Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California et al v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2012cv03728
Date Filed2012-07-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California
PlaintiffSan Francisco Bay Guardian
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2012-07-171COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611076469.). Filed bySan Francisco Bay Guardian, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
2012-07-172Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
2012-07-173ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2012 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
2012-07-174Certificate of Interested Entities by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, San Francisco Bay Guardian (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
2012-07-205SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by San Francisco Bay Guardian, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 7/17/2012, answer due 8/16/2012. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 7/20/2012) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
2012-08-066STIPULATION Re Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Attestation of Concurrence in Filing)(Walker, Juan) (Filed on 8/6/2012) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff