Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHOLLAND v. U.S. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2013cv00185
Date Filed2013-02-12
Date Closed2013-02-26
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffMAX HOLLAND
DefendantU.S. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2013-02-121COMPLAINT against U.S. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0090-3215713) filed by MAX HOLLAND. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
2013-02-122NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bekesha on behalf of MAX HOLLAND (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
2013-02-12Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (ls, ) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
2013-02-123ELECTRONIC SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(ls, ) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
2013-02-134ORDER Establishing Procedures for Filing for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, signed on February 13, 2013. (SM) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
2013-02-225NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of U.S. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
2013-02-266NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MAX HOLLAND (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff