Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKARK-TV Inc v. Arkansas AIDS Fdn
DistrictEastern District of Arkansas
CityLittle Rock
Case Number4:2001cv00298
Date Filed2001-05-16
Date Closed2001-06-13
JudgeJudge James M. Moody
PlaintiffKARK-TV Inc
DefendantArkansas AIDS Foundation
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2001-05-161NOTICE of Petition for Removal from Pulaski County Circuit Court; Case Number: 01-4379; filing fee of $150.00 pd, receipt #95787 (kjp) (Entered: 05/17/2001)
2001-05-16COMPLAINT (kjp) Modified on 05/17/2001 (Entered: 05/17/2001)
2001-05-292MOTION by defendant Arkansas AIDS Fdn to dismiss (former empl) (Entered: 05/30/2001)
2001-05-293BRIEF by defendant in support of motion to dismiss [2-1] (former empl) (Entered: 05/30/2001)
2001-06-134MOTION by plaintiff for voluntary dismissal without prejudice (former empl) (Entered: 06/14/2001)
2001-06-135BRIEF by plaintiff KARK-TV Inc in support of motion for voluntary dismissal without prejudice [4-1] (former empl) (Entered: 06/14/2001)
2001-06-136ORDER by Judge James M. Moody granting motion for voluntary dismissal without prejudice [4-1]; terminating case (cc: all counsel) (former empl) (Entered: 06/14/2001)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff