Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2014cv00430
Date Filed2014-03-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for records concerning the security of the healthcare.gov website. After hearing nothing more before the expiration of the statutory time limit, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-03-181COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3654716) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons D.C. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons Dept. of Health and Human Services)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
2014-03-182LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
2014-03-18Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (md, ) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
2014-03-193ELECTRONIC SUMMONS (3) ISSUED as to DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons 2nd, # 2 Summons 3rd, # 3 Notice of Consent, # 4 Consent Form)(md, ) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
2014-04-034RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/26/2014. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/25/2014.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/26/2014., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 3/25/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of C. Rotaru)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
2014-04-105NOTICE of Appearance by Claire M. Whitaker on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
2014-04-256ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
2014-04-30MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by 5/14/2014. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 4/30/2014. (lckbj1) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
2014-05-147Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to for the parties to agree on a proposed production date in the Freedom of Information Act case to 6/13/14 by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
2014-05-15MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 7 Motion for Extension of Time for Parties to Agree on Proposed Production Date. It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for the parties to file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure is extended to 6/13/2014. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 05/15/2014. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
2014-06-138Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to jointly propose a production schedule in this FOIA case (to 7/3/14) by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
2014-06-17MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 8 Consent Motion to Extend. It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for the parties to file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure is extended to 7/3/2014. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/17/2014. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
2014-06-19Case reassigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr, ) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
2014-07-029Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to August 6, 2014, to file an agreed upon production schedule in this FOIA case by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
2014-07-07MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING 9 Consent Motion to extend deadline for a jointly proposed briefing or disclosure schedule. The parties' proposed briefing or disclosure schedule shall be filed not later than August 6, 2014 ; Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint schedule due by 8/6/2014. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/7/14. (lctsc1) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
2014-08-0510Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file a joint status report by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
2014-08-07MINUTE ORDER: Granting 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file a joint status report. The parties' proposed briefing or disclosure schedule shall be filed not later than October 16, 2014; Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint schedule due 10/16/2014.Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/7/14. (lctsc1) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
2014-10-1611Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to (file another Joint Status Report in this FOIA case to 12/16/14) by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
2014-10-20MINUTE ORDER: Granting 11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file a proposed production schedule or joint status report not later than December 16, 2014. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/20/14. (DJS) (Entered: 10/20/2014)
2014-10-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report or proposed production schedule due by 12/16/2014 (zsm) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
2014-12-1612STATUS REPORT and Joint Motion to Stay by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
2014-12-1613Joint MOTION to Stay re 12 Status Report (until May 15, 2015) by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
2014-12-17MINUTE ORDER: Granting 13 Joint Motion to Stay. This action is hereby STAYED until further order of the Court. The parties shall file a joint status report and proposed order for proceeding with this action not later than 5/15/15. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/17/14. (DJS) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
2014-12-17MINUTE ORDER: Consistent with the agreement of the parties 12 , during the stay of this action, HHS shall continue to process and release nonexempt,responsive records in this Freedom of Information Act case. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/17/14. (DJS) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
2014-12-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/15/2015. (sm) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
2015-05-1514STATUS REPORT and Motion to Stay by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
2015-05-1515Joint MOTION to Stay re 14 Status Report by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
2015-05-19MINUTE ORDER: Granting 15 Joint Motion to Stay. The STAY in this action shall remain in place until July 27, 2014 at which time the parties shall file a joint status report and proposed order for proceeding with this action. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/19/15. (DJS) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
2015-05-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/27/2015. (zsm) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
2015-07-2716Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file Joint Status Report by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
2015-07-28MINUTE ORDER: Granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time. Not later than 4:00 p.m. on August 10, 2015 the parties shall file a Joint Status Report containing a production schedule for the remaining records subject to Plaintiff's FOIA request. A status conference will be held at 10:15 a.m. on Tuesday, August 11, 2015. Counsel from the Department of Health and Human Services or another Department employee with personal knowledge of the search and review process shall appear at the conference. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/28/15. (lctsc3) Modified on 7/29/2015 (DJS). (Entered: 07/28/2015)
2015-07-28Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 8/10/2015. Status Conference set for 8/11/2015 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsm) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
2015-08-1017STATUS REPORT (Joint) by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
2015-08-11Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan: Status Conference held on 8/11/2015. Order to issue. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne.) (zsm) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
2015-08-11MINUTE ORDER: Defendant shall process 1,000 pages of records on a bimonthly basis and shall release all nonexempt records to Plaintiff upon completion of each batch of records. Defendant's first production shall be made on or before October 1, 2015. Within 48 hours of each production, Defendant shall file a notice with the court confirming it has made a production to the Plaintiff representing the nonexempt records from a batch of at least 1,000 pages of records. Each notice shall indicate how many pages of records remain to be processed; the notice accompanying the final production shall indicate that all processing has been completed. 14 days after the final notice is filed, the parties shall file a joint status report proposing a schedule for moving forward with this matter. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/11/15. (lctsc3) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
2015-10-0218NOTICE of Filing of Certification by CMS FOIA Officer by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certification)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
2015-12-0319NOTICE of Filing Certification by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES re Order,,, (Attachments: # 1 Certification)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 12/03/2015)
2016-02-0220NOTICE of Filing of Certification by CMS FOIA Officer by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES re Order,,, (Attachments: # 1 Certification)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 02/02/2016)
2016-04-0121NOTICE of Filing of Certification by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES re Order,,, (Attachments: # 1 Certification)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
2016-06-0222NOTICE of Filing of Certification by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Certification)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
2016-08-0223NOTICE of Filing of Certification by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Certification)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
2016-10-0324NOTICE of Filing of Certification in this FOIA case by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certification)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
2016-11-3025NOTICE of Filing of Certification in this FOIA case by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Certification)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
2017-02-0126NOTICE of Filing Certification by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES re Order,,, (Attachments: # 1 Certification)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
2017-04-0327NOTICE of Filing of Certification by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 (Certification))(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-06-0128NOTICE of Filing of Certification 6/1/17 by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Certification)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-08-0229NOTICE of Filing of Certification by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Certification)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-10-0230NOTICE of Filing of Certification by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Certification)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-12-0131NOTICE (Notice of Filing of Certification) by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 (Certification))(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2018-02-0232NOTICE of filing of Certification, 2/2/18 by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Certification dated February 2, 2018)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-04-0233NOTICE of filing of Certification by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
2018-06-0134NOTICE of Filing of Certification by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certification)(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-08-0235NOTICE of Filing of bimonthly certification by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Certification by Hugh Gilmore)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-0736NOTICE of Appearance by Benton Gregory Peterson on behalf of All Defendants (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-10-0237NOTICE of filing certification by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES re Order,,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar