Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJACKSON v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2014cv00192
Date Filed2014-02-10
Date Closed2017-09-17
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffDOMINIQUE L. JACKSON
Case DescriptionDominique Jackson, a state prisoner in Ohio, submitted a request to the Criminal Division of the Justice Department for records pertaining to the authorization of wiretaps of Jackson. The Criminal Division responded by telling Jackson that any records would be protected under Exemption 3 (other statutes). Jackson appealed to the Office of Information Policy, but after hearing nothing further, he filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Exemption 3 - Statutory prohibition of disclosure

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Criminal Division
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Office of Information Policy
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Opinion/Order [36]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Amy Berman Jackson has ruled that the Criminal Division of the Department of Justice conducted an adequate search for records concerning wiretap authorizations for Dominique Jackson and then properly withheld the records under subsection (j)(2) of the Privacy Act. The agency also claimed several FOIA exemptions, particularly Exemption 3 (other statutes) to withhold the records. Jackson found that the FOIA exemptions and subsction (j)(2) provided a sufficient basis for withholding the records. She noted that "the Department of Justice's Criminal Division is responsible for approving federal prosecutors' requests to apply for Title III orders, which would authorize the interception of wire, oral, or electronic communications in the course of criminal investigations. The Criminal Division's principal function is enforcing federal criminal laws, and the records plaintiff seeks are maintained in the Criminal Division's Title III request tracking system and email archives. The documents contained in these systems are exempted from disclosure by the Privacy Act. Given that defendants conducted a search for the requested documents, the Court does not need to answer whether it had authority not to conduct a search, and holds that defendants properly invoked the exemption after it did a search."
Issues: Adequacy - Search, Exemption 3 - Statutory prohibition of disclosure
Opinion/Order [56]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-02-101COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Office of Information Policy), UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Criminal Division) ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616062055) with Jury Demand filed by DOMINIQUE L. JACKSON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit B-1, # 5 Exhibit B-2, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D)(rc) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
2014-02-10SUMMONS (4) Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Office of Information Policy), UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Criminal Division), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (rc) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
2014-03-102NOTICE of Appearance by Claire M. Whitaker on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE(Office of Information Policy), UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE(Criminal Division) (Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
2014-03-103ERRATA by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE(Office of Information Policy), UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE(Criminal Division) 2 Notice of Appearance filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Appearance with Certificate of Service)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
2014-03-274MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE(Office of Information Policy), UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE(Criminal Division) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
2014-03-28MINUTE ORDER granting 4 defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is ORDERED that defendant's answer or other response to the complaint is due on or before April 28, 2014. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will not treat the complaint as a motion for summary judgment. Rather, plaintiff's opposition will be due on or before May 28, 2014, and if plaintiff chooses to do so, he may file a cross-motion for summary judgment on that date as well, with a combined memorandum of points and authorities in support of them both. Defendant's reply, combined with a cross-opposition, if necessary, is due on or before June 18, 2014. Plaintiff's cross-reply, if any, is due on or before July 9, 2014. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/28/2014. (lcabj3) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
2014-03-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Answer or Other Response to the Complaint is due by 4/28/2014. The Court will not treat the complaint as a motion for summary judgment. If Defendant's file a dispositive motion, Plaintiff's Opposition, and if he chooses to do so, any Cross Motion with a combined memo of points and authorities in support of them both will be due by 5/28/2014; Defendant's Reply, combined with an Opposition to any Cross Motion is due by 6/18/2014; Plaintiff's Reply to any Cross Motion is due by 7/9/2014. (jth) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
2014-04-045RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE(Office of Information Policy) served on 2/24/2014; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE(Criminal Division) served on 2/24/2014, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/24/2014., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/24/2014. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/26/2014.) (jf, ) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
2014-04-256ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE(Office of Information Policy), UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE(Criminal Division).(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
2014-04-257ORDER. It is ORDERED that, on or before May 27, 2014, defendants shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for production of documents to plaintiff. See order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/25/2014. (lcabj3) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
2014-04-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants shall either file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for production of documents to plaintiff by 5/27/2014. (jth) (Entered: 04/27/2014)
2014-05-198MOTION for Extension of Time to file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for production of documents to July 28, 2014 (see ECF No. 7) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE(Office of Information Policy), UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE(Criminal Division) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
2014-05-20MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Motion to Extend Time. It is ORDERED that defendants shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for production of documents to plaintiff, on or before July 28, 2014. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/20/2014. (lcabj3) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
2014-05-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants shall either file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for production of documents to plaintiff by 7/28/2014. (jth) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
2014-05-309Memorandum in opposition to re 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for production of documents to July 28, 2014 (see ECF No. 7) filed by DOMINIQUE L. JACKSON. (jf, ) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
2014-06-0910MOTION for Extension of Time to to file a response to Plaintiffs Motion in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time, ECF No. 9 by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE(Office of Information Policy), UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE(Criminal Division) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
2014-06-10MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 10 defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. The Court has considered 9 plaintiff's objections but the due date for defendants' filing of a dispositive motion, or in the alternative, a report setting forth the production of documents to plaintiff, remains July 28, 2014. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/10/2014. (lcabj3) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
2014-07-2411MOTION for Extension of Time to file a dispositive motion by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE(Office of Information Policy), UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE(Criminal Division) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
2014-07-25MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion to Extend Time. It is ORDERED that the deadline for filing any dispositive motions or a schedule for the production of documents is extended to August 18, 2014. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/25/2014. (lcabj3) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
2014-07-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' deadline for filing either a Dispositive Motion, or a Schedule for the Production of Documents to Plaintiff is extended to 8/18/2014. (jth) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
2014-08-1912MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE(Office of Information Policy), UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE(Criminal Division) (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1 (Decl. of Peter Sprung), # 2 Exhibit Ex. A to Att. 1 (FOIA Request), # 3 Exhibit Ex. B to Att. 1 (Crim Div Response), # 4 Exhibit Ex. C to Att. 1 (Plaintiff's FOIA Appeal), # 5 Exhibit Ex. D to Att. 1 (OIP Decision), # 6 Exhibit Ex. E to Att. 1 (Transcript of Detention Hearing), # 7 Exhibit Ex. F to Att. 1 (Vaughn Index), # 8 Statement of Facts, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
2014-08-28MINUTE ORDER. The Court has reason to believe that plaintiff is no longer located at Northwest Ohio Correctional Center but has been transferred to FCI Fort Worth. Given this, it is ORDERED that plaintiff file notice with the Court confirming his current address by September 8, 2014. It is further ORDERED that by September 12, 2014, defendant serve a copy of the motion for summary judgment filed on August 19, 2014 on plaintiff at his current address. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/28/14. (DMK) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
2014-08-2813ORDER advising plaintiff to respond by October 13, 2014 to defendants' motion to dismiss or risk summary dismissal of the case on what will be treated as a conceded motion. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/28/14. (DMK) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
2014-08-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/13/2014. (tb, ) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
2014-09-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff to file a notice with the Court confirming his current address by 9/8/2014. Defendant to serve a copy of the motion for summary judgment on Plaintiff at his current address by 9/12/2014. (jth) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
2014-09-0914NOTICE (Notice of Amended Certificate of Service) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE(Office of Information Policy), UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE(Criminal Division) re Order,, 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
2014-09-0915MOTION for Extension of Time by DOMINIQUE L. JACKSON. "Leave to file GRANTED" signed by Judge Amy B. Jackson on 09/08/2014 (jf, ) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
2014-09-11MINUTE ORDER granting 15 plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. It is ORDERED that plaintiff's response to 12 defendants' motion for summary judgment is due on or before October 24, 2014. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/11/2014. (lcabj3) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
2014-09-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is now due by 10/24/2014. (jth) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
2014-10-2216MOTION for Extension of Time by DOMINIQUE L. JACKSON. "Leave to file GRANTED" signed by Judge Amy B. Jackson on 10/21/2014 (jf, ) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
2014-10-22MINUTE ORDER granting 16 plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. It is ORDERED that plaintiff shall respond to defendant's 12 motion for summary judgment on or before February 23, 2015. The Court advises plaintiff, however, that any new FOIA claims must be exhausted at the administrative level before they can be brought in this Court. The Court further advises plaintiff to take note of Local Rule 7(i), which requires that any motion for leave to amend a pleading be accompanied by a copy of the proposed amended pleading. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/22/2014. (lcabj3) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
2014-10-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is now due by 2/23/2015. (jth) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
2014-12-0117MOTION to Compel by DOMINIQUE L. JACKSON (jf, ) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
2014-12-0318ORDER denying 17 Motion to Compel. See order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/3/2014. (lcabj3) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
2014-12-2919MOTION for Discovery by DOMINIQUE L. JACKSON (jf, ) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
2015-01-0620ORDER denying 19 Motion for Discovery. See order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/6/2015. (lcabj3) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
2015-01-2921MOTION for Extension of Time by DOMINIQUE L. JACKSON. "Leave to file GRANTED" signed by Judge Amy Brown Jackson on 01/27/2015 (jf, ) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
2015-01-29MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time 21 . It is ORDERED that plaintiff shall respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment 12 on or before April 24, 2015. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/29/2015. (lcabj3) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
2015-01-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is due by 4/24/2015. (jth) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
2015-04-2922MOTION for Extension of Time by DOMINIQUE L. JACKSON. "Leave to file GRANTED" signed by Judge Amy B. Jackson on 04/27/2015 (jf, ) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
2015-04-30MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time. It is ORDERED that plaintiff's response to defendants' motion for summary judgment is due by June 8, 2015. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/30/15. (DMK) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
2015-04-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is now due by 6/8/2015. (jth) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
2015-06-0523MOTION to Stay, MOTION for Extension of Time by DOMINIQUE L. JACKSON. "Leave to file GRANTED" signed by Judge Amy B. Jackson on 06/03/2015 (jf) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
2015-06-11MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Motion to Stay; denying as moot 23 Motion for Extension of Time. It is ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for a stay is granted. It is FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for extension of time is denied as moot. It is FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file a status report on July 13, 2015 and every 30 days thereafter advising the Court of the status of his attempts to gather the information he states he needs to respond to the government's motion for summary judgment. The Court notes that the motion plaintiff states he is planning to file concerning transcripts would not be appropriately filed in this action. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/11/15. (DMK) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
2015-06-12Set/Reset Deadline: Status Report from Plaintiff due by 7/13/2015. (jth) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
2015-07-2124STATUS REPORT by DOMINIQUE L. JACKSON. "Leave to file GRANTED" signed by Judge Amy B. Jackson on 07/20/2015 (*The correct caption of this case is Jackson v. Dept. of Justice, et al. and future pleadings should be filed with that case name) (jf) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
2015-07-24MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that plaintiff's next status report on his attempts to gather the information he states he needs to respond to the government's motion for summary judgment is due by August 21, 2015. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/24/15. (DMK) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
2015-07-24Set/Reset Deadline: Plaintiff's next status report is due by 8/21/2015. (jth) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
2015-08-1825STATUS REPORT by DOMINIQUE L. JACKSON. "Leave to file GRANTED" signed by Judge Amy B. Jackson on 08/17/2015 (jf) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
2015-08-23MINUTE ORDER. In light of plaintiff's most recent status report, it is ORDERED that plaintiff shall file another status report on his attempts to gather the information he states he needs to respond to the government's motion for summary judgment by September 30, 2015. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/23/15. (DMK) (Entered: 08/23/2015)
2015-08-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's next status report is due by 9/30/2015. (jth) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
2015-10-1626STATUS REPORT by DOMINIQUE L. JACKSON. "Leave to file GRANTED" signed by Amy B. Jackson on 10/16/2015 (jf) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
2015-10-20MINUTE ORDER. In light of plaintiff's most recent status report, it is ORDERED that plaintiff shall file another status report on his attempts to gather the information he states he needs to respond to the government's motion for summary judgment by November 30, 2015. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/20/15. (DMK) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
2015-10-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall file another Status Report on his attempts to gather the information he states he needs to Respond to the Government's Motion for Summary Judgment by 11/30/2015. (jth) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
2015-12-1027STATUS REPORT by DOMINIQUE L. JACKSON. "Leave to file GRANTED" signed by Judge Amy B. Jackson on 12/09/2015(jf) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
2015-12-14MINUTE ORDER. In light of plaintiff's most recent status report, it is ORDERED that plaintiff shall file by January 29, 2016 another status report on his attempts to gather the information he states he needs to respond to the government's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/14/15.(DMK) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
2015-12-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall file another Status Report on his attempts to gather the information he states he needs to Respond to the Government's Motion for Summary Judgment by 1/29/2016. (jth) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
2016-02-2528STATUS REPORT by DOMINIQUE L. JACKSON. "Leave to file GRANTED" signed by Judge Amy B. Jackson on 02/25/2016 (jf) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
2016-02-25MINUTE ORDER. In light of plaintiff's most recent status report, it is ORDERED that plaintiff shall file another status report by May 2, 2016. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/25/16. (DMK) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
2016-02-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall file another Status Report by 5/2/2016. (jth) (Entered: 02/26/2016)
2016-06-0729STATUS REPORT by DOMINIQUE L. JACKSON. "Leave to file GRANTED" signed by Judge Amy B. Jackson on 06/07/2016 (jf) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
2016-06-09MINUTE ORDER. In light of plaintiff's most recent status report, it is ORDERED that plaintiff shall file another status report by August 15, 2016. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/9/16. (DMK) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-06-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall file another Status Report by 8/15/2016. (jth) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-10-06MINUTE ORDER. On June 9, 2016, the Court ordered plaintiff to file another status report by August 15, 2016 on his efforts to gather the information he states that he needs to respond to the government's motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff did not file a status report by the deadline. It is ORDERED that plaintiff shall file a status report by October 17, 2016. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/6/16. (DMK) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
2016-10-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Status Report is due by 10/17/2016. (jth) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
2016-11-3030DISCHARGED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 01/06/17.....ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution by January 3, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/30/2016.(lcabj3) Modified on 1/18/2017 (jth). (Entered: 11/30/2016)
2017-01-0431RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 30 Order to Show Cause filed by DOMINIQUE L. JACKSON. "Leave to file GRANTED" signed by Judge Amy B. Jackson on 01/03/2017 (jf) (Entered: 01/04/2017)
2017-01-06MINUTE ORDER. In light of plaintiff's response 31 to the order to show cause, the order to show cause is discharged. It is ORDERED that plaintiff shall file a report on the status of his matter on appeal by March 31, 2017. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/6/17. (DMK) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall file a Report on the Status of his matter on appeal by 3/31/2017. (jth) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-04-1432STATUS REPORT by DOMINIQUE L. JACKSON. "Leave to file Granted as a Status Report" signed by Judge Amy B. Jackson on 04/12/2017 (jf) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
2017-04-1933ORDER. In light of plaintiff's status report of March 29, 2017 32 , it is ORDERED that the stay in this case is lifted. It is further ORDERED that plaintiff must respond to defendants' motion for summary judgement by May 17, 2017. If plaintiff fails to file a timely response, the Court will treat defendants' motion as conceded and dismiss the case. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/19/17. (DMK) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-04-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is due by 5/17/2017. (jth) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-05-2434MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Amendment or Response as to 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DOMINIQUE L. JACKSON. "Leave to file GRANTED" signed by Amy B. Jackson on 05/23/2017 (jf) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-05-24MINUTE ORDER granting 34 plaintiff's motion for extension of time to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment 12 . Plaintiff's response is due by 8/17/2017. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/24/17. (DMK) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-09-0835ORDER granting 12 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/8/17. (DMK) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-0836MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/8/17. (DMK) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-1837MOTION for Relief from Judgment under Rule 60(b) by DOMINIQUE L. JACKSON (td); "Leave to file GRANTED. File as Motion for Relief from Judgment under Rule 60(b)" by Judge Amy B. Jackson Modified on 9/19/2017 (td). (Entered: 09/19/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar