Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California et al v. Department of Justice
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2012cv04008
Date Filed2012-07-31
Date Closed2015-09-08
JudgeMagistrate Judge Maria-Elena James
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California
PlaintiffSan Francisco Bay Guardian
TERMINATED: 02/02/2015
DefendantDepartment of Justice
AppealNinth Circuit 14-17339
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [18]
Opinion/Order [20]
Opinion/Order [22]
Opinion/Order [32]
Opinion/Order [37]
Opinion/Order [41]
Opinion/Order [44]
Opinion/Order [51]
Opinion/Order [52]
Opinion/Order [54]
Opinion/Order [57]
Opinion/Order [61]
Opinion/Order [62]
Opinion/Order [63]
Opinion/Order [65]
FOIA Project Annotation: The court ruled that EOUSA and the Criminal Division of the Justice Department properly withheld the bulk of several memos providing guidance for how government attorneys should approach the issue of court authorization to use location tracking technology in light of the Supreme Court's recent ruling in United States v. Jones under Exemption 5 (privileges). The memos were part of a response to a multi-part request from the ACLU of Northern California. The ACLU argued the memos constituted the working law of the agency on the subject of court authorization of the use of location tracking technology and were not protected by Exemption 5. But Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James disagreed, noting that the memos instead "involve legal issues that will ultimately be decided by the Court, not the DOJ. . .DOJ's interpretation of recent case law affects only the strategies government lawyers will use to obtain permission from the court to use location tracking techniques by law enforcement officers in criminal prosecutions." She added that "they are not directives, not interpretations of any of the DOJ's regulations, and not part of a body of law promulgated by the DOJ. Rather, they present arguments and litigating positions that federal prosecutors may pursue on a case-by-case basis." James found that portions of the Criminal Division's USABook, a legal resource book and reference guide for federal prosecutors, did not qualify as work product. She noted that 'the general description of the materials as guidance, coupled with the templates for use in obtaining location tracking information or devices, strongly suggest that these documents function like an agency manual, providing instructions to prosecutors on how to obtain location tracking information." James rejected the government's argument that information about a more precise use of publicly known investigative techniques could be protected under Exemption 7(E) (investigative methods and techniques). She indicated that "to the extent that potential law violators can evade detection by the government's location tracking technologies, that risk already exists." Rejecting the government's claims, she observed that "the declarations here set forth only conclusory statements that the public is not aware of the specifics of how or when the techniques are used, but do not state that the techniques are not generally known to the public."
Issues: Exemption 7(E) - Unknown to public, Exemption 5 - Privileges
Opinion/Order [68]
FOIA Project Annotation: A federal court in California was ruled that EOUSA and the Criminal Division of the Justice Department properly withheld the bulk of several memos providing guidance on how government attorneys should approach the issue of court authorization to use location tracking technology in light of the Supreme Court's recent ruling in United States v. Jones under Exemption 5 (privileges). The memos were part of a response to a multi-part request from the ACLU of Northern California. The ACLU argued the memos constituted the working law of the agency on the subject of court authorization of the use of location tracking technology and were not protected by Exemption 5. But Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James disagreed, noting that the memos instead "involve legal issues that will ultimately be decided by the Court, not the DOJ. . .DOJ's interpretation of recent case law affects only the strategies government lawyers will use to obtain permission from the court to use location tracking techniques by law enforcement officers in criminal prosecutions." She added that "they are not directives, not interpretations of any of the DOJ's regulations, and not part of a body of law promulgated by the DOJ. Rather, they present arguments and litigating positions that federal prosecutors may pursue on a case-by-case basis." James found that portions of the Criminal Division's USABook, a legal resource book and reference guide for federal prosecutors, did not qualify as work product. She noted that 'the general description of the materials as guidance, coupled with the templates for use in obtaining location tracking information or devices, strongly suggest that these documents function like an agency manual, providing instructions to prosecutors on how to obtain location tracking information." James rejected the government's argument that information about a more precise use of publicly known investigative techniques could be protected under Exemption 7(E) (investigative methods and techniques). She indicated that "to the extent that potential law violators can evade detection by the government's location tracking technologies, that risk already exists." Rejecting the government's claims, she observed that "the declarations here set forth only conclusory statements that the public is not aware of the specifics of how or when the techniques are used, but do not state that the techniques are not generally known to the public."
Issues: Exemption 5 - Privileges - Deliberative process privilege - Deliberative, Exemption 5 - Privileges - Attorney-client privilege, Exemption 7(E) - Investigative methods or techniques
Opinion/Order [74]
Opinion/Order [76]
Opinion/Order [80]
Opinion/Order [81]
Opinion/Order [84]
Opinion/Order [85]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2012-07-311COMPLAINT against Department of Justice ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611076977.). Filed bySan Francisco Bay Guardian, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2012: # 1 Summons) (ga, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/02/2012)
2012-07-312ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/25/2012. Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/31/12. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
2012-08-033SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. Department of Justice served on 8/3/2012, answer due 8/24/2012. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 8/3/2012) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
2012-08-294NOTICE of Appearance by Brad Prescott Rosenberg (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 8/29/2012) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
2012-08-295STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Pursuant to Civ. L.R. 5-1(i)(3))(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 8/29/2012) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
2012-09-126CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, San Francisco Bay Guardian.. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 9/12/2012) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
2012-09-247CLERKS NOTICE DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO FILE CONSENT OR DECLINATION. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
2012-09-278ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 9/27/2012) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
2012-10-019ANSWER to Complaint byDepartment of Justice. (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 10/1/2012) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
2012-10-0310CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Department of Justice.. (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 10/3/2012) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
2012-10-1011ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 10/10/2012) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
2012-10-1012NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 10/10/2012) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
2012-10-1113ADR Clerk Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 10/19/12 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
2012-10-19ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by HAH on 10/19/12. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
2012-10-2414Certificate of Interested Entities by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, San Francisco Bay Guardian (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 10/24/2012) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
2012-10-2515CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 10/25/2012) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
2012-10-2916CLERKS NOTICE - Case Management Statement due by 1/3/2013. Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2013 10:00 AM. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2012) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
2013-01-0317CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 1/3/2013) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
2013-01-0418ORDER VACATING CMC. Case Management Statement due by 2/21/2013.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/4/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
2013-02-2119JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brad Rosenberg Per LR 5-1(i)(3))(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 2/21/2013) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
2013-02-2220ORDER -Motions due by 6/6/2013. Cross Motions due by 6/27/2013. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2013. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/22/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2013) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
2013-05-1021STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 20 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings filed by Department of Justice. (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 5/10/2013) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
2013-05-1322ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 21 Stipulation Re: Briefing Schedule. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
2013-05-13Set/Reset Hearing re 22 Order on Stipulation Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
2013-05-13Set/Reset Deadlines as to Responses due by 9/5/2013. Replies due by 9/26/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
2013-06-0623MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Department of Justice. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Responses due by 6/27/2013. Replies due by 7/18/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John W. Kornmeier, # 2 Declaration of John E. Cunningham III, # 3 Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 6/6/2013) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
2013-06-0624AMENDED DOCUMENT by Department of Justice. Amendment to 23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Caption Corrected in Proposed Order) . (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 6/6/2013) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
2013-06-2725Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) and Opposition filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Responses due by 7/18/2013. Replies due by 8/8/2013. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 6/27/2013) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
2013-06-2726Declaration of Linda Lye in Support of 25 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) and Opposition filed byAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (part 1 of 2), # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (part 2 of 2), # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 2-6, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits 7-10)(Related document(s) 25 ) (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 6/27/2013) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
2013-06-2827Declaration of Linda Lye in Support of 26 Declaration in Support, Proposed Order filed byAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Related document(s) 26 ) (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 6/28/2013) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
2013-06-2828Proposed Order re 25 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) and Opposition CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 27 by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 6/28/2013) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
2013-07-1029MOTION to Relate Case filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lye, Linda) (Filed on 7/10/2013) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
2013-07-1230RESPONSE (re 29 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed byDepartment of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 7/12/2013) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
2013-07-1731STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 20 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings filed by Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 7/17/2013) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
2013-07-1832ORDER RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Replies due by 7/22/2013. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/18/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
2013-07-2233RESPONSE (re 25 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) and Opposition , 23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byDepartment of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Second) of John Cunningham)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 7/22/2013) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
2013-07-2534ORDER RELATING CASE.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/25/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
2013-07-2935CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to 25 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) and Opposition , 23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2013 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
2013-08-0136STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 35 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,, Requesting Continuance of Hearing Date filed by Department of Justice. (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 8/1/2013) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
2013-08-0137ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting (36) Stipulation to Continue Motion Hearing in case 3:12-cv-04008-MEJ (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
2013-08-01Set/Reset Hearing re (37 in 3:12-cv-04008-MEJ, 9 in 3:13-cv-03127-MEJ) Order on Stipulation Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
2013-08-0838REPLY (re 25 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) and Opposition , 23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 8/8/2013) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
2013-08-0839Declaration of Linda Lye in Support of 38 Reply to Opposition/Response for Partial Summary Judgment filed byAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Related document(s) 38 ) (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 8/8/2013) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
2013-08-1240MOTION Modify Briefing Schedule Regarding Part 1 of FOIA Request re 22 Order on Stipulation (Unopposed) filed by Department of Justice. Responses due by 8/19/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brad P. Rosenberg, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 8/12/2013) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
2013-08-1241ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO MODIFY BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE RE: PART 1 OF PLAINTIFFS' FOIA REQUEST. Motions due by 9/23/2013. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2013.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/12/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
2013-08-24Set/Reset Hearing (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2013) (Entered: 08/24/2013)
2013-09-0542Minute Entry: Hearing held on 9/5/2013 re Cross-motions for Summary Judgment 23 25 . Court takes matters under submission. (FTR Digital Recorder: 10:04am-11:23am.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/5/2013) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
2013-09-2343MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Part 1 of FOIA Request filed by Department of Justice. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Responses due by 10/10/2013. Replies due by 10/24/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patricia J. Kenney, # 2 Declaration (Second) of John W. Kornmeier, # 3 Decision: Jennings v. FBI, # 4 Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 9/23/2013) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
2013-10-0244ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James in case 3:12-cv-04008-MEJ; granting (20) Motion to Stay in case 3:13-cv-03127-MEJ (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
2013-10-1045Consent MOTION to Stay Due to Lapse in Appropriations filed by Department of Justice. Responses due by 10/10/2013. Replies due by 10/10/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 10/10/2013) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
2013-10-1146ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 45 Motion to Stay (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
2013-10-2347JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 10/23/2013) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
2013-10-2548Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Part 1 filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Responses due by 12/5/2013. Replies due by 12/19/2013. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 10/25/2013) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
2013-10-2549Declaration of Linda Lye in Support of 48 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Part 1 filed byAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Related document(s) 48 ) (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 10/25/2013) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
2013-10-2550Proposed Order re 48 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Part 1 by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 10/25/2013) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
2013-11-0451ORDER LIFTING STAY AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 47 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Department of Justice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/4/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
2013-11-0652ORDER SETTING HEARING DATES ON MOTION 43 AND CROSS-MOTION 48 FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR JANUARY 30, 3014. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/6/2013. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
2013-11-06Set/Reset Hearing Motion Hearing [43, 48] set for 1/30/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
2013-11-2753STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 51 Order to Modify Briefing Schedule filed by Department of Justice. (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 11/27/2013) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
2013-11-2754STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 53 Request to Modify Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/27/2013. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
2013-12-1255RESPONSE (re 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Part 1 of FOIA Request , 48 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Part 1 ) filed byDepartment of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Supplemental) of Patricia J. Kenney)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 12/12/2013) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
2013-12-2056REPLY (re 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Part 1 of FOIA Request , 48 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Part 1 ) filed byAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, San Francisco Bay Guardian. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 12/20/2013) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
2014-01-2357ORDER Continuing 1/30/2014 Hearing on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment as to Part 1 of FOIA Request [43, 48]; Resetting hearing date for 2/27/2014. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/23/2014. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
2014-01-2458CLERKS NOTICE DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT OR DECLINATION BY JANUARY 31, 2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2014) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
2014-02-2659NOTICE by Department of Justice of Filing of Second Supplemental Declaration (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Second Supplemental) of Patricia J. Kenney)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 2/26/2014) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
2014-02-2760Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/27/2014 before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James (Date Filed: 2/27/2014). Argument heard, matter submitted. Court will issue Order. (Recording #10:31-10:48; 10:57-11:47.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/27/2014) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
2014-04-24CLERKS NOTICE RE: CHAMBERS COPIES This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this notice The parties are hereby advised that they do not need to submit chambers copies, with the exception of documents that (1) are related to a pending motion and/or discovery dispute and (2) exceed 10 pages when combined. (For example, if there is a 20-page stipulation and proposed order, no chambers copy is required.) For these documents only, the submitting party shall comply with Civil Local Rule 5-1(e)(7). All chambers copies should be double-sided (when possible) and include (1) the ECF running header at the top of each page, and (2) exhibits, if any, that are clearly delineated with tabbed dividers. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
2014-09-3061ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion for Summary Judgment (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
2014-09-3062ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 43 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion for Summary Judgment (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
2014-09-3063ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2014. Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2014 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/30/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
2014-10-2364JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Department of Justice. (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 10/23/2014) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
2014-10-2365ORDER CONTINUING CMC. Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2014. Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2014 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/23/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2014) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
2014-11-2666NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Department of Justice. Appeal of Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment 61 (Appeal fee FEE WAIVED.) (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 11/26/2014) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
2014-12-1267JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Department of Justice. (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 12/12/2014) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
2014-12-1568ORDER CONTINUING CMC: Case Management Statement due by 2/26/2015. Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2015 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/15/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
2015-01-0669USCA Case Number 14-17339 9th Circuit for 66 Notice of Appeal, filed by Department of Justice. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
2015-01-2970ORDER of USCA as to 66 Notice of Appeal filed by Department of Justice (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2015) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
2015-01-3071STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re voluntary dismissal of Pltf SF Bay Guardian filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, San Francisco Bay Guardian. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 1/30/2015) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
2015-02-0272ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 71 Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendant San Francisco Bay Guardian. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
2015-02-1773JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 2/17/2015) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
2015-02-1774ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 73 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Department of Justice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/17/2015. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2015) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
2015-02-17Set/Reset Hearing re 74 Order Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco, before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2015) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
2015-04-0975JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 4/9/2015) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
2015-04-0976ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2015. Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2015 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/9/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2015) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
2015-07-0277MANDATE of USCA as to San Francisco Bay Guardian Only filed by Department of Justice (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2015) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
2015-07-0778CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
2015-07-0879JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 7/8/2015) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
2015-07-0880ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CMC. Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2015. Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2015 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/8/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2015) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
2015-07-0981Please disregard - duplicate order. See Dkt. No. 80. (Entered: 07/09/2015)
2015-08-1982NOTICE by Department of Justice of Filing of Declaration of Patricia J. Kenney in Connection with the Parties' Settlement Agreement as to Part 1 of Plaintiff's FOIA Request (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patricia J. Kenney)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 8/19/2015) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
2015-08-2183STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Partial Dismissal with Prejudice filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 8/21/2015) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
2015-08-2184ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 83 Stipulation of Partial Dismissal with Prejudice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2015) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
2015-08-21Set Deadlines/Hearings: (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2015) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
2015-09-0885ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/8/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2015) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff