Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD v. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2014cv00030
Date Filed2014-01-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
Case DescriptionLeopold submitted a number of requests to Southern Command for records concerning detainees at Guantanamo Bay. Although he had received interim responses to some requests, Leopold had not received fee waiver determinations or completed responses for any of his requests. Further, on several occasions, Southern Command failed to provide an estimated date of completion for his requests. Leopold finally filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-01-091COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3586004) filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DOD, # 3 Summons USAO, # 4 Summons DOJ)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
2014-01-09Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (kb) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
2014-01-092ELECTRONIC SUMMONS (3) Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent)(kb) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
2014-01-093ENTERED IN ERROR, SEE DOCKET ENTRY 4 .....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/9/2014. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/8/2014.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/09/2014. (Light, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/10/2014 (jf, ). (Entered: 01/09/2014)
2014-01-094NOTICE of erroneous filing by JASON LEOPOLD re 3 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney, Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General,, (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
2014-01-095AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE filed by JASON LEOPOLD.(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
2014-01-136RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/10/2014. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/9/2014.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/10/2014. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
2014-02-057NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick D. Davis on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
2014-02-068Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
2014-02-07MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargemnet of Time. It is ORDERED that defendant shall respond to plaintiff's amended complaint on or before March 12, 2014. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/7/2014. (lcabj3) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
2014-02-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall respond to the Amended Complaint by 3/12/2014. (jth) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
2014-02-209ENTERED IN ERROR.....CONSENT TO THE FILING OF AN AMENDED COMPLAINT by JASON LEOPOLD. (Light, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/21/2014 (jf, ). (Entered: 02/20/2014)
2014-02-2010AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE filed by JASON LEOPOLD.(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
2014-02-21NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 9 Consent to Amended Complaint was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading in proper format. (Counsel should review LCvR 5.1(b) CORRESPONDENCE WITH COURT). Should counsel require any further assistance, please contact the ECF Help Desk @ (202) 354-3190 (jf, ) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
2014-02-21MINUTE ORDER that in light of the Notice of Corrected Docket Entry of 2/21/2014, plaintiff is directed to supplement the 10 amended complaint that has already been docketed with a motion for leave to amend the complaint that reflects defendant's consent. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/21/2014. (lcabj3) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
2014-02-2211Consent MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/22/2014)
2014-02-24MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Consent Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. The 10 second amended complaint is deemed filed as of the date of docketing. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/24/2014. (lcabj3) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
2014-02-25NOTICE of Hearing: A Status Conference is scheduled in this matter for 3/11/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jth) Modified on 2/25/2014 to reflect that the correct year for the date of the status conference is 2014 not 2013 (jth). (Entered: 02/25/2014)
2014-03-11Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Status Conference held on 3/11/2014. The parties are directed to file a Proposed Joint Schedule for the production of documents to Plaintiff by 4/16/2014.(Court Reporter Vicki Eastvold) (jth) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
2014-03-1212ANSWER to 10 Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. Related document: 10 Amended Complaint filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7, # 2 Exhibit 8-14, # 3 Exhibit 15-19, # 4 Exhibit 20, # 5 Exhibit 21-25, # 6 Exhibit 26-30, # 7 Exhibit 31-34, # 8 Exhibit 35-38, # 9 Exhibit 39-44, # 10 Exhibit 45-48, # 11 Exhibit 49-53)(Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
2014-04-1613NOTICE of Filing Proposed Joint Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
2014-04-17MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' Joint Proposed Schedule 13 , it is ORDERED that the parties shall provide further joint status reports to the Court every eight weeks, with the next status report due on June 12, 2014. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/17/2014. (lcabj3) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
2014-04-17Set/Reset Deadline: The Next Status Report is due by 6/12/2014. (jth) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
2014-06-0614NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen McCoy Elliott on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
2014-06-1215STATUS REPORT (Joint) by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
2014-06-12MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' Joint Status Report 15 , is ORDERED that another joint status report is due August 7, 2014. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/12/14. (DMK) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
2014-06-12Set/Reset Deadline: The Next Joint Status Report is due by 8/7/2014. (jth) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
2014-08-0716STATUS REPORT (Joint) by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
2014-08-14MINUTE ORDER that in light of the parties' Joint Status Report 16 , a further joint status report is due October 2, 2014. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/14/2014. (lcabj3) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
2014-08-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report is due by 10/2/2014. (jth) (Entered: 08/15/2014)
2014-10-0217STATUS REPORT (Joint) by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
2014-10-03MINUTE ORDER that in light of the parties' 17 joint status report, a further joint status report is due November 26, 2014. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/3/2014. (lcabj3) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
2014-10-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report is due by 11/26/2014. (jth) (Entered: 10/05/2014)
2014-11-20Case randomly reassigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. Judge Amy Berman Jackson no longer assigned to the case. (gt, ) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
2014-11-2618STATUS REPORT (Joint) by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
2015-01-2319STATUS REPORT (Joint) by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
2015-03-2020STATUS REPORT Filed Jointly By The Parties by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
2015-04-0321NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. Attorney Patrick D. Davis terminated. (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
2015-05-1522STATUS REPORT (Joint) by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
2015-07-1023STATUS REPORT (Joint) by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
2015-09-0424Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-10-3025Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
2015-10-30MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report 25 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before January 8, 2016. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/30/2015. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
2015-10-31Set/Reset Deadline: The parties shall file a joint status report on or before 1/8/2016. (kt) (Entered: 10/31/2015)
2016-01-0826Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
2016-03-0427Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
2016-03-07MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 27 and the Court's order of April 17, 2015, which remains in effect, the parties shall continue to provide joint status reports to the Court every eight weeks, with the next joint report due on or before April 29, 2016. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/7/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
2016-03-07Set/Reset Deadline: The parties shall continue to provide joint status reports to the Court every eight weeks, with the next joint report due on or before 4/29/2016. (kt) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
2016-04-2928Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
2016-04-29MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 28 and the Court's order of April 17, 2015, which remains in effect, the parties shall continue to provide joint status reports to the Court every eight weeks, with the next joint report due on or before June 24, 2016. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/29/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
2016-05-02Set/Reset Deadline: Joint status report due on or before 6/24/2016. (kt) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
2016-06-2429Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
2016-06-27MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 29 , the parties shall continue to provide joint status reports to the Court every eight weeks, with the next joint report due on or before August 19, 2016. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/27/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
2016-06-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint report due on or before 8/19/2016. (kt) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
2016-08-1930Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 08/19/2016)
2016-08-19MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 30 , the parties shall continue to provide joint status reports to the Court every eight weeks, with the next joint report due on or before October 21, 2016. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/19/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 08/19/2016)
2016-08-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due on or before 10/21/2016. (kt) (Entered: 08/19/2016)
2016-10-2131Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
2016-10-24MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 31 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties are to provide a joint status report on December 22, 2016. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/24/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
2016-10-24Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties are to provide a joint status report on 12/22/2016. (kt) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
2016-12-2132Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 32 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties are to file a joint status report on February 16, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/22/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2016-12-22Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties are to file a joint status report on 2/16/2017. (kt) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2017-02-1633Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
2017-02-17MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 33 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties are to file a joint status report on or before April 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/17/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/13/2017. (dot) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-04-1334Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-13MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 34 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties are to file a further joint status report on or before June 8, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/13/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-13Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties are to file a further joint status report on or before 6/8/2017. (kt) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-06-0835Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
2017-06-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 35 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties are to file a further joint status report on or before August 3, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/8/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
2017-06-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/3/2017. (dot) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-08-0336Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-03MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 36 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties are to file a further joint status report on or before September 28, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/3/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/28/2017. (kt) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-09-2837Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
2017-10-02MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 37 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties are to file a further joint status report on or before November 30, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/2/2017. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/30/2017. (kt) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-11-3038Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-12-04MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 38 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties are to file a further joint status report on or before January 25, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/4/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/25/2018. (kt) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff