Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNAVIGATOR PUBLISHING v. TRANSPORTATION US, et al
DistrictDistrict of Maine
CityPortland
Case Number2:2001cv00031
Date Filed2001-01-29
Date Closed2001-06-05
JudgeJUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY
PlaintiffNAVIGATOR PUBLISHING LLC
DefendantSECRETARY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
TERMINATED: 04/26/2001
DefendantJAMES M LOY ADMIRAL, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD
TERMINATED: 04/26/2001
DefendantVIVIEN S CREA REAR ADMIRAL, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD
TERMINATED: 04/26/2001
DefendantTRANSPORTATION, US DEPT.OF
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2001-01-291COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 42271 (Service of Process Deadline 5/29/01 ) (mnm) (Entered: 01/29/2001)
2001-01-29SUMMONS(ES) issued for TRANSPORTATION, US, JAMES M LOY, VIVIEN S CREA (mnm) (Entered: 01/29/2001)
2001-01-29CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT per Local Rule 83.7 by NAVIGATOR PUBLISHING (mnm) (Entered: 01/29/2001)
2001-03-022ANSWER to Complaint by TRANSPORTATION, US, JAMES M LOY, VIVIEN S CREA (Attorney EVAN ROTH), (mnm) (Entered: 03/05/2001)
2001-03-05RETURN of Service Executed as to TRANSPORTATION, US 2/2/01 (mnm) (Entered: 03/05/2001)
2001-03-05RETURN of Service Executed as to JAMES M LOY 2/2/01 (mnm) (Entered: 03/05/2001)
2001-03-073REPORT of Conference of Counsel, set specific document deadline (re:whether the parties agree to limited discovery and in the event that they do not agree to advise the court of the discovery the plaintiff wishes to conduct and the basis therefor) for 3/12/01 for NAVIGATOR PUBLISHING , set specific document deadline (re:response-in the event that the parties do not agree) for 3/14/01 for VIVIEN S CREA, for JAMES M LOY, for TRANSPORTATION, US ( signed by MAG. JUDGE DAVID M. COHEN ) cc: cnsl (mnm) (Entered: 03/07/2001)
2001-03-084RESPONSE by NAVIGATOR PUBLISHING to [3-1] order set specific document deadline (re:whether the parties agree to limited discovery and in the event that they do not agree to advise the court of the discovery the plaintiff wishes to conduct and the basis therefor) for 3/12/01 for NAVIGATOR PUBLISHING (mnm) (Entered: 03/09/2001)
2001-03-085AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by TRANSPORTATION, US, JAMES M LOY, VIVIEN S CREA : amends [2-1] answer (mnm) (Entered: 03/09/2001)
2001-03-08Motion(s) referred: [4-1] motion RESPONSE by NAVIGATOR PUBLISHING to [3-1] order set specific document deadline (re:whether the parties agree to limited discovery and in the event that they do not agree to advise the court of the discovery the plaintiff wishes to conduct and the basis therefor) for 3/12/01 for NAVIGATOR PUBLISHING referred to MAG. JUDGE DAVID M. COHEN (mnm) (Entered: 03/15/2001)
2001-03-146RESPONSE by TRANSPORTATION, US, JAMES M LOY, VIVIEN S CREA to Pltf's Response to Order #[3-1] order set specific document deadline (re:whether the parties agree to limited discovery and in the event that they do not agree to advise the court of the discovery the plaintiff wishes to conduct and the basis therefor) for 3/12/01 for NAVIGATOR PUBLISHING (slh) (Entered: 03/15/2001)
2001-03-15Motion(s) referred: [6-1] motion RESPONSE by TRANSPORTATION, US, JAMES M LOY, VIVIEN S CREA to Pltf's Response to Order #[3-1] order set specific document deadline (re:whether the parties agree to limited discovery and in the event that they do not agree to advise the court of the discovery the plaintiff wishes to conduct and the basis therefor) for 3/12/01 for NAVIGATOR PUBLISHING referred to MAG. JUDGE DAVID M. COHEN, [4-1] motion RESPONSE by NAVIGATOR PUBLISHING to [3-1] order set specific document deadline (re:whether the parties agree to limited discovery and in the event that they do not agree to advise the court of the discovery the plaintiff wishes to conduct and the basis therefor) for 3/12/01 for NAVIGATOR PUBLISHING referred to MAG. JUDGE DAVID M. COHEN (slh) (Entered: 03/15/2001)
2001-03-167ORDER terminating [6-1] motion RESPONSE by TRANSPORTATION, US, JAMES M LOY, VIVIEN S CREA to Pltf's Response to Order #[3-1] order set specific document deadline (re:whether the parties agree to limited discovery and in the event that they do not agree to advise the court of the discovery the plaintiff wishes to conduct and the basis therefor) for 3/12/01 for NAVIGATOR PUBLISHING, terminating [4-1] motion RESPONSE by NAVIGATOR PUBLISHING to [3-1] order set specific document deadline (re:whether the parties agree to limited discovery and in the event that they do not agree to advise the court of the discovery the plaintiff wishes to conduct and the basis therefor) for 3/12/01 for NAVIGATOR PUBLISHING, set Motion Filing deadline to 4/16/01 ( signed by MAG. JUDGE DAVID M. COHEN ) cc: cnsl (mnm) (Entered: 03/16/2001)
2001-04-138MOTION with memorandum in support by TRANSPORTATION, US, JAMES M LOY, VIVIEN S CREA for Judgment on the Pleadings ; Response to Motion due 5/4/01 for NAVIGATOR PUBLISHING (mnm) (Entered: 04/19/2001)
2001-04-259MOTION with memorandum in support by NAVIGATOR PUBLISHING to Substitute Party UNITED STATES DEPT OF TRANSPORTATION for named pty dft NORMAN Y. MINETA, SEC., US DOT; no obj , to Dismiss all remaining personally named defendants; no obj (dw) (Entered: 04/25/2001)
2001-04-25Motion(s) referred: [9-1] motion to Substitute Party UNITED STATES DEPT OF TRANSPORTATION for named pty dft NORMAN Y. MINETA, SEC., US DOT; no obj referred to MAG. JUDGE DAVID M. COHEN, [9-2] motion to Dismiss all remaining personally named defendants; no obj referred to MAG. JUDGE DAVID M. COHEN (dw) (Entered: 04/25/2001)
2001-04-26ENDORSEMENT on Motion granting [9-1] motion to Substitute Party UNITED STATES DEPT OF TRANSPORTATION for named pty dft NORMAN Y. MINETA, SEC., US DOT; no obj, granting [9-2] motion to Dismiss all remaining personally named defendants; no obj (Granted in all respects.) ( signed by MAG. JUDGE DAVID M. COHEN ) cc: cnsl (mnm) (Entered: 04/26/2001)
2001-05-0210MOTION by NAVIGATOR PUBLISHING to Extend Time until May 18, 2001 to respond to Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (mnm) (Entered: 05/02/2001)
2001-05-02ENDORSEMENT on Motion granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time until May 18, 2001 to respond to Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, Response to Motion reset to 5/18/01 for NAVIGATOR PUBLISHING for [8-1] motion for Judgment on the Pleadings ( signed by Melody Montanese, Deputy Clerk for JUDGE D. B. HORNBY ) cc: cnsl (mnm) (Entered: 05/02/2001)
2001-05-1711RESPONSE by NAVIGATOR PUBLISHING to [8-1] motion for Judgment on the Pleadings ; Reply to Response due 5/29/01 for TRANSPORTATION (mnm) (Entered: 05/18/2001)
2001-05-2412REPLY by TRANSPORTATION to response to [8-1] motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (mnm) (Entered: 05/25/2001)
2001-05-25Motion(s) taken under advisement: [8-1] motion for Judgment on the Pleadings under advisement (mnm) (Entered: 05/25/2001)
2001-06-0513MEMORANDUM OF DECISION granting [8-1] motion for Judgment on the Pleadings ( signed by JUDGE D. B. HORNBY ) cc: cnsl (mmc) (Entered: 06/05/2001)
2001-06-0514JUDGMENT for TRANSPORTATION, US against NAVIGATOR PUBLISHING signed by William S. Brownell, Clerk. cc: cnsl ( EOD: 6/5/01 ) (mmc) (Entered: 06/05/2001)
2001-06-05Case closed; Purge Appeal deadline set for 8/6/01 (mmc) (Entered: 06/05/2001)
2001-06-2715NOTICE OF APPEAL by NAVIGATOR PUBLISHING FILING FEE $ 105.00 RECEIPT # 43399 (Reporter: none) (mnm) (Entered: 06/27/2001)
2001-06-27COPIES of Notice of Appeal sent to counsel. Parties: NAVIGATOR PUBLISHING, TRANSPORTATION (mnm) (Entered: 06/27/2001)
2001-06-27CERTIFICATE of Clerk (Form 83) Org docs #: 1-15 (mnm) (Entered: 06/27/2001)
2001-07-18USCA Case Number Re: [15-1] appeal by NAVIGATOR PUBLISHING USCA NUMBER: 01-1939 (bfa) (Entered: 07/18/2001)
2001-09-1916MANDATE/JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) Re: [15-1] appeal by NAVIGATOR PUBLISHING Decision: appeal dismissed (bfa) (Entered: 09/20/2001)
2001-09-20Record on appeal returned from U.S. Court of Appeals: [15-1] appeal by NAVIGATOR PUBLISHING (bfa) (Entered: 09/20/2001)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff