Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDet Free Press v. Dept Justice
DistrictEastern District of Michigan
CityDetroit
Case Number2:2001cv70024
Date Filed2001-01-02
Date Closed2002-09-26
JudgeDistrict Judge Victoria A. Roberts
PlaintiffDetroit Free Press
DefendantDepartment of Justice
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2001-01-021COMPLAINT with exhibits - Receipt #410987 - Date Fee Received: 1/2/01 (kg) (Entered: 01/05/2001)
2001-01-232SUMMONS returned executed by certified mail on Attorney General on 1/8/01 - (cm) (Entered: 01/24/2001)
2001-01-233SUMMONS returned executed by certified mail on US Attorney on 1/5/01 (cm) (Entered: 01/24/2001)
2001-02-074ANSWER by defendant Dept Justice to complaint [1-1] with exhibits and proof of mailing (kg) (Entered: 02/08/2001)
2001-02-085NOTICE by the court of setting FRCP 16(b) status and scheduling conference for 10:30 3/20/01 with proof of mailing (nh) (Entered: 02/09/2001)
2001-03-066DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) (at) (Entered: 03/07/2001)
2001-03-217ORDER by Judge Victoria A. Roberts, setting deadline for US Dept of Justice for filing motion for summary judgment for 6/29/01 [EOD Date 3/22/01] (cm) (Entered: 03/22/2001)
2001-06-298MOTION by defendant for summary judgment with brief, exhibits and proof of mailing (cm) (Entered: 07/02/2001)
2001-07-249ORDER by Judge Victoria A. Roberts with stipulation, setting deadline for response to motion for summary judgment by Dept Justice [8-1] for 8/15/01 , setting deadline for reply to response to motion for summary judgment by Dept Justice [8-1] for 8/31/01 [EOD Date: 7/30/01] (lg) (Entered: 07/30/2001)
2001-08-1010NOTICE by Judge Victoria Roberts' chambers of setting hearing on motion for summary judgment by Dept Justice [8-1] for 3:00 on 9/18/01 ; proof of mailing (jg) (Entered: 08/14/2001)
2001-08-1511RESPONSE (Brief) by plaintiff, Det Free Press, in opposition to motion for summary judgment by Dept Justice [8-1] with attachments A-B and proof of mailing (jg) (Entered: 08/16/2001)
2001-08-3012REPLY by defendant Dept Justice to response to motion for summary judgment by Dept Justice [8-1] with attachment and proof of mailing (kg) (Entered: 08/31/2001)
2001-09-1213LETTER setting hearing on motion for summary judgment by Dept Justice [8-1] for 11:00 10/3/01 (cm) (Entered: 09/14/2001)
2001-10-03MOTION hearing held on motion for summary judgment by Dept Justice [8-1] - disposition: Taken Under Advisement - Judge Victoria A. Roberts - Court Reporter: Janice (cp) (Entered: 01/09/2002)
2001-11-2114OPINION and order by Judge Victoria A. Roberts, that the Government produce the docuemtns for in camera review and the Vaughn index by 2/21/02 [EOD Date: 11/26/01] (lg) (Entered: 11/26/2001)
2001-12-1015MOTION by defendant Dept Justice for rehearing or reconsideration of order that the Government produce the docuemtns for in camera review and the Vaughn index by 2/21/02 [14-1] with brief, exhibit A and proof of mailing (jg) (Entered: 12/11/2001)
2001-12-1916MOTION by plaintiff for leave to file a response to defendant's motion for rehearing or reconsideration with brief and attached response (LS) (Entered: 12/27/2001)
2001-12-2617ORDER by Judge Victoria A. Roberts granting motion for leave to file a response to defendant's motion for or reconsideration by Det Free Press [16-1] and setting deadline for reply to response to motion for rehearing or reconsideration of order that the Government produce the docuemtns for in camera review and the Vaughn index by 2/21/02 [14-1] by Dept Justice [15-1] for 1/10/02 [EOD Date 1/3/02] (RH) (Entered: 01/03/2002)
2002-01-0218RESPONSE by plaintiff to motion for rehearing or reconsideration of order that the Government produce the docuemtns for in camera review and the Vaughn index by 2/21/02 [14-1] by Dept Justice [15-1] with exhibits A-C, and proof of mailing. (PP) (Entered: 01/04/2002)
2002-01-1020REPLY brief by Dept Justice to response to motion for rehearing or reconsideration of order that the Government produce the docuemtns for in camera review and the Vaughn index by 2/21/02 [14-1] by Dept Justice [15-1] with proof of mailing (lg) (Entered: 01/11/2002)
2002-01-1621ORDER by Judge Victoria A. Roberts denying motion for rehearing or reconsideration of order that the Government produce the docuemtns for in camera review and the Vaughn index by 2/21/02 [14-1] by Dept Justice [15-1]; with proof of mailing [EOD Date 1/17/02] (dp) (Entered: 01/17/2002)
2002-02-1222ORDER by Judge Victoria A. Roberts with stipulation, extending time to comply with 11/21/01 order and to file motion for parital summary judgment and to open America stay , and setting deadline for 3/28/02 [EOD Date: 2/13/02] (cm) (Entered: 02/13/2002)
2002-03-2823MOTION by defendant Dept Justice for partial summary judgment and for open America stay ; with brief, exhibits 1-2 and proof of mailing (dp) (Entered: 04/01/2002)
2002-04-1624ORDER by Judge Victoria A. Roberts with stipulation staying motion for partial summary judgment [23-1], and for open America stay by Dept Justice [23-2], setting civil status conference for 10:00 7/15/02 [EOD Date: 4/17/02] (cm) (Entered: 04/17/2002)
2002-04-1725THIRD DECLARATION of Scott A. Hodes filed by defendant Dept Justice in further support of defendant's motion for partial summary judgment & for Open America Stay (#23 3/28/02) with notice of filing and proof of mailing (DT) (Entered: 04/18/2002)
2002-04-1926ORDER by Judge Victoria A. Roberts with stipulation, setting deadline for response to motion for partial judgment by Dept Justice [23-1] for 5/3/02 and setting deadline for reply to response to motion for partial summary judgment by Dept Justice [23-1] for 5/17/02 [EOD Date: 4/22/02] (lg) (Entered: 04/22/2002)
2002-04-1927PROOF of service of [26-1], [26-2], [26-3] by mail (lg) (Entered: 04/22/2002)
2002-04-2528PROOF of service by Det Free Press of stipulated order by mail (lg) (Entered: 04/26/2002)
2002-05-0329RESPONSE by plaintiff to motion for partial summary judgment [23-1], and for open America stay by Dept Justice [23-2] wit exhibits A-O and proof of service (cm) (Entered: 05/06/2002)
2002-05-1730REPLY by defendant to response to motion for partial summary judgment [23-1], and for open America stay by Dept Justice [23-2] with attachment and proof of service (cm) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
2002-07-15STATUS conference held - Judge Victoria A. Roberts (cp) (Entered: 07/18/2002)
2002-09-2631ORDER by Judge Nancy G. Edmunds with stipulation dismissing the case without prejudice and without costs, but with attorneys' fees pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 552(a)(4)(E) in the amount of $45,000.00 [EOD Date: 9/30/02] (dp) (Entered: 09/30/2002)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff