Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Associated Press v. United States Department of Defense et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2004cv04872
Date Filed2004-06-22
Date Closed2005-01-26
JudgeJudge Harold Baer
PlaintiffThe Associated Press
DefendantUnited States Department of Defense
DefendantDepartment of The Air Force
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2004-06-221COMPLAINT against Department of The Air Force, United States Department of Defense. (Filing Fee $ 150.00, Receipt Number 512583)Document filed by The Associated Press.(laq, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2004 (laq, ). (Entered: 06/23/2004)
2004-06-22SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of The Air Force, United States Department of Defense. (laq, ) (Entered: 06/23/2004)
2004-06-222RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by The Associated Press.(laq, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2004 (laq, ). (Entered: 06/23/2004)
2004-06-22Magistrate Judge Debra Freenan is so designated. (laq, ) (Entered: 06/23/2004)
2004-06-22Case Designated ECF. (laq, ) (Entered: 06/23/2004)
2004-06-243AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Department of The Air Force served on 6/22/2004, answer due 8/23/2004; United States Department of Defense served on 6/22/2004, answer due 8/23/2004. Service was accepted by Office of US Attorney: "PY". Service was made by mail. Document filed by The Associated Press. (Smith, Alia) (Entered: 06/24/2004)
2004-07-164MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by The Associated Press. Return Date set for 7/23/2004. (Smith, Alia) (Entered: 07/16/2004)
2004-07-165MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (Smith, Alia) (Entered: 07/16/2004)
2004-07-166AFFIDAVIT of Pete Yost in Support re: 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-L# 2 Exhibit Exhibits M-S)(Smith, Alia) (Entered: 07/16/2004)
2004-07-237ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer, Jr. from Beth E. Goldman dated 7/20/04. re: granting dfts' requests for an extension of time to answer the complaint in this action until 7/30/04. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 7/23/04) (pl, ) (Entered: 07/23/2004)
2004-07-23Set Answer Due Date purs. to 7 Endorsed Letter as to Department of The Air Force answer due on 7/30/2004; United States Department of Defense answer due on 7/30/2004. (pl, ) (Entered: 07/23/2004)
2004-07-238STIPULATION AND ORDER; that the time for dfts to answer or move with respect to the complaint in this action is hereby extended to 7/30/04. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 7/21/04) (pl, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2004 (pl, ). (Entered: 07/26/2004)
2004-07-23Set Answer Due Date purs. to 8 Stipulation and Order as to Department of The Air Force answer due on 7/30/2004; United States Department of Defense answer due on 7/30/2004. (pl, ) (Entered: 07/26/2004)
2004-07-30Set Answer Due Date purs. to 9 Stipulation and Order, as to Department of The Air Force answer due on 8/10/2004; United States Department of Defense answer due on 8/10/2004. (pl, ) (Entered: 08/05/2004)
2004-08-0312LETTER addressed to David A. Schulz from Ann Sherlock, secretary to Judge Harold Baer dated 8/2/04 re: pretrial conference at 5:20 p.m. on 8/18/04 in room 2230, 500 Pearl Street. (dle, ) (Entered: 08/18/2004)
2004-08-03Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2004 05:20 PM before Judge Harold Baer. (dle, ) (Entered: 08/18/2004)
2004-08-059STIPULATION AND ORDER; that the time for dfts to (1) answer or move with respect to the complaint in this action and (2) respond to plaintiff?s motion for preliminary injunction is hereby extended from 7/30/04, to and including 8/10/04. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 8/5/04) (pl, ) (Entered: 08/05/2004)
2004-08-0510FILING ERROR - DUPLICATED DOCKET ENTRY OF DOC. #9 - STIPULATION AND ORDER: the time for defendants to answer or move with respect to the complaint and respond to plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction is extended to 8/10/04. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 8/5/04) (db, ) Modified on 8/24/2004 (ae, ). (Entered: 08/09/2004)
2004-08-05Set Answer Due Date purs. to 10 Stipulation and Order as to Department of The Air Force answer due on 8/10/2004; United States Department of Defense answer due on 8/10/2004. (db, ) (Entered: 08/09/2004)
2004-08-05Set/Reset Deadlines as to 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 8/10/2004 (db, ) (Entered: 08/09/2004)
2004-08-1611ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer, Jr. from Beth E. Goldman dated 8/12/04 re: the parties joint request for an adjournment of the pretrial conference scheduled for 8/18/04; that 9/9 is fine if I?m not on trial which I understand may not go forward. Call chambers towards the end of August to find out. If not, 9/4, as for time on first September conference date. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 8/13/04) (pl, ) (Entered: 08/16/2004)
2004-08-2413STIPULATION AND ORDER; that in light of dfts' production of 49 pages of material and their sworn representation that these documents constitute a complete set of the documents maintained on microfilm at the Texas State archives pertaining to President Bush's individual military personnel file, plaintiff hereby withdraw its motion for preliminary injunction. The time to answer plaintiff's complaint is hereby extended to a date to be set at the pretrial conference in this case. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 8/18/04) (pl, ) Modified on 8/27/2004 (kg, ). (Entered: 08/24/2004)
2004-09-2014ORDER; that DOD will (1) produce to plaintiff the AP by no later than 9/24/04, subject to the rules, regulations and exemptions of FOIA, and with such redactions as allowed by law, any documents located as a result of the Additional Searches that have not previously been provided to AP, and (2) provide to Plaintiff AP by no later than 9/29/04, a written statement containing a detailed description of the Additional Searches. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 9/15/04) (pl, ) (Entered: 09/20/2004)
2004-10-0415ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer, Jr. from Beth E. Goldman dated 9/29/04 re: Interestingly, my recollection at our conference was that the AP was content with the timetable and I was the one who was troubled. Enough said about that. The government did represent that the information would be made available on 9/29/04. It behooves the government to keep the promisses it makes - to say nothing of other officers of the Court. To move on, the governement will provide by noon 10/4/04 all the information presently in the possession and the balance no later than noon on 10/5/04. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 10/1/04) (db, ) (Entered: 10/06/2004)
2004-12-2016MOTION for Attorney Fees. Document filed by The Associated Press. (Smith, Alia) (Entered: 12/20/2004)
2004-12-2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 16 MOTION for Attorney Fees.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (Smith, Alia) (Entered: 12/20/2004)
2004-12-2018AFFIDAVIT of Pete Yost in Support re: 16 MOTION for Attorney Fees.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - L# 2 Exhibit M - S)(Smith, Alia) (Entered: 12/20/2004)
2004-12-2019AFFIDAVIT of David A. Schulz in Support re: 16 MOTION for Attorney Fees.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 5# 2 Exhibit 6 - 10)(Smith, Alia) (Entered: 12/20/2004)
2005-01-1020ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer from Beth Goldman dated 1/7/05 re: counsel for dfts request the courts approval for the following agreed upon schedule: dfts' opposition papers by 1/13/05; plaintiff's reply by 1/19/05. Fine with me. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 1/10/05) (dle, ) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
2005-01-10Set/Reset Deadlines as to 16 MOTION for Attorney Fees.. Responses due by 1/13/2005 Replies due by 1/19/2005. (dle, ) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
2005-01-2621STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING COSTS, FEES, AND DISMISSAL, This action is hereby dismissed with prejudice, without attorneys' fees, costs or disbursements except as provided in paragraph 2. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 1/21/05) (dt, ) (Entered: 01/27/2005)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff