Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California et al v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2012cv03728
Date Filed2012-07-17
Date Closed2016-01-07
JudgeHon. Susan Illston
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California
PlaintiffSan Francisco Bay Guardian
TERMINATED: 02/02/2015
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
AppealNinth Circuit 15-15771
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [54]
FOIA Project Annotation: The court ruled that while the FBI has justified its withholding under Exemption 1 (national security) of records pertaining to various Occupy movements in California, it still has not sufficiently supported many of its Exemption 7 (law enforcement records) claims and must provide the disputed records for in camera review as well as providing a more detailed public affidavit. Judge Susan Illston explained that after reviewing the agency's in camera declaration she was satisfied that a two-page document had been properly classified. But she disagreed with the agency's contention that "ex parte, in camera review of the declarations is appropriate. The declaration does not appear to reveal the very information the government claims is exempt from disclosure" and the agency must either file a public affidavit or provide another ex parte in camera declaration that "reveals the very information this is exempt from disclosure." The FBI claimed the records qualified as law enforcement records because they dealt with possible terrorist activities. Illston found the agency still had not adequately provided a rational nexus tying the records to a terrorist investigation and pointed out that "the Court rejects the argument presented by the FBI at the hearing that it has established a sufficient nexus simply because the documents are contained in a counter terrorism database regardless of whether the documents are actually related to any unlawful activity. . . [E]ven if the documents are contained in a counter terrorism database, the FBI must still provide the Court with a sufficient description of the alleged criminal activity to establish the applicability of Exemption 7." While she agreed that the names of third parties in the records were protected under Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records), she faulted the agency for failing to show that non-exempt information could not be reasonably segregated and released. She observed that "a blanket statement that the documents are not segregable or that all reasonably segregable information has been released is insufficient to satisfy the government's burden." She accepted the FBI's Exemption 7(D) (confidential sources) claims as they pertained to explicit assurances of confidentiality, but noted that its showing of implicit assurances fell short. She pointed out that "the FBI does not explain what it means by the term 'organized violent groups.' The declaration states that the individuals came in contact with criminal elements, but the FBI does not explain what types of criminals they are, whether they are violent, or whether they would retaliate against an individual for disclosing information to law enforcement." The FBI claimed Exemption 7(E) (investigative methods and techniques) protected database collection, but Illston agreed with the plaintiffs that they had provided evidence showing the techniques were publicly known. She observed that "the FBI contends that it is not seeking to protect the publicly available criteria for classifying suspicious activity that is referenced in plaintiffs' motion; it is only withholding information that is not publicly known about the system of data collection. However, this specificity is not contained in the FBI's declaration. The declaration simply provides a blanket statement that the characteristics and data collected are not known and the way the FBI apples this information is not known. These statements are contradicted by plaintiffs' evidence."
Issues: Exemption 7(C) - Invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records, Exemption 7(D) - Assurance of confidentiality - Implicit, Exemption 7(E) - Unknown to public, Litigation - In camera review, Exemption 7 - Threshold, Exemption 1
Opinion/Order [62]
Opinion/Order [64]
Opinion/Order [65]
Opinion/Order [67]
FOIA Project Annotation: A federal court in California has ruled that almost all of the FBI's exemption claims for 27 remaining documents concerning Occupy movements in California are proper. While finding in her prior ruling that many of the agency's claims might well be applicable, Judge Susan Illston had ordered an in camera review of the records because the agency's justifications were not sufficient. However, after reviewing the documents in camera, Illston agreed, approving the use of various subparts of Exemption 7 (law enforcement records). The FBI had provided a chart showing why its Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records) applied to names of third parties and local law enforcement officers. Illston, however, noted that "while this information is helpful, it still fails, standing alone, to show why it would be reasonable to conclude that the third parties might be subject to retaliation, harassment, or other negative consequences if their names are revealed, and why the release of their names would not shed any light on the FBI's performance of its statutory duties." But after reviewing the documents she found all the agency's claims appropriate. She also agreed with the agency's claims under Exemption 7(A) (interference with law enforcement investigation or proceedings) and Exemption 7(D) (confidential sources). She rejected the agency's claims under Exemption 7(E) (investigative methods and techniques), observing that "here, the government's failure to meet its burden through public declarations appears to be symptomatic of the fact that the claimed exemption simply does not apply to the withheld material."
Issues: Litigation - In camera review, Exemption 7
Opinion/Order [71]
Opinion/Order [75]
User-contributed Documents
 Declaration of David Hardy
Declaration of David Hardy
Declaration of Linda Lye
Declaration of Peter J. Hatch
Declaration of Robert P. Hayes
Exhibit C to Plaintiff's Declaration
Exhibit M-3 to Plaintiff's Declaration
Exhibit M-4 to Plaintiff's Declaration
Exhibit N-O to Plaintiff's Declaration
Exhibits A and B to Plaintiff's Declaration
Exhibits D-L to Plaintiff's Declaration
FBI's Motion for Summary Judgement
FBI's Reply Brief
Order on Summary Judgment
Plaintiff's Notice of Cross-Motion and Opposition
Plaintiff's Reply
Stipulation Re: Processing of Coast Guard Documents etc.
Supplemental Declaration of Linda Lye in Support
Third Declaration of David M. Hardy
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2012-07-171COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611076469.). Filed bySan Francisco Bay Guardian, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
2012-07-172Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
2012-07-173ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2012 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
2012-07-174Certificate of Interested Entities by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, San Francisco Bay Guardian (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
2012-07-205SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by San Francisco Bay Guardian, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 7/17/2012, answer due 8/16/2012. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 7/20/2012) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
2012-08-066STIPULATION Re Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Attestation of Concurrence in Filing)(Walker, Juan) (Filed on 8/6/2012) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
2012-08-307CLERK'S NOTICE TO PARTIES Re: Consent or Declination to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2012) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
2012-08-318NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Brad Prescott Rosenberg (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 8/31/2012) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
2012-08-319ANSWER to Complaint byFederal Bureau of Investigation. (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 8/31/2012) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
2012-09-1210CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Federal Bureau of Investigation.. (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 9/12/2012) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
2012-09-1211CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, San Francisco Bay Guardian.. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 9/12/2012) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
2012-09-1212CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
2012-09-1413ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on September 14, 2012. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
2012-09-2714ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 9/27/2012) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
2012-10-1115CLERKS NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/23/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
2012-10-1116JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
2012-10-1217ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 10/12/2012) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
2012-10-1218NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 10/12/2012) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
2012-10-1519ADR Clerk Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 10/19/12 at 2:00 p.m. Pacific. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
2012-10-1620CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 10/16/2012) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
2012-10-19ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by HAH on 10/19/12. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
2012-10-2521Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/23/2012 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 10/25/2012). Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. The Court ordered that this case be exempt from the ADR program. (Court Reporter N/A.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/25/2012) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
2012-12-2122MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 1/18/2013. Replies due by 2/15/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David M. Hardy, # 2 Declaration of Peter J. Hatch, # 3 Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 12/21/2012) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
2013-01-1823Cross MOTION for Summary Adudication and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 2/15/2013. Replies due by 3/1/2013. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 1/18/2013) Modified on 3/4/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/18/2013)
2013-01-1824Declaration of Linda Lye in Support of 23 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D-L, # 4 Exhibit M-1, # 5 Exhibit M-2, # 6 Exhibit M-3, # 7 Exhibit M-4, # 8 Exhibit N-O)(Related document(s) 23 ) (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 1/18/2013) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
2013-01-1825Proposed Order re 23 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 1/18/2013) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
2013-02-1526REPLY in support of (re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 23 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment ) filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Supplemental) of David M. Hardy)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 2/15/2013) Modified on 2/19/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/15/2013)
2013-02-2627MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed Motion and [Proposed] Order Re Page Limits For Plaintiffs' Reply filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 2/26/2013) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
2013-02-2828ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 27 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
2013-03-0129REPLY (re 23 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment ) filed byAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 3/1/2013) Modified on 3/4/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/01/2013)
2013-03-0130Supplemental Declaration of Linda Lye in Support of 23 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Related document(s) 22 , 23 ) (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 3/1/2013) Modified on 3/4/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/01/2013)
2013-03-1931Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/15/2013 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 3/19/2013). Motions for Summary Judgment are deemed submitted. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/19/2013) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
2013-07-0132ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 22 , 23 . Within 30 days of the date of this order, defendant shall supplement its declaration. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/1/2013) Modified on 7/2/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/01/2013)
2013-07-3133NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Investigation re 32 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, Stipulation re Processing of Coast Guard Documents and the Filing of a JCMS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert P. Hayes)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 7/31/2013) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
2013-07-3134NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Investigation re 32 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, re Filing of Third Declaration of David M. Hardy (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Third) of David M. Hardy)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 7/31/2013) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
2013-07-3135NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Investigation re 32 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, re Lodging of In-Camera, Ex Parte Declaration of David M. Hardy (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 7/31/2013) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
2013-08-1436CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 8/14/2013) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
2013-08-2137CLERKS NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. A joint case management conference statement shall be filed one week prior to the conference. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
2013-09-1338JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 9/13/2013) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
2013-09-2339Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/20/2013 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 9/23/2013). Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (Court Reporter n/a.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/23/2013) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
2013-10-1540Consent MOTION to Stay Due to Lapse in Appropriations filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. Responses due by 10/15/2013. Replies due by 10/15/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 10/15/2013) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
2013-10-1641ORDER STAYING CASE, Motions terminated: 40 Consent MOTION to Stay Due to Lapse in Appropriations filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/15/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
2013-10-2342JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 10/23/2013) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
2013-10-2543Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 11/15/2013. Replies due by 12/6/2013. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 10/25/2013) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
2013-10-2544Third Declaration of Linda Lye in Support of 43 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 43 ) (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 10/25/2013) Modified on 10/28/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/25/2013)
2013-10-2545Proposed Order re 43 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 10/25/2013) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
2013-10-2846ORDER setting hearing on motion 12/20/13. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/24/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
2013-10-28Set/Reset Deadlines as to 43 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
2013-11-1547Second MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to 43 Plaintiffs' Second Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/6/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Fourth) of David M. Hardy, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 11/15/2013) Modified on 11/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/15/2013)
2013-12-0648REPLY (re 47 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Second Motion for Summary Judgment , 43 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, San Francisco Bay Guardian. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 12/6/2013) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
2013-12-0649Declaration in Support of 48 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, San Francisco Bay Guardian. (Related document(s) 48 ) (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 12/6/2013) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
2013-12-2050Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/20/2013 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 12/20/2013). Motions are deemed submitted (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/20/2013) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
2014-01-1451NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Investigation re 50 Motion Hearing, 35 Notice (Other) of Public Filing of Declaration of David M. Hardy That Had Previously Been Filed Ex Parte, In Camera (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David M. Hardy)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 1/14/2014) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
2014-04-2352NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Investigation of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit : EFF v. DHS Decision)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 4/23/2014) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
2014-04-2453RESPONSE to re 52 Notice of Supplemental Authorities and [52-1] by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, San Francisco Bay Guardian. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 4/24/2014) Modified on 4/25/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/24/2014)
2014-09-1654ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 43 47 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/16/2014) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
2014-09-1655CLERK'S NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Counsel shall file a joint case management conference statement one week prior to the conference. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
2014-10-0756MOTION re: Clarification of the Court's Order re 54 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. Responses due by 10/14/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brad P. Rosenberg, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 10/7/2014) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
2014-10-1657NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Investigation of Filing of Fifth Declaration of David M. Hardy, Submission of Documents for In-Camera Review, and Lodging of Classified Documents with the Court Security Officer (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Fifth) of David M. Hardy)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 10/16/2014) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
2014-11-1458JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 11/14/2014) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
2014-11-2559Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Susan Illston: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/21/2014. (Date Filed: 11/25/2014) Further Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.Court Reporter Name or FTR Time n/a. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
2015-01-2960STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Continuance of CMC filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, San Francisco Bay Guardian. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 1/29/2015) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
2015-01-2961STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Voluntary Dismissal of Pltf SF Bay Guardian filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, San Francisco Bay Guardian. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 1/29/2015) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
2015-02-0262***ERRONEOUS ATTACHMETN*** ORDER, Motions terminated: 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Continuance of CMC filed by San Francisco Bay Guardian, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/2/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015) Modified on 2/2/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/02/2015)
2015-02-0263ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 61 Stipulation re Voluntary Dismissal of Pltf SF Bay Guardian (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2015: # 1 Appendix Signed Order) (tfS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/02/2015)
2015-02-0364ORDER re 60 : Further Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/2/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015) Modified on 2/4/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/03/2015)
2015-02-1765ORDER RE: IN CAMERA REVIEW 43 , 47 , 56 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/17/2015) Modified on 2/18/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/17/2015)
2015-03-0666JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 3/6/2015) (Entered: 03/06/2015)
2015-03-1067ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/10/2015) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
2015-03-10Set/Reset Hearing Further Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2015) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
2015-04-1768NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 15-15771 filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. Appeal of Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 65 (Appeal fee FEE WAIVED.) (Attachments: # 1 Rule 3-2 Representation Statement)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 4/17/2015) Modified on 4/22/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/17/2015)
2015-04-1769USCA Case Number 15-15771 USCA for 68 Notice of Appeal, filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2015) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
2015-05-0870JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 5/8/2015) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
2015-05-1471ORDER vacating 5/15/15 case management conference and requiring a joint statement every 90 days. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/14/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2015) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
2015-05-1872NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Investigation of No Transcript Necessary (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 5/18/2015) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
2015-08-1173CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 8/11/2015) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
2016-01-0576Mandate/ORDER of USCA as to 68 Notice of Appeal: Appellants motion to dismiss this appeal is granted. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court.(ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
2016-01-0674STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of dismissal with prejudice filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 1/6/2016) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
2016-01-0775ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/7/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016) Modified on 1/8/2016 (ysS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/07/2016)
2016-01-0877CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel RE 68 Notice of Appeal. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff