Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCTR/PUBLIC INTEGRITY v. DOE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2000cv02803
Date Filed2000-11-21
Date Closed2002-03-26
JudgeJudge Henry H. Kennedy
PlaintiffCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2000-11-211COMPLAINT filed by plaintiff CTR/PUBLIC INTEGRITY; exhibits (6) (bm) (Entered: 11/27/2000)
2000-11-21SUMMONS (3) issued to federal party federal defendant DOE , and non-parties: U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (bm) (Entered: 11/27/2000)
2000-12-072RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of summons and complaint executed on 11/24/00 upon federal defendant DOE (tb) (Entered: 12/11/2000)
2000-12-073RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of summons and complaint executed upon U.S. Attorney General on 11/24/00 (tb) (Entered: 12/11/2000)
2000-12-214ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injuctive Relief [1-1] by federal defendant DOE.; Exhibit (1) (hsj) Modified on 12/28/2000 (Entered: 12/28/2000)
2001-01-115ORDER by Judge Henry H. Kennedy : Meet Confer hearing set for 2:15 3/9/01 . (N) (dcn) (Entered: 01/11/2001)
2001-01-196MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT/REPORT PURSUANT TO L.R. 16 filed by plaintiff CTR/PUBLIC INTEGRITY, federal defendant DOE . (td) (Entered: 01/22/2001)
2001-02-21SCHEDULING NOTICE: Meet Confer hearing set for 10:15 3/13/01 . before Judge Henry H. Kennedy . (dcn) (Entered: 02/21/2001)
2001-02-277MOTION filed by federal defendant DOE for protective order barring discovery (dcn) (Entered: 03/01/2001)
2001-02-288MOTION (CONSENT) filed by federal defendant DOE for stay of discovery While defendant's motion for protective order barring discovery is pending. (hsj) (Entered: 03/01/2001)
2001-03-059ORDER by Judge Henry H. Kennedy : granting motion for stay of discovery While defendant's motion for protective order barring discovery is pending. [8-1] by DOE (N) (dcn) (Entered: 03/05/2001)
2001-03-0811STATEMENT filed by plaintiff CTR/PUBLIC INTEGRITY , regarding: the case and its statutory bases. (td) (Entered: 03/14/2001)
2001-03-0812STATEMENT filed by federal defendant DOE , regarding: the case and the statutory basis for its defenses. (td) (Entered: 03/14/2001)
2001-03-1210RESPONSE by plaintiff CTR/PUBLIC INTEGRITY in opposition to motion for protective order barring discovery [7-1] by DOE . (hsj) (Entered: 03/13/2001)
2001-03-13STATUS HEARING before Judge Henry H. Kennedy : taken under advisement by DOE motion for protective order barring discovery [7-1] status hearing set for 11:00 6/8/01 ; Reporter: Dolores Byers (dcn) (Entered: 03/13/2001)
2001-03-1513ORDER by Judge Henry H. Kennedy : referring defendants motion for protective order brring discovery to Magistrate Judge (N) (dcn) (Entered: 03/15/2001)
2001-03-15CASE REFERRED to Mag. Judge Deborah A. Robinson (MJ) for discovery disputes (bcs) (Entered: 03/20/2001)
2001-03-2214REPLY MEMORANDUM by federal defendant DOE in support of motion for protective order barring discovery [7-1] by DOE (hsj) (Entered: 03/23/2001)
2001-05-0215ORDER by Mag. Judge Deborah A. Robinson (MJ) : granting motion for protective order barring discovery [7-1] by DOE (N) (jeb) (Entered: 05/03/2001)
2001-06-08STATUS HEARING before Judge Henry H. Kennedy : status hearing set for 10:00 11/9/01 ; Reporter: Dolores Byers (dcn) (Entered: 06/08/2001)
2001-06-0816ORDER by Judge Henry H. Kennedy : Case assigned to the Standard track (track two). , motion for summary judgment due 7/20/01 ; response to motion for summary judgment due 8/3/01 cross motions due 8/3/01 ; reply motion for summary judgment due 8/17/01 ; response to cross motions due 8/17/01 ; reply to cross motions due 8/31/01 ; (N) (dcn) (Entered: 06/08/2001)
2001-07-2017MOTION filed by federal defendant DOE for summary judgment ; exhibits (20) (cdw) (Entered: 07/23/2001)
2001-08-0318CROSS MOTIONS by plaintiff CTR/PUBLIC INTEGRITY for summary judgment (cdw) (Entered: 08/07/2001)
2001-08-0319RESPONSE by plaintiff CTR/PUBLIC INTEGRITY in opposition to motion for summary judgment [17-1] by DOE (cdw) (Entered: 08/07/2001)
2001-08-1720REPLY by federal defendant DOE in support of motion for summary judgment [17-1] by DOE (cdw) (Entered: 08/21/2001)
2001-08-1721MEMORANDUM by federal defendant DOE in opposition to cross motion for summary judgment [18-1] by CTR/PUBLIC INTEGRITY (cdw) (Entered: 08/21/2001)
2001-08-3122REPLY by plaintiff CTR/PUBLIC INTEGRITY in support of cross motion for summary judgment [18-1] by CTR/PUBLIC INTEGRITY (cdw) (Entered: 09/04/2001)
2001-09-07CASE referral ended Mag. Judge Deborah A. Robinson (MJ) (bh) (Entered: 09/28/2001)
2001-10-10SCHEDULING NOTICE: status hearing reset for 10:30 11/16/01 ; before Judge Henry H. Kennedy . (dcn) (Entered: 10/10/2001)
2001-11-16STATUS HEARING before Judge Henry H. Kennedy : status hearing set for 11:15 4/26/02 ; Reporter: Dolores Byers (dcn) (Entered: 11/21/2001)
2002-03-2623MEMORANDUM by Judge Henry H. Kennedy : (N) (N) (dcn) (Entered: 03/27/2002)
2002-03-2624JUDGMENT by Judge Henry H. Kennedy in favor of plaintiff CTR/PUBLIC INTEGRITY against federal defendant DOE (dcn) (Entered: 03/27/2002)
2002-04-1025MOTION filed by plaintiff CTR/PUBLIC INTEGRITY to extend time to 4/11/02 to file motion for an award of attorneys' fees ; EXHIBIT (MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES) (cdw) (Entered: 04/12/2002)
2002-04-2526MOTION (UNOPPOSED) filed by federal defendant DOE for a stay of fee proceedings , or in the alternative opposition to plaintiff's motion for award of attorneys' fees ; exhibits (1) (cdw) (Entered: 04/29/2002)
2002-04-2929SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL for federal defendant DOE , substituting Serrin Turner for attorney Youngjae Lee for (cdw) (Entered: 05/01/2002)
2002-04-3027ORDER by Judge Henry H. Kennedy: granting motion to extend time to 4/11/02 to file motion for an award of attorneys' fees [25-1] by CTR/PUBLIC INTEGRITY; plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees is accepted for filing out of time. (N) (dam) (Entered: 04/30/2002)
2002-04-3028ORDER by Judge Henry H. Kennedy: granting motion for a stay of fee proceedings [26-1] by DOE (N) (dam) (Entered: 04/30/2002)
2002-05-1730NOTICE OF APPEAL by federal defendant DOE from judgment order [24-1], entered on: 3/27/02. no fees paid - Govt. copies mailed to counsel. (cdw) (Entered: 05/21/2002)
2002-05-21TRANSMITTED PRELIMINARY RECORD on appeal [30-1] by DOE to U.S. Court of Appeals (cdw) (Entered: 05/21/2002)
2002-05-22USCA # 02-5165 assigned for appeal [30-1] by DOE (cdw) (Entered: 05/23/2002)
2002-11-2531CERTIFIED COPY of order filed in USCA dated 11/25/02, on appeal [30-1] , dismissing appeal . USCA # 02-5165 (cp) (Entered: 11/25/2002)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff