Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSAI v. TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2014cv00403
Date Filed2014-03-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffSAI
Case DescriptionSai submitted a FOIA/PA request to the Transportation Safety Administration concerning an incident involving Sai and TSA personnel that took place at Boston's Logan Airport. Sai subsequently submitted another FOIA request pertaining to an incident involving Sai at the San Francisco Airport. Sai submitted three more requests for various policy documents. The requests asked for expedited processing and that Sai be placed in the news media category for fee purposes. The agency indicated that video taken at the airports was protected under Exemption 3 (other statutes) as sensitive security information, and that the requests were too broad. Sai finally filed suit.
Complaint issues: failure to respond, declare requests "reasonably described" records, grant of news media status and public interest fee waiver, arbitrary and capricious behavior, disclosure of all records, Privacy Act damages, attorney's fees, pattern and practice of improper withholding of records

DefendantTRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (TSA)
AppealD.C. Circuit 16-5004
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [34]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle has ruled that Sai is not entitled to a preliminary injunction requiring TSA to disclose records pertaining to his ADA and Rehabilitation Act complaints. Sai filed two FOIA requests to the agency pertaining to incidents he alleged occurred at the airports in Boston and San Francisco. After the agency failed to respond, Sai filed suit asking for a preliminary injunction requiring the agency to disclose the requested records. The agency argued Sai was requesting relief beyond the scope of his FOIA complaint, but Huvelle noted that "plaintiff does specifically identity his November 2013 FOIA/PA request in the complaint and further alleges TSA's non-compliance with statutory deadlines as to that request. Moreover, plaintiff seeks in his complaint broad relief�"including production of requested documents�"as to 'all' his FOIA/PA requests. Construed liberally�"as the court must�"plaintiff's complaint seeks a court order requiring TSA to produce documents requested in his November 2013 FOIA/PA request." However, finding that she had jurisdiction over the claim, Huvelle concluded Sai was not entitled to relief, noting that "he has failed to demonstrate any�"let alone 'very serious'�"irreparable harm that would befall him absent the extraordinary relief of a preliminary injunction." She observed that "to be sure, a movant's general interest in timely processing of FOIA requests may be sufficient to establish irreparable harm if the information sought is 'time-sensitive.' In this regard, plaintiff implores the Court to consider the 'larger context of news and public interest reporting on a nationwide, multi-year pattern and practice of TSA violations of individuals' rights at checkpoints.' While this argument gets closer to those FOIA cases in which courts have found irreparable harm, the Court concludes that plaintiff has not provided any evidence to demonstrate the time-sensitivity of and public concern over the 'specific subject' of the TSA's responses to plaintiff's Rehabilitation Act grievances." She pointed out that "plaintiff 'has failed to demonstrate any time sensitive need for [the requested] information that will be irreparably lost if disclosure does not occur immediately' and this case is allowed to proceed down the typical path of FOIA litigation."
Issues: Litigation - Jurisdiction - Standing
Opinion/Order [93]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Randolph Moss has ruled that because various motions filed by pro se litigant Sai are premature, he is not entitled to compel TSA to disclose orders it may rely on to support its characterization of surveillance footage as sensitive security information, he is not entitled to attorney's fees, and he is not entitled to add 14 other FOIA requests to the current complaint. Noting that the case was nearly ready for consideration of the merits, Moss pointed out that Sai had peppered the court with motions, most of which were unnecessary. Moss indicated that Sai was apparently concerned that he would miss his deadline to appeal the agency's SSI order to the D.C. Circuit, which has original jurisdiction over TSA's orders. Acknowledging Sai's concerns, Moss noted that "but, as to the substance of [a motion to the D.C. Circuit], the Court remains convinced that resolution of any potential issues relating to SSI is premature. The Court does not yet know what information, if any, TSA will contend should be withheld and it does not know what dispute may exist with respect to the designation of any such SSI. . .It is important, however, to recall that this is a FOIA and Privacy Act case relating to specific requests for records. Before the Court can adjudicate this case, it needs to know what specific requests remain unanswered, what specific exemptions TSA invokes and the basis for its determinations, and why Plaintiff disputes those determinations." Although the agency had already disclosed some 3,000 pages, Moss explained that Sai's motion for attorney's fees was also premature. He noted that "it is too early to assess even whether [any] particular order will result in any 'relief' to Plaintiff, much less whether Plaintiff will substantially prevail in this case." Because Sai was proceeding pro se, he was not entitled to attorney's fees, only costs. Moss indicated that "in light of the Court's holding that Plaintiff has no and cannot, demonstrate 'eligibility' or 'entitlement' to fees and costs at this stage of the litigation, it need not consider whether he would be entitled"if and when he does substantially prevail"to costs and/or a nominal award of attorney's fees as he asserts." Moss rejected Sai's motion to add the additional FOIA requests, noting that "the addition of fourteen additional FOIA/Privacy Act requests to this case would merely result in undue delay in the disposition of this case and would not enhance judicial efficiency."
Issues: Litigation - Jurisdiction - Failure to Exhaust
Opinion/Order [162]
User-contributed Documents
 1
2
2
4
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-03-131PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE Notice of Filing Fee Surety by SAI. (md, ) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
2014-03-132MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis and Appointment of Attorney Ex Parte Under Seal by SAI. (md, ) "LEAVE TO FILE GRANTED". (Entered: 03/13/2014)
2014-03-133MOTION for Acceptance of P.O. Box as Official Address by SAI. (md, ) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
2014-03-134ORDERED that the motion 3 for leave to file the complaint using a post office box address be, and hereby is, GRANTED; ORDERED that by April 5, 2014 Sai provide the court with an update on his permanent address, unless his motion for a CM/ECF password is granted. Signed by Chief Judge Richard W. Roberts on 3/12/2014. (md, ) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
2014-03-135COMPLAINT against TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Filing Fee: Paid, $ 400, Receipt No. 4616062663) filed by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(md, ) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
2014-03-136MOTION for CM/ECF User Name and Password by SAI. (md, ) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
2014-03-13FIAT ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 2 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/30/2014. (md, ) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
2014-03-13LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- EX PARTE UNDER SEAL This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/18/2014. (md, ) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
2014-03-137REQUEST to Clerk to File Summons by SAI. (md, ) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
2014-03-14Set/Reset Deadlines: By 4/5/2014, SAI to provide court with update on his permanent address unless his motion for CM/ECF password is granted. (zmm, ) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
2014-03-17SUMMONS (3) ISSUED as to TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (md, ) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
2014-04-07MINUTE ORDER granting 6 plaintiff's Motion for CM/ECF Password. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on April 7, 2014. (AG) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
2014-04-168MOTION to Expedite by SAI (SAI, ) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
2014-04-169MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by SAI (SAI, ) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
2014-04-16MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(b), plaintiff may amend his complaint once as a matter of right up until 21 days after the filing of a responsive pleading or motion. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on April 16, 2014. (AG) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
2014-04-17MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 8 plaintiff's Motion to Expedite pending proof that plaintiff has served defendant with a copy of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on April 17, 2014. (AG) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
2014-04-1810SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 8 MOTION to Expedite filed by SAI. (SAI, ) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
2014-04-1811NOTICE of Change of Address by SAI (SAI, ) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
2014-04-2412CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAI re 5 Complaint , 8 , 9 , and 11 . (SAI, ) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
2014-05-2813NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy S. Simon on behalf of TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
2014-05-2814MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
2014-05-2815RESPONSE re 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Email to AUSA Simon)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
2014-05-2916REPLY to opposition to motion re 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
2014-06-0917ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer is due by July 10, 2014, unless plaintiff moves before July 1, 2014, for leave to amend or to supplement his complaint. See order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on June 9, 2014. (AG) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
2014-06-09MINUTE ORDER re April 16, 2014 Minute Order: For the reasons stated in the Order granting defendant's motion for extension of time to answer (ECF No. 17 ), it is hereby ORDERED that the sentence in the April 16, 2014 Minute Order that reads "Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(B), plaintiff may amend his complaint once as a matter of right up until 21 days after the filing of a responsive pleading or motion" is STRICKEN. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on June 9, 2014. (AG) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
2014-06-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/10/2014. (zmm, ) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
2014-06-1518MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION to Expedite per LCvR 65.1(d) by SAI (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts Statement of facts as to which there is no genuine issue)(SAI, ) (Entered: 06/15/2014)
2014-06-1619Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Expedite per LCvR 65.1(d) to withdraw TRO portion by SAI (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Corrected motion for preliminary injunction)(SAI, ) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
2014-06-16MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's 19 consent motion to amend/correct plaintiff's 18 motion for a preliminary injunction, temporary restraining order, and to expedite, denying plaintiff's 18 initial motion as moot, and setting a briefing schedule. Plaintiff's consent motion to amend 19 is hereby GRANTED and plaintiff's initial motion 18 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT. The Clerk is instructed to docket the attachment to plaintiff's 19 consent motion as a separate Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. It is further ORDERED that defendant's opposition to plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction is due on June 25, 2014; plaintiff's reply is due July 2, 2014. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on June 16, 2014.(lcesh1) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
2014-06-1620MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by SAI (jf, ) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
2014-06-1721MOTION for Leave to File amended complaint , MOTION to Amend/Correct 5 Complaint by SAI (Attachments: # 1 Amended complaint)(SAI, ) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
2014-06-1722MOTION to Expedite , MOTION to Amend/Correct 10 Supplemental Memorandum by SAI (SAI, ) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
2014-06-1723Emergency MOTION to Issue Summons by SAI (SAI, ) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
2014-06-17MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice plaintiff's 23 Motion to Issue Summons. It is HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's 23 emergency motion to issue a summons is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pending the Court's ruling on plaintiff's 21 motion for leave to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg as Motions Judge on behalf of Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle on June 17, 2014. (lcesh1) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
2014-06-1724CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAI re 21 MOTION for Leave to File amended complaint MOTION to Amend/Correct 5 Complaint re [21-1] . (SAI, ) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
2014-06-1725MEMORANDUM re 24 Certificate of Service filed by SAI, Order on Motion to Issue Summons, 23 Emergency MOTION to Issue Summons filed by SAI by SAI. (SAI, ) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
2014-06-1826MOTION for Protective Order by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Plaintiff's First Request for Admission and Interrogatory)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
2014-06-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction due by 6/25/2014 Reply due by 7/2/2014. (zmm, ) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
2014-06-2527Memorandum in opposition to re 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Amanda Deplitch, # 2 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
2014-06-2628MOTION to Compel production of documents , MOTION to Expedite this motion , MOTION for Discovery by SAI (Attachments: # 1 Request for production of documents, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1: 2013-03-16 - 2013-04-01 FOIA request for TSA policies & procedures.pdf, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2: 2013-01-26 - 2014-01-06 Correspondence re TSA grievances.pdf)(SAI, ) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
2014-06-2929RESPONSE re 26 MOTION for Protective Order , filed by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2014-06-23 - 2014-06-29 Email conversation with AUSA Simon re RFA)(SAI, ) (Entered: 06/29/2014)
2014-06-2930Cross MOTION to Compel, MOTION for Sanctions by SAI. (See Docket Entry 29 to view document) (jf, ) Modified on 7/1/2014 (gt, ). (Entered: 06/30/2014)
2014-07-0231REPLY to opposition to motion re 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Expedite per LCvR 65.1(d) , and Motion for imposition of sanctions filed by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2013-11-23 FOIA acknowledgment)(SAI, ) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
2014-07-0232MOTION for Sanctions by SAI. (See Docket Entry 31 to view document) (jf, ) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
2014-07-0633MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Reply 31 to TSA opposition 27 to preliminary injunction 20 by SAI (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Supplement to Reply to TSA opposition to preliminary injunction, # 2 Exhibit Statement of Adam Bliss, # 3 Exhibit Statement of Caleb Lanik, # 4 Exhibit Statement of Douglas Cantrell, # 5 Exhibit Statement of John Doe, # 6 Exhibit Statement of Lorrin Nelson, # 7 Exhibit Statement of Nick Staddon & Sandy Hall)(SAI, ) (Entered: 07/06/2014)
2014-07-0734MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 7, 2014. (lcesh1) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
2014-07-0735ORDER denying 20 plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, denying 32 plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions, and denying 33 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Supplement to his Reply Brief, for the reasons stated in the accompanying 34 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 7, 2014. (lcesh1) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
2014-07-0736Memorandum in opposition to re 21 MOTION for Leave to File amended complaint MOTION to Amend/Correct 5 Complaint filed by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibits 1 to 4)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
2014-07-0737Memorandum in opposition to re 22 MOTION to Expedite MOTION to Amend/Correct 10 Supplemental Memorandum filed by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
2014-07-1038MOTION for Reconsideration re 34 Memorandum & Opinion, 31 Reply to opposition to Motion, 35 Order on Motion for Sanctions, Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,, to reconsider motion for sanctions by SAI (SAI, ) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
2014-07-1039REPLY to opposition to motion re 26 MOTION for Protective Order filed by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
2014-07-1040Memorandum in opposition to re 30 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions, 28 MOTION to Compel production of documents MOTION to Expedite this motion MOTION for Discovery filed by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
2014-07-1541REPLY to opposition to motion re 21 MOTION for Leave to File amended complaint MOTION to Amend/Correct 5 Complaint filed by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 2013-02-15 - 2013-02-28 Email correspondence re FOIA request 13-0375, # 2 Exhibit 2 - 2013-02-20 FOIA new number TSA13-0414, # 3 Exhibit 3 - 2014-02-12 FOIA 2014-TSPA-00188, # 4 Exhibit 4 - 2014-02-12 FOIA 2014-TSPA-00189, # 5 Exhibit 5 - 2013-01-26 - 2013-03-07 Grievance for TSA agent actions on January 21st, # 6 Exhibit 6 - 2013-02-12 Massport public records request response - Attachment - Public Record respose to Sai, # 7 Exhibit 7 - 2013-03-19 - 2013-03-21 SFO response to Request for Documents, # 8 Exhibit 8 - 2013-04-01 - 2013-04-04 SFO response to FOIA, # 9 Exhibit 9 - 2013-04-12 SFO ADA Complaint - Attachment - Video 1, # 10 Exhibit 10 - 2013-04-12 SFO ADA Complaint - Attachment - Video 2)(SAI, ) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
2014-07-1842MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 22 plaintiff's Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 18, 2014. (lcesh1) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
2014-07-2243MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 26 defendant's motion for Protective Order and denying 30 plaintiff's cross-motion to compel. No discovery shall be conducted in this case until and unless ordered by the Court. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 22, 2014. (lcesh1) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
2014-07-2244ORDER denying 30 plaintiff's motion for sanctions. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 22, 2014. (lcesh1) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
2014-07-2845Memorandum in opposition to re 38 MOTION for Reconsideration re 34 Memorandum & Opinion, 31 Reply to opposition to Motion, 35 Order on Motion for Sanctions, Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,, to reconsider motion for sancti filed by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
2014-07-2946REPLY to opposition to motion re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, 38 MOTION for Reconsideration re 34 Memorandum & Opinion, 31 Reply to opposition to Motion, 35 Order on Motion for Sanctions, Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,, to reconsider motion for sancti ons filed by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 2013-03-25 tsa foia response - sfo incident, # 2 Exhibit 2 - 2013-03-25 tsa foia response - policies & procedures, # 3 Exhibit 3 - 2013-03-16 FOIA request for TSA policies & procedures - Attachment)(SAI, ) (Entered: 07/29/2014)
2014-07-3147MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 38 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 31, 2014. (lcesh1) (Entered: 07/31/2014)
2014-07-3148MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 28 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 31, 2014. (lcesh1) (Entered: 07/31/2014)
2014-08-0149MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 21 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File and Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 1, 2014. (lcesh1) (Entered: 08/01/2014)
2014-08-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/11/2014. (zmm, ) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
2014-08-0750MOTION for Reconsideration re 49 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint , MOTION to Clarify Order 49 by SAI (SAI, ) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
2014-08-0851MOTION to Strike 5 Complaint and to Dismiss in Part by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Addendum, # 2 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy). Added MOTION to Dismiss in part on 8/11/2014 (jf, ). (Entered: 08/08/2014)
2014-08-0852ERRATA Supplement by SAI 50 MOTION for Reconsideration re 49 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint MOTION to Clarify Order 49 filed by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 2014-08-08 2013-TSFO-01096 Response Letter SIGNED, # 2 Exhibit 2 - 2014-08-08 2013-TSFO-01096 Final Release Document)(SAI, ) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
2014-08-11NOTICE OF ERROR re 51 Motion to Strike; emailed to jeremy.simon@usdoj.gov, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Two-part docket entry, 2. DO NOT REFILE --- Counsel is reminded to select all parts of their motion (jf, ) (Entered: 08/11/2014)
2014-08-1253MOTION to Compel Answer, Motion to Strike , by SAI (SAI, ) Modified on 8/13/2014 (jf, ). (Entered: 08/12/2014)
2014-08-1354ORDER advising plaintiff to respond to defendant's 51 partial motion to dismiss by August 28, 2014 or Court may deem matter as conceded. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 13, 2014. (lcesh1) (Entered: 08/13/2014)
2014-08-1355ORDER denying plaintiff's 53 motions to compel defendant to file an answer and to strike defendant's motion to strike. Defendant's obligation to file an answer is tolled pending the Court's consideration of its 51 motions to strike and partially dismiss plaintiff's complaint; plaintiff may not file further motions without the Court's leave or direction until the Court resolves defendant's pending 51 motions. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 13, 2014. (lcesh1) (Entered: 08/13/2014)
2014-08-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to defendant's motion to dismiss due by 8/28/2014. (zmm, ) (Entered: 08/15/2014)
2014-08-2556Memorandum in opposition to re 50 MOTION for Reconsideration re 49 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint MOTION to Clarify Order 49 filed by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
2014-08-2657MOTION to Clarify Orders 54 and 55 , Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 50 MOTION for Reconsideration re 49 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint MOTION to Clarify Order 49 , 51 MOTION to Strike 5 Complaint and to Dismiss in Part by SAI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 2014-08-08 2013-TSPA-00339 interim release letter 8-8-14 signed and dated - redacted, # 2 Exhibit 2 - 2014-08-08 2013-TSPA-00339 Interim Release Documents August 8 2014 pt 1 - redacted, # 3 Exhibit 3 - 2014-08-08 2013-TSPA-00339 Interim Release Documents August 8 2014 pt 2 - redacted, # 4 Exhibit 4 - 2014-08-08 2013-TSPA-00368 Interim response signed and dated - redacted, # 5 Exhibit 5 - 2014-08-08 2013-TSPA-00368 Interim Release Documents August 8 2014 - redacted, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Response to TSA re interim releases generally, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Response to TSA re 2013-TSFO-01096 interim release, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Response to TSA re 2013-TSPA-00339 interim release, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Response to TSA re 2013-TSPA-00368 interim release)(SAI, ) (Entered: 08/26/2014)
2014-08-2658ORDER granting plaintiff's 57 Motion for Extension of Time and 57 Motion for Clarification. Plaintiff shall respond to defendant's 51 motion to dismiss no later than September 11, 2014, and shall reply to defendant's 56 opposition to plaintiff's motion for reconsideration no later than September 15, 2014. Under the Court's 55 August 13, 2014 Order, plaintiff may file motions for extensions of time, as well as responses and replies to pending motions, without leave of the Court, but may not file a cross-motion for summary judgment or additional motions for clarification without leave of the Court until the Court resolves defendant's pending 51 motions. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 26, 2014. (lcesh1) (Entered: 08/26/2014)
2014-08-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to motion to dismiss due by 9/11/2014. Reply due by 9/15/2014. (zmm, ) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
2014-09-1059Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 51 MOTION to Strike 5 Complaint and to Dismiss in Part , 50 MOTION for Reconsideration re 49 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint MOTION to Clarify Order 49 for 14 days extension - UNOPPOSED by SAI (SAI, ) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
2014-09-11MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's unopposed 59 Motion for extension of time to file response/reply. For good cause shown, it is HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's 59 Motion for an extension of time is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall respond to defendant's 51 motion to dismiss no later than September 25, 2014, and plaintiff shall reply to defendant's 56 opposition to plaintiff's 50 motion for reconsideration no later than September 29, 2014. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 11, 2014. (lcesh1) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
2014-09-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion to Dismiss due by 9/25/2014. Reply to Defendant's opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration due by 9/29/2014. (sm) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
2014-09-1260MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 51 MOTION to Strike 5 Complaint and to Dismiss in Part , 50 MOTION for Reconsideration re 49 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint MOTION to Clarify Order 49 until pending responses are released , MOTION for Leave to File divided response and motions for partial summary judgment, to compel response, and to amend complaint by SAI (SAI, ) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
2014-09-1861ORDER denying plaintiff's 60 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and denying plaintiff's 60 Motion for Leave to File a Partial Motion for Summary Judgment and a Motion to Compel. The parties should proceed briefing the pending motions according to the schedule set forth in the Courts September 11, 2014 Minute Order. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 18, 2014. (lcesh1) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
2014-09-2562Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 51 MOTION to Strike 5 Complaint and to Dismiss in Part , 50 MOTION for Reconsideration re 49 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint MOTION to Clarify Order 49 for 7 days by SAI (SAI, ) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
2014-09-2563SUPPLEMENT re 62 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by SAI. (SAI, ) Modified on 9/26/2014 (jf, ). (Entered: 09/25/2014)
2014-09-3064Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 51 MOTION to Strike 5 Complaint and to Dismiss in Part , 50 MOTION for Reconsideration re 49 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint MOTION to Clarify Order 49 until October 17 by SAI (SAI, ) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
2014-09-30MINUTE ORDER granting 64 plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and, accordingly, finding as moot 62 plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff's response and reply are due by October 17, 2014. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 30, 2014. (AG) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
2014-09-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to TSA's motion to dismiss and strike due by 10/17/2014. Reply to TSA's opposition to motion for reconsideration due by 10/17/2014. (zmm, ) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
2014-09-30Set/Reset Deadlines as to 50 MOTION for Reconsideration re 49 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint MOTION to Clarify Order 49 , 51 MOTION to Strike 5 Complaint and to Dismiss in Part . Responses due by 10/17/2014 Replies due by 10/17/2014. (zmm, ) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
2014-10-1665REPLY to opposition to motion re 50 MOTION for Reconsideration re 49 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint . (Attachments: # 1 2014-10-03 2013-TSPA-00368 Final release letter, # 2 2014-10-03 2013-TSPA-00339 Final release Letter)(SAI, ) Modified on 10/17/2014 (jf, ). (Entered: 10/16/2014)
2014-10-1766ERRATA re 65 Reply to opposition to Motion, to correct typographic errors and quotes by SAI (Attachments: # 1 2014-10-03 2013-TSPA-00368 Final release letter, # 2 2014-10-03 2013-TSPA-00339 Final release letter)(SAI, ) Modified on 10/17/2014 (jf, ). (Entered: 10/17/2014)
2014-10-17/strike (jf, ) (Entered: 10/17/2014)
2014-10-1767RESPONSE re 51 MOTION to Strike 5 Complaint and to Dismiss in Part filed by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 2014-10-03 2013-TSPA-00368 Final release letter, # 2 2014-10-03 2013-TSPA-00339 Final release letter)(SAI, ) (Entered: 10/17/2014)
2014-10-2368Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Complaint and Dismiss in Part by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
2014-10-24MINUTE ORDER granting 68 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: Upon consideration of Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Complaint and Dismiss in Part, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall have to, and including, November 12, 2014, to file its reply in support of its Motion to Strike Complaint and Dismiss in Part. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on October 24, 2014. (AG) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
2014-10-27Set/Reset Deadlines as to 51 MOTION to Strike 5 Complaint and to Dismiss in Part . Reply due by 11/12/2014. (zmm, ) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
2014-11-0769NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by SAI. Case related to Case No. 1:14-cv-01876-ESH. (SAI, ) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
2014-11-1270REPLY to opposition to motion re 51 MOTION to Strike 5 Complaint and to Dismiss in Part filed by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
2014-11-1371MOTION for Leave to File surreply and cross motion by SAI (Attachments: # 1 Surreply to motion to strike, # 2 Cross motion for dismissal without prejudice or preclusion, # 3 Exhibit - 2013-11-23 request)(SAI, ) (Entered: 11/13/2014)
2014-11-14Case randomly reassigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. Judge Ellen S. Huvelle no longer assigned to the case. (gt, ) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
2014-12-0172Memorandum in opposition to re 71 MOTION for Leave to File surreply and cross motion filed by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
2015-06-09Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Telephone Conference held on 6/9/2015. (kt) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
2015-06-10MINUTE ORDER: As discussed on the teleconference held on June 9, 2015, it is hereby ORDERED that on or before July 31, 2015, the parties shall file a joint status report setting forth Defendants' expected timetable for providing additional material in response to the FOIA requests at issue in this litigation and identifying the subjects of any anticipated areas of remaining dispute. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/10/2015. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
2015-06-11Set/Reset Deadline: On or before 7/31/2015, the parties shall file a joint status report setting forth Defendants' expected timetable for providing additional material in response to the FOIA requests at issue in this litigation and identifying the subjects of any anticipated areas of remaining dispute. (kt) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
2015-07-3073Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
2015-08-1974ORDER denying 50 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 50 Motion to Clarify; denying 51 Motion to Strike ; granting 71 Motion for Leave to File; denying [71-2] motion to dismiss; denying 73 Motion for Extension of Time. The restrictions imposed by Judge Huvelles earlier orders (Dkts. 55, 58) remain in place pending further order of the Court. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/19/2015. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
2015-08-1975SURREPLY to re 51 MOTION to Strike 5 Complaint and to Dismiss in Part filed by SAI. (znmw) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
2015-08-1976Cross MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice or preclusion by SAI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(znmw) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
2015-08-2477Proposed MOTION to Compel service of 49 USC § 46105(b) orders and findings of fact , Proposed MOTION for Declaratory Judgment re. § 46110(a) deadline by SAI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 2013-03-16 FOIA request for TSA policies & procedures, # 3 2015-06-02 FOIA request for all 49 USC 46110 "orders", # 4 2015-06-03 TSA 2015-TSFO-00251 acknowledgement, # 5 2015-06-11 TSA 2015-TSFO-00251 time estimate of 1 year, # 6 2015-06-15 DHS 2015-HQFO-00489 DHS final response and referral to TSA)(SAI, ) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
2015-08-2478MOTION for Leave to File lodged motion 77 to compel service of 49 USC § 46105(b) orders and findings of fact, and for declaratory relief re. § 46110(a) deadline by SAI (SAI, ) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
2015-08-3179NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of All Defendants (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
2015-08-3180MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 5 Complaint, 48 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion to Expedite, Order on Motion for Discovery, 77 Proposed MOTION to Compel service of 49 USC § 46105(b) orders and findings of fact Proposed MOTION for Declaratory Judgment re. § 46110(a) deadline , 47 Order on Motion for Reconsideration , MOTION for Extension of Time to File , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 77 Proposed MOTION to Compel service of 49 USC § 46105(b) orders and findings of fact Proposed MOTION for Declaratory Judgment re. § 46110(a) deadline , 78 MOTION for Leave to File lodged motion 77 to compel service of 49 USC § 46105(b) orders and findings of fact, and for declaratory relief re. § 46110(a) deadline by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
2015-09-0281RESPONSE re 80 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 5 Complaint, 48 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion to Expedite, Order on Motion for Discovery, 77 Proposed MOTION to Compel service of 49 USC § 46105(b) orders and findings of MOTION for Extension of Time to File MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 77 Proposed MOTION to Compel service of 49 USC § 46105(b) orders and findings of fact Proposed MOTION for Declaratory Judgment re. § 46110(a) deadline , 78 MO - partial consent and partial opposition filed by SAI. (SAI, ) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
2015-09-03MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's motion for an extension of time 80 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The parties shall file the joint status report as set forth in the Court's June 10, 2015 Minute Order on or before September 22, 2015. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before September 23, 2015. Defendant shall file any response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File 77 and the Motion to Compel Service of 49 USC 46105(b) Orders 78 on or before October 2, 2015. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/3/2015. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
2015-09-03Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file the joint status report on or before 9/22/2015; Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before 9/23/2015; Defendant shall file any response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File 77 and the Motion to Compel Service of 49 USC 46105(b) Orders 78 on or before 10/2/2015. (kt) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
2015-09-2282Joint STATUS REPORT by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
2015-09-2383ANSWER to 5 Complaint by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION.(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
2015-10-0284Memorandum in opposition to re 77 Proposed MOTION to Compel service of 49 USC § 46105(b) orders and findings of fact Proposed MOTION for Declaratory Judgment re. § 46110(a) deadline , 78 MOTION for Leave to File lodged motion 77 to compel service of 49 USC § 46105(b) orders and findings of fact, and for declaratory relief re. § 46110(a) deadline filed by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
2015-10-0885MOTION for Attorney Fees of $0 as matter of law , MOTION for Leave to File this motion , MOTION award of fees and costs and declaration of prevailing party status by SAI (SAI, ) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
2015-10-0886MOTION for Leave to File FRCP 15(d) supplemental pleading adding exhausted FOIA/PA requests by SAI (SAI, ) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
2015-10-1087NOTICE of Change of Address by Sai (Sai, ) (Entered: 10/10/2015)
2015-10-1988MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 77 Proposed MOTION to Compel service of 49 USC § 46105(b) orders and findings of fact Proposed MOTION for Declaratory Judgment re. § 46110(a) deadline , 78 MOTION for Leave to File lodged motion 77 to compel service of 49 USC § 46105(b) orders and findings of fact, and for declaratory relief re. § 46110(a) deadline until Friday, October 23 by SAI (SAI, ) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
2015-10-2289NOTICE of conferral that Defendants take no position by SAI re 88 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 77 Proposed MOTION to Compel service of 49 USC § 46105(b) orders and findings of fact Proposed MOTION for Declaratory Judgment re. § 46110(a) deadline , 78 MO (SAI, ) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
2015-10-2390REPLY to opposition to motion re 77 Proposed MOTION to Compel service of 49 USC § 46105(b) orders and findings of fact Proposed MOTION for Declaratory Judgment re. § 46110(a) deadline , 78 MOTION for Leave to File lodged motion 77 to compel service of 49 USC § 46105(b) orders and findings of fact, and for declaratory relief re. § 46110(a) deadline filed by SAI. (SAI, ) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
2015-10-2691Memorandum in opposition to re 85 MOTION for Attorney Fees of $0 as matter of law MOTION for Leave to File this motion MOTION award of fees and costs and declaration of prevailing party status filed by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
2015-10-2692Memorandum in opposition to re 86 MOTION for Leave to File FRCP 15(d) supplemental pleading adding exhausted FOIA/PA requests filed by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
2015-10-27NOTICE OF ERROR re 91 Memorandum in Opposition; emailed to mark.nebeker@usdoj.gov, cc'd 5 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. In future, ECF login must match electronic signature on documents. (znmw, ) (Entered: 10/27/2015)
2015-12-21MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall appear for a joint status conference in this matter and in Civil Action No. 14-1876 on January 7, 2016, at 10 a.m., in Courtroom 21. Any party who wishes to appear telephonically shall contact the Courtroom Deputy Clerk to arrange for telephonic participation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/21/2015. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
2015-12-21Set/Reset Hearing: A Status Conference is set for 1/7/2016, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
2016-01-0693MEMORANDUM AND OPINION: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File 78 , and Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time 88 are GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Service 77 , Motion for Attorney Fees 85 , and Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Pleading 86 are DENIED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff must seek and obtain leave of the Court prior to filing any motion other than a motion for an extension of time or a motion for summary judgment pursuant to the schedule to be entered by the Court in a separate, future order. As in Sai v. Dep't of Homeland Sec., 99 F. Supp. 3d 50, 6869 (D.D.C. 2015), leave to file shall be sought by raising the issue by telephonic status conference with the Court. To schedule such a conference, Plaintiff shall confer with counsel for the government regarding available dates and times and may then contact the courtroom deputy clerk at (202) 354-3084 to request a status conference. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/6/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
2016-01-07Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 1/7/2016; Order forthcoming. A further Status Conference is set for 3/11/2016, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook). (kt) (Entered: 01/07/2016)
2016-01-07MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before March 4, 2016. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on March 11, 2016, at 10 a.m. in Courtroom 21. Any party who wishes to appear telephonically shall contact the Courtroom Deputy Clerk to arrange for telephonic participation. During the status conference held today, January 7, 2016, Plaintiff Sai made an oral motion to reconsider the Court's March 13, 2014 fiat order denying without prejudice his Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and for Appointment of Counsel. The oral motion was based on the reasons stated in Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and to Appoint Counsel in Case No. 14-1876 (Dkts. 65 & 66). The Court orally denied the motion for the same reasons as stated in that case. See No. 14-1876, Dkt. 88. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/7/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 01/07/2016)
2016-01-08MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff is directed not to contact the Courtroom Deputy Clerk or chambers via e-mail. To arrange for a status conference or to schedule a time to seek the Court's leave to file a motion, the parties shall follow the procedure outlined in the Court's April 16, 2015 Memorandum and Order in Case No. 14-1876 (Dkt. 56 ), and if necessary may jointly contact the Courtroom Deputy Clerk via telephone to schedule a time to confer with the Court regarding the relevant dispute. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/8/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
2016-01-0894NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order,,, Leave to File Denied by SAI. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (SAI, ) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
2016-01-1195Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court re 94 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (znmw) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
2016-01-11MINUTE ORDER: The status conference previously scheduled for March 11, 2016, at 10 a.m. in Courtroom 21 is hereby VACATED. The parties shall appear for a status conference on March 11, 2016, at 2 p.m. in Courtroom 21. Any party who wishes to appear telephonically shall contact the Courtroom Deputy Clerk to arrange for telephonic participation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/11/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
2016-01-11Set/Reset Hearing: The Status Conference previously set for 3/11/2016, at 10:00 AM, is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 3/11/2016, at 2:00 PM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
2016-01-19USCA Case Number 16-5004 for 94 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by SAI. (zrdj) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
2016-01-22USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 4616075652 re 94 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by SAI (zrdj) (Entered: 01/27/2016)
2016-01-2796Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 94 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (zrdj) (Entered: 01/27/2016)
2016-02-1697NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION Substituting for attorney Jeremy S. Simon and William M. Nebeker (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
2016-03-0398Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Briefing Schedule by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
2016-03-07MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 98 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before June 9, 2016. Plaintiff shall file its opposition and any cross motion on or before August 8, 2016. Defendant shall file its reply, if any, and its opposition to any cross motion on or before September 7, 2016. Plaintiff shall file its reply, if any, on or before October 7, 2016. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/7/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
2016-03-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before 6/9/2016; Plaintiff shall file its opposition and any cross motion on or before 8/8/2016; Defendant shall file its reply, if any, and its opposition to any cross motion on or before 9/7/2016; Plaintiff shall file its reply, if any, on or before 10/7/2016. (kt) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
2016-03-07ENTERED IN ERROR.....Set/Reset Deadline: The parties shall submit a joint status report on or before 4/1/2016. (kt) Modified on 3/11/2016, entered in wrong case (kt). (Entered: 03/07/2016)
2016-03-11Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 3/11/2016. Issues addressed. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook). (kt) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
2016-06-0999MOTION for Summary Judgment by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts as to Which There is No Genuine Issue, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Declaration of Regina McCoy (with exhibits), # 4 Declaration of Douglas Blair, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-07-18100Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 99 MOTION for Summary Judgment and cross-motion, of 45 days , Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule extending all deadlines by 45 days by SAI (SAI, ) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
2016-07-18101ORDER granting 100 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff Sai shall file his opposition/cross-motion to TSA's motion for summary judgment on or before September 22, 2016. TSA shall file its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment, as well as any opposition to a cross-motion, on or before October 10, 2016. Plaintiff's reply in support of his cross-motion for summary judgment, if any, shall be filed on or before November 23, 2016. Plaintiff Sai, who is proceeding pro se, is further advised that failure to respond to TSA's motion may result in the Court granting the motion and dismissing the case or entering judgment in favor of the defendant. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/18/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
2016-07-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Sai shall file his opposition/cross-motion to TSA's motion for summary judgment on or before 9/22/2016; TSA shall file its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment, as well as any opposition to a cross-motion, on or before 10/10/2016; Plaintiff's reply in support of his cross-motion for summary judgment, if any, shall be filed on or before 11/23/2016. (kt) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
2016-08-02102MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 94 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by SAI. USCA Case Number 16-5004. (Attachments: # 1 order filed June 6, 2016)(zrdj) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
2016-08-12NOTICE of Hearing: A Telephone Conference is set for 8/25/2016, at 11:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-25Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Telephone Conference held on 8/25/2016. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook). (kt) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
2016-08-25MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiff to file his opposition/cross-motion to TSA's motion for summary judgment is hereby extended to November 4, 2016. Defendant shall file its reply, as well as any opposition to a cross-motion,on or before November 22, 2016. Plaintiff's reply in support of his cross-motion for summary judgment, if any, shall be filed on or before January 5, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/25/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
2016-08-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff to file his opposition/cross-motion to TSA's motion for summary judgment is hereby extended to 11/4/2016; Defendant shall file its reply, as well as any opposition to a cross-motion, on or before 11/22/2016; Plaintiff's reply in support of his cross-motion for summary judgment, if any, shall be filed on or before 1/5/2017. (kt) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
2016-08-26103Consent MOTION to Modify the Briefing Schedule by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
2016-08-26MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Consent Motion to Modify 103 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file its opposition/cross-motion to TSA's motion for summary judgment on or before November 4, 2016. Defendant shall file its reply, as well as any opposition to a cross-motion, on or before December 6, 2016. Plaintiff's reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment, if any, shall be filed on or before January 5, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/26/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
2016-08-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall file its opposition/cross-motion to TSA's motion for summary judgment on or before 11/4/2016;. Defendant shall file its reply, as well as any opposition to a cross-motion, on or before 12/6/2016; Plaintiff's reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment, if any, shall be filed on or before 1/5/2017. (kt) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
2016-09-12104Consent MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Proposed Filing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
2016-09-12MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants Consent Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment 104 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants motion is GRANTED. The attached supplemental brief is hereby deemed filed. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/12/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
2016-09-12105SUPPLEMENTAL Brief re 99 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (zrdj) (Main Document 105 replaced on 4/26/2018 to correct header issue.) (ztnr) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
2016-10-20106Consent MOTION for Leave to File a Second Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Second Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
2016-10-20MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Consent Motion for Leave to File a Second Supplemental Brief 106 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the second supplemental brief with supporting declaration attached as an exhibit to defendant's motion for leave is deemed filed as of October 20, 2016. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/20/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
2016-10-20107Second SUPPLEMENTAL Brief re 99 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (zrdj) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
2016-10-20108NOTICE of Filing of Declaration in Support of Defendant's Second Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION re 107 Supplemental Memorandum (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Regina McCoy)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
2016-10-28109Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule amended per motion , Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File all pending briefing by 30 days by SAI (SAI, ) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
2016-10-30MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Consent Motion for Extension and Revised Briefing Schedule 109 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff Sai shall file his opposition/cross-motion to TSA's motion for summary judgment on or before December 5, 2016. TSA shall file its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment, as well as any opposition to a cross-motion, on or before January 6, 2017. Plaintiff's reply in support of his cross-motion for summary judgment, if any, shall be filed on or before February 6, 2017. The Court cautions the parties that, barring any extraordinary circumstances, no further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/30/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 10/30/2016)
2016-10-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Sai shall file his opposition/cross-motion to TSA's motion for summary judgment on or before 12/5/2016; TSA shall file its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment, as well as any opposition to a cross-motion, on or before 1/6/2017; Plaintiff's reply in support of his cross-motion for summary judgment, if any, shall be filed on or before 2/6/2017. (kt) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
2016-12-05110Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 99 MOTION for Summary Judgment and cross-motion by SAI (SAI, ) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
2016-12-05MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a status conference on December 7, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. in order to discuss the scheduling issues raised in Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time 110 . Should either party wish to appear telephonically, that party shall contact the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at (202) 354-3084 to make the necessary arrangements. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/5/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
2016-12-06Set/Reset Hearings: A Status Conference is set for 12/7/2016, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
2016-12-07Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 12/7/2016. Court GRANTS IN PART Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time, as to filing an Opposition to the 99 Motion for Summary Judgment, to 1/30/2017; Defendant shall file their reply 30 days thereafter. No further extensions by Plaintiff will be granted. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook). (kt) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
2016-12-07MINUTE ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's long delay in responding to Defendant's motion for summary judgment 99 and in order to avoid further delay in resolving that long-pending motion, the Court directs that Plaintiff postpone the filing of a cross-motion for summary judgment, if any, until after the Court has resolved Defendant's motion for summary judgment. If the Court concludes that Defendant's motion for summary judgment should be denied in whole or in part, it will then set a separate briefing schedule that will permit Plaintiff to file his own motion for summary judgment. Filing a cross-motion for summary judgment at this time, however, will extend the current briefing schedule even further and will unfairly delay completion of briefing on a motion that Defendant filed six months ago and that, to date, has gone unanswered. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/7/2016. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
2017-01-12NOTICE of Hearing: A Telephone Conference is set for 1/12/2017, at 3:00 PM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) Modified on 1/12/2017 to correct date (kt). (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-12Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Telephone Conference held on 1/12/2017. Plaintiff renewed his motions for in forma pauperis (IFP) status and appointment of counsel. It is the ORDER of the Court, that once the Plaintiff files his opposition brief as to the motion that has been pending, the Court will then grant Plaintiff leave to file a renewed motion for IFP status, along with a supporting motion for leave to file a declaration under seal. Plaintiff's renewed motion for appointment of counsel is hereby held in abeyance pending his IFP status and the Court's ruling on summary judgment. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook). (kt) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-02-01111RESPONSE re 99 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Response to defendant's statement of material facts, # 2 Affidavit and statement of genuine issues still in dispute, # 3 Vaughn indices)(SAI, ) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
2017-02-01112MOTION for Leave to File 111 three hours out of time by SAI (SAI, ) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
2017-02-02113Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 112 MOTION for Leave to File 111 three hours out of time (amended: one day out of time; consent as to both amendment and motion) by SAI (SAI, ) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
2017-02-04114ERRATA exihibits to MSJ opp - Part 1 (UNOPPOSED) by SAI 111 Response to motion, filed by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 RDSOF 34 2013-04-01 email - FOIA request for TSA policies & procedures, # 2 RDSOF 34 2013-08-18 email - Pending response on TSA13-0424 & TSA13-0414; question re appeal on TSA13-0494, TSA13-0488 - redacted, # 3 SGI 2 n 2 82 FR 5790, # 4 SGI 18 n 7 OGIS TSA Compliance Report - Executive summary, # 5 SGI 18 n 7 OGIS TSA Compliance Report 2016-01-11 TSA FOIA compliance report, # 6 SGI 18 n 7 OGIS TSA Compliance Report 2016-05-17 120 day follow-up letter, # 7 SGI 18 n 7 OGIS TSA Compliance Report 2016-11-29 Letter re status of TSA FOIA recommendations, # 8 SGI 18 n 7, 48 n 22 OGIS TSA Compliance Report 2016-06-15 Compliance assessment response, # 9 SGI 18 n 8 October 25 2016 Meeting Transcript, # 10 SGI 18 n 8 Section 508 and FOIA Presentation (PDF converted), # 11 SGI 20 n 11 NSA - Redacting with Confidence, # 12 SGI 40 n 17 PapersPlease 2010-12-07 TSA releases list of SOPs - but says theyre all secret, # 13 SGI 40 n 17 PapersPlease 2010-12-07 TSA10-0179 FOIA response, # 14 SGI 40 n 17 PapersPlease 2010-12-07 TSA10-0179 FOIA appeal, # 15 SGI 43 n 19 DHS OIG-10-37 TSA's Breach of Sensitive Security Information (Redacted), # 16 SGI 45 2016-01-15 Final letter to complainant (01-15-16), # 17 SGI 46 n 20 81 FR 78623, # 18 SGI 47 n 21 PapersPlease 2008-07-08 TSA "identity verification" procedures, # 19 SGI 47 n 21 PapersPlease 2009-05-26 TSA releases (censored) ID checking procedures, # 20 SGI 47 n 21 PapersPlease 2009-05-26 certification-of-identity-form_checkpoint, # 21 SGI 47 n 21 PapersPlease 2009-05-26 tsafoiareq62108_final, # 22 SGI 47 n 21 PapersPlease 2015-04-09 Why did the TSA prevent these people from flying, # 23 SGI 47 n 21 PapersPlease 2015-04-09 2013-tsfo-01016-interim-8apr2015, # 24 SGI 47 n 21 PapersPlease 2015-04-09 foia-tsoc-id-verify-report, # 25 SGI 47 n 21 PapersPlease 2015-04-09 tsa_id_sop, # 26 SGI 47 n 21 PapersPlease 2015-04-09 tsa_id_sop-posted, # 27 SGI 47 n 21 PapersPlease 2015-04-09 tsa-form-415, # 28 SGI 92 n 23 DHS OIG-10-37 TSA's Breach of Sensitive Security Information (Redacted), # 29 SGI 93 n 24 tsa-screening-mgmt-sop, # 30 SGI 102 n 25 Intercept 2014-07-23 The secret government rulebook for labeling you a terrorist (PDF optimized), # 31 SGI 102 n 25 Intercept 2014-07-23 2013-watchlist-guidance (PDF optimized), # 32 SGI 107 n 26 Intercept 2015-03-27 Exclusive - TSA's secret behavior checklist to SPOT terrorists, # 33 SGI 107 n 26 Intercept 2015-03-27 spot-referral, # 34 SGI 111, 150 n 35 2003 Cues to Deception - Psychological Bulletin, vol. 129, no. 1, # 35 SGI 111, 150 n 35 2006 Accuracy of Deception Judgments - Personality and Social Psychology Review, vol. 10, no. 3)(SAI, ) (Entered: 02/04/2017)
2017-02-04115LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) exihibits to MSJ opp - Part 2 (UNOPPOSED) by SAI 114 Errata,,,,,,,,,,, filed by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 SGI 111, 150 n 35 2006 Who Can Best Catch a Liar - A Meta-Analysis of Individual Differences in Detecting Deception - The Forensic Examiner, 15(1), # 2 SGI 111, 150 n 35 2008 National Research Council - Protecting Individual Privacy in the Struggle Against Terrorists - A Framework for Assessment, # 3 SGI 111, 150 n 35 2010-05 Nature - Intent to deceive, # 4 SGI 111, 150 n 35 2011 Why Do Lie-Catchers Fail? A Lens Model Meta-Analysis of Human Lie Judgments - Psychological Bulletin, vol. 137, no. 4, # 5 SGI 111, 150 n 35 2013 RAND Using Behavioral Indicators to Help Detect Potential Violent Acts - A Review of the Science Base (PDF normalized), # 6 SGI 111, 152 n 36 2010-05-20 GAO report GAO-10-763 - Efforts to Validate TSA's Passenger Screening Behavior Detection Program Underway, but Opportunities Exist to Strengthen Validation and Address Operational Challenges (PDF normalized), # 7 SGI 111, 152 n 36 2011-04-06 Behavioral Science and Security Evaluating TSA's SPOT Program - 112 H. Hrg. 65-053, Serial No. 112-11, # 8 SGI 111, 152 n 36 2013-05-29 OIG-13-91 Transportation Security Administrations Screening of Passengers by Observation Techniques (Redacted), # 9 SGI 111, 152 n 36 2013-11-13 GAO report GAO-14-159 - TSA Should Limit Future Funding for Behavior Detection Activities (PDF normalized), # 10 SGI 111, 152 n 36 2014-03-31 Risk-Based Approaches to Airline Passenger Screening - CRS R43456, # 11 SGI 114 n 27 113 H. Hrg. 88-973, Serial No. 113-121 (May 29, 2014), # 12 SGI 114a n 28 Pseudo-Classification-Report-FINAL-5-28-2014-5, # 13 SGI 114b n 29 2016-07-07 How pervasive is misconduct at TSA - Examining findings from a joint subcommittee investigation, # 14 SGI 145a n 30 DHS OIG-15-18 Audit of Security Controls for DHS Information Systems at John F. Kennedy International Airport (Redacted) (Revised), # 15 SGI 145b n 31 DHS OIG-17-14 Summary Report on Audits of Security Controls for TSA Information Technology Systems at Airports (Redacted), # 16 SGI 148 n 32 Sai thesis - Motor imagery, action imitation, empathic accuracy, and confidence, # 17 SGI 167 n 40 HOPE Number Nine Shirt, # 18 SGI 167 n 41 US Department of HOPEland Security seal, # 19 SGI 179 2013-02-19 Massport public records request response - Attachment - Public Records response to Sai's response)(SAI, ) (Entered: 02/04/2017)
2017-02-22MINUTE ORDER: A Telephone Conference is set for February 24, 2017, at 10:30 a.m., in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. If either party cannot be available for the hearing, that party should coordinate with the opposing party and jointly contact the Courtroom Deputy Clerk to schedule an alternative date and/or time for the conference. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/22/2017. (lcrdm1, ) Modified on 2/23/2017 to change "Notice of Hearing" to "Minute Order" (kt). (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-02-23Set/Reset Hearings: A Telephone Conference is set for 2/24/2017, at 10:30 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-02-24Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Telephone Conference held on 2/24/2017. Issues heard and addressed; Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter: Lisa Moreira). (kt) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
2017-02-24116STRICKEN Entries 116 & 116-1 in part, PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 02/24/2017.....SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 111 Response to motion, and supplemental affidavit and exhibits filed by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental affidavit, # 2 2014-10-01 ACLU FOIA request re SPOT, # 3 SA 1 - 2017-02-08 ACLU Bad Trip - Debunking the TSA's "Behavior Detection" Program, # 4 SA 4 - 2015-TSLI-00004 001404-001464 extracts, # 5 SA 4 - 2015-TSLI-00004 002557-002559, # 6 SA 4 - 2015-TSLI-00004 002802-002803, # 7 SA 4 - 2015-TSLI-00004 002829-002830, # 8 SA 4 - TSA 15-00014 004356-004416 extracts, # 9 SA 4 - TSA 15-00014 004893-004895, # 10 SA 4 - TSA 15-00014 005126-005127, # 11 SA 4 - TSA 15-00014 005153-005154, # 12 SA 7 - 2009-01-23 SPOT SOP Summary of Changes and Clarifications - TSA 15-0014 007207-007275, # 13 SA 7 - 2009-03-05 Civil Liberties Impact Assessment for the SPOT Program - TSA 15-0014 007857-007880, # 14 SA 7 - 2012-10-26 Memorandum from TSA re TSA Behavioral Detection Officers - TSA 15-00014 004206-004225, # 15 SA 7 - 2013-11-22 SPOT Behavioral Indicator Reference Guide - TSA 15-0014 005363-005380, # 16 SA 7 - 2013-12 SPOT Referral Report User Guide - TSA 15-0014 007286-007308, # 17 SA 7 - 2013-12 SPOT Techniques Referral Report User Guide - TSA 15-0014 07330-007352, # 18 SA 7 - 2013-12-19 Behavior Detection and Analysis Program Office - TSA 15-0014 007353-007357, # 19 SA 7 - 2013-12-19 Behavior Detection and Analysis Program Office - TSA 15-0014 007681-007682, # 20 SA 7 - 2014-04-15 SPOT Independent Subject Matter Expert Panel - TSA 15-0014 009308-009337, # 21 SA 7 - 2015 Behavior Detection and Analysis Program Handbook - TSA 15-00014 010043-010198 (PDF optimized), # 22 SA 7 - TSA SPOT Program Overview - TSA 15-0014 012704-012709)(SAI, ) Modified on 2/27/2017 (jf). (Entered: 02/24/2017)
2017-02-24MINUTE ORDER: At the hearing to consider Sai's request to submit additional affidavits and exhibits to his late-filed opposition to the TSA's motion for summary judgment, the Court permitted Sai to file 20 sample documents that were produced to the ACLU but not to him or that were produced with different redactions. The Court explicitly instructed that it "d[id] not want any legal argument," and it limited Sai's supplemental filing to "20 samples" and a declaration identifying the documents. Within two hours of the conclusion of the hearing, Sai submitted the 20 permitted sample documents, a "supplemental affidavit" [116-1], and, in direct contravention of the Court's instructions, a "supplemental brief in opposition to MSJ," 116 . Moreover, Sai's supplemental affidavit includes multiple paragraphs of argument. Accordingly, the Court hereby STRIKES Sai's "supplemental brief" 116 and paragraphs 8 through 20 of his "supplemental affidavit" [116-1] for failure to comply with the Court's directives. Sai is admonished that future violations of the Court's orders may result in the imposition of sanctions. The TSA's time to reply to Sai's opposition to the TSA's motion for summary judgment, as supplemented by the 20 sample documents, is hereby extended until March 9, 2017. After reviewing that brief, the Court will determine whether any additional briefing addressing the 20 sample documents, or any additional evidentiary submission, is appropriate. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/24/2017. (lcrdm1, ) Modified on 2/24/2017 for punctuation typo (kt). (Entered: 02/24/2017)
2017-02-27Set/Reset Deadlines: The TSA's time to reply to Sai's opposition to the TSA's motion for summary judgment is extended until 3/9/2017. (kt) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-03-07MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Out of Time 112 and Consent Motion for Leave to File Out of Time (Amended) 113 , the motions are hereby GRANTED and Dkt. 111 is deemed FILED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/7/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-07117Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Consent Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages 117 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. Defendant's reply brief shall not exceed thirty-five pages. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/8/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-09118REPLY to opposition to motion re 99 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 3d Supp. Decl. of Regina McCoy, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-04-14MINUTE ORDER: In accordance with its Minute Order of February 24, 2017, the Court hereby permits Sai to file a brief addressing the ACLU documents he filed on February 24, 2017 (Dkt. 116 ) and responding to TSA's arguments regarding those documents (Dkt. 118 at 29-33). Sai's brief shall not exceed five pages and shall be filed on or before April 28, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/14/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
2017-04-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Sai's brief shall be filed on or before 4/28/2017. (kt) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
2017-04-17NOTICE of Hearing: A Telephone Conference is set for 4/25/2017, at 1:15 PM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
2017-04-17119Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File re April 14 minute order by SAI (SAI, ) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
2017-04-18MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Unopposed Motion for Extension 119 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. Sai may file the brief referenced in the Court's Minute Order of April 14, 2017, on or before May 5, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/18/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Brief due by 5/5/2017. (kt) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-25Set/Reset Hearings: The Telephone Conference set for 4/25/2017 at 1:15 PM, is RESCHEDULED to 4:00 PM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-04-25Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Telephone Conference held on 4/25/2017. Issues addressed. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook). (kt) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-05-05120SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re Order, 118 Reply to opposition to Motion filed by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Kwoka, The Freedom of Information Act Trial, 61 American Univ. L. R. 2, 6 (2011))(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2018-01-25NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 1/30/2018, at 11:30 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-30Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Telephone Conference held on 1/30/2018. Oral motion by Plaintiff, to supplement the record with further documentation; HEARD, GRANTED, and limited to the documents discussed on the record. The Court will determine the relevance of the documents, and Plaintiff is reminded that no additional briefing is permitted, at this time. Plaintiff is permitted to file a one-page affidavit or declaration, that addresses the one issue of the telephone conference he participated in with the head of the TSA FOIA office. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-01-30121NOTICE of lodging by SAI re Telephone Conference,, (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit re call with TSA FOIA Office, # 2 2017-03-02 IG Roth testimony to House OGR, # 3 2017-07-06 OIG-17-45-MA Management Alert Regarding Inspector General Access to Information, # 4 2017-07-20 GAO-17-608-R TSA Behavior Detection (converted), # 5 2017-08-30 FOIA re-request re 14-cv-403, # 6 2017-09-14 2017-TSFO-00408 Acknowledgement Letter, # 7 2017-10-04 2017-TSFO-00408 Refusal to process Vaughn-listed documents, # 8 2017-11-14 2017-TSFO-00408 Final response)(SAI, ) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-01-30122NOTICE of lodging corrected document [121-1] & re [121-4] by SAI re 121 Notice (Other),, (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit re call with TSA FOIA Office (re-exported))(SAI, ) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-03-08NOTICE of Hearing: A Telephone Conference is set for 3/13/2018, at 11:30 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-13123NOTICE of lodging by SAI re Notice of Hearing (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit re documents mentioned in DHS IG report, Appx. B, # 2 2018-02-08 DHS OIG report OIG-18-50, The TSA SSI Program Office's Identification and Redaction of Sensitive Security Information, # 3 2009-08-12 BPO Management Services document, Redaction in eReview)(SAI, ) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-03-13Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Telephone Conference held on 3/13/2018. Plaintiff is permitted to produce a copy of the IG report to the Court, as well as the document related to the software. Plaintiff is further permitted to file an affidavit that is related to the IG report, which states the documents identified in the IG report, that are not listed in the Vaughn Index. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-03-22NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 4/5/2018, at 9:30 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-04-05Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Telephone Conference held on 4/5/2018. Issues addressed. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman.) (kt) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-19MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff provide a readable copy of the spreadsheet filed at Dkt. 111-3 at 2 to both the Court and counsel for the Defendant or before April 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/19/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-04-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff to provide a readable copy of the spreadsheet filed at Dkt. 111-3 at 2 to both the Court and counsel for the Defendant by 4/23/2018. (kt) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-20124NOTICE of filing spreadsheet file of [111-3] by SAI re Order, (SAI, ) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-05-01MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff electronically file a complete set of Defendant's productions in response to his FOIA requests on or before May 3, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/1/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-02125MOTION for Extension of Time to File FOIA/PA records per May 1 minute order (partially consent) , MOTION for Hearing re Order (opposed) by SAI (SAI, ) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-02MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time and Request for a Hearing 125 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff electronically file a complete set of Defendant's productions in response to his FOIA requests, with the exception of video footage, on or before May 10, 2018. Plaintiff may redact personal information from the records, but shall clearly indicate that any such redaction was made by Plaintiff after receipt of the relevant records from Defendant. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's requests for a status conference, for a joint submission verifying the completeness of Plaintiff's filing, and for an extension to file one week after any such conference are DENIED. If, after reviewing Plaintiff's submission, Defendant concludes that it is incomplete, Defendant may file any omitted records. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/2/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff to electronically file a complete set of Defendant's productions in response to his FOIA requests, with the exception of video footage, on or before 5/10/2018. (kt) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-10126Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File FOIA/PA records per May 1 minute order (2 day) by SAI (SAI, ) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-11127ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Batch 1 part 1 by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Records responsive to part 1-b Bates 63-73.pdf, # 2 Records responsive to part 1-c Bates 74-140.pdf, # 3 Records responsive to part 2 Bates 408.pdf)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-11128LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Batch 1 part 2 by SAI 127 Administrative Record filed by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Records responsive to part 3-i Bates 409-931.pdf, # 2 Records responsive to part 4-a and 4-b Bates 932-962.pdf, # 3 Records responsive to part 4-c Bates 963-970.pdf)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-11129LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Batch 1 part 3 by SAI 127 Administrative Record filed by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Records responsive to part 5-a Bates 971-1181.pdf part 1)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-11130LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Batch 1 part 4 by SAI 127 Administrative Record filed by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Records responsive to part 5-a Bates 971-1181.pdf part 2, # 2 Records responsive to part 5-b Bates 1182-1187.pdf, # 3 Records responsive to part 6 Bates 1188-1287.pdf, # 4 Records responsive to part 7 Bates 1288-1292.pdf)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-11131LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Batch 1 part 5 of 5 by SAI 127 Administrative Record filed by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Records responsive to part 9 Bates 1325-1789.pdf part 1, # 2 Records responsive to part 9 Bates 1325-1789.pdf part 2)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-11132ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Batch 2 part 1 by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Records responsive to part 1-d Bates 1828-1897.pdf, # 2 Records responsive to part 1-e Bates 1898-1911.pdf, # 3 Records responsive to part 1-f Bates 1912-2238.pdf part 1)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-11133LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Batch 2 part 2 by SAI 132 Administrative Record, filed by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Records responsive to part 1-f Bates 1912-2238.pdf part 2, # 2 Records responsive to part 3 Bates 2239-2349.pdf)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-11134LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Batch 2 part 3 by SAI 132 Administrative Record, filed by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Records responsive to part 5-b Bates 2350-2443.pdf, # 2 Records responsive to part 9 Bates 2444-3222.pdf part 1)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-11135LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Batch 2 part 4 of 4 by SAI 132 Administrative Record, filed by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Records responsive to part 9 Bates 2444-3222.pdf part 2, # 2 Records responsive to part 9 Bates 2444-3222.pdf part 3, # 3 SAI draft 2nd interim release letter 081915.pdf)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-11136ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Batch 3 part 1 by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Records responsive to part 1-f Bates 003232 - 003538.pdf part 1, # 2 Records responsive to part 1-f Bates 003232 - 003538.pdf part 2)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-11137LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Batch 3 part 2 by SAI 136 Administrative Record filed by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Records responsive to part 1-f Bates 003232 - 003538.pdf part 3, # 2 Records responsive to part 1-f Bates 003232 - 003538.pdf part 4)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-11138LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Batch 3 part 3 by SAI 136 Administrative Record filed by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Records responsive to part 1-f Bates 003232 - 003538.pdf part 5, # 2 Records responsive to part 1-f Bates 003232 - 003538.pdf part 6)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-11139LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Batch 3 part 4 of 4 by SAI 136 Administrative Record filed by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Records responsive to part 9 Bates 2444-3222.pdf part 7, # 2 Records responsive to part 3-a Bates 003561 - 003573.pdf, # 3 Records responsive to part 5-b Bates 003223 -003231.pdf, # 4 Third Interim Release Letter 10 30 15.pdf)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-11140ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Batch 4 (one part; video in links) by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Remand Response Letter 2016-TSAP-00050.pdf)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time 126 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall electronically file a complete set of Defendant's productions in response to his FOIA requests, with the exception of video footage, on or before May 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/11/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall electronically file a complete set of Defendant's productions in response to his FOIA requests, with the exception of video footage, on or before 5/12/2018. (kt) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-12141ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Batch 5 by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 2013-TSFO-01096 Response Letter SIGNED.pdf redacted, # 2 Final Release Document.pdf)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/12/2018)
2018-05-12142ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Batch 6 by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 2013-tspa-00339 interim release letter 8-8-14 signed and dated.pdf redacted, # 2 Interim Release Documents August 8 2014pt 1.pdf redacted, # 3 Interim Release Documents August 8 2014 pt 2.pdf redacted)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/12/2018)
2018-05-12143ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Batch 7 by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 2013-TSPA-00368 Interim response signed and dated.pdf redacted, # 2 Interim Release Documents August 8 2014.pdf redacted)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/12/2018)
2018-05-12144ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Batch 8 part 1 by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Signed 2013-TSPA-00339 Final Release Letter signed and dated.pdf, # 2 'SFO Complaints'.pdf, # 3 Response Documents DMD part 1.pdf redacted)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/12/2018)
2018-05-12145LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Batch 8 part 2 of 2 by SAI 144 Administrative Record filed by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Response Documents DMD part 2.pdf redacted, # 2 Response Documents DMD part 3.pdf redacted)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/12/2018)
2018-05-12146ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Batch 9 by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Signed 2013-TSPA-00368 final release letter v4 signed and dated.pdf, # 2 'Final Release part 1'.pdf redacted, # 3 'Final Release part 2'.pdf, # 4 'Final Release part 3' - redacted.pdf)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/12/2018)
2018-05-12147Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File FOIA/PA records per May 1 minute order (until Friday May 18) by SAI (SAI, ) (Entered: 05/12/2018)
2018-05-14MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Consent Motion for Extension of Time, 147 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff shall electronically file documents Bates stamped numbers 141 through 408 on or before 5:00 p.m. Eastern Standard Time, on May 16, 2018. Plaintiff shall electronically file all remaining documents in Defendant's productions in response to his FOIA requests, with the exception of video footage, on or before 5:00 p.m. Eastern Standard Time, on May 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/14/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall electronically file documents Bates stamped numbers 141 through 408 by 5:00 p.m. EST, on 5/16/2018; Plaintiff shall electronically file all remaining documents in Defendant's productions in response to his FOIA requests by 5:00 p.m. EST, on 5/18/2018. (kt) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-14148RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,, re first part (Bates 141-408) filed by SAI. (SAI, ) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-14MINUTE ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's Response to the Order of the Court, 148 , the Court's Minute Order (May 14, 2018) is hereby modified as follows: Plaintiff shall electronically file all remaining documents in Defendant's productions in response to his FOIA requests, with the exception of video footage, on or before 5:00 p.m. Eastern Standard Time, on May 18, 2018. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff will file with the Court the following documents referenced in his Affidavit and Statement of Genuine Issues Still in Dispute, Dkt. 111-2, on or before 5:00 p.m. Eastern Standard Time, on May 16, 2018: (1) "2013-TSPA-00368 Bates 003-004, 006-007; 2013-TSFO-01096 Bates 009-010," Dkt. 111-2 at 2 (Sai Aff. ¶ 8); (2) "2013-TSPA-00339... Bates 130-134, 145," Dkt. 111-2 at 5-6 (Sai Aff. ¶ 27); (3) "2013-TSPA-00339... Bates 458, 520, 540," Dkt. 111-2 at 5-6 (Sai Aff. ¶ 27); (4) "2013-TSPA-00339 Bates 266... 428, 431[,]... 106[,]... 294, 295, 300[,]... 214[,]... 287," Dkt. 111-2 at 22 (Sai Aff. ¶ 116); (5) "2013-TSPA-00368 001-002, 011-014[,] 017, 020-021, 023; 2013-TSPA-00339 113, 135, 181, 211, 214, 254, 279, 284, 481, 520; 2015-TSLI-00004 002239-002346, 002350-002399, 003574-003932," Dkt. 111-2 at 22 (Sai Aff. ¶ 117); (6) "2013-TSPA-00339 Bates 474," Dkt. 111-2 at 25 (Sai Aff. ¶ 139); (7) "2013-TSPA-00339 268-271," Dkt. 111-2 at 25 (Sai Aff. ¶ 339). To the extent that these documents have already been provided to the Court, Plaintiff shall file a notice with the Court identifying the docket number and page number(s) of the documents listed, on or before 5:00 p.m. Eastern Standard Time, on May 16, 2018. The submission should not contain any argument. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/14/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-15149RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,,,,,,, table of ECF & page numbers for requested portions filed by SAI. (SAI, ) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-17150ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Batch 10 by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Records responsive to part 1-b Bates 63-73.pdf, # 2 Records responsive to part 1-c Bates 74-140.pdf, # 3 Records responsive to part 4-a and 4-b Bates 932-962.pdf, # 4 Records responsive to part 4-c Bates 963-970.pdf, # 5 Records responsive to part 5-b Bates 1182-1187.pdf, # 6 Records responsive to part 7 Bates 1288-1292.pdf, # 7 Signed Response Letter 073015.pdf)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-17151ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Batch 11 by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Sai Unperfected Acknowledgment 2015-0268.pdf)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-17152ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Batch 12 - 2015-10-27 2016-TSPA-00009 and 2016-TSPA-00010 (email) by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Sai Acknowledgment Letter 00009 and 00010.pdf)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-17153ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Batch 13 - 2015-11-30 2016-TSPA-00010 (email) by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 signed release letter.pdf)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-17154ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Batch 14 - 2016-01-06 2016-TSPA-00009 (email) by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 TSA - No Records Response Letter fo FOIA Reqeusts 072814.pdf)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-17155ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Batch 15 - 2016-02-29 2015-TSLI-00004 (email via counsel) by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 2015-TSLI-00004 (Sai) Final Release Letter.pdf)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-17156ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Batch 16 part 1 - 2016-06-10 Bates-stamped pages (email from TSA counsel) by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 BOS Request (2013-TSPA-00368) Released Records_Bates 001-093.pdf redacted, # 2 BOS Request (2013-TSPA-00368) Released Records_Bates 094-189.pdf, # 3 BOS Request (2013-TSPA-00368) Released Records_Bates 190-236.pdf redacted, # 4 CCTV Request 2013-TSFO-01096 Released Records_Bates 001-018.pdf)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-17157LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Batch 16 part 2 - 2016-06-10 Bates-stamped pages (email from TSA counsel) by SAI 156 Administrative Record, filed by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 SFO Request 2013-TSPA-00339 Released Records_Bates 001-072.pdf redacted, # 2 SFO Request 2013-TSPA-00339 Released Records_Bates 073-150.pdf redacted, # 3 SFO Request 2013-TSPA-00339 Released Records_Bates 151-249.pdf redacted)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-17158LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Batch 16 part 3 of 3 - 2016-06-10 Bates-stamped pages (email from TSA counsel) by SAI 156 Administrative Record, filed by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 SFO Request 2013-TSPA-00339 Released Records_Bates 250-355.pdf redacted, # 2 SFO Request 2013-TSPA-00339 Released Records_Bates 356-440.pdf redacted, # 3 SFO Request 2013-TSPA-00339 Released Records_Bates 441-611.pdf redacted)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-17159ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Batch 17 - 2016-08-26 post CADC 15-5201 (email via counsel) by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 BOS Request Bates page 008_a.pdf redacted, # 2 BOS Request Bates page 009_a.pdf redacted, # 3 SFO Request Bates page 474_a.pdf)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-17160ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Batch 18 - 2016-10-19 spreadsheets rerelease (email from TSA counsel) by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 _BOS Request Amended Bates pages_.pdf, # 2 _SFO Request Amended Bates pages 584_b & 585_a & 586_a_.pdf, # 3 _SFO Request Amended Bates pages_.pdf)(SAI, ) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-17161RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,,,,,,, filing completed; pointer to authoritative Bates references filed by SAI. (SAI, ) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-24162MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, 99 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/24/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-25163NOTICE Letter re: May 24 Opinion by SAI re 162 Memorandum & Opinion (Attachments: # 1 Sai v Pekoske CA1 15-2356 2017-09-30 6123177 Sai Letter re pronoun usage)(SAI, ) Modified text on 5/29/2018 (ztd). (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-05-25MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a scheduling conference on May 30, 2018, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 21. Should either party wish to appear telephonically, that party shall contact the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at (202) 354-3084 to make the necessary arrangements. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/25/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-05-25164RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, notice of unavailability May 30; request for video (or alternatively phone) appearance filed by SAI. (SAI, ) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-05-25Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference scheduled for 5/30/2018, at 2:00 PM, in Courtroom 21 before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (hmc) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-05-29MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Notice of Unavailability 164 , it is hereby ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference currently scheduled for May 30, 2018, is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED for June 1, 2018, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 21. Plaintiff's request to appear by video is DENIED. Should Plaintiff wish to appear telephonically, Plaintiff is directed to contact the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at (202) 354-3084 to make the necessary arrangements. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/29/2018. (lcrdm1, ) Modified on 5/29/2018 to change "status conference" to "scheduling conference" (kt). (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-29Set/Reset Hearings: The Scheduling Conference set for 5/30/2018 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 6/1/2018, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-06-01Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Scheduling Conference held on 6/1/2018. Defendant's renewed motion for summary judgment due by 9/28/2018; Plaintiff's opposition and cross motion, if any, due by 11/16/2018; Defendant's reply and cross opposition, if any, due by 12/14/2018; Plaintiff's final reply, if any, due by 1/31/2019. Plaintiff's list of page numbers due by 6/15/2018. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-02165RESPONSE re Scheduling Conference,, Set Deadlines, re gender edit; clarification; & blindness filed by SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Sai v TSA DCD 1-14-cv-00403-RDM 2018-05-24 162 Court Opinion and order on MSJ - gender edited - clean)(SAI, ) (Entered: 06/02/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff