Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMOKHIBER v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2001cv01974
Date Filed2001-09-18
Date Closed2004-09-09
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffRUSSELL MOKHIBER
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2001-09-181COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $150 ). Filed by RUSSELL MOKHIBER. (adc, ) (Entered: 09/27/2001)
2001-09-252NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent H. Cohen Jr. on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (jeb, ) (Entered: 10/02/2001)
2001-10-153MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 until 11/18/01 by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (td, ) (Entered: 10/24/2001)
2001-10-244RESPONSE in Opposition re 3 Defendant's Motion for Enlargement filed by RUSSELL MOKHIBER. (Tankersley, Michael) (Entered: 10/24/2001)
2001-10-25ORDER - U.S. Department of Treasury's opposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer 3 is granted. The answer to the complaint shall be filed by no later than November 18, 2001. Motions terminated. () (GK, ) (Entered: 10/25/2001)
2001-11-135NOTICE to court concerning mail service at United States Attorney's Office by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (td, ) (Entered: 11/16/2001)
2001-11-196Federal defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (td, ) (Entered: 11/27/2001)
2001-12-178Calendar Entry, Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 1/25/2002 10:00 AM before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/22/2002. (clv, ) (Entered: 12/17/2001)
2001-12-179amended Calendar Entry, Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 1/25/2002 10:00 AM before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/22/2002. (clv, ) (Entered: 12/17/2001)
2002-01-2210MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Cohen, Vincent) (Entered: 01/22/2002)
2002-01-2511MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment on Count Three by RUSSELL MOKHIBER. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts As To Which There Is No Genuine Dispute# 2 Exhibit Ex. A, Letter of Jan. 18, 2002 from the Department of the Treasury Re: FOIA Request)(Tankersley, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2002)
2002-03-1112MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Cohen, Vincent) (Entered: 03/11/2002)
2002-03-1813Memorandum in Opposition to Motion re 12 Enlargment of Time to Respond To Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by RUSSELL MOKHIBER. (Tankersley, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2002)
2002-03-2714RESPONSE to Motion re 11 for partial summary judgment on count three filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (td, ) (Entered: 04/03/2002)
2002-04-0315ORDER granting Motion for partial summary judgment 11 , denying Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply 12 . Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 3, 2002. (Sullivan, Emmet) (Entered: 04/03/2002)
2002-04-1016ATTORNEY APPEARANCE. (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 04/10/2002)
2002-04-1717Consent MOTION to Continue the initial scheduling conference set for April 26, 2002 by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 04/17/2002)
2002-04-1718Consent MOTION to Continue with ORDER by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 04/17/2002)
2002-04-18ORDER granting Motion to Reschedule the Initial Scheduling Conference 17 18 . Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 18, 2002. The Initial Scheduling Conference is rescheduled to May 3, 2002, at 10:30a.m., in courtroom #1. (Sullivan, Emmet) (Entered: 04/18/2002)
2002-04-1919MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Tankersley, Michael) (Entered: 04/19/2002)
2002-05-03CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola for settlement. (cp, ) (Entered: 05/03/2002)
2002-05-0620SCHEDULING NOTICE: Status Conference set for 8/1/2002 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1.; case referred to Magistrate Judge Facciola for settlement purposes;. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on May 3, 2002. (clv, ) (Entered: 05/06/2002)
2002-08-01Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 8/1/2002 before Emmet G. Sullivan; no court date scheduled; (Court Reporter Frank Rangus.) (clv, ) (Entered: 08/01/2002)
2002-09-0621NOTICE of Filing Vaughn Index by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (mpt, ) (Entered: 09/09/2002)
2002-09-2722MOTION for Summary Judgment by RUSSELL MOKHIBER. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts# 2 Appendix Plaintiff's List of Challenged Exemption Claims# 3 Declaration of Russell Mokhiber# 4 Exhibit Exhibits to Declaration of Russell Mokhiber)(Tankersley, Michael) (Entered: 09/27/2002)
2002-10-3023MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 10/30/2002)
2002-11-0824Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [] To Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 11/08/2002)
2002-11-15ORDER granting Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply 24 . Defendant's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due November 20, 2002; Plaintiff's reply is due December 13, 2002, Defendant's Reply is due December 20, 2002. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on November 15, 2002. (GK, ) (Entered: 11/15/2002)
2002-11-15ORDER granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply 23 . Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on November 15, 2002. (GK, ) (Entered: 11/15/2002)
2002-11-2025MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY.Attachments: # 1 # 2 order# 3 Exhibit # 4 declaration)(td, ) (Entered: 11/21/2002)
2002-11-2026Memorandum in opposition to motion re 22 to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY . (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 declaration)(td, ) (Entered: 11/21/2002)
2002-12-1327Memorandum in opposition to motion re 25 and reply in support of motion re: 22 filed by RUSSELL MOKHIBER. (Tankersley, Michael) (Entered: 12/13/2002)
2002-12-2028REPLY in support of motion re 25 for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 12/20/2002)
2003-01-0729MOTION to Strike Declaration of Richard Newcomb by RUSSELL MOKHIBER. (Tankersley, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2003)
2003-01-1630First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 29 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Richard Newcomb by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 01/16/2003)
2003-01-22ORDER granting 30 Defendant's First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 29 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Richard Newcomb. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 22, 2003. (lcegs2) (Entered: 01/22/2003)
2003-02-0331Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 29 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Richard Newcomb by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 02/03/2003)
2003-02-04ORDER granting 31 Defendant's Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 29 MOTION to Strike. The response/reply is due February 7, 2003. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 4, 2003. (GK, ) (Entered: 02/04/2003)
2003-02-0732Memorandum in opposition to motion to strike re 29 filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Graham-Oliver, Heather) Modified on 2/10/2003 (rje, ). (Entered: 02/07/2003)
2003-02-1933REPLY in support of motion re 29 filed by RUSSELL MOKHIBER. (Tankersley, Michael) (Entered: 02/19/2003)
2003-09-2634ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion for Summary Judgment, granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion for Summary Judgment, and denying 29 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on September 26, 2003. (lcegs2) (Entered: 09/26/2003)
2003-10-3135MOTION for Leave to File Declaration of R. Richard Newcomb by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 )(Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 10/31/2003)
2003-11-03MINUTE ORDER granting 35 Motion for Leave to File Declaration.Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on November 3, 2003. (lcegs2) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
2003-11-0536MOTION for Summary Judgment on Factual Material Improperly Withheld Under the FOIA by RUSSELL MOKHIBER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tankersley, Michael) (Entered: 11/05/2003)
2003-11-1937Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment And Opposition to Plaintiff's renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 11/19/2003)
2003-11-2638REPLY in support of motion re 36 Motion for Summary Judgmenton Factual Material and Opposition to Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by RUSSELL MOKHIBER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tankersley, Michael) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
2003-12-0839REPLY in support of motion re 37 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 12/08/2003)
2004-01-0540NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Marcy Zieve on behalf of RUSSELL MOKHIBER (Zieve, Allison) (Entered: 01/05/2004)
2004-09-0941MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 36 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, denying 37 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on September 9, 2004. (lcegs2) (Entered: 09/09/2004)
2004-09-0942ORDER accompanying Memorandum Opinion directing entry of final judgment in favor of plaintiff and directing the Clerk of the Court to remove the case from the active calendar.Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on September 9, 2004. (lcegs2) (Entered: 09/09/2004)
2004-09-2143Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorney Fees And Costs by RUSSELL MOKHIBER. (Zieve, Allison) (Entered: 09/21/2004)
2004-09-21MINUTE ORDER granting 43 Motion for Extension of Time, until October 14, 2004, to File Motion for Attorney Fees And Costs.Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on September 21, 2004. (lcegs2) (Entered: 09/21/2004)
2004-10-0844MOTION to Stay re 41 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, 42 Order Pending Appeal by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 10/08/2004)
2004-10-12MINUTE ORDER granting 44 Defendent's Motion to Stay. The Court's 9/9/04 Order directing the release of documents is stayed pending possible appeal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on October 12, 2004. (lcegs2) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
2004-10-1445MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by RUSSELL MOKHIBER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Declaration of Allison Zieve# 3 Declaration of Michael Tankersley)(Zieve, Allison) (Entered: 10/14/2004)
2004-10-2746MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 45 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 10/27/2004)
2004-10-28MINUTE ORDER granting 46 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to 45 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs. Defendant's Response is due by 11/12/2004. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on October 28, 2004. (lcegs2) (Entered: 10/28/2004)
2004-11-0847NOTICE OF APPEAL by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 11/08/2004)
2004-11-0848NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 41 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, 42 Order by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY; (Fee not required) (td, ) (Entered: 11/09/2004)
2004-11-09Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 48 Notice of Appeal (td, ) (Entered: 11/09/2004)
2004-11-1249Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 45 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 11/12/2004)
2004-11-19MINUTE ORDER granting 49 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Defendant's Response shall be due 14 days after the resolution of the appeal in this matter. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on November 19, 2004. (lcegs2) (Entered: 11/19/2004)
2004-12-03USCA Case Number 04-5412 for 48 Notice of Appeal filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (zjsc) (Entered: 12/06/2004)
2004-12-3050ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to 48 Notice of Appeal filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY; It is hereby ordered that the appellant's motiion to dismiss appeal be granted; USCA#04-5412, (jsc) (Entered: 01/03/2005)
2005-01-1051NOTICE OF FILING by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY re 41 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, (Attachments: # 1 Index and Release Part I# 2 Release Part II# 3 Release Part III)(Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 01/10/2005)
2005-01-1252MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Petition For Attorney Fees by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
2005-01-21MINUTE ORDER granting 52 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees. Defendant's Response is due no later than 2/3/05. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 21, 2005. (lcegs2) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
2005-01-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 2/3/2005 (clv, ) (Entered: 01/24/2005)
2005-02-0253STIPULATION Of Settlement by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 02/02/2005)
2005-02-03MINUTE ORDER approving 53 Stipulation of Settlement. This case is dismissed with prejudice.Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 3, 2005. (lcegs2) (Entered: 02/03/2005)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff