Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWESTERN JOURNALISM, et al v. IRS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2001cv00773
Date Filed2001-04-11
Date Closed2004-03-16
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffWESTERN JOURNALISM CENTER
PlaintiffJOSEPH FARAH
DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2001-04-111COMPLAINT filed by plaintiffs WESTERN JOURNALISM, and JOSEPH FARAH; attachment (1) (bm) (Entered: 04/12/2001)
2001-04-11SUMMONS (3) issued to federal party federal defendant IRS , and non-parties: U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (bm) (Entered: 04/12/2001)
2001-04-112LCvR 26.1 Certificate of disclosure of corporate affiliations and financial interests by plaintiff WESTERN JOURNALISM (bm) (Entered: 04/12/2001)
2001-05-013AMENDED COMPLAINT by plaintiff WESTERN JOURNALISM, plaintiff JOSEPH FARAH amending complaint [1-1] .; exhibits (1) (aet) Modified on 05/03/2001 (Entered: 05/03/2001)
2001-05-01SUMMONS NOT ISSUED. (aet) (Entered: 05/03/2001)
2001-05-114ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for federal defendant IRS by David Martin Kafinsky (aet) (Entered: 05/14/2001)
2001-05-145JOINT MOTION by plaintiff WESTERN JOURNALISM, plaintiff JOSEPH FARAH, federal defendant IRS to extend time by 30 days to answer amended complaint [3-1] (aet) (Entered: 05/15/2001)
2001-05-226ORDER by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan : granting joint motion to extend time by 30 days to answer amended complaint [3-1] [5-1] by IRS, JOSEPH FARAH, WESTERN JOURNALISM (N) (clv) (Entered: 05/22/2001)
2001-06-137ANSWER TO COMPLAINT [1-1] by federal defendant IRS . (aet) (Entered: 06/15/2001)
2001-07-05SCHEDULING NOTICE: Meet Confer hearing set for 10:15 8/1/01 . Meet Confer Statement due 7/27/01 . before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan . (clv) (Entered: 07/05/2001)
2001-07-278MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT/REPORT PURSUANT TO L.R. 16 filed by plaintiff WESTERN JOURNALISM, plaintiff JOSEPH FARAH, federal defendant IRS . (aet) (Entered: 07/30/2001)
2001-08-01MEET AND CONFER STATUS HEARING before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan : Status hearing set for 10:00 8/17/01 Reporter: Wm. McAllister (clv) (Entered: 08/01/2001)
2001-08-169MOTION filed by federal defendant IRS to dismiss amended complaint [3-1]. (td) (Entered: 08/17/2001)
2001-08-17STATUS HEARING before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan : status hearing set for 10:15 10/12/01 ; Reporter: Frank Rangus (clv) (Entered: 08/17/2001)
2001-08-3010MOTION filed by plaintiff WESTERN JOURNALISM, plaintiff JOSEPH FARAH to extend time to extend briefing schedule. (td) (Entered: 08/31/2001)
2001-09-0611ORDER by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan : granting motion to extend time to extend briefing schedule. [10-1] by JOSEPH FARAH, WESTERN JOURNALISM; response to dispositive motions due by 10/1/01 (N) (bm) (Entered: 09/06/2001)
2001-09-2512NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL of motion to dismiss amended complaint [3-1]. [9-1] by IRS (aet) (Entered: 09/27/2001)
2001-10-12STATUS HEARING before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan : status hearing set for 10:00 1/30/02 ; counsel to submit order; Reporter: Frank Rangus (clv) (Entered: 10/12/2001)
2001-10-1514ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiff WESTERN JOURNALISM, plaintiff JOSEPH FARAH by Paul J. Orfanedes. (td) (Entered: 10/17/2001)
2001-10-1713ORDER by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan : status hearing set for 10:00 1/30/02 ; setting forth further instruction to counsel; (N) (clv) (Entered: 10/17/2001)
2002-01-30STATUS HEARING before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan : status hearing set for 10:00 4/5/02 ; counsel to submit order; Reporter: Frank Rangus (clv) (Entered: 01/30/2002)
2002-02-0515ORDER by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan : setting forth further instruction to counsel; status hearing set for 10:00 4/5/02 ; (N) (clv) (Entered: 02/05/2002)
2002-04-05SCHEDULING NOTICE: status hearing set for 10:00 5/8/02 ; before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan . (clv) (Entered: 04/05/2002)
2002-05-08STATUS HEARING before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan : plaintiff's discovery motion due by 5/29/02; government response due by 6/19/02; reply due by 6/29/02; no court date set; Reporter: Frank Rangus (clv) (Entered: 05/08/2002)
2002-05-0916ORDER by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan :plaintiff's motion to compel discovery due by 5/29/02; response due by 6/19/02; reply due by 6/29/02; (N) (clv) (Entered: 05/09/2002)
2002-05-2917MOTION filed by plaintiff WESTERN JOURNALISM, plaintiff JOSEPH FARAH to compel discovery ; attachments (2) (td) Modified on 06/05/2002 (Entered: 06/05/2002)
2002-06-1818NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by David Martin Kafinsky representing federal defendant IRS . New address: U.S. Department of Justice P.O.Box 227 Ben Franklin Station Washington DC 20044 (202)307-6435. (bcs) (Entered: 06/19/2002)
2002-06-1819MEMORANDUM by federal defendant IRS in opposition to motion to compel discovery [17-1] by JOSEPH FARAH, WESTERN JOURNALISM; declaration (7); exhibits (8) (bcs) (Entered: 06/19/2002)
2002-07-0120MOTION (unopposed) filed by plaintiff WESTERN JOURNALISM, plaintiff JOSEPH FARAH to extend time to file their reply to defendant's memorandum in opposition to plaintiffs' motion to compel discovery. (td) (Entered: 07/03/2002)
2002-07-0821ORDER by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan : granting motion to extend time to 7/8/02 to file their reply to defendant's memorandum in opposition to plaintiffs' motion to compel discovery. [20-1] by JOSEPH FARAH, WESTERN JOURNALISM (N) (clv) (Entered: 07/08/2002)
2002-07-0822REPLY by plaintiff WESTERN JOURNALISM, plaintiff JOSEPH FARAH to response in opposition to motion to compel discovery [17-1] by JOSEPH FARAH, WESTERN JOURNALISM; exhibit (1) (rje) (Entered: 07/10/2002)
2003-03-0423MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan : denying motion to compel discovery [17-1] by JOSEPH FARAH, WESTERN JOURNALISM (N) (clv) (Entered: 03/04/2003)
2003-11-2524NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Peterson on behalf of WESTERN JOURNALISM CENTER (Peterson, James) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
2003-11-2625NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Orfanedes on behalf of WESTERN JOURNALISM CENTER (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
2003-11-2626NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Orfanedes on behalf of JOSEPH FARAH (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
2003-11-2627NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Peterson on behalf of JOSEPH FARAH (Peterson, James) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
2004-03-1028SHOW CAUSE ORDER. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 10, 2004. (lcegs1) (Entered: 03/10/2004)
2004-03-1629STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by JOSEPH FARAH, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, WESTERN JOURNALISM CENTER. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 03/16/2004)
2004-03-16MINUTE ORDER The Court approves the Stipulation of dismissal dated March 16, 2004. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 16, 2004. (lcegs1) (Entered: 03/16/2004)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff