Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2013cv03595
Date Filed2013-05-29
Date Closed2013-09-30
JudgeJudge Paul A. Crotty
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2013-05-291COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401068503)Document filed by The New York Times Company.(mqu) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
2013-05-29SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (mqu) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
2013-05-29Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. (mqu) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
2013-05-29Case Designated ECF. (mqu) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
2013-05-302CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. United States Department of Justice served on 5/30/2012, answer due 6/20/2012. Service was made by mail. Document filed by The New York Times Company. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
2013-06-213ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from David McCraw dated 6/20/2013 re: Counsel for plaintiff writes on behalf of both parties to request that Defendant's time to answer be extended to August 1, 2013. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED.United States Department of Justice answer due 8/1/2013. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 6/21/2013) (rsh) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
2013-07-314ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Jean-David Barnea dated 7/30/2013 re: Counsel writes on behalf of both parties to request a further extension of the time for defendant the Department of Justice to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint, to September 6, 2013. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. United States Department of Justice answer due 9/6/2013. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 7/31/2013) (rsh) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
2013-09-065LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from AUSA Jean-David Barnea dated 9/6/13. Document filed by United States Department of Justice.(Barnea, Jean-David) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
2013-09-066ORDER granting 5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 5 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from AUSA Jean-David Barnea dated 9/6/1. United States Department of Justice answer due 10/7/2013 (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
2013-09-307STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, as follows: The documents produced by DOJ fully settle any and all claims Plaintiff now has or may hereafter acquire against DOJ or the United States of America ("United States"), or any department, agency, officer, or employee of DOJ and/or the United States, related to or arising out of Plaintiff's FOIA Request at issue in this action. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(2), this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each side shall bear its own attorneys' fees and litigation costs in this action. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 9/30/2013) (rsh) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff