Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleROSENBERG v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2013cv00342
Date Filed2013-03-15
Date Closed2013-07-03
JudgeJudge Gladys Kessler
PlaintiffCAROL ROSENBERG
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2013-03-151COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0090-3251012) filed by CAROL ROSENBERG. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Brown, Jay) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
2013-03-15Case Assigned to Judge Gladys Kessler. (md, ) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
2013-03-182ELECTRONIC SUMMONS Issued (3) as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent, # 2 Consent Form)(md, ) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
2013-03-263RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/19/2013. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/18/2013. (Brown, Jay) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
2013-03-264RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/19/2013. (Brown, Jay) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
2013-03-285RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 3/21/2013 (Brown, Jay) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
2013-04-186NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina Ann Wolfe on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
2013-04-187ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
2013-04-198ORDER setting an Initial Scheduling Conference for May 15, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/19/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
2013-04-19Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/15/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CL, ) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
2013-05-109MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
2013-05-1310ORDER cancelling the Initial Scheduling Conference set for May 15, 2013; the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than June 7, 2013. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/13/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
2013-05-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/7/2013 (CL, ) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
2013-06-0711STATUS REPORT (Joint) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
2013-06-1712ORDER that the Parties' shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than July 8, 2013. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/17/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
2013-06-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/8/2013 (CL, ) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
2013-07-0313STIPULATION of Dismissal by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff