Plaintiff's attorney is directed to notify defendant's attorney of the new date. As the Court has previously made clear, it intends to set deadlines for completing production and for assessing and litigating objections and disputes. This will be done at the 6/3/13 status hearing. (or, ) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
2013-05-3124ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center by Eric J. Andalman (Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
2013-06-0326MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Rule 16(b) status hearing held with attorneys for both sides. At counsels' request, the matter is continued so that the parties can attempt to agree upon a schedule. Status hearing continued to 7/8/2013 at 09:00 AM. Joint status report and proposed schedule are to be submitted by 7/3/2013. (or, ) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
2013-06-2427MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing set for 7/8/2013 is vacated because Judge Kennelly will not be holding court on that date. Status hearing reset for 7/16/2013 at 09:00 AM. (pjg, ) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
2013-07-0228MOTION by counsel for Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center to withdraw as attorney Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Katherine L. Staba (Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
2013-07-0229NOTICE of Motion by Eric J. Andalman for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 28 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/11/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
2013-07-0330STATUS Report Joint Status Report and Proposed Schedule by National Immigrant Justice Center (Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
2013-07-1131MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiffs' motion to withdraw the appearance of Katherine L. Staba is granted 28 . The motion hearing date of 7/11/13 is vacated. Mailed notice (np, ) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
2013-07-1632MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Status hearing pursuant to Rule 16(b) held with attorneys for both sides. Status hearing continued to 9/30/2013 at 09:30 AM. (or, ) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
2013-09-2333MOTION by Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center to strike status hearing, set/reset hearings 32 Agreed Joint Motion to Strike and Set New Status Hearing Date (Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
2013-09-2334NOTICE of Motion by Eric J. Andalman for presentment of motion to strike, motion for relief, 33 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/26/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
2013-09-2335MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Due to Judge Kennelly holding court only in the afternoon on 9/26/2013, the motion hearing regarding plaintiff's motion to strike 33 set for 9/26/2013 at 9:30 a.m. is reset for 9/26/2013 at 01:30 p.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, ) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
2013-09-2436MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The joint motion to strike and set a new status hearing date 33 is denied, due to the fact that defendants have not met their previous commitment regarding the production of certain documents and the absence of any commitment or representation regarding when they will be produced. The Court will address this point further at the status hearing on 9/30/2013, which will proceed as scheduled. (mk) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
2013-09-3037MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing held on 9/30/2013 and continued to 10/22/2013 at 09:30 a.m. Defendant is to provide a written status report by 10/21/2013. Mailed notice. (pjg, ) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
2013-10-0238MOTION by counsel for Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center to withdraw as attorney Maria L. Domanskis (Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
2013-10-0239NOTICE of Motion by Eric J. Andalman for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 38 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/8/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
2013-10-0740MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion to withdraw the appearance of Maria Domanskis as attorney 38 is granted; attorney Maria Domanskis terminated. (mk) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
2013-10-0741GENERAL ORDER 13-0018 dated 10/7/13: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, effective October 1, 2013, that all civil litigation involving as a party the United States of America, is immediately suspended, postponed and held in abeyance continuing for a period of fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this General Order (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by Chief Judge Castillo. Mailed notice(ph, ) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
2013-10-1742GENERAL ORDER 13-0019 dated 10/17/13: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, that the stay entered by General Order 13-0018 is hereby lifted, and any and all deadlines in the affected civil litigation (whether established by order, rule, or agreement), including but not limited to any scheduled discovery and pleading dates, are extended by 28 days. The Court warns litigants that this General Order does not purport to affect rights to or deadlines concerning appeal from any decision of this Court. Any litigant affected by this General Order may see relief from the order by motion. Trial dates in the affected cases will stand, although they may need to be adjusted in individual cases to account for the extension of other dates. The Court may, in any particular case, vary the effect or operation of this General Order by a separate ruling. (For Further Details See Attached Order) Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 10/17/2013.(nf, ) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
2013-10-1843Status Report by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
2013-10-2044MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The case remains set for a status hearing on 10/22/2013 at 9:30 a.m. as ordered. The order entered on the docket of this case by the Chief Judge pursuant to General Order is modified to the extent it might be understood to alter the date for the status hearing. (mk) (Entered: 10/20/2013)
2013-10-2245MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing held on 10/22/2013. The status report is approved. Another status report is due by 11/4/2013. Status hearing is set for 11/7/2013 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, ) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
2013-11-0446STATUS Report Joint by National Immigrant Justice Center (Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
2013-11-0747MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing held on 11/7/2013. Discovery ordered closed by 2/10/2014. Dispositive motions due by 3/3/2014. Status hearing is set for 3/5/2014 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, ) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
2014-01-0648MOTION by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement for protective order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
2014-01-0649NOTICE of Motion by Craig Arthur Oswald for presentment of motion for protective order 48 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/9/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
2014-01-0850MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Because Judge Kennelly is on trial, the motion hearing set for 1/8/2014 is vacated. Plaintiff is directed to respond to the motion by 1/13/2014. Defendant is directed to reply by 1/17/2014. Ruling set to 1/21/2014 at 9:30 AM. (mk) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
2014-01-1351RESPONSE by National Immigrant Justice Centerin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement for protective order 48 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
2014-01-1752REPLY by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement to motion for protective order 48 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
2014-01-2153MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion hearing held on 1/21/2014. Motion for protective order 48 is granted. Status report on production of documents to be filed by 2/14/2014. Status hearing set for 2/24/2014 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, ) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
2014-02-0754TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/7/13 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura Brennan, 312-435-5785, Laura_M_Brennan@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2014. (Brennan, Laura) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
2014-02-1455STATUS Report on the production of documents by National Immigrant Justice Center (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
2014-02-1456STATUS Report by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A, # 2 Exhibit 1-20)(Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
2014-02-1457NOTICE by All Defendants re status report 56 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment B, # 2 Exhibit Attachment C, # 3 Exhibit Attachment D)(Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
2014-02-2458MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing held on 2/24/2014. The deadline for dispositive motions is extended to 4/4/2014; responses due 5/5/2014; Replies due by 5/19/2014. These deadlines will not be extended further. Mailed notice. (pjg, ) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
2014-04-0459MOTION by Defendants United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security for summary judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1-31, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
2014-04-0460MOTION by Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center for summary judgment (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
2014-04-0461MEMORANDUM by National Immigrant Justice Center in support of motion for summary judgment 60 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
2014-04-0462Rule 56.1 STATEMENT by National Immigrant Justice Center (Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
2014-04-0463NOTICE of Motion by Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center (Andalman, Eric) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) (mr, ). (Entered: 04/04/2014)
2014-04-0464NOTICE of Motion by Eric J. Andalman for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 63 , motion for summary judgment 60 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/15/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
2014-04-0465NOTICE of Motion by Eric J. Andalman for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 63 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/15/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
2014-04-0466MOTION by Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center for summary judgment CORRECTED (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
2014-04-0467MOTION by Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center for leave to file excess pages CORRECTED (Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
2014-04-0468NOTICE of Motion by Eric J. Andalman for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 67 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/15/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
2014-04-0469MEMORANDUM by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement in support of motion for summary judgment, 59 (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
2014-04-0470RULE 56 56.1 Statement by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement regarding motion for summary judgment, 59 (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
2014-04-1171MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: This is a lawsuit under the federal Freedom of Information Act. Both sides have noticed motions for summary judgment. Defendants argue in their motion that they conducted an adequate search for records. Plaintiff argues in its motion that defendants did not do so, and they also address the appropriate relief if the Court agrees with plaintiff's position. In other words, the parties present opposing arguments on the same point. The Court will not accept 6 briefs (3 on each motion) on overlapping motions like these and also does not believe it would be productive to have simultaneous filings. The Court proposes a 4-brief format and does not care which party goes first. Counsel are directed to confer to attempt to come up with an agreed sequence and schedule, which may involve one side withdrawing its current brief and filing a different version of it as a response to the other side's current brief. The hearing on the motions is advanced to 8:30 on 4/15/2014 and will be held in chambers (Room 2188). (mk) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
2014-04-1572MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Rule 16(b) status hearing held on 4/15/2014 with attorneys for both sides. Motion for leave to file excess pages 67 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 66 is taken under advisement. Defendant's response and cross motion is to be filed by 5/15/2014; plaintiff's reply is to be filed by 5/30/2014; defendant's final reply is to be filed by 6/16/2014. Consideration of plaintiff's argument regarding attorney's fees is deferred; defendant need not respond. Mailed notice. (pjg, ) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
2014-05-1473MOTION by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement for extension of time (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
2014-05-1474NOTICE of Motion by Craig Arthur Oswald for presentment of extension of time 73 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/22/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
2014-05-1575MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant's motion for a four-day extension of time 73 is granted. The due date for defendant's brief is extended to May 19, 2014; the due date for plaintiff's reply is extended to June 3; and the due date for defendants' final reply is extended to June 20, 2014. Defendants should not expect an extension of the interval for their final reply brief and should plan accordingly. (mk) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
2014-05-1976MOTION by Defendants United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security for summary judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F, # 2 Exhibit G, # 3 Exhibit H, # 4 Exhibit I, # 5 Exhibit J)(Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
2014-05-1977MEMORANDUM motion for summary judgment, 76 by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
2014-05-1978RULE 56 56.1(b) Statement by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement regarding motion for summary judgment 66 (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
2014-05-1979RULE 56 a Statement by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement regarding motion for summary judgment, 76 (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
2014-06-0280MOTION by Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center for extension of time Agree to (Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
2014-06-0281NOTICE of Motion by Eric J. Andalman for presentment of extension of time 80 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/3/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
2014-06-0382MOTION by Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center for extension of time Agreed to (Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
2014-06-0383NOTICE of Motion by Eric J. Andalman for presentment of extension of time 82 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/10/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
2014-06-0484MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion hear date of 6/3/2014 regarding motion for extension of time 80 is vacated. Motion is to be re-noticed for hearing with three days notice. Mailed notice. (pjg, ) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
2014-06-0985MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time 80 is granted; due date for plaintiff's reply brief is extended to 6/13/2014. Due date for defendants' final reply is extended to 6/30/2014. (mk) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
2014-06-1386RESPONSE by National Immigrant Justice Centerin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security for summary judgment 76 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit)(Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
2014-06-1387RESPONSE by Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center to Rule 56 statement 78 (Andalman, Eric) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
2014-06-3088MEMORANDUM by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
2014-07-0189NOTICE by All Defendants re memorandum 88 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M)(Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
2014-07-0290ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center by Ronald Cantrell Jones (Jones, Ronald) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
2014-07-0291MOTION by counsel for Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center to withdraw as attorney , Eric J. Andalman (Jones, Ronald) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
2014-07-0292NOTICE of Motion by Ronald Cantrell Jones for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 91 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/10/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Jones, Ronald) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
2014-07-0993MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion to withdraw the appearance of Eric J. Andalman is granted. (mk) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
2014-07-1494TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 1/21/14 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura Brennan, 312-435-5785, Laura_M_Brennan@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/4/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/14/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2014. (Brennan, Laura) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
2015-02-0195For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court grants plaintiff's motion for summary judgment [dkt. nos. 60 & 66] and denies defendants' motion for summary judgment [dkt. nos. 59 & 76]. Counsel are directed to confer and prepare a draft form of judgment consistent with this decision and are to submit it to the Court by no later than February 6, 2015. (mk) (Entered: 02/01/2015)
2015-02-0796MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: This case is set for a status hearing on 2/10/2015 at 8:30 AM, to discuss the submissions made by the parties pursuant to the Court's directive to submit a proposed "draft form of judgment." (mk) (Entered: 02/07/2015)
2015-02-1097MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing held in chambers with attorneys for both sides. The judgment language proposed by each side does not conform to the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. The Court having granted summary judgment in favor of the plaintiff, the Clerk is directed to enter judgment as follows: Judgment is entered in favor of plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center and against defendants U.S. Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. The defendants shall produce all of the remaining responsive documents by no later than 3/21/2015. This includes responsive records through the end of fiscal year 2012 and specifically includes records in the defendants' possession that were generated by other agencies. Mailed notice. (pjg, ) (Entered: 02/10/2015)
2015-02-1098ENTERED JUDGMENT on 2/10/2015. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice.(pjg, ) (Entered: 02/10/2015)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar