Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRivere vs Director of Hidta
DistrictDistrict of the Virgin Islands
CitySt. Thomas Division
Case Number3:2012cv00050
Date Filed2012-07-11
Date Closed2014-06-20
JudgeDistrict Judge Curtis V. Gomez
PlaintiffDarrel Riviere
DefendantDirector of Hidta
Documents
Docket
Opinion/Order [8]
Opinion/Order [21]
Opinion/Order [45]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2012-07-111PETITION by Plainitiff (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Envelope) (KAB) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
2012-09-142NOTICE of status by Darrel Rivere (1) Envelope (JRC). (Entered: 09/18/2012)
2013-09-033MOTION for injunctive authority under FOIA to "order the production of any agency records improperly witheld from complainant" by Plaintiff Darrel Riviere. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Envelope, # 8 Envelope) (JRC) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
2013-10-154NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Darrel Riviere (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (CAB) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
2013-12-165REQUEST for notification on the status of petitioner's petition for injunctive authority by Darrel Riviere (KAB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/26/2013: # 1 Envelope) (KAB). (Entered: 12/17/2013)
2014-03-126REQUEST for notification on the status of petitioner's petition by Darrel Riviere (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Request to compel Disclosure) (KAB) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
2014-03-127REQUEST for injunctive authority by Darrel Riviere (KAB) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
2014-05-148ORDER (CVG) No later than June 4, 2014, Riviere shall pay the Courts filing fee or seek to proceed in forma pauperis, failing which this action may be dismissed. (JNH) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
2014-05-15HARD COPY NOTICE of filing sent to Darrel Riviere Related Document: 8 (KAB) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
2014-06-209ORDER (CVG) This action is DISMISSED. (JNH) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar