Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBroward Bulldog, Inc. et al v. U.S. Department of Justice et al
DistrictSouthern District of Florida
CityFt Lauderdale
Case Number0:2012cv61735
Date Filed2012-09-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge William J. Zloch
PlaintiffBroward Bulldog, Inc. a Florida corporation not for profit
PlaintiffDan Christensen founder, operator and editor of the BrowardBulldog.com website
DefendantU.S. Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation 935 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20535
DefendantSarasota Herald Tribune (Halifax Media Holdings, LLC)
DefendantMiami Herald Media Company
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2012-09-051COMPLAINT to Enforce the Freedom of Information Act against Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 113C-5034481, filed by Broward Bulldog, Inc., Dan Christensen. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s) Federal Bureau of Investigation, # 3 Summon(s) US Department of Justice, # 4 Exhibit 1 - Articles, # 5 Exhibit 2 - Christensen Letter to the FBI, September 26, 2011, # 6 Exhibit 3 - FBI Letter to Christensen, October 6, 2011, # 7 Exhibit 4 - Christensen Letter to FBI, october 27, 2011, # 8 Exhibit 5 - FBI letter to Christensen, November 7, 2011, # 9 Exhibit 6 - Christensen letter to OIP, November 20, 2011, # 10 Exhibit 7 - FBI Letter to Christensen, December 22, 2011, # 11 Exhibit 8 - FBI Letter to Christensen, February 7, 2012, # 12 Exhibit 9 - Christensen's Appealed Letter, February 23, 2012, # 13 Exhibit 10 - OIP Letter to Christensen, May 23, 2012)(Julin, Thomas) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
2012-09-052Judge Assignment to Judge William J. Zloch (ail) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
2012-09-063Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summon(s))(ail) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
2012-09-194ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to 3 Summons Issued as to USA Department of Justice and as to Federal Bureau of Investigatgion Acknowledgment filed by Broward Bulldog, Inc., Dan Christensen. (Julin, Thomas) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
2012-11-195MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint,,,, by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. Responses due by 12/6/2012 (Fernandez, Carole) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
2012-12-036RESPONSE in Opposition re 5 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint,,,, filed by Broward Bulldog, Inc., Dan Christensen. (Julin, Thomas) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
2012-12-137REPLY to Response to Motion re 5 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint,,,, filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Fernandez, Carole) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
2012-12-138STIPULATION of the Parties Regarding Service of the Complaint by Broward Bulldog, Inc., Dan Christensen (Julin, Thomas) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
2012-12-199MOTION for Extension of Time for the Parties to File a Scheduling Conference Report and Proposed Scheduling Order by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. Responses due by 1/5/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fernandez, Carole) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
2013-01-0810ORDER of Instructions. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 1/8/2013. (bc) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
2013-01-0811PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot 9 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 1/8/2013. (bc) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
2013-01-0912Initial Disclosure(s) by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice (Fernandez, Carole) (Entered: 01/09/2013)
2013-01-0913Initial Disclosure(s) by Broward Bulldog, Inc., Dan Christensen (Julin, Thomas) (Entered: 01/09/2013)
2013-01-1614SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Broward Bulldog, Inc., Dan Christensen (Julin, Thomas) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
2013-01-2415ORDER for Pre-Trial Conference. Pretrial Conference set for 7/12/2013 at 9:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William J. Zloch. Pretrial Stipulation due by Noon, 6/28/2013. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 1/24/2013. (bc) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
2013-01-2416ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 1/24/2013. (bc) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
2013-01-2417Order on Trial Instructions. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 1/24/2013. (bc) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
2013-02-0718NOTICE by Broward Bulldog, Inc., Dan Christensen re 16 Order Referring Case to Mediation (Julin, Thomas) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
2013-02-0719Notice of Mediation Hearing Laurie L. Riemer added as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 4/29/2013 10:00 AM (ls)(See Image at DE # 18 ) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
2013-02-0820Clerks Notice to Filer re 18 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#19]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
2013-02-1221Notice of Mediation Hearing before Mediator, Laurie L Riemer filed by Laurie L. Riemer. Mediation Hearing set for 4/29/2013 10:00 AM (Riemer, Laurie) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
2013-03-1422Notification of Ninety Days Expiring by Broward Bulldog, Inc., Dan Christensen re 5 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint,,,, filed by U.S. Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation (Julin, Thomas) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
2013-04-0123Unopposed MOTION Requesting Exemption from Mediation Requirements re 16 Order Referring Case to Mediation by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fernandez, Carole) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
2013-04-1924ORDER granting 23 Motion requesting Exemption from Mediation Requirements. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 4/19/2013. (bc) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
2013-05-1325MOTION for Summary Judgment by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. Responses due by 5/31/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of David M. Hardy, # 2 Exhibit A through Exhibit K to declaration of David M. Hardy)(Fernandez, Carole) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
2013-05-3126MOTION to Strike Hardy Declaration or to Allow Deposition of Hardy and Memorandum of Law by Broward Bulldog, Inc., Dan Christensen. Responses due by 6/17/2013 (Julin, Thomas) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
2013-05-3127MOTION for Vaughn Index and In Camera Review and Memorandum of Law by Broward Bulldog, Inc., Dan Christensen. (Julin, Thomas) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
2013-05-3128RESPONSE in Opposition re 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Broward Bulldog, Inc., Dan Christensen. (Julin, Thomas) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
2013-05-3129Statement of: Undisputed and Disputed Material Facts Relevant to Defendants' Motion for Final Summary Judgment by Broward Bulldog, Inc., Dan Christensen re 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Patrick Gallagher, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Larry Berberich, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Jone Barlow Weist, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Dan Christensen, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Former U.S. Senator Bob Graham, # 6 Exhibit A - To Declaration of Former U.S. Senator Bob Graham, # 7 Exhibit B (Part 1 of 3) - To Declaration of Former U.S. Senator Bob Graham, # 8 Exhibit B (Part 2 of 3) - To Declaration of Former U.S. Senator Bob Graham, # 9 Exhibit B (Part 3 of 3) - To Declaration of Former U.S. Senator Bob Graham)(Julin, Thomas) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
2013-06-1030REPLY to Response to Motion re 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Fernandez, Carole) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
2013-06-1731RESPONSE in Opposition re 26 MOTION to Strike Hardy Declaration or to Allow Deposition of Hardy and Memorandum of Law filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Fernandez, Carole) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
2013-06-1732RESPONSE in Opposition re 27 MOTION for Vaughn Index and In Camera Review and Memorandum of Law filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Fernandez, Carole) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
2013-06-1933MOTION for Protective Order by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Interrogatories, # 2 Request for Production, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Fernandez, Carole) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
2013-06-2634PRETRIAL STIPULATION BY ALL PARTIES by Broward Bulldog, Inc., Dan Christensen (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Schedule A - Plaintiffs' Numbered List of Trial Exhibits & Objections, # 2 Exhibit Schedule B - Defendants' Numbered List of Trial Exhibits & Objections)(Julin, Thomas) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
2013-06-2735REPLY to Response to Motion re 26 MOTION to Strike Hardy Declaration or to Allow Deposition of Hardy and Memorandum of Law filed by Broward Bulldog, Inc., Dan Christensen. (Julin, Thomas) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
2013-06-2736REPLY to Response to Motion re 27 MOTION for Vaughn Index and In Camera Review and Memorandum of Law filed by Broward Bulldog, Inc., Dan Christensen. (Julin, Thomas) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
2013-06-2737NOTICE by Broward Bulldog, Inc., Dan Christensen re 29 Statement,,, of Correction of Typographical Error (Julin, Thomas) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
2013-06-2838ORDER denying 5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 6/28/2013. (bc) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
2013-07-0639RESPONSE in Opposition re 33 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Broward Bulldog, Inc., Dan Christensen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Statement of Glenn A. Fine)(Julin, Thomas) (Entered: 07/06/2013)
2013-07-1140MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 1 Complaint,,,, by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fernandez, Carole) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
2013-07-1141Proposed Findings of Fact and Proposed Conclusions of Law by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Fernandez, Carole) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
2013-07-1142Proposed Findings of Fact and Proposed Conclusions of Law by Broward Bulldog, Inc., Dan Christensen. (Julin, Thomas) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
2013-07-1243Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William J. Zloch: Final Pretrial Conference held on 7/12/2013. Court Reporter: Carl Schanzleh, 954-769-5488 / Carl_Schanzleh@flsd.uscourts.gov (bc) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
2013-07-1644ORDER granting 40 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiffs' Complaint 14 days after Court's ruling on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgement. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 7/16/2013. (bc) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
2013-07-1645ORDER directing Plaintiffs to file Motion re: FOIA request by Noon, 7/19/2013; Defendants shall file its responses by Noon, 8/7/2013 and Plaintiffs shall file their Reply by Noon, 8/14/2013. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 7/16/2013. (bc) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
2013-07-1946Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Additional Search by Broward Bulldog, Inc., Dan Christensen. Responses due by 8/5/2013 (Julin, Thomas) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
2013-08-0747RESPONSE in Opposition re 46 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Additional Search filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Fernandez, Carole) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
2013-08-1448RESPONSE/REPLY to Response to Motion for Additional Search by Broward Bulldog, Inc., Dan Christensen. (Julin, Thomas) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
2013-08-1449REPLY to Response to Motion re 46 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Additional Search Corrected filed by Broward Bulldog, Inc., Dan Christensen. (Julin, Thomas) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
2013-09-1050MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Sarasota Herald Tribune (Halifax Media Holdings, LLC). Attorney Rachel Elise Fugate added to party Sarasota Herald Tribune (Halifax Media Holdings, LLC)(pty:am). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit)(Fugate, Rachel) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
2013-09-1951RESPONSE in Opposition re 50 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Fernandez, Carole) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
2013-09-2752MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Miami Herald Media Company. Attorney Carol Jean LoCicero added to party Miami Herald Media Company(pty:am). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9/11's Lingering Questions)(LoCicero, Carol) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
2013-10-0953RESPONSE in Opposition re 52 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Fernandez, Carole) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
2013-12-0254NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dexter Lee on behalf of Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. Attorney Dexter Lee added to party Federal Bureau of Investigation(pty:dft), Attorney Dexter Lee added to party U.S. Department of Justice(pty:dft). (Lee, Dexter) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
2014-03-1955ORDER granting 50 Motion for Leave to File. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge . The Sarasota Herald Tribune and The Miami Herald have by noon 3/25/2014 to file their Amicus Curiae Briefs Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 3/19/2014. (ots) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
2014-03-2056Defendant's MOTION Request to Remove Counsel by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Lee, Dexter) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
2014-03-2557RESPONSE in Opposition re 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Amicus Curiae filed by Miami Herald Media Company, Sarasota Herald Tribune (Halifax Media Holdings, LLC). Attorney Carol Jean LoCicero added to party Sarasota Herald Tribune (Halifax Media Holdings, LLC)(pty:am). (LoCicero, Carol) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
2014-03-3158ORDER granting 46 Motion to Compel; denying 25 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 26 Motion to Strike ; denying 27 Motion for Vaughn Index and In Camera Review; and granting 33 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 3/31/2014. (bc) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
2014-04-0459ORDER granting 56 Motion to Remove Counsel. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 4/4/2014. (bc) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
2014-04-04Attorney Carole M. Fernandez terminated. (bc) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
2014-04-0460ORDER re 46 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Additional Search. Defendants' Report to Court and Declarations due by Noon, Friday, 6/6/2014. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 4/4/2014. (bc) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
2014-04-1761Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to Make In Camera Submission re 60 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines ( Responses due by 5/5/2014), Defendant's MOTION for Reconsideration re 60 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Second Declaration of David M. Hardy)(Lee, Dexter) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
2014-04-1762NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice re 61 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to Make In Camera Submission re 60 Order, Set/Reset DeadlinesDefendant's MOTION for Reconsideration re 60 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines Regarding Certificate of Conference on Motion for Enlargement of Time to Make In Camera Submission and for Partial Reconsideration (Lee, Dexter) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
2014-04-1863ORDER granting 61 Motion for Extension of Time; denying 61 Motion for Reconsideration. See Order for details. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 04/18/2014. (wjz3) (Main Document 63 replaced on 4/18/2014) (mb). (Entered: 04/18/2014)
2014-04-1864Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 63 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Order on Motion for Reconsideration. Correction Document replaced due to scanning error. (mb) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
2014-04-1865NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paulo R. Lima on behalf of Broward Bulldog, Inc., Dan Christensen. Attorney Paulo R. Lima added to party Broward Bulldog, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Paulo R. Lima added to party Dan Christensen(pty:pla). (Lima, Paulo) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
2014-04-1866NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice of In Camera Filing (Lee, Dexter) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
2014-05-0167NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice of In Camera Filing (Lee, Dexter) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
2014-05-0968NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice of Filing Third Declaration of David M. Hardy (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Third Declaration of David M. Hardy)(Lee, Dexter) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
2014-06-0669NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice of Filing Fourth Declaration of David M. Hardy (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Fourth Declaration of David M. Hardy)(Lee, Dexter) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
2014-06-0670NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice of Filing Fifth Declaration of David M. Hardy, Ex Parte, for In Camera Review (Lee, Dexter) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
2014-06-2771NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice of In Camera Filing (Lee, Dexter) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
2014-06-3072NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice of Filing Material Released on June 27, 2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Material Released to Plaintiff on June 27, 2014)(Lee, Dexter) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
2015-04-2373MOTION Request for Status Conference by Broward Bulldog, Inc., Dan Christensen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. The FBI Protecting the Homeland in the 21st Century, March 25, 2015, # 2 Exhibit 2. Editorial: FBI's Suspicious Behavior, March 29, 2015, # 3 Exhibit 3. FBI: Leads on Sarasota Family Not Substantiated, April 10, 2015, # 4 Exhibit 4. How the FBI is Whitewashing the Saudi Connection to 9/11, April 12, 2015, # 5 Exhibit 5. 9/11 Review Commission Under the FBI's Thumb, April 13, 2015, # 6 Exhibit 6. Florida Ex-Senator Pursues Claims of Saudi Ties to Sept. 11 Attacks, April 13, 2015, # 7 Exhibit 7. Column: 9/11 Claim is Unfounded, April 16, 2015, # 8 Exhibit 8. Column: Did 9/11 Terrorists Get Outside Help, April 17, 2015, # 9 Exhibit 9. Email from Thomas Julin to Dexter Lee, April 3, 2015, # 10 Exhibit 10. Email from Dexter Lee to Thomas Julin, April 9, 2015)(Julin, Thomas) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
2015-05-1174RESPONSE in Opposition re 73 MOTION Request for Status Conference filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. Replies due by 5/21/2015. (Lee, Dexter) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
2015-11-2575NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice of In Camera Filing (Lee, Dexter) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
2016-03-2276PAPERLESS ORDER denying 73 Motion For Status Conference. A Status Conference, if necessary in the future, will be set by separate Order of the Court. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 3/22/2016. (wjz3) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
2016-05-3177Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees by Broward Bulldog, Inc., Dan Christensen. Responses due by 6/17/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Thomas R. Julin)(Julin, Thomas) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
2016-06-0278NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice of In Camera Filing (Lee, Dexter) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
2016-06-1779Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 77 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Dexter) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
2016-06-1780PAPERLESS ORDER granting 79 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants have until noon on Friday, July 1, 2016, to file their response. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 6/17/2016. (wjz1) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
2016-07-0181RESPONSE in Opposition re 77 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. Replies due by 7/11/2016. (Lee, Dexter) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
2016-07-1182NOTICE of Change of Address by Thomas Richard Julin (Julin, Thomas) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
2016-07-1183Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 77 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees by Broward Bulldog, Inc., Dan Christensen. Responses due by 7/28/2016 (Julin, Thomas) Modified Relief/Link on 7/12/2016 (ls). (Entered: 07/11/2016)
2016-07-1284Clerks Notice to Filer re 83 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Fole Reply to Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Interim Attorneys' Fee Award re 81 Response in Opposition to Motion. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
2016-07-1285PAPERLESS ORDER granting 83 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiffs have until noon on Monday, July 18, 2016, to file their reply. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 7/12/2016. (wjz1) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
2016-07-12Reset Deadlines as to 77 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees . Replies due by 7/28/2016. (ls) (per DE #85) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
2016-07-1786REPLY to Response to Motion re 77 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Broward Bulldog, Inc., Dan Christensen. (Julin, Thomas) (Entered: 07/17/2016)
2016-08-0887NOTICE by Broward Bulldog, Inc., Dan Christensen of Declassification of Records that May be Relevant to the Court's In Camera Review of Classified FBI Records (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 07-15-2015 Statement of Director of National Intelligence, # 2 Exhibit The 28 Pages - Part 4 of Joint Congressional Inquiry, # 3 Exhibit 09-01-2005 CIA-FBI Memorandum) (Julin, Thomas) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2017-03-3088ORDER denying 77 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Senior Judge William J. Zloch on 3/30/2017. (bc) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-05-1689NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice of In Camera Filing (Lee, Dexter) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff