Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2013cv02179
Date Filed2013-04-02
Date Closed2013-05-17
JudgeJudge Richard J. Sullivan
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffJulia Preston
DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2013-04-021COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401064018)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Julia Preston.(mqu) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
2013-04-02SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (mqu) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
2013-04-02Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. (mqu) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
2013-04-02Case Designated ECF. (mqu) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
2013-04-032CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. United States Department of Justice served on 4/3/2013, answer due 4/24/2013. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by The New York Times Company; Julia Preston. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
2013-04-083ORDER: The parties are HEREBY ORDERED to appear for a status conference on Friday, May 17,2013, at 12:15 p.m. in Courtroom 905 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, by Friday, May 3, 2013, at 4:00 p.m., the parties shall submit to the Court a proposed case management plan and scheduling order. SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 5/17/2013 at 12:15 PM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/08/2013) (ama) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
2013-05-064SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court hereby adopts the following Scheduling Order: Defendant's time to answer is adjourned until May 24, 2013. Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment shall be served and filed by June 7, 2013. Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Plaintiffs' motion shall he served and filed by July 2, 2013. Plaintiff's' opposition to Defendant's cross-motion and reply memorandum or law shall be served and filed by July 16, 2013. Defendant's reply memorandum of law shall be served and filed by July 26, 2013. Motions due by 6/7/2013. Cross Motions due by 7/2/2013. Responses due by 7/16/2013. Replies due by 7/26/2013. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/6/2013) (ft) Modified on 5/7/2013 (ft). (Entered: 05/07/2013)
2013-05-06Set/Reset Deadlines: United States Department of Justice answer due 5/24/2013. (ft) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
2013-05-175STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL: The documents produced by DOJ fully settle any and all claims Plaintiffs now have or may hereafter acquire against DOJ or the United States of America ("United States"), or any department, agency, officer, or employee of DOJ and/or the United States, related to or arising out of Plaintiffs' FOIA request at issue in this action. DOJ shall pay to Plaintiffs the sum of $12,000.00 in attorneys' fees and litigation costs, pursuant to 5 U.S.C. § 552(a)(4)(E), which sum Plaintiffs agree to accept as full payment of any attorneys' fees and costs Plaintiffs have incurred or will incur in this action for services performed up to the date of this stipulation and order. This action is hereby dismissed with prejudice, provided that the Court shall retain jurisdiction over any issues that may arise relating to this Stipulation and Order. The parties understand and agree that this Stipulation and Order contains the entire agreement between them, and that no statements, representations, promises, agreements, ornegotiations, oral or otherwise, between the parties or their counsel that are not included herein shall be of any force or effect. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/17/2013) (ama) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff