Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2013cv01324
Date Filed2013-09-02
Date Closed2015-05-14
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
Case DescriptionJournalist Jason Leopold submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for a copy of the executive summary of the Senate Select Committee on Intelligence's report on torture. He also requested expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Opinion/Order [42]
FOIA Project Annotation: In a challenge by journalist Jason Leopold to redactions of various costs from the publicly disclosed executive summary of the Senate Intelligence Committee report on the CIA's use of detention and interrogation techniques, Judge James Boasberg has ruled that the redactions were appropriate under Exemption 1 (national security) and Exemption 3 (other statutes). After the executive summary of the Senate Intelligence Committee report was made public with redactions, Leopold sued the CIA challenging redactions concerning the cost of CIA detention facilities abroad, amounts paid to unknown countries, the size of monetary cuts to CIA intelligence programs, sums given to previously detained individuals, and compensation for medical services. Leopold argued the agency should have been required to provide a separate explanation for each redaction. Boasberg disagreed, noting that the CIA's affidavits "read in conjunction with the released portions of the Executive Summary, provide sufficient detail for Leopold and the Court to evaluate whether they fall within the scope of Exemptions 1 and 3. The content of the information withheld is clear, as evidenced by Leopold's own rather specific articulation of the expenditures he wishes to unveil." The CIA had cited Section 102A(i)(1) of the National Security Act of 1947, which protects intelligence sources and methods, as the basis for its redactions under Exemption 3. The agency argued that disclosure would reveal the funding priorities of the CIA and that "disclosing the amounts of these various expenditures could provide insight to adversaries as to the resources available to, and by extension the capabilities of, the Agency" and that "in some cases, the amount of money spent for a given activity could allow for the identification of the foreign country that provided assistance to the CIA." Indicating that he found "this explanation to be reasonable," Boasberg observed that "a trained intelligence analyst might, for instance, be able to deduce the relative importance that the CIA places on each detainee or the interrogation methods that were applied from the amounts spent on his medical treatment or given to him as compensation." Leopold argued that the link between the expenditures and the agency's intelligence priorities was too tenuous. But Boasberg pointed out that "in essence, Leopold asks the Court to credit his judgment about the effects of disclosure over those of the agency. This is something it clearly cannot do." He added that "the Court, additionally, sees no principled reason to find that only actual expenditures, as opposed to proposed expenditures, could reveal information about the agency's sources and methods. It would seem entirely plausible, for instance, that the proposed expenditures related to a CIA facility could just as easily reveal sensitive information about its location, purpose, and methods." Leopold claimed that disclosure of some expenditures cast doubt on the need to withhold other cost data. Boasberg noted that "far from casting doubt on the Agency's judgments about which sums could lead to the unauthorized disclosure of its sources and methods, the release of other expenditures suggests that the CIA has only withheld those that would unjustifiably compromise our national security." Leopold also contended the agency had not shown how the expenditures related to foreign relations as required under the Executive Order on Classification. Boasberg observed that "it seems rather clear that the expenditures at issue in this caseā€"which related to the United States' interrogation and detention activities in foreign countries to extract information from foreign nationalsā€"pertain to its foreign activities and relations. Despite having access to the unredacted portions of the Executive Summary, moreover, which indicate the nature of the redacted expenditures, Plaintiff has not pointed to any particular expenditures that he believes do not properly fall within this category."
Issues: Exemption 1 - Properly classified, Exemption 3 - Statutory prohibition of disclosure
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2013-09-021COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3452752) filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney's Office, # 3 Summons US Department of Justice)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/02/2013)
2013-09-022WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO DOCKET ENTRY NO. 11 . . . . .MOTION for Summary Judgment by JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit 2 - USPS Tracking, # 3 Declaration Jason Leopold, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Statement of Facts)(Light, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/14/2013 (td, ). (Entered: 09/02/2013)
2013-09-03Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (md, ) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
2013-09-033ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED (2) as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons 2nd, # 2 Notice of Consent, # 3 Consent Form)(md, ) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
2013-09-034CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JASON LEOPOLD re 2 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
2013-09-035RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/03/2013. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
2013-09-036RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/3/2013. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/3/2013. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
2013-09-207WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO DOCKET ENTRY NO. 11 . . . . . MOTION for Order to Deem Admitted Facts Submitted with Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, and Request for Ruling by JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/14/2013 (td, ). (Entered: 09/20/2013)
2013-10-038NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J. Shapiro on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Shapiro, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
2013-10-039Consent MOTION to Stay by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
2013-10-03MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion to Stay. Upon consideration of Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Stay of Proceedings, it is hereby ORDERED that all proceedings in this case are stayed until thirty (30) days after Congress has restored appropriations to the Department of Justice. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/03/2013. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
2013-11-0110NOTICE of Appearance by Vesper Mei on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Mei, Vesper) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
2013-11-1311NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by JASON LEOPOLD re 2 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 7 MOTION for Order to Deem Admitted Facts Submitted with Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, and Request for Ruling (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
2013-11-1312Consent MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
2013-11-14MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to File. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave is GRANTED, and the First Amended Complaint is deemed FILED. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/14/2013. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
2013-11-1413First AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by JASON LEOPOLD.(td, ) Modified text to add "First" on 11/14/2013 (td, ). (Entered: 11/14/2013)
2013-11-2614ANSWER to 13 Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Related document: 13 Amended Complaint filed by JASON LEOPOLD.(Mei, Vesper) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
2013-12-0215ORDER directing the parties to consult and file a joint proposed briefing schedule on or before December 16, 2013. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/2/2013. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
2013-12-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint proposed briefing schedule due by 12/16/2013. (tg, ) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
2013-12-1616MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Mei, Vesper) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
2013-12-16MINUTE ORDER: As the Court agrees with Defendant that the wiser course is to consider first whether the document at issue is subject to FOIA, the Court ORDERS that the parties brief that issue under the following timetable: 1) Defendant's Motion due January 24, 2014, 2) Plaintiff's Opposition due February 14, 2014, and 3) Defendant's Reply due February 28, 2014. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/16/2013. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
2013-12-17ENTERED IN ERROR.....Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Motion due 2/24/2014; Plaintiff's Opposition due 2/14/2014; and Defendant's Reply due 2/28/2014. (ad) Modified on 1/23/2014 (ad). (Entered: 12/17/2013)
2014-01-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Motion due by 1/24/2014; Plaintiff's Opposition due by 2/14/2014; and Defendant's Reply due by 2/28/2014. (ad) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
2014-01-23NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re Set/Reset Deadlines was entered in error because the deadline for the Defendant's Motion was incorrect. (ad) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
2014-01-2417MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit of Vanessa Brinkmann, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Mei, Vesper) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
2014-02-1218Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
2014-02-12MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: Upon consideration of the Motion, the Court hereby ORDERS that the Motion is GRANTED; Plaintiff shall file his opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on or before February 18, 2014, and Defendant shall file its reply on or before March 4, 2014. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/12/2014. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
2014-02-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall file his opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on or before 2/18/2014, and Defendant shall file its reply on or before 3/4/2014. (ad) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
2014-02-1819Memorandum in opposition to re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Declaration Leon Panetta, # 14 Declaration Steven Aftergood, # 15 Text of Proposed Order, # 16 Statement of Facts)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
2014-03-0220Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Reply by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mei, Vesper) (Entered: 03/02/2014)
2014-03-0421NOTICE by JASON LEOPOLD re 19 Memorandum in Opposition, (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
2014-03-04MINUTE ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time. Upon consideration of Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Two-Day Extension of Time, the motion is GRANTED, and it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Reply in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss is to be filed by March 6, 2014. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/4/2014. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
2014-03-04Set/Reset Deadline: Defendant's Reply in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss is to be filed by 3/6/2014. (ad) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
2014-03-0622REPLY to opposition to motion re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Mei, Vesper) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
2014-04-09MINUTE ORDER: In light of the SSCI's decision to submit the Report's executive summary, findings, and conclusions to the White House for declassification review, the Court ORDERS that a conference call is set for Friday, April 11, 2014, at 11:30 a.m. The parties in this and the companion case, No. 13-cv-1870, shall jointly call Chambers at (202) 354-3300 at the appointed time and should be prepared to discuss whether the Court should proceed to consider the pending motions at this time or wait until the declassification process concludes. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/9/14. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
2014-04-10MINUTE ORDER rescheduling conference call. It is hereby ORDERED that the conference call previously scheduled for Friday, April 11, 2014, at 11:30 a.m. will now be held on Monday, April 14, 2014, at 10:30 a.m. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall jointly call Chambers at (202) 354-3300 at that time. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/10/2014. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
2014-04-14Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Telephone Conference held on 4/14/2014. (ad) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
2014-04-14MINUTE ORDER: As agreed upon in today's conference call among the parties in case nos. 13-1324 and 13-1870, the Court ORDERS that: 1) As a result of pending declassification decisions, the motions to dismiss concerning whether the subject documents are "agency records" shall be held in abeyance until a further status conference among the parties; and 2) All parties shall appear for such status conference on May 29, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 19. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/14/14. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
2014-04-14Set/Reset Hearing: A Status Conference is set for 5/29/2014 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 19 before Judge James E. Boasberg. (ad) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
2014-05-29MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at today's status hearing, the Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file a status report by June 20, 2014, providing a date for the completion of processing of the Executive Summary of the SSCI Report. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/29/14. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
2014-05-29Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Status Conference held on 5/29/2014. (Defendant shall file a status report by 6/20/2014, providing a date for the completion of processing of the Executive Summary of the SSCI Report). (Court Reporter Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller) (ad) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
2014-06-1923CONSENT TO THE FILING OF AN AMENDED COMPLAINT by JASON LEOPOLD. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
2014-06-1924AMENDED COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Summons CIA)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
2014-06-2025STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Mei, Vesper) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
2014-07-2126ANSWER to 24 Amended Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. Related document: 24 Amended Complaint filed by JASON LEOPOLD.(Mei, Vesper) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
2014-08-14MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall appear for a status conference in Case Nos. 13-1324, 13-1870, and 14-48 on September 4, 2014, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/14/2014. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
2014-08-14Set/Reset Hearing: A Status Conference is set for 9/04/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 19 before Judge James E. Boasberg in case nos. 13cv1324, 13cv1870, and 14cv048. (ad) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
2014-08-2727Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to process documents by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mei, Vesper) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
2014-08-28MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's Unopposed 27 Motion for Extension of Time to Process Documents. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall complete processing on or before September 29, 2014. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/28/14. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
2014-08-28Set/Reset Deadline: The Defendant shall complete processing on or before 9/29/2014. (ad) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
2014-09-04Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Status Conference held on 9/4/2014. A combined Status Conference for case numbers 13-cv-1870, 13-cv-1324, and 14-cv-0048 is scheduled 10/7/2014 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 19 before Judge James E. Boasberg. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (jth) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
2014-09-04MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at today's status hearing in case nos. 13-1324, 13-1870, and 14-48, the Court ORDERS that: 1) The request in 13-1324 is confined to the Executive Summary of the SSCI Report; 2) In 13-1324, Defendant's 17 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot with consent; 3) In 13-1870, Defendant's 17 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot with consent; and 4) A further status hearing in all three cases shall take place on October 7, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/4/14. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
2014-09-2528MOTION for Extension of Time to Process Documents by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mei, Vesper) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
2014-10-07MINUTE ORDER: As discussed in today's status conference in Nos. 13-1324, 13-1870, and 14-48, the Court ORDERS that: 1) The Government's Motions for Extension are GRANTED; 2) The ACLU need not file an additional amended complaint or additional FOIA request in 13-1870; and 3) Summary judgment briefing in all cases will comply with the following schedule: Government's Motion due December 5, 2014, Plaintiffs' Opposition and Cross-Motion due January 9, 2015; Government's Opposition and Reply due January 30, 2015, and Plaintiffs' Reply due February 13, 2015. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/7/14. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
2014-10-07Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Status Conference held on 10/7/2014. (Government's Motion due 12/05/2014, Plaintiffs' Opposition and Cross-Motion due 1/09/2015; Government's Opposition and Reply due 1/30/2015, and Plaintiffs' Reply due 2/13/2015). (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (ad) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
2014-10-2829MOTION for Extension of Time to Process Documents by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mei, Vesper) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
2014-10-31MINUTE ORDER: Defendants have moved for a further extension. If Plaintiff opposes the resolution of Defendants' similar motion in No. 13-1870, see Minute Order of Oct. 31, 2014, he shall file such opposition by November 3, 2014. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/31/14. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
2014-10-31Set/Reset Deadline: If Plaintiff opposes the resolution of Defendants' similar motion in No. 13-1870, see Minute Order of Oct. 31, 2014, he shall file such opposition by 11/3/2014. (ad) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
2014-11-0330Memorandum in opposition to re 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to Process Documents filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
2014-11-19MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant's 29 Motion for Extension is GRANTED; 2) The deadlines for summary judgment set forth in the Court's Minute Order of October 7, 2014, will govern even if no release has been made by December 5, 2014, and 3) Defendant shall file a status report with the Court by December 8, 2014, regarding the release of the Executive Summary of the SSCI Report. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/19/14. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
2014-11-19Set/Reset Deadline: Defendant shall file a status report with the Court by 12/08/2014, regarding the release of the Executive Summary of the SSCI Report. (ad) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
2014-12-0431MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motion by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mei, Vesper) (Entered: 12/04/2014)
2014-12-04MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 31 Motion for Three-Day Extension of Time. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/4/14. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 12/04/2014)
2014-12-0832STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Mei, Vesper) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
2014-12-1033Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file summary judgment motion by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mei, Vesper) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
2014-12-10MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 33 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that the government's motion for summary judgment is due by January 21, 2015. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/10/14. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
2014-12-11Set/Reset Deadline: The government's motion for summary judgment is due by 1/21/2015. (kt) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
2015-01-2134MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Martha Lutz, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Mei, Vesper) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
2015-02-0335Consent MOTION to Clarify Briefing schedule by JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
2015-02-04MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 35 Motion to Clarify. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff shall file his Opposition and Cross-Motion on or before February 11, 2015; Defendant shall file its Reply and Opposition to Cross-Motion on or before March 4, 2015; and Plaintiff shall file his Reply in Support of Cross-Motion on or before March 18, 2015. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/4/15. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
2015-02-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall file his Opposition and Cross-Motion on or before 2/11/2015; Defendant shall file its Reply and Opposition to Cross-Motion on or before 3/04/2015; and Plaintiff shall file his Reply in Support of Cross-Motion on or before 3/18/2015. (ad) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
2015-02-1136Memorandum in opposition to re 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Exhibit SSCI Executive Summary, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
2015-02-1137Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Exhibit SSCI Executive Summary, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
2015-03-0438REPLY to opposition to motion re 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Second Declaration of Martha Lutz)(Mei, Vesper) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
2015-03-0439Memorandum in opposition to re 37 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Second Declaration of Martha Lutz, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mei, Vesper) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
2015-03-1840REPLY to opposition to motion re 37 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
2015-05-1441ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant's 34 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; 2) Plaintiff's 37 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED; and 3) Judgment is ENTERED in favor of Defendant. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 05/14/15. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
2015-05-1442MEMORANDUM OPINION re 41 Order on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 05/14/15. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff