Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGeorgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2012cv03702
Date Filed2012-10-24
Date Closed2015-02-04
JudgeJudge Richard W. Story
PlaintiffGeorgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Georgia
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantImmigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2012-10-241COMPLAINT filed by Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Georgia. Consent form to proceed before U.S. Magistrate and pretrial instructions provided. Filing fee $350 paid; receipt number 113E-4223116. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 10/26/2012)
2012-11-102APPLICATION for Admission of Jessica Karp Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-4256228)by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Georgia. (Shahshahani, Azadeh) (Entered: 11/10/2012)
2012-11-15APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 2 APPLICATION for Admission of Jessica Karp Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-4256228). Attorney Jessica Karp added appearing on behalf of Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights (pb) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
2012-11-163ORDER granting 2 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Jessica Karp for American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Georgia. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/16/2012. (bdb) --Please register at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to receive electronic notification of all activity in your case to comply with Standing Order 04-01.-- (Entered: 11/16/2012)
2012-11-16Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Georgia re 3 Order on Application for Admission PHV for Jessica Karp with notice of requirement. (bdb) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
2012-11-304MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Brief In Support by Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Melaine) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
2012-12-055APPLICATION for Admission of Alina Das Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-4297077)by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Georgia. (Shahshahani, Azadeh) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
2012-12-13APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Alina Das Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-4297077). Attorney Alina Das added appearing on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Georgia, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights (pb) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
2012-12-136ORDER granting 4 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and United States Department of Homeland Security Answer due 2/4/2013 (next business day). Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/12/2012. (bdb) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
2012-12-187ORDER granting 5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Alina Das for American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Georgia, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/18/2012. (bdb) --Please register at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to receive electronic notification of all activity in your case to comply with Standing Order 04-01.-- (Entered: 12/19/2012)
2012-12-19Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security re 7 Order on Application for Admission PHV mailed to Alina Das. (bdb) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
2013-02-018PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER For a Second Enlargement of Time. (Williams, Melaine) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
2013-02-049CONSENT ORDER for a Second Enlargement of Time until 4/6/2013, for Defendant to file an answer or other responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 2/4/13. (cem) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
2013-02-04Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Alina Das re 9 Order. (cem) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
2013-04-0510PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER For Third Enlargement of Time. (Williams, Melaine) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
2013-04-0811CONSENT ORDER for a Third Enlargement of Time until 4/26/2013, for Defendants to file an answer or other responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 4/8/13. (cem) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
2013-04-2612PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER For Fourth Enlargement of Time. (Williams, Melaine) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
2013-04-2913CONSENT ORDER for a Fourth Enlargement of Time until 5/10/2013 to file an answer or other responsive pleading. Plaintiffs have consented to the requested relief on the condition that Defendants, including agency counsel, make themselves available for calls on May 3, 2013, and May 9, 2013, as part of good faith negotiations. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 4/29/2013. (cem) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
2013-05-1014PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER. (Williams, Melaine) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
2013-05-1315CONSENT ORDER for a Fifth Enlargement of Time until 5/17/2013, for Defendants to file an answer or other responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 5/13/2013. (cem) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
2013-06-0516STIPULATION and Order by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Georgia, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Williams, Melaine) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
2013-06-1017STIPULATION AND ORDER Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 6/10/2013. (cem) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
2013-07-2518STATUS REPORT by Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Williams, Melaine) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
2013-08-0119ORDER: As required by the Courts June 10, 2013 Order 17 , the parties submitted a Status Report 18 to the Court on July 25, 2013. In the Status Report, the parties report their progress in producing documents and request additional time. As requested by the parties, the period for briefing in this case will continue to be held in abeyance and the parties shall submit a status update on or before August 30, 2013. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 8/1/2013. (cem) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
2013-08-3020PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER. (Williams, Melaine) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
2013-09-0321CONSENT ORDER for Enlargement of Time until 9/6/2013 for the parties to complete the items the parties agreed to complete. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/3/2013. (cem) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
2013-09-0622PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER for an Enlargement of Time. (Williams, Melaine) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
2013-09-1023CONSENT ORDER for an Enlargement of Time until 9/20/2013 to complete the items the parties agreed to complete by 9/6/2013. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/10/2013. (cem) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
2013-09-2024PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER. (Williams, Melaine) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
2013-09-2425CONSENT ORDER for an Enlargement of Time until 10/04/2013 to complete the items the parties agreed to complete by 9/20/2013. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/24/2013. (cem) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
2013-09-3026PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER. (Williams, Melaine) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
2013-10-0727CONSENT ORDER for an Enlargement of Time until 10/18/2013 to complete the items the parties agreed to complete by 10/04/2013. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 10/7/2013. (cem) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
2013-10-1828PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER for an Enlargement of Time. (Williams, Melaine) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
2013-10-2429CONSENT ORDER for an Enlargement of Time until 11/1/2013 to complete the items the parties agreed to complete by 10/18/2013. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 10/18/13. (ddm) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
2013-11-0130PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER. (Williams, Melaine) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
2013-11-0431CONSENT ORDER for an Enlargement of Time until 11/8/2013 to complete the items the parties agreed to complete by 11/1/2013. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/4/2013. (cem) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
2013-11-1432STIPULATION and Proposed Order by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Georgia, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Williams, Melaine) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
2013-11-1533STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding agreement to produce certain data and records. Agreement to participate in settlement discussions concerning all outstanding issues. Agreement to hold in abeyance further briefing in this case until 5/16/2014, when the parties will submit an update to the Court. Agreement that the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia shall retain jurisdiction over any controversy or claim arising out of or relating to this Stipulation and Order, and any further litigation relating to this case. (See Order for full and complete details.) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/15/2013. (cem) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
2014-05-0234NOTICE Of Filing by Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security of Declaration (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Pineiro Declaration)(Ben-David, Neeli) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
2014-05-0235Joint MOTION for Extension of Time with Brief In Support by Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Ben-David, Neeli) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
2014-05-0636ORDER granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 5/6/2014. (RWS) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
2014-05-0937Joint MOTION for Extension of Time with Brief In Support by Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Ben-David, Neeli) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
2014-05-1338CONSENT ORDER granting 37 Joint Motion Extending Deadlines set forth in the Court's 6/10/2013 17 Order and Stipulations. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 5/13/2014. (See Order for full details.) (cem) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
2014-06-1139NOTICE Of Filing Declaration by Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security re 17 Order (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Ben-David, Neeli) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
2015-01-3040STIPULATION of Dismissal by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Georgia. (Shahshahani, Azadeh) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
2015-02-02Submission of 40 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal, submitted to District Judge Richard W. Story. (cem) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
2015-02-0341STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing the Complaint with prejudice. Defendants agree to pay Plaintiffs the total sum of $30,000.00 in full satisfaction of any and all claims by Plaintiffs in this case, including claims for attorney fees, costs and expenses, in connection with this case. The Parties agree that the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia shall retain jurisdiction over this case solely for the purpose of enforcing the terms of this Stipulation and Order and to conduct such further proceedings and award relief as may be necessary to resolve any breach of this Stipulation and Order by either of the Parties. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 2/3/2015. (cem) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
2015-02-04Civil Case Terminated. (cem) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar