Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLONG et al v. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2012cv01725
Date Filed2012-10-22
Date Closed2013-07-26
JudgeJudge Ellen S. Huvelle
PlaintiffSUSAN B. LONG
PlaintiffDAVID BURNHAM
DefendantIMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantIMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
500 12th Street, S.W.
Washington, DC 20536
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 Defendant's Answer to Complaint
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2012-10-221COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0090-3108308) filed by SUSAN B. LONG, DAVID BURNHAM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits to complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Nelson, Scott) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
2012-10-22Case Assigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (mmh) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
2012-10-232ELECTRONIC SUMMONS Issued (3) as to IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Consent Notice)(mmh) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
2012-11-093RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/31/2012. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/30/2012. (Nelson, Scott) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
2012-11-094RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/06/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Nelson, Scott) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
2012-11-295Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chambers, Felicia) (Entered: 11/29/2012)
2012-11-30MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: This matter is before the Court pursuant to Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The Court having reviewed the motion and the record in this case finds the motion to be well-taken. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Defendant has until January 7, 2013, in which to serve the response to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on November 30, 2012. (AG) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
2013-01-076Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Chambers, Felicia) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
2013-01-15MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defendant will file a Vaughn index, if applicable, and its motion for summary judgment by March 14, 2013; Plaintiff will file an opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment by May 14, 2013; Defendant will file an opposition and reply by June 14, 2013; Plaintiff will file a reply by July 15, 2013. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on January 15, 2013. (AG) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
2013-01-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 5/14/2013. Response to Cross Motions due by 6/14/2013. Reply to Cross Motions due by 7/15/2013. Summary Judgment motions due by 3/14/2013. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/14/2013. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/14/2013. (gdf) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
2013-03-137Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motion by IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chambers, Felicia) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
2013-03-14MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: Upon consideration of defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to file its motion for summary judgment, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that defendant has until March 22, 2013, in which to file its motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 13, 2013. (AG) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
2013-03-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 3/22/2013. (gdf) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
2013-03-218Unopposed MOTION to Stay the Case by IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chambers, Felicia) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
2013-03-22MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Unopposed Motion to Stay: This matter is before the Court pursuant to Defendant's Unopposed Motion for a Temporary Stay of the Case. The Court having reviewed the motion and the record in this case finds the motion to be well-taken. ACCORDINGLY, the motion is GRANTED. Defendant has until Tuesday, June 25, 2013, to complete the processing of the data that is responsive to plaintiffs' Freedom of Information Act request. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 22, 2013. (AG, ) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
2013-05-159NOTICE of Appearance by Jehan A. Patterson on behalf of DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG (Patterson, Jehan) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
2013-07-18MINUTE ORDER: The stay in this matter having expired on June 25, 2013, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report by July 30, 2013. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 18, 2013. (AG) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
2013-07-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/30/2013. (zmm, ) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
2013-07-2510STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report of the Parties by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG. (Patterson, Jehan) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
2013-07-26MINUTE ORDER re 10 Joint Status Report: Upon consideration of the parties' status report filed on July 25, 2013, stating that the parties "have settled the merits of this case and currently are negotiating the issue of attorney's fees and costs, a process that will require an estimated 45 to 60 days to complete," and with the consent of the parties, it is hereby ORDERED that the above-captioned matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for a period of 60 days from the date of this Order; and it is further ORDERED that after 60 days the matter shall stand as DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE without further Order of the Court, unless, during that 60-day period, either party notifies the Court that additional time is needed. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 26, 2013. (AG) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff