Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBrady-Lunny, et al v. Massey, et al
DistrictCentral District of Illinois
CitySpringfield
Case Number3:2001cv03222
Date Filed2001-07-20
Date Closed2002-02-11
JudgeJudge Richard Mills
PlaintiffEdith Brady-Lunny
PlaintiffPulitzer Publishing Company
doing business as The Pantagraph
DefendantRoger Massey Sheriff of Dewitt County
DefendantUSA
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2001-07-201NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dewitt County Case Number: 01-MR-5 Case referred to Mag. Judge Byron G. Cudmore (AJ, ilcd) (Entered: 07/23/2001)
2001-07-202ANSWER by defendant USA (RA, ilcd) (Entered: 07/24/2001)
2001-07-24MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Byron G. Cudmore: Notice of Removal filed 7/20/01 appears in conformity with removal requirements and procedure. Plaintiffs however are given to 8/8/2001 to file objections. Failure to do so is deemed to mean Plaintiffs have no legal opposition and this case shall proceed in this court. (cc: all counsel) (RA, ilcd) (Entered: 07/26/2001)
2001-07-253NOTICE of filing a copy of the Notice and Petition for Removal with the Circuit Clerk of DeWitt County by defendant USA (RA, ilcd) (Entered: 07/27/2001)
2001-08-16MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Byron G. Cudmore. Telephone status conference to expedite disposition of case set 8/27/2001 at 4:00 p.m. (cc: all counsel) (AJ, ilcd) (Entered: 08/22/2001)
2001-08-27MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge Byron G. Cudmore. Telephone status conference held with Attorneys Donald Craven and James Lewis. Parties both advise at this time discovery is not required. Defendants request a deadline of 11/1/2001 by which to file a Motion for Summary Judgment. No objection by Plaintiffs. Plaintiffs' response to Motion for Summary Judgment due 12/1/2001, and any reply due by 12/15/2001. (cc: all counsel) (AJ, ilcd) (Entered: 08/29/2001)
2001-11-014MOTION by defendant USA to amend answer (AJ, ilcd) (Entered: 11/01/2001)
2001-11-015MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of motion to amend answer [4-1] by defendant USA (AJ, ilcd) (Entered: 11/01/2001)
2001-11-016MOTION by defendants for summary judgment (AJ, ilcd) Modified on 11/01/2001 (Entered: 11/01/2001)
2001-11-02ENDORSED ORDER on its face by Mag. Judge Byron G. Cudmore granting motion to amend answer [4-1] (cc: all counsel). (RA, ilcd) (Entered: 11/02/2001)
2001-11-087AMENDMENT by defendant to answer [2-1] (AJ, ilcd) (Entered: 11/08/2001)
2001-11-268CROSS MOTION by plaintiffs for summary judgment (CC, ilcd) (Entered: 11/27/2001)
2001-11-269RESPONSE by plaintiffs to motion for summary judgment [6-1] (CC, ilcd) (Entered: 11/27/2001)
2001-11-2910Defendants' REPLY in support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (d/e 6) and in opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (d/e 8). (AJ, ilcd) (Entered: 12/04/2001)
2001-11-2910Defendants' Reply, in support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (d/e 6) and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (d/e 8). (AJ, ilcd) (Entered: 12/04/2001)
2001-12-1111CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 filed by plaintiff (BR, ilcd) (Entered: 12/11/2001)
2002-02-1112ORDER by Judge Richard Mills denying plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment [8-1], granting the Government's motion for summary judgment [6-1] Case closed. (cc: all counsel) (MR, ilcd) (Entered: 02/11/2002)
2002-02-1113JUDGMENT in a civil case entered, pursuant to an Opinion entered by Judge Richard Mills. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is denied. The Government's motion for summary judgment is allowed. Case closed. (cc: all counsel) (MR, ilcd) (Entered: 02/11/2002)
2002-02-1314SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE by plaintiffs to defendant's motion for summary judgment [6-1] (CC, ilcd) (Entered: 02/14/2002)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff