Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHiken et al v. Department of Defense et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2006cv02812
Date Filed2006-04-25
Date Closed2012-08-29
JudgeHon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
PlaintiffMarguerite Hiken
PlaintiffMilitary Law Task Force
DefendantDepartment of Defense
DefendantUnited States Central Command
AppealNinth Circuit 13-17073
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [12]
Opinion/Order [42]
Opinion/Order [53]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Marilyn Hall Patel has ruled that the Defense Department has not provided adequate support for its claims concerning the adequacy of the search and its invocation of Exemption 2 (internal practices and procedures) and Exemption 5 (deliberative process privilege) and has instructed the agency to provide documents for in camera review. Patel's ruling comes in a case brought by Marguerite Hiken and the Military Law Task Force to obtain records concerning Rules of Engagement and other guidelines in effect in Iraq during the battle for Fallujah in 2004 and at the time when the vehicle carrying Italian journalist Giuliana Sgrena was fired upon en route to the Baghdad airport in March 2005. The request was sent to CENTCOM, which identified several documents related to ROE and a 964-page investigative report on the Sgrena incident. The ROE were withheld under Exemption 1 (national security) and much of the report was redacted pursuant to Exemption 2, Exemption 3 (other statutes), Exemption 5, and Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). Faulting both the lack of specificity in describing its search and the lack of detail in describing entries in its Vaughn index, Patel indicated that "the lack of specific search terms and the general nature of the description contained in the affidavit in combination with evidence that the results of the search failed to produce responsive documents persuade the court of the need for an in camera review to determine the adequacy of the search." She added that "the index, as currently presented, does not afford either the court itself or plaintiffs the opportunity to challenge the withholding of certain documents. The government has failed to state the specific harms which may result from the release of the document." One of Hiken's arguments for disclosure of more detail from the Sgrena report was that the report had been available on DOD's website and subsequently removed. Hiken argued this constituted a waiver, while the agency claimed the report was posted by mistake. Patel ordered the agency to provide further explanation of its actions regarding "the release of the document' why it was removed from the website; and a comparison of the types of information disclosed in that version of the report with the redacted version provided to plaintiffs." Patel then found that the ROE had been properly classified and withheld. The agency had claimed both the circumvention and trivial prongs of Exemption 2. Hiken argued that information pertaining to routes and unit names had already been made public and release could not circumvent a law or regulation. Patel agreed, noting that "Exemption 2 concerns the likely circumvention of the certain information if disclosed " not the likelihood of harm. Defendants have not explained why disclosure of names of routes or units, which are already in the public domain, would allow for circumvention of this information." But she rejected Hiken's claim that the agency had brought up Exemption 2 too late in the administrative process. Patel pointed out that "plaintiffs' logic would require the court to ignore these documents because they were produced as part of the delayed appeal. Contrary to plaintiffs' assertions, equity does not demand, and the court will not require, defendants to abandon their Exemption 2 argument, which was raised on administrative appeal." She also ordered the agency to supplement its explanation for withholding trivial information, observing that "the purpose of the claimed exemption is rooted in the trivial nature of the information. Providing a more detailed description of trivial information cannot undermine this purpose." However, aside from the route and unit names and the administrative triviata, Patel accepted the agency's Exemption 2 claims. She found the agency had not yet substantiated its claims that disclosure of facts would reveal the agency's deliberative process, noting that "without reviewing the information, it is difficult to determine whether the privilege is appropriately applied to certain facts. . .The court would benefit from an in camera review of the disputed information to determine whether the deliberative process privilege applies." Patel agreed with Hiken that disclosure of the names of individuals involved in the investigation was important, indicating that they were "central to the public understanding of this incident and the conduct of the government. This is especially true if the personnel involved had policy-making or implementation positions." However, she sided with the government on the issue, noting that "as the court owes deference to the national security determinations made by the government, and as plaintiffs have not alleged any corruption or illegality, it concludes that the privacy interests outweigh the interests in disclosure."
Issues: Exemption 2 - Risk of circumvention, Exemption 5 - Privileges - Deliberative process privilege - Deliberative
Opinion/Order [57]
Opinion/Order [58]
Opinion/Order [64]
Opinion/Order [68]
Opinion/Order [71]
Opinion/Order [102]
Opinion/Order [103]
Opinion/Order [107]
Opinion/Order [122]
Opinion/Order [127]
Opinion/Order [131]
Opinion/Order [143]
Opinion/Order [145]
FOIA Project Annotation: The court adopted the magistrate judge's recommendation that Marguerite Hiken receive attorney's fees based on a rate of $200 an hour. Hiken had originally requested that her attorney's be paid their current hourly rate, but the magistrate judge had concluded a $200 per hour rate was more appropriate. The court agreed, noting that because Hiken's only proposal was to pay her attorney's market rates, it was now too late for her to argue that a rate somewhere in between was appropriate.
Issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees - Entitlement - Calculation of award
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2006-04-251COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against Department of Defense, United States Central Command (Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 3384790.). Filed byMarguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2006 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/25/2006)
2006-04-252ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2006. Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2006 04:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2006) (Entered: 04/25/2006)
2006-04-25Summons Issued as to Department of Defense, United States Central Command. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2006) (Entered: 04/25/2006)
2006-04-25CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2006) (Entered: 04/25/2006)
2006-06-273ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 6/27/2006) (Entered: 06/27/2006)
2006-06-274CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force re 3 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b)of discussion of ADR options (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 6/27/2006) (Entered: 06/27/2006)
2006-07-105ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (White, Edward) (Filed on 7/10/2006) (Entered: 07/10/2006)
2006-07-106NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) Stipulation to Bypass ADR Process and Proposed Order (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 7/10/2006) (Entered: 07/10/2006)
2006-07-147Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint byDepartment of Defense, United States Central Command. (White, Edward) (Filed on 7/14/2006) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
2006-07-218Consent MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference filed by Department of Defense, United States Central Command. (White, Edward) (Filed on 7/21/2006) (Entered: 07/21/2006)
2006-07-249JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Marguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 7/24/2006) (Entered: 07/24/2006)
2006-07-2710Letter from Edward H. White Confirming Postponement of and Participation by Telephone in Case Management Conference . (White, Edward) (Filed on 7/27/2006) (Entered: 07/27/2006)
2006-08-1111Joint MOTION Regarding Submission of Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Defense, United States Central Command. (White, Edward) (Filed on 8/11/2006) (Entered: 08/11/2006)
2006-08-2912STIPULATION AND ORDER setting briefing schedules re motions for summary judgment; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 8/28/2006. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2006) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
2006-08-3013CLERK'S NOTICE: Case Management Conference of 9/13/2006 vacated;Motion Hearing reserved for 2/5/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2006) (Entered: 08/30/2006)
2006-10-1714MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Defense, United States Central Command. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2007 02:00 PM. (White, Edward) (Filed on 10/17/2006) (Entered: 10/17/2006)
2006-10-1715Memorandum in Opposition re 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment /Opposition to Motion for Modification of Briefing Schedule, filed byMarguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 10/17/2006) (Entered: 10/17/2006)
2006-10-1816Reply to Opposition re 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed byDepartment of Defense, United States Central Command. (White, Edward) (Filed on 10/18/2006) (Entered: 10/18/2006)
2006-10-2617Memorandum in Opposition Supplemental Opposition to Motion for Modification of Briefing Schedule filed byMarguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 10/26/2006) (Entered: 10/26/2006)
2006-11-0318MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Defense, United States Central Command. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2007 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7)(White, Edward) (Filed on 11/3/2006) (Entered: 11/03/2006)
2006-11-0919ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File summary judgment motions: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment to be filed by 11/3/2006; Plaintiff's Motion/opposition to be filed by 12/1/2006; Defendant's reply/opposition to be filed by 12/29/2006; Plaintiff's reply to be filed by 1/26/2007; Hearing on cross motions to be heard 2:00 pm on 2/12/2007 (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2006) (Entered: 11/09/2006)
2006-12-0120Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Marguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 12/1/2006) (Entered: 12/02/2006)
2006-12-0221EXHIBITS A filed byMarguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 12/2/2006) (Entered: 12/02/2006)
2006-12-0222EXHIBITS A-C filed byMarguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 12/2/2006) (Entered: 12/02/2006)
2006-12-0223EXHIBITS D-F filed byMarguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D# 2 Exhibit E# 3 Exhibit F)(Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 12/2/2006) (Entered: 12/02/2006)
2006-12-0224EXHIBITS G, I, J filed byMarguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G# 2 Exhibit I# 3 Exhibit J)(Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 12/2/2006) (Entered: 12/02/2006)
2006-12-0225EXHIBITS M-N filed byMarguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M# 2 Exhibit N)(Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 12/2/2006) (Entered: 12/02/2006)
2006-12-0226EXHIBITS L.1 filed byMarguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L.1)(Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 12/2/2006) (Entered: 12/02/2006)
2006-12-0227EXHIBITS L.2 filed byMarguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L.2)(Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 12/2/2006) (Entered: 12/02/2006)
2006-12-0228EXHIBITS O, P, Q filed byMarguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit O# 2 Exhibit P# 3 Exhibit Q)(Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 12/2/2006) (Entered: 12/02/2006)
2006-12-0229EXHIBITS R, S filed byMarguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit R# 2 Exhibit S)(Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 12/2/2006) (Entered: 12/02/2006)
2006-12-0230EXHIBITS T filed byMarguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit T)(Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 12/2/2006) (Entered: 12/02/2006)
2006-12-0231EXHIBITS H filed byMarguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H)(Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 12/2/2006) (Entered: 12/02/2006)
2006-12-0232Declaration of Colleen Flynn in Support of 20 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byMarguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Related document(s) 20 ) (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 12/2/2006) (Entered: 12/02/2006)
2006-12-0233EXHIBITS K filed byMarguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K)(Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 12/2/2006) (Entered: 12/02/2006)
2006-12-2034Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Department of Defense, United States Central Command. Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2007 02:00 PM. (White, Edward) (Filed on 12/20/2006) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
2007-01-0535Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byDepartment of Defense, United States Central Command. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(White, Edward) (Filed on 1/5/2007) (Entered: 01/05/2007)
2007-01-0936NOTICE by Department of Defense, United States Central Command of Corrected Filings (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Table of Authorities# 2 Complete Supplemental Ghormley Declaration)(White, Edward) (Filed on 1/9/2007) (Entered: 01/09/2007)
2007-01-1037ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants' Reply/Response due by 1/5/2007. Plaintiff's Reply due by 2/2/2007. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/8/07. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2007) (Entered: 01/10/2007)
2007-01-1638CLERK'S NOTICE - Continuing Motion Hearing. Motion Hearing previously set for 2/12/07 vacated and reset for 2/26/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2007) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
2007-02-0239Reply Memorandum Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Reply filed byMarguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Ps' Rep. & Opp.)(Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 2/2/2007) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
2007-02-0240Declaration of Colleen Flynn in Support of 39 Reply Memorandum, Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Reply filed byMarguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Related document(s) 39 ) (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 2/2/2007) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
2007-02-1441STIPULATION to Permit Defendants to File a Surreply and to Postpone Hearing by Department of Defense, United States Central Command. (White, Edward) (Filed on 2/14/2007) (Entered: 02/14/2007)
2007-02-1642STIPULATION AND ORDER - Defendants permitted to file surreply not to exceed 20 pp., by 3/5/07. Motions Hearing of 2/26/ vacated and reset for 3/26/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 2/15/07. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2007) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
2007-03-0543Brief Defendants' Surreply in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment filed byDepartment of Defense, United States Central Command. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(White, Edward) (Filed on 3/5/2007) (Entered: 03/05/2007)
2007-03-2744Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/26/2007 before the Honorable Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 3/27/2007) re 20 18 cross motions for summary judgment (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/27/2007) (Entered: 03/27/2007)
2007-07-0645MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Department of Defense, United States Central Command. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jaffe, William) (Filed on 7/6/2007) (Entered: 07/06/2007)
2007-07-1146ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 45 Motion to Substitute Attorney; Attorney WIlliam B Jaffe for defendants added; Attorney Edward Hanson White terminated (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2007) (Entered: 07/11/2007)
2007-09-0647AMENDED MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Defense, United States Central Command. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration# 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order re: Summary Judgment)(Jaffe, William) (Filed on 9/6/2007) Modified on 9/18/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/06/2007)
2007-09-1848TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/26/07 before Judge Marilyn H. Patel. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2007) (Entered: 09/18/2007)
2007-09-1849Ex Parte MOTION to Strike 47 defendants' Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Marguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in support of motion to strike)(Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 9/18/2007) Modified on 9/20/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/18/2007)
2007-09-1850NOTICE by Marguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force of Submitted Matter (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 9/18/2007) (Entered: 09/18/2007)
2007-09-2551Memorandum in Opposition re 49 Ex Parte MOTION to Strike defendants' Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment filed byDepartment of Defense, United States Central Command. (Jaffe, William) (Filed on 9/25/2007) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
2007-09-2752CLERKS NOTICE: In case: 3:06-cv-02812-MHP, Hiken et al v. Department of Defense et al, doument number 51 (Document type: Response) was efiled on 9/24/2007at 9:49:13 AM by William Benjamin Jaffe. The efiled document noted here was lost due to a failure of this court's efiling system. If you have not done so already, you are hereby instructed to re-efile your document(s). You do not need to resubmit any paper (courtesy) copies. For your reference, the original docket text that was submitted read: "Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs'; Ex Parte Motion to Strike filed byDepartment of Defense, United States Central Command. (Jaffe, William) (Filed on 9/24/2007)". There will be no PDF document associated with this notice. If you have questions, please contact the case administrator or the ECF Helpdesk at ecfhelpdesk@cand.uscourts.gov. (br, Court Staff) (Filed on 9/27/2007) (Entered: 09/27/2007)
2007-10-0253MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel: Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment is DENIED. Defendants motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The court orders the defendants to produce certain documents described in this order for in camera review and to provide a supplemental declaration in accordance with this order. The production and the declaration shall be submitted within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2007) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
2007-10-2354Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File supplemental declaration filed by Department of Defense, United States Central Command. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order proposed order to extend time to file supplemental declaration)(Jaffe, William) (Filed on 10/23/2007) (Entered: 10/23/2007)
2007-10-2655NOTICE by Department of Defense, United States Central Command Notice of Lodging of Classified Documents Pursuant to the Court's Order dated 9/28/2007 (Jaffe, William) (Filed on 10/26/2007) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
2007-10-2956STIPULATION extending time to comply with the Court's September 28, 2007 order by Department of Defense, United States Central Command. (Jaffe, William) (Filed on 10/29/2007) (Entered: 10/29/2007)
2007-10-3157ORDER DENYING plaintiff's 49 Ex Parte MOTION to Strike defendants' Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment; Plaintiff to file opposition to defendants' supplemental motion not later than 11/16/2007; Replies to be filed not later than 11/23/2007; Motion Hearing reset for 12/10/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/30/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2007) (Entered: 10/31/2007)
2007-10-3158STIPULATION AND ORDER for enlargment of time to and including 11/30/2007 to file supplemental declaration; Compliance with remainder of 9/29/2007 order extended to 10/31/2007; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/30/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2007) (Entered: 10/31/2007)
2007-10-3159NOTICE by Department of Defense, United States Central Command Notice of Compliance with the Court's Sept. 28, 2007 order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Revised Vaughn Index)(Jaffe, William) (Filed on 10/31/2007) (Entered: 10/31/2007)
2007-11-1260Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Marguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 11/12/2007) (Entered: 11/12/2007)
2007-11-2061Reply Memorandum in support of defendants' supplemental motion for summary judgment and in opposition to plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment filed byDepartment of Defense, United States Central Command. (Jaffe, William) (Filed on 11/20/2007) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
2007-11-2662STIPULATION to extend, through 12/14/07, defendants' time to file supplemental declaration by Department of Defense, United States Central Command. (Jaffe, William) (Filed on 11/26/2007) (Entered: 11/26/2007)
2007-11-2763STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date; [Proposed] Order Thereon by Marguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 11/27/2007) (Entered: 11/27/2007)
2007-11-2864STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to and including 12/14/2007 to file supplemental declarations as required by the 9/28/2007 order; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 11/27/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2007) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
2007-11-2965STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING hearing on 60 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment to 1/28/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 11/28/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2007) (Entered: 11/29/2007)
2007-12-1466MOTION Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment re 53 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Strike,,,, MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Defense, United States Central Command. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Revised Vaughn Index, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Maj. Gen. Moore, # 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment)(Jaffe, William) (Filed on 12/14/2007) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
2007-12-2867MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Renewed MSJ (if any) filed by Military Law Task Force. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Counsel)(Kaupp, W.) (Filed on 12/28/2007) (Entered: 12/28/2007)
2008-01-0268STIPULATION AND ORDER modifying briefing schedules as follows: plaintiff's opposition/renewed cross motions due not later than 2/11/2008; Defendant's reply/opposition not later than 3/11/2008; plaintiff's reply not later than 3/25/2008; All motions to be heard on 4/14/2008 at 2:00 pm; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/2/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2008) (Entered: 01/02/2008)
2008-02-1169Memorandum in Opposition to 66 Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Marguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 2/11/2008) Modified on 2/13/2008 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/11/2008)
2008-03-1070Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File defendants' reply and opposition to cross-motion filed by Department of Defense, United States Central Command. Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed order for extension of time to file defendants' reply and opposition to the cross-motion)(Jaffe, William) (Filed on 3/10/2008) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
2008-03-1271ORDER granting consent motion for enlargement of time, to and including 3/17/2008 for defendant to file reply and opposition; Plaintiff's reply to be filed by 3/31/2008; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 3/11/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2008) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
2008-03-1772*** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 73 . *** Reply Memorandum re 66 MOTION Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment re 53 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Strike,,, MOTION Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment re 53 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Strike,,, MOTION Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment re 53 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Strike,,, MOTION for Summary Judgment Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment filed byDepartment of Defense, United States Central Command. (Jaffe, William) (Filed on 3/17/2008) Modified on 3/25/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/17/2008)
2008-03-1873Reply Memorandum in support of defendants' renewed motion for summary judgment and in opposition to pltffs' renewed cross-motion for summary judgment filed byDepartment of Defense, United States Central Command. (Jaffe, William) (Filed on 3/18/2008) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
2008-03-3174Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment filed byMarguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 3/31/2008) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
2008-04-1075CLERK'S NOTICE: Cross-motions Hearing reset for 4/21/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2008) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
2008-04-1176Consent MOTION to Continue hearing date, currently scheduled for 4/21/2008, to be rescheduled on consent to 4/28/2008 filed by Department of Defense, United States Central Command. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Jaffe, William) (Filed on 4/11/2008) (Entered: 04/11/2008)
2008-04-1477STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING on Motions 66 53 60 Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2008 02:00 PM; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 4/11/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2008) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
2008-05-0178Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/28/2008 before Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 5/1/2008) re 60 66 Cross-Motions for summary judgment (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/1/2008) (Entered: 05/01/2008)
2008-07-0379Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-28-08, before Judge Marilyn Hall Patel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Connie Kuhl, Telephone number 415-431-2020. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2008. (ck, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2008) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
2008-09-0980NOTICE by Marguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force Notice of Submitted Matter (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 9/9/2008) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
2008-11-0681NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Joseph C. Folio, III for William Benjamin Jaffe (Folio, Joseph) (Filed on 11/6/2008) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
2008-12-0282Letter from Chris Ford, Esq. Request for Case Status . (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 12/2/2008) (Entered: 12/02/2008)
2010-02-1683Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Marguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas Burke, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Chris Ford, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of W. Gordon Kaupp, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Kenneth Kreuscher, # 5 Affidavit Declaration of Marguerite Hiken, # 6 Affidavit Declaration of Carol A. Sobel, # 7 Proposed Order)(Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 2/16/2010) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
2010-02-1684Declaration of Colleen Flynn in Support of 83 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees filed byMarguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Flynn CV, # 2 Exhibit B - MIWON fee motion, # 3 Exhibit C - MIWON Exh J, # 4 Exhibit D - MIWON Fee Order, # 5 Exhibit E - Time Sheets)(Related document(s) 83 ) (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 2/16/2010) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
2010-03-0585STIPULATION re 83 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees for Order Rescheduling Hearing and an Enlargement of Time by Department of Defense, United States Central Command. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Folio, Joseph) (Filed on 3/5/2010) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
2010-03-0886NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Lily Sara Farel (Farel, Lily) (Filed on 3/8/2010) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
2010-03-08***Deadlines terminated. All deadlines prior to this date removed from system. Future deadlines remain in effect. This is an automatic e-mail message generated by the CM/ECF system. Please DO NOT RESPOND to this e-mail it is purely an administrative utility function. PLEASE DISREGARD (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
2010-03-2587STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULES: Oppositions to be filed by 4/5/2010; RESETTING Hearing on 83 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees for 4/26/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 3/25/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
2010-04-0588Memorandum in Opposition re 83 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees filed byDepartment of Defense, United States Central Command. (Farel, Lily) (Filed on 4/5/2010) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
2010-04-1289Reply to Opposition re 83 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees filed byMarguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 4/12/2010) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
2010-04-2190CLERKS NOTICE submitting plaintiffs' motion for interim fees on the papers; Hearing date of 4/26/2010 vacated. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
2010-06-2391NOTICE by Marguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force Notice of Submitted Matter & Request for Case Status (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 6/23/2010) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
2010-08-2492NOTICE by Marguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force re 83 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Submitted Matter & Request for Case Status (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 8/24/2010) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
2011-07-2593NOTICE by Marguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force NOTICE OF SUBMITTED MATTER (Kaupp, W.) (Filed on 7/25/2011) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
2012-02-0394MEMORANDUM and ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 66 Motion ; granting in part and denying in part 66 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants shall show cause in writing by 02/27/12; plaintiffs shall respond by 03/12/12. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2012) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
2012-02-1095NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Timothy Andrew Johnson (Johnson, Timothy) (Filed on 2/10/2012) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
2012-02-2796RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Department of Defense, United States Central Command . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Major General Karl R. Horst)(Johnson, Timothy) (Filed on 2/27/2012) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
2012-03-1297RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Marguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force . (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 3/12/2012) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
2012-03-1498MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Clarification and Partial Reconsideration filed by Department of Defense, United States Central Command. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Motion for Clarification and Partial Reconsideration, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Proposed Motion: Second Revised Vaughn Index, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Proposed Motion: Revised Redacted Documents, beginning with Document 1, # 5 Exhibit Document 2 and Attachments, # 6 Exhibit Document 3 and Attachments, # 7 Exhibit Document 4 and Attachments, # 8 Exhibit Document 5, # 9 Exhibit Doc. 5 Annexes A-C, # 10 Exhibit Doc. 5 Annex D, # 11 Exhibit Doc. 5 Annex E Part 1, # 12 Exhibit Doc. 5 Annex E Part 2, # 13 Exhibit Doc. 5 Annex E Part 3, # 14 Exhibit Doc. 5 Annex E Part 4, # 15 Exhibit Doc. 5 Annexes F-H, # 16 Exhibit Doc. 5 Annexes I-J, # 17 Exhibit Doc. 5 Annex K Part 1, # 18 Exhibit Doc. 5 Annex K Part 2, # 19 Exhibit Doc. 5 Annex K Part 3, # 20 Exhibit Doc. 5 Annex K Part 4, # 21 Exhibit Doc. 5 Annex K Part 5, # 22 Exhibit Doc. 5 Annex K Part 6, # 23 Exhibit Doc. 5 Annex K Part 7, # 24 Exhibit Doc. 5 Annexes L-M)(Johnson, Timothy) (Filed on 3/14/2012) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
2012-03-1499MOTION to Stay Disclosure Pending Resolution of Show Cause Responses and Defendants' Proposed Motion for Clarification and Partial Reconsideration filed by Department of Defense, United States Central Command. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Marilyn H. Patel. Responses due by 3/28/2012. Replies due by 4/4/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Timothy) (Filed on 3/14/2012) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
2012-03-14100MOTION to Shorten Time for Briefing of Defendants' Motion to Stay or, Alternatively, Motion to Postpone Compliance Date filed by Department of Defense, United States Central Command. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration In Support of Motion, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Proposed Order (Alternative))(Johnson, Timothy) (Filed on 3/14/2012) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
2012-03-15101RESPONSE (re 100 MOTION to Shorten Time for Briefing of Defendants' Motion to Stay or, Alternatively, Motion to Postpone Compliance Date ) filed byMarguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 3/15/2012) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
2012-03-22102ORDER Re Reassignment and Request the Executive Committee reassign the action to Chief Judge Ware. Signed by Judge Marilyn H. Patel on 3/19/2012. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2012) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
2012-03-23103ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. James Ware. Hon. Marilyn H. Patel no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/23/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2012) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
2012-03-26104Emergency MOTION to Stay (Administrative) and Motion to Stay Disclosure Pending Resolution of Show Cause Responses and Defendants' Proposed Motion for Clarification and Reconsideration filed by Department of Defense, United States Central Command. Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Responses due by 4/9/2012. Replies due by 4/16/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (Administrative Stay), # 2 Proposed Order (Stay Pending Resolution))(Johnson, Timothy) (Filed on 3/26/2012) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
2012-03-27105ORDER by Judge James Ware denying as premature 83 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 98 Motion for Leave to File; finding as moot 99 Motion to Stay; finding as moot 100 Motion to Shorten Time; granting 104 Motion to Stay (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
2012-03-27Set/Reset Deadlines as to deadline to file Motion for Clarification is 3/28/12; Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
2012-03-28106MOTION for Reconsideration re 94 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, filed by Department of Defense, United States Central Command. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, Second Revised Vaughn Index, # 3 Exhibit 2, Revised Redacted Documents -- Doc. 1, # 4 Exhibit -- Doc. 2 and Attachments, # 5 Exhibit -- Doc. 3 and Attachments, # 6 Exhibit -- Doc. 4 and Attachments, # 7 Exhibit -- Doc. 5, # 8 Exhibit -- Doc. 5, Annexes A-C, # 9 Exhibit -- Doc. 5, Annex D, # 10 Exhibit -- Doc. 5, Annex E Part 1, # 11 Exhibit -- Doc. 5, Annex E Part 2, # 12 Exhibit -- Doc. 5, Annex E Part 3, # 13 Exhibit -- Doc. 5, Annex E Part 4, # 14 Exhibit -- Doc. 5, Annexes F-H, # 15 Exhibit -- Doc. 5, Annexes I-J, # 16 Exhibit -- Doc. 5, Annex K Part 1, # 17 Exhibit -- Doc. 5, Annex K Part 2, # 18 Exhibit -- Doc. 5, Annex K Part 3, # 19 Exhibit -- Doc. 5, Annex K Part 4, # 20 Exhibit -- Doc. 5, Annex K Part 5, # 21 Exhibit -- Doc. 5, Annex K Part 6, # 22 Exhibit -- Doc. 5, Annex K Part 7, # 23 Exhibit -- Doc. 5, Annexes L-M)(Johnson, Timothy) (Filed on 3/28/2012) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
2012-04-11107ORDER CONTINUING HEARING, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 106 MOTION for Reconsideration re 94 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, . Motion Hearing reset for 5/14/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on 4/9/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2012) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
2012-04-11108RESPONSE (re 106 MOTION for Reconsideration re 94 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, ) Opposition filed byMarguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 4/11/2012) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
2012-04-18109REPLY (re 106 MOTION for Reconsideration re 94 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, ) filed byDepartment of Defense, United States Central Command. (Johnson, Timothy) (Filed on 4/18/2012) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
2012-05-14110Minute Entry: Arguments heard. Matter submitted. Court to issue order. Motion Hearing held on 5/14/2012 before Judge James Ware re 106 MOTION for Reconsideration. (Court Reporter Margo Gurule.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/14/2012) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
2012-05-24111ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 106 Motion for Reconsideration (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2012) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
2012-05-24Set/Reset Deadlines as to 111 ORDER: Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees due by 6/4/2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2012) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
2012-05-25112NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH COURT'S ORDERS by Department of Defense, United States Central Command. (Johnson, Timothy) (Filed on 5/25/2012) Modified on 5/29/2012 (wsn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/25/2012)
2012-06-04113STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Extension for Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date, Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Marguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 6/4/2012) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
2012-06-06114ORDER by Judge James Ware denying 113 Stipulation (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2012) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
2012-06-14115MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Marguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Responses due by 6/28/2012. Replies due by 7/3/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 6/14/2012) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
2012-06-14116Declaration of Colleen Flynn; Chris Ford; Gordon Kaupp; Kenneth Kreuscher in Support of 115 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed byMarguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Declaration)(Related document(s) 115 ) (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 6/14/2012) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
2012-06-14117Declaration of Carol Sobel in Support of 115 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed byMarguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Related document(s) 115 ) (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 6/14/2012) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
2012-06-14118Declaration of Thomas Burke; Marguerite Hiken in Support of 115 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed byMarguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Related document(s) 115 ) (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 6/14/2012) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
2012-06-22119MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Department of Defense, United States Central Command. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration)(Johnson, Timothy) (Filed on 6/22/2012) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
2012-06-26120ORDER by Chief Judge James Ware granting 119 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
2012-06-28121RESPONSE (re 115 MOTION for Attorney Fees ) filed byDepartment of Defense, United States Central Command. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Laffey Matrix)(Johnson, Timothy) (Filed on 6/28/2012) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
2012-07-03122ORDER VACATING HEARING re 115 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on July 3, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
2012-07-03123STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for enlargement of time to file Reply filed by Marguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Colleen Flynn, # 2 Declaration Chris Ford, # 3 Proposed Order)(Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 7/3/2012) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
2012-07-05124REPLY (re 115 MOTION for Attorney Fees ) filed byMarguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 7/5/2012) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
2012-08-21125ORDER by Judge James Ware granting in part and denying in part 115 Motion for Attorney Fees; finding as moot 123 Stipulation (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
2012-08-24126Proposed Order Re Entry of Judgment by Department of Defense, United States Central Command. (Johnson, Timothy) (Filed on 8/24/2012) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
2012-08-29127STIPULATION AND ORDER RE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re 126 Proposed Order filed by United States Central Command, Department of Defense. Signed by Judge James Ware on August 29, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
2012-08-30128STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Payment Deadline filed by Department of Defense, Marguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force, United States Central Command. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Johnson, Timothy) (Filed on 8/30/2012) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
2012-09-24129MOTION to Alter Judgment re: Award of Attorney Fees filed by Marguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Responses due by 10/9/2012. Replies due by 10/16/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 9/24/2012) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
2012-09-24130NOTICE of Change of Address by Colleen Flynn (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 9/24/2012) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
2012-09-25131ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Hon. James Ware no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/25/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012) (Entered: 09/25/2012)
2012-10-09132RESPONSE and [Proposed] Order (re 129 MOTION to Alter Judgment re: Award of Attorney Fees ) filed by Department of Defense, United States Central Command. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Timothy) (Filed on 10/9/2012) Modified on 10/10/2012 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/09/2012)
2012-10-16133REPLY (re 129 MOTION to Alter Judgment re: Award of Attorney Fees ) filed byMarguerite Hiken, Military Law Task Force. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 10/16/2012) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff