Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSchiller, et al v. U.S. Immigration
DistrictWestern District of Texas
CitySan Antonio
Case Number5:2001cv00165
Date Filed2001-02-28
Date Closed2002-03-25
JudgeChief Judge Fred Biery
PlaintiffDane Schiller
PlaintiffSan Antonio Express News
DefendantU.S. Immigration and Naturalization Service
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2001-02-28Case assigned to Honorable Fred Biery (rg1) (Entered: 03/01/2001)
2001-02-281Complaint filed. Filing Fee: $ 150.00 Receipt # 167890 (Pages: 10) (rg1) (Entered: 03/01/2001)
2001-03-01Summons issued for U.S. Immigration, U.S. Attorney General, and U.S. Attorney. (rg1) Modified on 03/01/2001 (Entered: 03/01/2001)
2001-03-162Return of service executed as to U.S. Immigration on 3/1/01 by personal service upon U.S. Attorney (kc) (Entered: 03/19/2001)
2001-03-163Return of service executed as to U.S. Immigration on 3/5/01 by certified mail (kc) (Entered: 03/21/2001)
2001-03-164Return of service executed as to U.S. Immigration on 3/7/01 by certified mail upon Department of Justice (kc) (Entered: 03/21/2001)
2001-04-165Original Answer to plaintiff's original complaint by U.S. Immigration. (fe) (Entered: 04/17/2001)
2001-04-176Order that the plaintiff shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant (kc) (Entered: 04/18/2001)
2001-04-257Motion by U.S. Immigration for summary judgment (kc) (Entered: 04/26/2001)
2001-04-258Notice of filing by U.S. Immigration: Defendant's In Camera Submission of Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' FOAI Request (Attached Envelope containing sealed documents placed in vault) (kc) (Entered: 04/26/2001)
2001-05-019Unopposed Motion by Dane Schiller, San Antonio Express to extend time in which to respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment (kc) (Entered: 05/02/2001)
2001-05-0310Order granting motion to extend time in which to respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment [9-1]; shall respond by 5/14/01. (sj) (Entered: 05/04/2001)
2001-05-1411Response by Dane Schiller, San Antonio Express motion for summary judgment [7-1] (kc) (Entered: 05/15/2001)
2001-05-1411Or Alternatively, Motion by Dane Schiller, San Antonio Express for continuance (kc) (Entered: 05/15/2001)
2001-05-1812Motion by U.S. Immigration for protective order , and to quash deposition notice (kc) (Entered: 05/21/2001)
2001-05-2513Response by Dane Schiller, San Antonio Express motion for protective order [12-1], motion to quash deposition notice [12-2] (kc) (Entered: 05/29/2001)
2001-05-2514Supplemental in camera submission of documents responsive to plaintiffs' FOIA request filed by U.S. Immigration Re: file notice [8-1] with unredacted documents submitted separately under seal and placed in vault (kc) (Entered: 05/29/2001)
2001-05-2515Reply by U.S. Immigration in support of motion for summary judgment [7-1] (kc) (Entered: 05/29/2001)
2001-05-2515Response by U.S. Immigration in opposition to motion for continuance [11-1] (kc) (Entered: 05/29/2001)
2001-05-3116Reply Brief by U.S. Immigration in support of motion for protective order [12-1], motion to quash deposition notice [12-2] (kc) (Entered: 06/01/2001)
2001-06-0717Rejoinder by Dane Schiller, San Antonio Express and reply to defendant's reply in support of motion for summary judgment [15-1], and response in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for continuance [15-1] (kc) (Entered: 06/08/2001)
2001-06-1418Joint motion by Dane Schiller, San Antonio Express, U.S. Immigration to extend time to file proposed scheduling order (kc) (Entered: 06/14/2001)
2001-06-1519Order granting joint motion to extend time to file proposed scheduling order [18-1] to within 10 days of the Court's ruling on either defendant's motion for summary judgment or defendant's motion for protective order (kc) (Entered: 06/18/2001)
2001-06-2120Motion by U.S. Immigration for leave to file response to plaintiffs' rejoinder (kc) (Entered: 06/22/2001)
2001-06-21Received "Defendant's response to plaintiffs' rejoinder and reply to defendant's reply in support of motion for summary judgment and response in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for continuance" (kc) (Entered: 06/22/2001)
2001-06-2521Order granting motion for leave to file response to plaintiffs' rejoinder [20-1] (kc) (Entered: 06/26/2001)
2001-06-2522Response by U.S. Immigration to to plaintiffs' rejoinder and reply [17-1] to defendant's reply in support of motion for summary judgment and response in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for continuance (kc) (Entered: 06/26/2001)
2001-06-2923Motion by Dane Schiller, San Antonio Express for leave to file reply to defendant's response (kc) (Entered: 07/02/2001)
2001-06-29Received "Plaintiffs' reply to defendant's response to plaintiffs' rejoinder and reply to defendant's reply in support of moiton for summary judgment and response in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for continuance" (kc) (Entered: 07/02/2001)
2001-07-0524Order granting motion for leave to file reply to defendant's response [23-1] (kc) (Entered: 07/06/2001)
2001-07-0525Reply by Dane Schiller, San Antonio Express to defendant's response [22-1] to plaintiffs' rejoinder and reply to defendant's reply in support of motion for summary judgment and response in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for continuance (kc) (Entered: 07/06/2001)
2002-03-2526Order granting defendant's motion for summary judgment [7-1] such that case is DISMISSED; dismissing motion for protective order [12-1], dismissing motion to quash deposition notice [12-2], dismissing motion for continuance [11-1] (kc) (Entered: 03/26/2002)
2002-03-2527Judgment: Defendant's motion for summary judgment is granted and case is dismissied. (Pages: 1) (kc) (Entered: 03/26/2002)
2002-03-25Case closed (kc) (Entered: 03/26/2002)
2002-05-2828Order that the attached order concerning pending motions is substituted in place of the original order [26-1] filed 3/25/02 and is the copy which will be forwarded for publication. (kc) (Entered: 05/29/2002)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff