Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePBN NEWS v. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2003cv02494
Date Filed2003-12-03
Date Closed2004-09-22
JudgeJudge Richard J. Leon
PlaintiffPBN NEWS
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantFOIA UNIT
DefendantROBERT CLINTON MORRIS Colonel
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2003-12-031COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, FOIA UNIT, ROBERT CLINTON MORRIS (Filing fee $ 150.) , filed by PBN NEWS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(jf, ) (Entered: 12/16/2003)
2003-12-03SUMMONS (5) Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ; FOIA UNIT ; ROBERT CLINTON MORRIS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, ) (Entered: 12/16/2003)
2003-12-032MOTION for Vaughn Index by PBN NEWS. (jf, ) (Entered: 12/16/2003)
2004-02-043MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, 2 MOTION Vaughn Index by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, FOIA UNIT, ROBERT CLINTON MORRIS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewenhaupt, Claes) (Entered: 02/04/2004)
2004-02-094ORDER granting 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, 2 MOTION Vaughn Index by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, FOIA UNIT, ROBERT CLINTON MORRIS. Defendants shall have until April 4, 2004 to file their motion, answer or otherwise respond. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/6/04. (whb) (Entered: 02/09/2004)
2004-04-055ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, FOIA UNIT.(Lewenhaupt, Claes) (Entered: 04/05/2004)
2004-04-056STATUS REPORT For Initial Scheduling Conference by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, FOIA UNIT, ROBERT CLINTON MORRIS. (Lewenhaupt, Claes) (Entered: 04/05/2004)
2004-04-057ANSWER to Complaint by ROBERT CLINTON MORRIS.(Lewenhaupt, Claes) (Entered: 04/05/2004)
2004-05-138MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, FOIA UNIT, ROBERT CLINTON MORRIS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewenhaupt, Claes) (Entered: 05/13/2004)
2004-05-26MINUTE ORDER granting 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, FOIA UNIT, ROBERT CLINTON MORRIS until May 28, 2004. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/26/2004. (lcrjl2, ) (Entered: 05/26/2004)
2004-05-289MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, FOIA UNIT, ROBERT CLINTON MORRIS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DEX 1 - Declaration of Faye C. Wrench# 2 Exhibit Exhibit A- FOIA Request# 3 Exhibit Exhibit B-FOIA Office Memo# 4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Chief of Staff Tasking Slip# 5 Exhibit Exhibit D-Declaration of Walter Sokalski# 6 Exhibit Exhibit E-Declaration of Wesley Moore# 7 Exhibit Exhibit F- Index FOIA Req # 03-81 & 03-82# 8 Exhibit Exhibit G (Part 1) -Redacted Emails# 9 Exhibit Exhibit G (Part 2) - Redacted Emails# 10 Exhibit Exhibit G (Part 3) - Redacted Emails# 11 Exhibit Exhibit G (Part 4). - Redacted Emails# 12 Exhibit Exhibit H - No Record Cert# 13 Exhibit Exhibit I - OSD Memo# 14 Exhibit Exhibit J - U.S. Sp. Op. Cmd# 15 Exhibit Exhibit K - 2nd FOIA Req# 16 Exhibit Exhibit L - Protocol No Rcd. Cert.# 17 Exhibit Exhibit M - Memo For Cdr# 18 Exhibit Exhibit N - Index FOIA Req # 03-82# 19 Exhibit Exhibit O - Info Syst. No Rcd Cert.# 20 Exhibit Exhibit P - 2nd FOIA Req# 21 Exhibit Exhibit Q- 2nd FOIA Req-Aug 16# 22 Exhibit Exhibit R - Protocol No Rec. Cert# 23 Exhibit Exhibit S - Sp. Op. Cmd. No Rec. Cert.# 24 Exhibit Exhibit T - Declaration of William Sutton# 25 Exhibit Exhibit U - Index Phone Rcds# 26 Exhibit Exhibit V - Redacted Phone Logs# 27 Exhibit Exhibit W - Cost Est.# 28 Exhibit Exhibit X - Inv. Phone List# 29 Exhibit Exhibit Y - Red. Phone Rec# 30 Exhibit DEX 2 - Letter to Plaintiff# 31 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewenhaupt, Claes) (Entered: 05/28/2004)
2004-07-1210ATTORNEY APPEARANCE. (Corn, Gary) (Entered: 07/12/2004)
2004-08-1811MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, FOIA UNIT, ROBERT CLINTON MORRIS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Corn, Gary) (Entered: 08/18/2004)
2004-08-1912ORDERED that plainitff shall respond to the Defendant's motion no later than September 20, 2004. If the plaintiff fails to respond, the Court may treat the motion as conceded and dismiss the complaint against the defendant . Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/18/04. (whb) (Entered: 08/19/2004)
2004-09-2213ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/21/04. (whb) (Entered: 09/22/2004)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff