Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAL-FAYED, et al v. CIA, et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2001cv00046
Date Filed2001-01-10
Date Closed2004-01-08
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffMOHAMED AL-FAYED
PlaintiffPUNCH LIMITED
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantNATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantIMMIGRATION & NATURALIZATION SERVICE
TERMINATED: 03/18/2002
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2001-01-101COMPLAINT filed by plaintiffs MOHAMED AL-FAYED, and PUNCH LIMITED (bm) (Entered: 01/11/2001)
2001-01-10SUMMONS (10) issued to federal party(s) federal defendants CIA, NSA, DOD, DOJ, EXEC. OFFICE/US ATTY, DOS, FBI, INS , and non-parties: U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (bm) (Entered: 01/11/2001)
2001-01-102NOTIFICATION OF RELATED CASE: Case related to Case No(s): CA 00-2092 (bm) (Entered: 01/11/2001)
2001-01-103LCvR 26.1 Certificate of disclosure of corporate affiliations and financial interests by plaintiff PUNCH LIMITED (bm) (Entered: 01/11/2001)
2001-02-124ANSWER TO COMPLAINT [1-1] by federal defendants (cdw) (Entered: 02/13/2001)
2001-03-025ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly :for Initial Scheduling Conference hearing set for 9:30 3/22/01 . (N) (dot) (Entered: 03/05/2001)
2001-03-206MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT/REPORT PURSUANT TO L.R. 16 filed by plaintiffs, federal defendants (cdw) (Entered: 03/21/2001)
2001-03-22MEET AND CONFER STATUS HEARING before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly :defendant agencies EOUSA, DOD, and INS dispositive motions due 6/29/01; oppositions due 7/20/01; replies due 8/3/01; defendant agencies DOJ dispositive motions due 8/17/01; oppositions due 8/31/01; replies due 9/14/01; the FBI to file schedule with the Court by 4/6/01; defendant agencies DOS, CIA, and NSA to file motion of an Open America stay by 5/20/01; Reporter: Edward Hawkins (dot) (Entered: 03/23/2001)
2001-03-237ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly :dispositive motions relating to defendant agencies EOUSA, DOD, and INS: cross motions due 6/29/01 ; response to cross motions due 7/10/01 ; reply to cross motions due 8/3/01. Dispositive motions relating to defendant agencies DOJ criminal division, DOJ office of information and privacy: cross motion due 8/17/01; oppositions due 8/31/01; replies due 9/14/01; the FBI shall file a schedule with the Court by 4/6/01. If appropriate, defendant agencies DOS, CIA, and NSA shall file their motions of an Open America stay by 5/20/01. (N) (dot) (Entered: 03/23/2001)
2001-04-068REPORT by federal defendant FBI (cjp) (Entered: 04/16/2001)
2001-05-219MOTION filed by federal defendant CIA, federal defendant NSA, federal defendant DOS for an open America stay ; Attachment (1), Exhibits (14) (hsj) (Entered: 05/22/2001)
2001-06-0710ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : granting plaintiffs' consent motion for extension of time to subit responsive pleading to 6/11/01; defendants' reply is due 6/25/01. (N) (dot) (Entered: 06/07/2001)
2001-06-1211MOTION filed by plaintiffs MOHAMED AL-FAYED, and PUNCH LIMITED to extend time to 6/12/01 in which to file their opposition to motion for an Open America Stay ; attachments (15) BULKY PLEADING (bm) (Entered: 06/13/2001)
2001-06-1412ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : granting nunc pro tunc motion to extend time to 6/12/01 in which to file their opposition to motion for an Open America Stay [11-1] by PUNCH LIMITED, MOHAMED AL-FAYED. Plaintiffs' responsive pleading is due 6/12/01, and defendants' reply is due 6/26/01. (N) (dot) (Entered: 06/14/2001)
2001-06-2613REPLY by federal defendants CIA, NSA, DOS, federal defendant FBI in support of motion for an open America stay [9-1] by DOS, NSA, CIA; exhibits (3) (cdw) (Entered: 06/27/2001)
2001-06-2714MOTION (CONSENT) filed by federal defendant DOD, federal defendant INS to extend time for filing their dispositive motions (cdw) (Entered: 06/28/2001)
2001-06-2815ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: granting motion to extend time for filing their dispositive motions [14-1] by INS, DOD dispositive motions due by 8/17/01; response to dispositive motions due by 8/31/01; reply to dispositive motions due by 9/14/01; (N) (dam) (Entered: 06/28/2001)
2001-06-2916MOTION filed by federal defendant EXEC. OFFICE/US ATTY for summary judgment ; exhibits (5), declarations (1) (cdw) Modified on 07/02/2001 (Entered: 07/02/2001)
2001-07-3117STATEMENT filed by plaintiff MOHAMED AL-FAYED, plaintiff PUNCH LIMITED , regarding: notice of position with respect to defendant EOUSA (cdw) (Entered: 08/02/2001)
2001-08-0718ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : granting motion for summary judgment [16-1] by EXEC. OFFICE/US ATTY (N) (dot) (Entered: 08/07/2001)
2001-08-1719MOTION filed by federal defendant DOD, federal defendant DOJ, federal defendant INS for summary judgment ; exhibits (7) (cdw) (Entered: 08/21/2001)
2001-08-3020MEMORANDUM OPINION by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly (N) (dot) (Entered: 08/30/2001)
2001-08-3021ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : granting motion for an open America stay [9-1] by DOS, NSA, CIA. That proceedings against the DOS are stayed throught 4/25/02. That roceedings against the CIA are stayed through 12/20/02. That proceedings against the NSA are stayed through 4/20/02. Defendants DOS, CIA, and NSA shall file status reports with the Court every ninety (90) days indicating and their progress in processing plaintiffs' request. Defendant FBI's motion for an Open America Stay is denied. Defendant FBI shall file its Vaughn index not later than September 24, 2001 (N) (dot) (Entered: 08/30/2001)
2001-09-0522MOTION (CONSENT) filed by plaintiff MOHAMED AL-FAYED, plaintiff PUNCH LIMITED for extension of time in which to submit responsive pleading (cdw) (Entered: 09/06/2001)
2001-09-0723ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : granting nunc pro tunc motion for extension of time in which to submit responsive [22-1] by PUNCH LIMITED, MOHAMED AL-FAYED. Plaintiffs' responsive pleading is due on or before Friday, September 7, 2001, and defendants' reply is due on or before Friday, September 21, 2001. (N) (dot) (Entered: 09/07/2001)
2001-09-0724RESPONSE by plaintiff MOHAMED AL-FAYED, plaintiff PUNCH LIMITED in opposition to motion for summary judgment [19-1] by INS, DOJ, DOD; declarations (1) (cdw) (Entered: 09/10/2001)
2001-09-2125REPLY by federal defendant DOJ in support of motion for summary judgment [19-1] by INS, DOJ, DOD (cdw) (Entered: 09/25/2001)
2001-09-2426MOTION filed by federal defendant FBI for summary judgment ; declarations (2), exhibits (2) (cdw) (Entered: 09/26/2001)
2001-11-2127ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : granting motion for summary judgment [26-1] by FBI (N) (dot) (Entered: 11/21/2001)
2001-11-2928OPEN AMERICA STATUS REPORT by federal defendant CIA, federal defendant NSA, federal defendant DOS (cdw) (Entered: 11/30/2001)
2002-03-0129OPEN AMERICA STATUS REPORT by federal defendants CIA, NSA, and DOS (bm) (Entered: 03/05/2002)
2002-03-1830MEMORANDUM OPINION by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly (N) (dot) (Entered: 03/18/2002)
2002-03-1831ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : granting motion for summary judgment [19-1] by INS. Dismissing as to federal defendant INS. Granting defendant DOD and DOJ-OIP's motion for partial summary judgment [#19]. Defendant DOJ-Crim's motion for summary judgment is granted in part and denied without prejudice in part. Defendant shall file a declaration in support of its assecertion of Exemption 7(A) as the letter attachement to Item 35 not later thant April 1, 2002. (N) (dot) (Entered: 03/18/2002)
2002-03-2732MOTION (CONSENT) filed by federal defendant DOJ to extend time to 4/15/02 to serve its supplemental declaration in response to Court's memeorandum opinion and order of 3/18/02 (cdw) (Entered: 03/29/2002)
2002-04-0233ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : granting motion to extend time to 4/15/02 to serve its supplemental declaration in response to Court's memeorandum opinion and order of 3/18/02 [32-1] by DOJ (N) (dot) (Entered: 04/02/2002)
2002-04-1934MOTION filed by federal defendant NSA to extend time to for an additional six weeks to complete processing of plaintiffs FOIA request (bcs) (Entered: 04/23/2002)
2002-04-1935MOTION filed by plaintiff to extend time to 5/31/02 to file their responsive brief to the Department of Justices Criminal Divisions renewed motion for partial summary judgment (bcs) (Entered: 04/23/2002)
2002-04-2936ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : granting motion to extend time to for an additional six weeks to complete processing of plaintiffs FOIA request [34-1] by NSA; NSA shall produce the requested records or file a dispositive motion on or before 6/3/02; (N) (tth) (Entered: 04/29/2002)
2002-04-2937ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : granting motion to extend time to 5/31/02 to file their responsive brief to the Department of Justices Criminal Divisions renewed motion for partial summary judgment [35-1] by PUNCH LIMITED, MOHAMED AL-FAYED response to renewed motion for partial summary judgment due 5/31/02; (N) (tth) (Entered: 04/29/2002)
2002-06-0339STATUS REPORT by federal defendant CIA, federal defendant NSA, federal defendant DOS (aet) (Entered: 06/06/2002)
2002-06-0438MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : defendant DOJ-Crim's Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment granted. (N) (dot) (Entered: 06/04/2002)
2002-09-0340STATUS REPORT by federal defendant CIA, federal defendant NSA, federal defendant DOS (aet) (Entered: 09/04/2002)
2002-09-0941NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Mark Steven Zaid representing plaintiff MOHAMED AL-FAYED, plaintiff PUNCH LIMITED . New address: Krieger & Zaid (The National Security Law Group), 21st Street, NW, Suite 800, Washington, DC 20036 202-223-4050. (mpt) (Entered: 09/12/2002)
2002-11-2643NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Diane Kelleher representing federal defendant. New address: US Department of Justice P.O. Box 883 Washington DC 20044 (202) 514-4775. (aet) (Entered: 12/06/2002)
2002-12-0342STATUS REPORT by federal defendant CIA, federal defendant NSA, federal defendant DOS pursuant to Order dated 8/30/01 (aet) (Entered: 12/04/2002)
2002-12-2045MOTION (UNOPPOSED) filed by federal defendant CIA for extention of open America stay to allow additional time to complete the processing of plaintiff's FOIA request (cp) (Entered: 01/08/2003)
2003-01-0346MOTION (UNOPPOSED) filed by federal defendant CIA to modify Court's order of 12/27/02 ; attachments (aet) Modified on 01/09/2003 (Entered: 01/09/2003)
2003-01-0744ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : granting the CIA's unopposed motion to revise order. Granting the CIA's unopposed motion for extension of Open America stay. A joint status report shallb e filed by the plaintiffs and CIA no later than 1/31/03. (N) (dot) (Entered: 01/08/2003)
2003-01-3147JOINT STATUS REPORT by plaintiffs, and federal defendants (bm) (Entered: 02/04/2003)
2003-02-2848MOTION filed by federal defendant CIA for partial summary judgment ; attachments (6) (bm) (Entered: 03/07/2003)
2003-03-0349STATUS REPORT by federal defendants CIA, NSA, and DOS (bm) (Entered: 03/07/2003)
2003-03-2150MOTION filed by plaintiffs MOHAMED AL-FAYED, and PUNCH LIMITED to extend time to 4/14/03 in which to file their opposition to CIA's motion for partial summary judgment (bm) (Entered: 03/26/2003)
2003-03-3151ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : granting motion to extend time to 4/14/03 in which to file their opposition to CIA's motion for partial summary judgment [50-1] by PUNCH LIMITED, MOHAMED AL-FAYED. Plaintiffs' responsive pleading is due Monday, April 14, 2003. (N) (dot) (Entered: 04/01/2003)
2003-04-1152MOTION filed by plaintiff MOHAMED AL-FAYED, plaintiff PUNCH LIMITED to extend time to 4/18/03 to submit responsive pleading (nmr) (Entered: 04/14/2003)
2003-04-1853RESPONSE by plaintiff MOHAMED AL-FAYED, plaintiff PUNCH LIMITED in opposition to motion for partial summary judgment [48-1] by CIA.; exhibit (1) (aet) (Entered: 04/22/2003)
2003-04-1854NOTICE OF FILING by plaintiff MOHAMED AL-FAYED, plaintiff PUNCH LIMITED of seperate statement of material facts as to which there is no genuine issue necessary to be litigated (aet) (Entered: 04/23/2003)
2003-04-2255ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : granting nunc pro tunc motion to extend time to 4/18/03 to submit responsive pleading [52-1] by PUNCH LIMITED, MOHAMED AL-FAYED (N) (dot) (Entered: 04/23/2003)
2003-04-2356MOTION filed by federal defendant CIA to clarify the docket ; exhibits (1) (aet) (Entered: 04/24/2003)
2003-04-2457MOTION (CONSENT) filed by federal defendant CIA to extend time to 5/9/03 in which to serve its reply brief in support of its motion for partial summary judgment (aet) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
2003-04-2958ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : granting motion to extend time to 5/9/03 in which to serve its reply brief in support of its motion for partial summary judgment [57-1] by CIA (N) (dot) (Entered: 04/30/2003)
2003-05-0259NOTICE OF FILING by plaintiffs MOHAMED AL-FAYED, and PUNCH LIMITED of signed declaration page of Robert James Fallowfield (bm) (Entered: 05/05/2003)
2003-05-0960REPLY by federal defendants in further support of CIA'S motion for partial summary judgment [48-1]; attachment (1) (td) Modified on 05/13/2003 (Entered: 05/13/2003)
2003-06-0361STATUS REPORT by federal defendant CIA, federal defendant NSA, federal defendant DOS pursuant to Court Order dted 8/30/01 (aet) Modified on 06/06/2003 (Entered: 06/06/2003)
2003-07-0362NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Mark Steven Zaid representing plaintiff MOHAMED AL-FAYED, plaintiff PUNCH LIMITED . New address: KRIEGER & ZAID 1747 Pennsylvania Ave., NW, Washington DC 20006 (202) 454-2809. (aet) (Entered: 07/07/2003)
2003-09-0463STATUS REPORT by federal defendant CIA, federal defendant NSA, federal defendant DOS (zz) (Entered: 09/09/2003)
2003-09-3064MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : denying without prejudice motion for partial summary judgment [48-1] by CIA. Should defendant decide to refile its motion it must file the administrative record with the Court no later than 10/31/03. Its motion for partial summary judgment due 10/31/03; response to motion for partial summary judgment due 11/14/03; reply motion for partial summary judgment due 11/21/03. (N) (dot) (Entered: 10/02/2003)
2003-10-1465SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL for federal defendant, substituting Alan S. Modlinger for attorney Diane Kelleher for FBI, attorney Diane Kelleher for DOS, attorney Diane Kelleher for EXEC. OFFICE/US ATTY, attorney Diane Kelleher for DOJ, attorney Diane Kelleher for DOD, attorney Diane Kelleher for NSA, attorney Diane Kelleher for CIA (bjsp) (Entered: 10/15/2003)
2003-10-1766MOTION (CONSENT) filed by federal defendant CIA to extend time to 11/12/03 in which to refile its motion for partial summary judgment and to file the administrative record pursuant to the Court's 9/30/03 memorandum order (bjsp) (Entered: 10/21/2003)
2003-10-2167ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: granting motion to extend time to 11/12/03 in which to refile its motion for partial summary judgment and to file the administrative record pursuant to the Court's 9/30/03 memorandum order [66-1] by CIA dispositive motions due by 11/12/03; (N) (tth) (Entered: 10/22/2003)
2003-11-1268MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Statement of Material Facts# 3 Memorandum of Law# 4 Declaration Kathryn Dyer# 5 Exhibits A-H)(Modlinger, Alan) (Entered: 11/12/2003)
2003-11-1369Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 68 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by MOHAMED AL-FAYED. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 11/13/2003)
2003-11-17MINUTE ENTRY: ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response 69 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs have until December 12, 2003, to file their response to Defendant CIA's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 17, 2003. (lcckk2) (Entered: 11/17/2003)
2003-12-0270NOTICE by MOHAMED AL-FAYED re 68 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Conceding Motion (Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 12/02/2003)
2003-12-03MINUTE ENTRY: ORDERED that upon 70 notice that Plaintiffs' concede the motion, 68 Defendant CIA's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The parties in this case are ORDERED to file a Joint Status Report by January 12, 2004, detailing the outstanding issues in this case and providing a proposal for how to proceed. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 3, 2003. (lcckk2) Modified on 12/3/2003 (lcckk2, ). (Entered: 12/03/2003)
2003-12-0371Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Open America Status Report by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Modlinger, Alan) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
2003-12-05MINUTE ENTRY: ORDERED that 71 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Open America Status Report is GRANTED. Defendants' Open America Status Report is due January 12, 2004. It is further ORDERED that 56 Defendant CIA's Motion to Clarify the Docket is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 5, 2003. (lcckk2) (Entered: 12/05/2003)
2004-01-0872NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by all parties (Modlinger, Alan) (Entered: 01/08/2004)
2004-01-08MINUTE ENTRY: The parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal 72 is APPROVED. This case is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 8, 2004. (lcckk2) (Entered: 01/08/2004)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff