Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTAX ANALYSTS v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2013cv01238
Date Filed2013-08-13
Date Closed2014-03-18
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffTAX ANALYSTS
Case DescriptionTax Analysts submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for training materials used to train employees at the tax exempt determination office in Cincinnati. Tax Analysts also requested expedited processing, which was granted. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Tax Analysts filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2013-08-131COMPLAINT TAX ANALYSTS against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3432651) filed by TAX ANALYSTS.(Hitchcock, Cornish) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
2013-08-132CIVIL COVER SHEET TAX ANALYSTS by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE re 1 Complaint filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by TAX ANALYSTS.(Hitchcock, Cornish) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
2013-08-133REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to IRS by TAX ANALYSTS re 1 Complaint filed by TAX ANALYSTS. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by TAX ANALYSTS. (Attachments: # 1 Summons to US Attorney, # 2 Summons to Attorney General)(Hitchcock, Cornish) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
2013-08-13Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (kb) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
2013-08-144ELECTRONIC SUMMONS (2) Issued as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Consent Form, # 3 Non Consent Form)(kb) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
2013-08-145REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to Attorney General by TAX ANALYSTS re 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA filed by TAX ANALYSTS. Related document: 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA.(Hitchcock, Cornish) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
2013-08-156MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by TAX ANALYSTS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hitchcock, Cornish) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
2013-08-157ELECTRONIC SUMMONS (1) Issued as to U.S. Attorney General. (znmw, ) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
2013-08-15MINUTE ORDER In light of the plaintiff's 6 motion for a preliminary injunction, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a proposed briefing schedule by 8/21/13. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/15/13. (TA) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
2013-08-198NOTICE of Appearance by Yonatan Gelblum on behalf of INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Gelblum, Yonatan) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
2013-08-209NOTICE (Joint Briefing Schedule by the Parties) by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE re Order, (Gelblum, Yonatan) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
2013-08-20MINUTE ORDER In light of the parties' proposed briefing schedule regarding 6 the plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant's opposition shall be filed by 9/13/13, and that the plaintiff's reply shall be filed by 9/18/13. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/20/13. (TA) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
2013-08-21Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 9/13/2013; Replies due by 9/18/2013. (tj ) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
2013-08-2610ENTERED IN ERROR.....AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by TAX ANALYSTS. (Hitchcock, Cornish) Modified on 8/27/2013 (znmw, ). (Entered: 08/26/2013)
2013-08-2711RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/22/2013. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/21/2013.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/21/2013., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 8/20/2013. (znmw, ) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
2013-08-27NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry 10 Affidavit was entered in error (incorrect event) and was refiled as Docket Entry 11 Return of Service/Affidavit. (znmw, ) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
2013-09-1212Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gelblum, Yonatan) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
2013-09-13MINUTE ORDER Upon consideration of 12 the defendant's consent motion for an extension of time to file its opposition to the plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction by 10/14/13, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/13/13. (TA) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
2013-10-0213ANSWER to Complaint by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.(Gelblum, Yonatan) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
2013-10-0814Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction due to lapse in appropriations by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gelblum, Yonatan) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
2013-10-10MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties' 14 consent motion for extension of time is GRANTED and it is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its opposition to plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction twenty (20) calendar days after funding is restored to the Department of Justice and Internal Revenue Service, and that the plaintiff shall have seven (7) calendar days thereafter in which to file a reply. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/10/13. (lcrc1) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
2013-11-0515Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gelblum, Yonatan) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
2013-11-05MINUTE ORDER granting 15 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. It is hereby ORDERED that the Defendant shall have through November 27, 2013, to file an opposition to Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction, and that Plaintiff shall have until December 4, 2013, to file a reply. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/05/2013. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
2013-11-2716Cross MOTION to Stay re 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion to Stay Proceedings until January 15, 2014 by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas Kane, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Yonatan Gelblum, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Gelblum, Yonatan) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
2013-11-2717Memorandum in opposition to re 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and in Support of Cross Motion for Stay filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas Kane, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Declaration of Yonatan Gelblum)(Gelblum, Yonatan) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
2013-12-0618Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 Cross MOTION to Stay re 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion to Stay Proceedings until January 15, 2014 and as to 17 opposition to 6 by TAX ANALYSTS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hitchcock, Cornish) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
2013-12-09MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall file its opposition motion on or before December 19, 2013. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/9/2013. (lcrc1) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
2013-12-1919Memorandum in opposition to re 16 Cross MOTION to Stay re 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion to Stay Proceedings until January 15, 2014 filed by TAX ANALYSTS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hitchcock, Cornish) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
2013-12-1920REPLY to opposition to motion re 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by TAX ANALYSTS. (See Docket Entry 19 to view document). (znmw, ) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
2013-12-20MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before January 6, 2014, updating the Court on the IRS's production of documents. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/20/2013. (lcrc1) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
2013-12-2721REPLY to opposition to motion re 16 Cross MOTION to Stay re 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion to Stay Proceedings until January 15, 2014 filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Gelblum, Yonatan) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
2014-01-0622STATUS REPORT FILED JOINTLY BY THE PARTIES by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Gelblum, Yonatan) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
2014-01-0723ORDER. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/7/2014. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
2014-01-08Set Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/5/2014 (tj) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
2014-02-0524STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report & Stipulation by the Parties by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Gelblum, Yonatan) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
2014-02-06MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report with the Court on or before February 19, 2014. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/6/2014. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
2014-02-1925STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report of the Parties with Proposed Order) by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Gelblum, Yonatan) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
2014-02-20MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a proposed briefing schedule on attorney's fees on or before March 12, 2014. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/20/2014. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
2014-03-1226STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report of the Parties with Proposed Order) by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Gelblum, Yonatan) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
2014-03-12MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 26 joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit either a stipulation or a proposed briefing schedule on attorney's fees on or before March 17, 2014. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 03/12/2014. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
2014-03-1827STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Gelblum, Yonatan) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff