Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTAX ANALYSTS v. IRS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2000cv02914
Date Filed2000-12-07
Date Closed2002-08-27
JudgeJudge Ricardo M. Urbina
PlaintiffTAX ANALYSTS
DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2000-12-071COMPLAINT filed by plaintiff TAX ANALYSTS.; exhibits (3) (dam) (Entered: 12/15/2000)
2000-12-07SUMMONS (3) issued to federal party(s) federal defendant IRS, and non-parties: U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (dam) (Entered: 12/15/2000)
2000-12-192RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of summons and complaint executed on 12/12/00 upon federal defendant IRS (td) (Entered: 12/22/2000)
2000-12-193RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of summons and complaint executed upon U.S. Attorney on 12/15/00 (td) (Entered: 12/22/2000)
2001-01-094ANSWER TO COMPLAINT [1-1] by federal defendant IRS . (aet) (Entered: 01/16/2001)
2001-01-10SCHEDULING NOTICE: status hearing set for 9:45 4/26/01 ; before Judge Ricardo M. Urbina Courtroom #12, Fourth Floor (Trial Certification Sheets mailed). (jwd) (Entered: 01/10/2001)
2001-04-205ORDER by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina: vacating status hearing set for 4/26/01 and rescheduling for 1:45 5/23/01 (N) (jwd) (Entered: 04/20/2001)
2001-05-186ORDER by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina: vacating status hearingset for 5/23/01 and rescheduling new status hearing for 9:45 8/14/01 (N) (jwd) (Entered: 05/18/2001)
2001-05-187MOTION (CONSENT) filed by plaintiff TAX ANALYSTS to continue 5/23/01 status conference to 8/14/01 at 9:45 a.m. (aet) (Entered: 05/21/2001)
2001-08-16STATUS HEARING before Judge Ricardo M. Urbina : defendant's dispositive motion due 11/15/01; plaintiff's response to dispositive motion and cross-motion due 12/14/01; defendant's reply to plaintiff's oppositions and dispositive motions due 1/15/02; plaintiff's reply to defendant's opposition motion to plaintiff's cross-motion due 1/30/02 Reporter: William D. McAllister (jwd) (Entered: 08/16/2001)
2001-08-168SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina discovery closes 10/16/01 ; dispositive motions due 11/15/01 ; response to dispositive motions due 12/14/01 ; reply to dispositive motions due 1/15/02; reply on cross motion due 1/30/02 (N) (jwd) (Entered: 08/16/2001)
2001-08-299TRANSCRIPT filed for date(s) of August 16, 2001. Reporter: William D. Mc Allister (td) (Entered: 08/30/2001)
2001-11-1510MOTION filed by federal defendant IRS for summary judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56 ; attachment (1) (td) (Entered: 11/20/2001)
2001-12-1311STATEMENT filed by plaintiff TAX ANALYSTS , regarding: as to which there is no genuine dispute. (td) (Entered: 12/17/2001)
2001-12-1312RESPONSE by plaintiff TAX ANALYSTS to defendant's statement of undisputed material facts [10-1] by IRS (td) (Entered: 12/17/2001)
2001-12-1313CROSS MOTIONS by plaintiff TAX ANALYSTS for summary judgment ; exhibits (1) (aet) (Entered: 12/17/2001)
2002-01-1414REPLY by federal defendant IRS in support of motion for summary judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56 [10-1] by IRS (td) (Entered: 01/17/2002)
2002-01-1415MEMORANDUM by federal defendant IRS in opposition to cross motion for summary judgment [13-1] by TAX ANALYSTS (td) (Entered: 01/17/2002)
2002-02-1216SURREPLY by plaintiff TAX ANALYSTS to response to reply memorandum in support of defendant's motion for summary judgment and in opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment [14-1],[15-1]; (FIAT. Judge Urbina) (td) Modified on 02/13/2002 (Entered: 02/13/2002)
2002-02-2817NOTICE by plaintiff TAX ANALYSTS of pertinent new authority. (td) (Entered: 03/04/2002)
2002-08-2718MEMORANDUM OPINION by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina granting the defendant's motion for summary judgment; denying the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. (N) (jwd) (Entered: 08/27/2002)
2002-08-2719ORDER by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina : denying cross motion for summary judgment [13-1] by TAX ANALYSTS, granting motion for summary judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56 [10-1] by IRS (N) (jwd) (Entered: 08/27/2002)
2002-09-0420NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff TAX ANALYSTS from order [19-1], entered on: 8/27/02. Filing fee of $100.00, docketing fee of $5.00 paid. Copies sent. (aet) (Entered: 09/06/2002)
2002-09-06TRANSMITTED PRELIMINARY RECORD on appeal [20-1] by TAX ANALYSTS to U.S. Court of Appeals (aet) (Entered: 09/06/2002)
2002-09-10USCA # 02-5278 assigned for appeal [20-1] by TAX ANALYSTS (aet) (Entered: 09/12/2002)
2002-11-0721JOINT MOTION by plaintiff TAX ANALYSTS, federal defendant IRS to correct the record ; exhibits (1) (aet) (Entered: 11/12/2002)
2002-11-1322NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by William Aaron Dobrovir representing plaintiff TAX ANALYSTS . New address: PO Box 198 Sperryville VA 22740-0198 (540)987-9114. (aet) (Entered: 11/14/2002)
2002-11-1423ORDER by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina : granting joint motion to correct the record [21-1] by IRS, TAX ANALYSTS (N) (jwd) (Entered: 11/14/2002)
2002-11-1424STIPULATION filed and fiated by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina regarding 34 letter rulings listed in paragraph #3 of stipulation. (Stipulation signed on 10/4/01 and received for processing on 11/14/02) (N) (jwd) (Entered: 11/14/2002)
2002-11-14TRANSMITTED supplemental record on appeal [20-1] by TAX ANALYSTS USCA No.: 02-5278. (aet) (Entered: 11/14/2002)
2004-02-0425MANDATE of USCA reversing the judgment of the District Court as to 20 USCA #02-5278 Notice of Appeal filed by TAX ANALYSTS (cp, ) (Entered: 02/09/2004)
2004-07-0626NOTICE by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE re 25 USCA Mandate Notice of Filing of Agreed Judgment Order (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gibson, Stuart) (Entered: 07/06/2004)
2004-08-0927JUDGMENT ORDER Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on August 9, 2004 entered pursuant to the mandate issued on January 30, 2004, by the United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit.(jwd) (Entered: 08/09/2004)
2004-08-10Transmission of Judgment Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals (td, ) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
2004-10-2828Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 27 Order by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gibson, Stuart) (Entered: 10/28/2004)
2004-10-2929ORDER granting 28 defendant's Motion to Amend/Correct the Judgment Order filed on 8/9/2004; amending the Judgment Order to read as follows: 6. No later than 1/31/2005, the parties shall submit to this Court a proposed supplemental judgment order, specifying a schedule of redaction, notice and release for public inspection of EO denial and revocation letters issued with respect to ruling requests submitted after 11/1/1976 and dated before 12/3/2003. The proposed supplemental judgment order will provide for the processing of such rulings in staggered batches, e.g. a certain number by a certain date (or according to any other system the parties agree to); will provide that notice will be mailed to the address listed on the IDRS Master File database for each affected organization, and will provide for opening them to public inspection as outlined in paragraph 3 of the Judgment Order filed 8/9/2004 . Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 10/29/2004. (bm) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
2005-01-2430STIPULATION re 29 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,, Supplemental Judgment Order by TAX ANALYSTS, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Katinsky, David) (Entered: 01/24/2005)
2005-01-2431SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT ORDER Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on January 24, 2005. (jwd) (Entered: 01/24/2005)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff