Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN LAWYER MED, et al v. SEC
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2001cv01967
Date Filed2001-09-17
Date Closed2002-09-06
JudgeJudge Gladys Kessler
PlaintiffAMERICAN LAWYER MEDIA, INC.
PlaintiffMICHAEL RAVNITZKY
DefendantSECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2001-09-171COMPLAINT filed by plaintiff AMERICAN LAWYER MED, plaintiff MICHAEL RAVNITZKY (cdw) (Entered: 09/19/2001)
2001-09-17SUMMONS (3) issued to federal party(s) federal defendant SEC , and non-parties: U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (cdw) (Entered: 09/19/2001)
2001-09-172LCvR 26.1 Certificate of disclosure of corporate affiliations and financial interests by plaintiff AMERICAN LAWYER MED (cdw) (Entered: 09/19/2001)
2001-10-013ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for federal defendant SEC by Andrew David Auerbach (cdw) (Entered: 10/02/2001)
2001-10-224ANSWER TO COMPLAINT [1-1] by federal defendant SEC . (cdw) (Entered: 10/23/2001)
2001-11-065INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler status hearing set for 9:45 11/27/01 (N) (pob) (Entered: 11/06/2001)
2001-11-217JOINT NOTICE of exemption for local rule 16.3 filed by plaintiffs (cdw) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
2001-11-27STATUS HEARING before Judge Gladys Kessler: Held. Defendant's dispositive motion due 1/15/02; Plaintiff's response to dispositive motion and cross motion due 2/15/02 ; Defendant's reply to dispositive motion and opposition to cross motion due 3/15/02; Plaintiff's reply to cross motion due 4/1/02 ; Reporter: Susan Tyner (dam) (Entered: 11/27/2001)
2001-11-276SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler Defendant's dispositive motion due 1/15/02; plaintiff's response to dispositive motion and cross motion due 2/15/02; defendant's reply to dispositive motion and opposition to cross motion due 3/15/02; plaintiff's reply to cross motion due 4/1/02 , and Case assigned to the Standard track (track two). (N) (dam) (Entered: 11/27/2001)
2001-12-078MOTION filed by federal defendant SEC to dismiss complaint [1-1] for lack of jurisdiction (ag) (Entered: 12/10/2001)
2001-12-219RESPONSE by plaintiff AMERICAN LAWYER MED, plaintiff MICHAEL RAVNITZKY in opposition to motion to dismiss complaint [1-1] for lack of jurisdiction [8-1] by SEC; exhibits (7) (cdw) (Entered: 12/31/2001)
2002-01-0210REPLY by federal defendant SEC to response in opposition to motion to dismiss complaint [1-1] for lack of jurisdiction [8-1] by SEC; attachments (2) (bm) (Entered: 01/07/2002)
2002-01-0811MOTION (CONSENT) filed by federal defendant SEC to extend time for ten days in which to file its motion for summary judgment (cdw) (Entered: 01/10/2002)
2002-01-1512MOTION filed by federal defendant SEC for summary judgment exhibits (9) BULKY PLEADING (cdw) Modified on 01/17/2002 (Entered: 01/17/2002)
2002-01-1713ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler : granting motion to extend time for ten days in which to file its motion for summary judgment [11-1] by SEC; SEC's motion for summary judgment due by 1/25/02; plaintiff's opposition and cross motion due 2/25/02; the SEC's Reply and Opposition shall be due 3/25/02; and Plaintiffs' Reply shall be due 4/25/02. (N) (tth) (Entered: 01/18/2002)
2002-02-2514RESPONSE by plaintiffs in opposition to motion for summary judgment [12-1] by SEC; declarations (1) (cdw) (Entered: 02/27/2002)
2002-02-2515CROSS MOTIONS by plaintiff AMERICAN LAWYER MED, plaintiff MICHAEL RAVNITZKY for summary judgment ; declarations (1) (cdw) (Entered: 02/27/2002)
2002-02-2816NOTICE OF FILING by plaintiffs AMERICAN LAWYER MED, and MICHAEL RAVNITZKY; original signature page to exhibit 1 of the plaintiffs' opposition to motion for summary judgment (bm) (Entered: 03/04/2002)
2002-03-2517REPLY by federal defendant SEC to response in opposition to motion for summary judgment [12-1] by SEC; exhibits (1) (cdw) (Entered: 03/27/2002)
2002-03-2518RESPONSE by federal defendant SEC in opposition to cross motion for summary judgment [15-1] by MICHAEL RAVNITZKY, AMERICAN LAWYER MED . (cdw) (Entered: 03/27/2002)
2002-04-2219MOTION (CONSENTED) filed by plaintiffs to extend time to 5/2/02 to submit responsive pleading (cdw) (Entered: 04/25/2002)
2002-04-2420ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler : granting motion to extend time to 5/2/02 to submit responsive pleading [19-1] by MICHAEL RAVNITZKY, AMERICAN LAWYER MED reply to brief due by 5/2/02; (N) (tth) (Entered: 04/25/2002)
2002-05-0221REPLY by plaintiffs AMERICAN LAWYER MED and MICHAEL RAVNITZKY to response in opposition to cross motion for summary judgment [15-1] by MICHAEL RAVNITZKY, AMERICAN LAWYER MED; attachment (1) (bm) (Entered: 05/03/2002)
2002-09-0622MEMORANDUM OPINION by Judge Gladys Kessler (N) (tth) (Entered: 09/06/2002)
2002-09-0623ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler : granting in part, denying in part cross motion for summary judgment [15-1], granting in part, denying in part motion for summary judgment [12-1]; defendant mus release Exhibit 3, Definitions "m" and "t," and Sections 21 and 22; this case is dismissed and all other pending motions are dismissed as moot. This is a final appealable order. (N) (tth) (Entered: 09/06/2002)
2002-09-0924NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Mark Steven Zaid representing plaintiff AMERICAN LAWYER MED, plaintiff MICHAEL RAVNITZKY . New address: KRIEGER & ZAID 1123 21st Street, NW - Suite 800 Washington DC 20036 (202) 223-4050. (cdw) (Entered: 09/10/2002)
2002-09-1325MOTION filed by federal defendant SEC for reconsideration , and modification of the order dated 9/6/02 [23-1] ; exhibits (1) (cdw) (Entered: 09/17/2002)
2002-10-1126ORDER by Judge Gladys Kessler: granting motion for modification of the order dated 9/6/02 [23-1] [25-2] by SEC; defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part; plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part; defendant must release definitions "m" and "t" and Sections 21 and 22; this case is dismissed and all other pending motions are dismissed as moot. (N) (tth) (Entered: 10/11/2002)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff