Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWASHINGTON NEWSPAPER PUBLISHING COMPANY, LLC v. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2014cv00444
Date Filed2014-03-19
Date Closed2014-10-03
JudgeJudge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffWASHINGTON NEWSPAPER PUBLISHING COMPANY, LLC
Case DescriptionRichard Pollock, an investigative reporter for the Washington Examiner, submitted a FOIA request to the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau concerning recent renovations of its headquarters. The agency told Pollock it had located 257 pages and was withholding 254 pages in their entirety under Exemption 5 (privileges) and Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). Pollock filed an administrative appeal. The agency upheld its decision to withhold the 254 pages, but decided its initial search was inadequate and remanded the request for a further search. As a result of the second search, the agency located another 93 pages and withheld 81 pages entirely under Exemptions 5 and 6. Pollock appealed the second determination which was affirmed. He then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Exemption 5 - Privileges, Exemption 6 - Invasion of privacy

DefendantCONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-03-191COMPLAINT against CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3655657) filed by THE WASHINGTON NEWSPAPER PUBLISHING COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons CFPB)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
2014-03-192LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by THE WASHINGTON NEWSPAPER PUBLISHING COMPANY, LLC (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
2014-03-19Case Assigned to Judge Beryl A. Howell. (kb) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
2014-03-193ELECTRONIC SUMMONS (3) ISSUED as to THE WASHINGTON NEWSPAPER PUBLISHING COMPANY, LLC, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons 2nd, # 2 Summons 3rd, # 3 Notice of Consent, # 4 Consent Form)(md, ) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
2014-03-194STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 19, 2014. (lcbah2) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
2014-04-025ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/26/2014. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/25/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Summons U.S.Attorney)(Bekesha, Michael) Modified on 4/3/2014 (rdj). (Entered: 04/02/2014)
2014-04-026RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/26/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
2014-04-027RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU served on 3/26/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
2014-04-028RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/26/2014. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/25/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
2014-04-109NOTICE of Appearance by Heather D. Graham-Oliver on behalf of CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
2014-04-2510Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
2014-04-28MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendant's 10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer nunc pro tunc. Accordingly, the defendant shall, by May 9, 2014, answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 28, 2014.(lcbah2) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
2014-04-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 5/9/2014 (tg, ) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
2014-05-0911ANSWER to Complaint by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU.(Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
2014-05-2212STATUS REPORT AND JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
2014-05-23MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING the following SCHEDULING ORDER to control the timing of proceedings in this matter, pursuant to the parties' 12 Joint Report and Proposed Scheduling Order: by June 20, 2014, the defendant shall provide its Vaughn index to the plaintiff. By June 27, 2014, the plaintiff shall respond to the defendant with any comments. By July 7, 2014, The defendant shall respond to the plaintiff's inquiry about particular documents and/or categories of documents listed in the Vaughn index. By August 4, 2014, the defendant shall file any motion for summary judgment. By September 5, 2014, the plaintiff shall file any opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment. By October 6, 2014, the defendant shall file any opposition and reply. By October 20, 2014, the plaintiff shall file any reply. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 23, 2014. (lcbah2) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
2014-05-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Vaughn Index due by 6/20/2014; Response due by 6/27/2014; Reply due by 7/7/2014. Summary Judgment motion due by 8/4/2014; Cross-Motion and Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/5/2014; Opposition to Cross-Motion and Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/6/2014; Reply to Opposition to Cross Motion due by 10/20/2014. (tg, ) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
2014-07-2513Joint MOTION to Vacate Scheduling Order,,, by WASHINGTON NEWSPAPER PUBLISHING COMPANY, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
2014-07-25MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the parties' 13 Joint Motion to Vacate Briefing Schedule, VACATING the Court's May 23, 2014 scheduling order, and DIRECTING the parties to file, by September 5, 2014, a joint status report indicating: (1) "whether substantive briefing is necessary," Mot. Vacate at 2; and, if so, (2) a proposed schedule for the filing of dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 25, 2014. (lcbah2) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
2014-07-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/5/2014. (tg, ) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
2014-09-0314STATUS REPORT (Joint) by WASHINGTON NEWSPAPER PUBLISHING COMPANY, LLC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
2014-09-03MINUTE ORDER (Paperless) DIRECTING the parties to file, by October 3, 2014, a joint status report indicating: (1) whether substantive briefing is necessary, and, if so, (2) a proposed schedule for the filing of dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 3, 2014. (lcbah2) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
2014-09-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/3/2014 (tg, ) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
2014-10-0315STIPULATION of Dismissal by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU. (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
2014-10-03MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DISMISSING this matter, with prejudice, pursuant to the parties' 15 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 3, 2014. (lcbah2) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff