Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEMERSON v. DOS, et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2001cv01184
Date Filed2001-05-30
Date Closed2003-09-04
JudgeJudge Rosemary M. Collyer
PlaintiffSTEVEN EMERSON
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantU.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF TREASURY
DefendantMARK S. ZAID
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2001-05-301COMPLAINT filed by plaintiff STEVEN EMERSON (bm) (Entered: 06/01/2001)
2001-05-30SUMMONS (5) issued to federal party(s) federal defendants DOS, US AGENCY/INTL DEV, DEPT OF THE TREASURY , and non-parties: U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (bm) (Entered: 06/01/2001)
2001-07-022MOTION filed by federal defendants to extend time for thirty days to answer complaint [1-1] (cdw) (Entered: 07/03/2001)
2001-07-093ORDER by Judge Henry H. Kennedy : granting motion to extend time for thirty days to answer complaint [1-1] [2-1] by federal defendantss ; Answer extended to 8/1/01 for DEPT OF THE TREASURY, for US AGENCY/INTL DEV, for DOS (N) (dcn) (Entered: 07/09/2001)
2001-07-274MOTION (CONSENT) filed by federal defendants to extend time to answer complaint [1-1] (cdw) (Entered: 07/31/2001)
2001-08-015ORDER by Judge Henry H. Kennedy : granting motion to extend time to answer complaint [1-1] [4-1] by DEPT OF THE TREASURY, US AGENCY/INTL DEV, DOS ; Answer extended to 8/17/01 for DEPT OF THE TREASURY, for US AGENCY/INTL DEV, for DOS (N) (dcn) (Entered: 08/02/2001)
2001-08-176SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL for federal defendant DOS, federal defendant US AGENCY/INTL DEV, federal defendant DEPT OF THE TREASURY , substituting Brian J. Sonfield for attorney Christy A. Slamowitz for DEPT OF THE TREASURY, US AGENCY/INTL DEV, DOS (cdw) (Entered: 08/20/2001)
2001-08-177ANSWER TO COMPLAINT [1-1] by federal defendant DOS, federal defendant US AGENCY/INTL DEV, federal defendant DEPT OF THE TREASURY . (cdw) (Entered: 08/20/2001)
2001-09-188SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Henry H. Kennedy Meet Confer hearing set for 10:15 10/17/01 . (N) (dcn) (Entered: 09/19/2001)
2001-10-029MOTION filed by federal defendant DOS to stay pursuant to Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force ; Exhibits (5); Declarations (1) (ag) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
2001-10-0310MOTION filed by federal defendant US AGENCY/INTL DEV for summary judgment ; exhibits (1-3) (aet) (Entered: 10/05/2001)
2001-10-17MEET AND CONFER STATUS HEARING before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Initial Scheduling Conference reset for 9:30 12/14/01 as plaintiff's counsel was not present. Reporter: Dolores Byers (dam) (Entered: 10/17/2001)
2001-10-1912MOTION (CONSENT) filed by plaintiff STEVEN EMERSON to extend time nunc pro tunc to 11/9/01 to file a responsive pleading (aet) (Entered: 10/24/2001)
2001-10-1915NOTICE by plaintiff STEVEN EMERSON of position with respect to defendant DOS (cdw) (Entered: 10/25/2001)
2001-10-2311LETTER to Judge Kennedy from attorney Mark S. Zaid regarding his failure to appear at initial scheduling conference; "Let this be filed", J. Kennedy (cdw) (Entered: 10/24/2001)
2001-10-2513ORDER by Judge Henry H. Kennedy : granting motion to stay pursuant to Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force [9-1] by DOS (N) (dcn) (Entered: 10/25/2001)
2001-10-2514ORDER by Judge Henry H. Kennedy : granting motion to extend time nunc pro tunc to 11/9/01 to file a responsive pleading [12-1] by STEVEN EMERSON (N) (dcn) (Entered: 10/25/2001)
2001-10-2516ORDER by Judge Henry H. Kennedy : granting notice [15-1] by STEVEN EMERSON; parties to submit to the court a suggested briefing schedule. (N) (dcn) (Entered: 10/25/2001)
2001-11-0917NOTICE by federal defendants to Court concerning mail service at US Attorney's office (cdw) (Entered: 11/14/2001)
2001-11-1318RESPONSE by plaintiff STEVEN EMERSON in opposition to motion for summary judgment [10-1] by US AGENCY/INTL DEV; exhibits (2) (cdw) (Entered: 11/15/2001)
2001-11-1519MOTION (CONSENT) filed by plaintiff STEVEN EMERSON to extend time to 11/16/01 to submit responsive pleading (cdw) (Entered: 11/16/2001)
2001-11-1920MOTION (CONSENT) filed by federal defendant US AGENCY/INTL DEV to postpone time to respond to plaintiff's opposition to motion for summary judgment (cdw) (Entered: 11/20/2001)
2001-11-2121ORDER by Judge Henry H. Kennedy : granting motion to postpone time to respond to plaintiff's opposition to motion for summary judgment [20-1] by US AGENCY/INTL DEV Status Report due: 12/26/01 (N) (dcn) (Entered: 11/21/2001)
2001-12-14STATUS HEARING before Judge Henry H. Kennedy : show cause order discharged as to Mark Zaid, Esquire;parties to consult on deadlines and plaintiffs counsel to submit an agreed upon order setting forth agreements reached by 12/24/01; , staying motion for summary judgment until further order of the court as to federal defendant , status hearing set for 5/17/02 ; Reporter: Dolores Byers (dcn) (Entered: 12/14/2001)
2001-12-2123RESPONSE by plaintiff STEVEN EMERSON, federal defendant DOS, federal defendant US AGENCY/INTL DEV, federal defendant DEPT OF THE TREASURY to order of 10/25/01 [16-1] (cdw) (Entered: 12/31/2001)
2001-12-2622STATUS REPORT and SUPPLEMENTAL VAUGHN DECLARATIONS by federal defendant US AGENCY/INTL DEV; exhibits (2); Declarations of SYLVIA P. LANKFORD and PATRICK JAMES HOGAN. (cas) (Entered: 12/27/2001)
2002-01-0724ORDER by Judge Henry H. Kennedy : Joint Status Report due: 1/11/02 (N) (dcn) (Entered: 01/07/2002)
2002-01-1125NOTICE OF FILING by plaintiff STEVEN EMERSON, federal defendant DEPT OF THE TREASURY of proposed order as required by the Court's order of 1/7/02 (cdw) (Entered: 01/15/2002)
2002-01-2226ORDER by Judge Henry H. Kennedy : Department of Treasury shall produce to plaintiff certain information by 4/30/02; plaintiff to notify defendant by 5/15/02 of any challenges; Joint Status Report due: 5/31/02 (N) (dcn) (Entered: 01/22/2002)
2002-01-3127UPDATED STATUS REPORT by federal defendant US AGENCY/INTL DEV (cdw) (Entered: 02/01/2002)
2002-02-2228JOINT STATUS REPORT by plaintiff, federal defendants regarding plaintiff's claims against defendant US Agency for International Development (cdw) (Entered: 02/26/2002)
2002-05-17STATUS HEARING before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Held. Plaintiff's counsel was not present, the court will continue this case for another hearing. status hearing set for 10:45 7/12/02 ; Reporter: Jackie Wood (Miller) (dam) (Entered: 05/17/2002)
2002-05-1729ORDER by Judge Henry H. Kennedy: that plaintiff shall show cause in writing that shall be filed no later than 5/31/02 why this case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution and/or counsel sanctioned for counsel's failure to appear; that in the event this case is not dismissed a status hearing will be conducted on 7/12/02 at 10:45; the Clerk of the Court shall send this order to plaintiff as well as to counsel for the parties. (N) (dam) (Entered: 05/17/2002)
2002-05-3130RESPONSE by plaintiff STEVEN EMERSON to order that plaintiff shall show cause in writing that shall be filed no later than 5/31/02 why this case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution and/or counsel sanctioned for counsel's failure to appear; that in the event this case is not dismissed a status hearing will be conducted on 7/12/02 at 10:45; the Clerk of the Court shall send this order to plaintiff as well as to counsel for the parties. [29-1], order [29-2]; exhibit (1) (bcs) Modified on 06/03/2002 (Entered: 06/03/2002)
2002-06-1131ORDER by Judge Henry H. Kennedy : Sanctioning Mark Zaid, Esquire in the amount of $300.00 to be paid by check or money order to the Clerk, USDC and delivered to the finance window in room 1225, said amount to be paid by 7/7/02. (N) (dcn) (Entered: 06/12/2002)
2002-06-2132RESPONSE by Non Party MARK S. ZAID to order Sanctioning Mark Zaid, Esquire in the amount of $300.00 to be paid by check or money order to the Clerk, USDC and delivered to the finance window in room 1225, said amount to be paid by 7/7/02. [31-1] (cdw) (Entered: 06/24/2002)
2002-07-12STATUS HEARING before Judge Henry H. Kennedy : Joint Status Report due: 10/1/02 Reporter: Dolores Byers (dcn) (Entered: 07/12/2002)
2002-09-0933NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Mark Steven Zaid representing plaintiff STEVEN EMERSON . New address: KRIEGER & ZAID 1123 21st Street, NW - Suite 800 Washington DC 20036 (202) 223-4050. (cdw) (Entered: 09/10/2002)
2002-10-0134JOINT STATUS REPORT by plaintiffs, federal defendants (cdw) (Entered: 10/03/2002)
2002-10-0735ORDER by Judge Henry H. Kennedy : granting filing of the status report [34-1] by DEPT OF THE TREASURY, US AGENCY/INTL DEV, DOS, STEVEN EMERSON Status Report due: 12/2/02 (N) (dcn) (Entered: 10/07/2002)
2002-10-0736STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL of case by federal defendant US AGENCY/INTL DEV . (dcn) (Entered: 10/07/2002)
2002-12-0237JOINT STATUS REPORT by plaintiff, federal defendants (cdw) (Entered: 12/03/2002)
2002-12-19CASE REASSIGNED from Judge Henry H. Kennedy to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer (nmr) (Entered: 12/20/2002)
2003-02-2638STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL (Joint) by plaintiff, federal defendant Department of State, dismissing claims against Department of State with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(ii); issue of whether plaintiff is entitled to costs or fees will be reserved until the end of the case; "So Ordered", J. Collyer (rje) Modified on 03/10/2003 (Entered: 03/04/2003)
2003-02-2839JOINT STATUS REPORT by plaintiff, federal defendants (rje) (Entered: 03/04/2003)
2003-06-0240JOINT STATUS REPORT by plaintiff, federal defendants (rje) (Entered: 06/04/2003)
2003-06-0341ORDER by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: the parties shall file another joint status report by 9/2/03 (N) (cdw) (Entered: 06/04/2003)
2003-09-0442STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL of case with prejudice by plaintiff STEVEN EMERSON, federal defendant DEPT OF THE TREASURY; "LET THIS BE FILED", J. Collyer (cdw) (Entered: 09/05/2003)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff