Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2004cv01273
Date Filed2004-07-29
Date Closed2005-06-17
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2004-07-291COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Filing fee $ 150.) filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY.(rje, ) (Entered: 07/30/2004)
2004-07-292LCvR 7.1 - CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Center For Public Integrity (rje, ) (Entered: 07/30/2004)
2004-07-29SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (rje, ) (Entered: 07/30/2004)
2004-08-053RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/29/2004, answer due 9/27/2004., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/29/2004, answer due 9/27/2004, SUMMONS Returned Executed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/29/2004, answer due 9/27/2004. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 08/05/2004)
2004-08-234Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gacki, Andrea) (Entered: 08/23/2004)
2004-08-24MINUTE ENTRY: ORDER granting 4 defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by not later than 9/13/2004. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/24/04. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 08/24/2004)
2004-09-135ANSWER to Complaint 1 by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Gacki, Andrea) Modified on 9/16/2004 (lc, ). (Entered: 09/13/2004)
2004-10-066ORDER Parties shall confer and submit, either together or separate, a proposed briefing schedule by not later than October 20, 2004. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/06/2004. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 10/06/2004)
2004-10-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed briefing schedule is due by not later than 10/20/2004. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 10/06/2004)
2004-10-207Joint MOTION for Order Scheduling Dispositive Motions by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/20/2004)
2004-10-228ORDER GRANTING 7 Joint Motion for Order Scheduling Dispositive Motions. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/22/2004. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 10/22/2004)
2004-10-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Dispositive Motions due by not later than 1/7/2005. Plaitniff's Response and Dispositive Motions due by not later than 2/4/2005. Defendant's Reply and Response due by not later than 2/25/2005. Plaintiff's Reply due by not later than 3/11/2005. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 10/22/2004)
2005-01-079Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gacki, Andrea) (Entered: 01/07/2005)
2005-01-07MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 9 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion, it is hereby ORDERED the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall file its dispositive motion by not later than January 14, 2005. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/7/2005. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 01/07/2005)
2005-01-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 1/14/2005. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 01/07/2005)
2005-01-1310Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file dispositive motion by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 01/13/2005)
2005-01-2111Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file dispositive motion by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
2005-01-21MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 11 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions, it is hereby ORDERED the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED defendant shall file a dispositive motion by not later than February 4, 2005. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/21/2005. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
2005-01-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 2/4/2005. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
2005-02-0112Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gacki, Andrea) (Entered: 02/01/2005)
2005-02-02MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 12 defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to file a dispositive motion, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is granted; and it is further ORDERED that defendant shall file a dispositive motion by not later than February 11, 2005. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/2/05. (CK) (Entered: 02/02/2005)
2005-02-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 2/11/2005. (CK) (Entered: 02/02/2005)
2005-02-1113Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file dispositive motion by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 02/11/2005)
2005-02-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 13 defendant's joint scheduling motion for additional extension of time to file a dispositive motion, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that defendant shall file a dispositive motion by not later than February 18, 2005. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/11/2005. (CK) (Entered: 02/11/2005)
2005-02-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 2/18/2005. (CK) (Entered: 02/11/2005)
2005-02-1814Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 02/18/2005)
2005-02-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 14 the joint motion for additional extension of time for filing defendant's dispositive motion, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that defendant shall file a dispositive motion by not later than March 4, 2005. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/22/2005. (CK) (Entered: 02/22/2005)
2005-02-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's dispositive motion due by 3/4/2005. (CK) (Entered: 02/22/2005)
2005-03-0415Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gacki, Andrea) (Entered: 03/04/2005)
2005-03-04MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 15 defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to file a dispositive motion, it is hereby ORDERED that themotion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that defendant shall file a dispositive motion by not later than March 18, 2005; and it is further ORDERED that no further extensions will be granted absent compelling circumstances. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/4/2005. (CK) (Entered: 03/04/2005)
2005-03-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's dispositive motion due by 3/18/2005. No further extensions will be granted absent compelling circumstances. (CK) (Entered: 03/04/2005)
2005-03-1816Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion in the Presence of Compelling Circumstances by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gacki, Andrea) (Entered: 03/18/2005)
2005-03-18MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 16 defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to file a dispositive motion, and defendant's demonstration of compelling circumstances, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that defendant shall file a dispositive motion by not later than May 17, 2005. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/18/2005. (CK) (Entered: 03/18/2005)
2005-03-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's dispositive motion due by 5/17/2005. (CK) (Entered: 03/18/2005)
2005-05-1717STIPULATION by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gacki, Andrea) (Entered: 05/17/2005)
2005-05-1718MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Thomas McIntyre# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gacki, Andrea) (Entered: 05/17/2005)
2005-05-1719MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (see docket entry #18 for document images). (lc, ) (Entered: 05/18/2005)
2005-06-0120Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, 19 for Summary Judgment by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) Modified on 6/2/2005 (lc, ). (Entered: 06/01/2005)
2005-06-09MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 20 plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time to file opposition to motion to dismiss, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is granted; it is further ORDERED that plaintiff's response shall be filed by not later than June 16, 2005; and it is further ORDERED that defendant's reply shall be filed by not later than July 1, 2005.Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/9/2005. (CK) (Entered: 06/09/2005)
2005-06-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response to motion to dismiss due by 6/16/2005. Defendant's reply in support of motion to dismiss due by 7/1/2005. (CK) (Entered: 06/09/2005)
2005-06-1621STIPULATION of Dismissal by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gacki, Andrea) (Entered: 06/16/2005)
2005-06-1722ORDER dismissing case. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/17/2005. (CK) (Entered: 06/17/2005)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff