Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDow Jones & Company, et al v. Fed Ener Regulatory
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2001cv07074
Date Filed2001-08-14
Date Closed2002-09-16
JudgeJudge Christina A. Snyder
PlaintiffDow Jones & Company Inc
PlaintiffJohn R Emshwiller
DefendantFederal Energy Regulatory Commission
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2001-08-141COMPLAINT filed Summons(es) issues referred to Discovery James W. McMahon (jag) (Entered: 08/16/2001)
2001-08-142NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Dow Jones & Company, plaintiff John R Emshwiller (jag) (Entered: 08/16/2001)
2001-08-223NOTICE TO CNSL AND ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder This notice to cnsl shall be applicable to all parties appearing in propria personal and for purposes of this ntc, the term "cnsl" shall include any person appearing in pro per. (see document) (SEND) (yc) (Entered: 08/23/2001)
2001-09-134PROOF OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Federal Energy Regulatory Commission; Service by Fed Statute on 8/27/01 via Certified mail by serving S/C to Federal Energy Regulartory Commission (Attached Original Domestic Rtn Receipt addressed to US Atty General John Ashcroft, rcd 8/28/01 by Ernest Parker; Civil Process Clk, Officer of John S Gordon, US Atty, rcd on 8/27/01 by Ricardo Reyes) (ir) (Entered: 09/14/2001)
2001-09-265ANSWER filed by defendant Federal Energy Regulatory Commission to complaint [1-1] (ir) (Entered: 09/27/2001)
2001-09-266NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendant Fed Ener Regulatory (ir) (Entered: 09/27/2001)
2001-10-307ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney Gillian Flory for Fed Ener Regulatory by defendant Fed Ener Regulatory and substituting attorney Marcia N Tiersky by Judge Christina A. Snyder (SEND) (ir) (Entered: 11/02/2001)
2001-11-308JOINT REPORT TO CRT re RULE 26(f) meeting filed; est length of trial (no time indicated) (ir) (Entered: 12/03/2001)
2002-01-089MINUTES: mandatory status/scheduling conf set for 11:30 2/4/02 ; ptys reminded of obligation to disclose info & confer on discov plan NLT 21 days bef conf & rpt to Crt NTL 14 days after they confer by Judge Christina A. Snyder CR: none (send) (lc) (Entered: 01/09/2002)
2002-01-2310STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder by Ord ent on 1/9/02, Crt set the Rule 16(b) sched conf for 2/4/02 @ 11:30; Lead cnsl for dft has her office in Washington, DC; Pyts through their undersigned attys, have conferred on discovery sched & agree dthat there will be no discovery in this FOLA case, as noted in the Joint Rpt to Crt re Rule 26(F) Meeting; In view of these factors, ptys stip that undersigned cnsl for dft may appear @ sched conf on 2/4/02 via telephone (ir) (Entered: 01/24/2002)
2002-02-0411MINUTES: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ; Matte called & cnsl present; Case is not sched; Cnsl agree case be resolved by Cross sumamry jgm mot(s); Crt sets the following sched for filing of said mot(s); Dft's mot to be fld NLT 3/8/02; opp due 4/8/02; reply due 4/22/02; Plf's cross-mot to be fld NLT 4/8/02; opp due 5/8/02; reply due 5/23/02; Hrg on said mot(s) will be set 6/10/02 @ 10:00 by Judge Christina A. Snyder CR: Laura Elias (ir) (Entered: 02/07/2002)
2002-02-0712ORDER setting Sched for summary jgm & Cross Summary jgm briefing by Judge Christina A. Snyder as follows: mot for summary jgm of Dft shall be svd & fld on or before 3/8/02; Plfs' opp to Dft's mot for summary jgm shall be svd & fld on or before 4/8/02; Plfs' mot for Cross-summary jgm shall be svd & fld on or before 4/8/02; Dft's reply to Plfs' opp to the mot for summary jgm shall be svd & fld on or before 4/22/02; Dft's opp to Plfs' mot for Cross-summary shall be svd & fld on or before 5/8/02; Plfs' reply to Dft's opp to the mot for Cross-summary jgm shall be svd & fld on or before 5/23/02; Hrg set for 6/10/02 @ 10:00 (ir) (Entered: 02/08/2002)
2002-03-1113NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by defendant Fed Ener Regulatory for summary judgment ; motion hearing set for 10:00 6/10/02; Lodged Propsd Ord, Stmt of Uncontroverted Facts & Stip to extend (ir) (Entered: 03/12/2002)
2002-03-1214STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder extending Dft's time to file its mot for summary jgm on or before 3/12/02 ; Plfs' opp to Dft's mot for summary jgm shall now be served & fld on or before 4/12/02 & tha Plf's mot for cross-summary jgm if any shall be served & filed on or before 4/12/02; Subsequent briefing is to occur as set out in the ord of 2/7/02 (ir) (Entered: 03/13/2002)
2002-04-1115NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION AND CROSS-MOTION by plaintiffs Dow Jones & Company, John R Emshwiller for summary judgment ; motion hearing set for 10:00 6/10/02; memo of PA & attached exh(s) in suppt of Plfs' Cross-mot for summary jgm & in opp to Dft's mot for summary jgm; Lodged Stmt & Lodged Summary jgm (ir) (Entered: 04/11/2002)
2002-04-2916STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder Dft will file a single responsive brief both in reply to Plfs' opp to Dfts mot for summary jgm & in opp to Plfs' Cross-mot for summary jgm NLT 5/8/02 ; Purs to Crt's 2/7/02 Plfs' reply in suppt of thier cross-mot for summary jgm shall be fld NLT 5/23/02 (ir) (Entered: 05/01/2002)
2002-05-0817REPLY by defendant in suppt of its' motion for summary judgment [15-1], & opp to Plfs' Cross-motion for summary judgment [13-1] (ir) (Entered: 05/09/2002)
2002-05-2318REPLY by Dow Jones & Company, John R Emshwiller in suppt of their cross motion for summary judgment [15-1] (lc) (Entered: 05/24/2002)
2002-06-1021MINUTES: Dft's motion for summary judgment [13-1] (Fld 3/11/02) & Plf's Cross-motion for summary judgment [15-1] (Fld 4/11/02); Above entitle mot(s) were argued & taken under submission; Crt ord cnsl for the Govt to file a Vaughn Index underseal; In addt the Appendix shall be fld in camera; Fur Crt ord a status rpt on what is going on in the case in Northern CA be fld IT IS SO ORD by Judge Christina A. Snyder CR: Laura Elias (ir) (Entered: 06/28/2002)
2002-06-2420SUBMISSION by defendant in support of its motion for summary judgment [13-1] (ir) (Entered: 06/28/2002)
2002-06-2519RECEIPT OF TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following date(s): 6/10/02 (Re:) CR: Laura Elias. (ghap) (Entered: 06/26/2002)
2002-06-25TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings held on 6/10/02. (ghap) (Entered: 06/26/2002)
2002-06-2822RESPONSE TO DFTS SUBMISSIONS IN SUPPT by Dow Jones & Company, John R Emshwiller to motion for summary judgment [13-1] (lc) (Entered: 07/01/2002)
2002-09-1625ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder Dft has failed to demonstrate that the appendix is exempt from disclosure, Dft's motion for summary judgment [13-1] is DENIED; Plfs' motion for summary judgment [15-1] is GRANTED (ENT 9/17/02) (ir) (Entered: 09/17/2002)
2002-09-1626JUDGMENT AND ORDER: by Judge Christina A. Snyder purs to Crt's Ord dated 9/13/02 denying Dft's mot for summary jgm & granting Plfs' mot for summary jgm, IT IS HEREBY ORD that Plfs shall have jgm against defendant; Ea side to bear its own attys' fees & costs terminating case (MD JS-6) (ENT 9/17/02) (ir) (Entered: 09/17/2002)
2002-10-0227NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiffs Dow Jones & Company & John R Emshwiller for attorney fees & costs in the amount of $94,565.60 ; motion hearing set for 10:00 11/18/02; Decls of Theodore J Boutrous, JR. & Sonjar R. West; Exhibits attached (nhac) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
2002-10-1528STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder that the hearing on the motion for attorney fees & costs in the amount of $94,565.60 [27-1] should be CONTINUED until 12/16/02; Defendants Opposition to plaintiff motion, if any, must be submitted by 12/02/02. Plaintiffs Reply to defendant's Opposition, if any, must be submitted by 12/09/02. (jp) (Entered: 10/16/2002)
2002-11-2029NOTICE OF CHANGE Of Address filed by atty Marcia N Tiersky for defendant Fed Ener Regulatory (New address: United States Department of Justice Civil Division, Federal Programs Branch 20 Massachusetts Ave, N.W. Washington, DC 20530; Telephone 202-514-1359; Fax 202-616-8202; E-mail marcia.tiersky@usdoj.gov) (ir) (Entered: 11/22/2002)
2002-11-2730STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder; Parties & their undersigned attorneys have conferred on the matter & agreed to settle Plfs' claim for attorney's fees & costs; Plfs will receive $60,000 from the United States in full settlement of all claims against Dft for attorney's fees & litigation costs; Plfs have agreed to withdraw their motion for attorney fees & costs in the amount of $94,565.60 [27-1]; This compromise shall not constitute an admission of liability by Dft; Hearing on Plfs' motion for attorney's fees & costs set for 12/16/02 shall be cancelled/withdrawn (ir) (Entered: 12/02/2002)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff