Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAbdul-Alim v. Comey et al
DistrictDistrict of Massachusetts
CitySpringfield
Case Number3:2014cv30059
Date Filed2014-04-01
Date Closed2017-09-29
JudgeDistrict Judge Timothy S. Hillman
PlaintiffAyyub Abdul-Alim
Case DescriptionAyyub Abdul-Alim submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for any investigatory records concerning himself. The FBI acknowledged receipt of the request, but indicated he was required to confirm his identity. After some further back and forth on the issue of identification, the agency finally accepted his request, but indicated it would take 418 days before a search for records would begin. Abdul-Alim then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDirector James B. Comey Of the Federal Bureau of Investigation, in his official capacity
DefendantDirector Eric Holder, Jr. Attorney General of the United States , in his official capacity
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation, Washington D.C. Headquarters
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Opinion/Order [88]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-04-011COMPLAINT 14-30059 against All Defendants (Fee Status: IFP requested), filed by Ayyub Abdul-Alim. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Sheet, # 3 Motion Forma Pauperis)(Robinson, Thomas) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
2014-04-014MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ayyub Abdul-Alim.(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
2014-04-022ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Michael A. Ponsor assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
2014-04-023Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman Referred for: Events Only (e). Further information: Ruling on motion..(Finn, Mary) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
2014-04-025Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING MOTION 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ayyub Abdul-Alim to Magistrate Judge Neiman(Finn, Mary) Motions referred to Kenneth P. Neiman. (Entered: 04/02/2014)
2014-04-046Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. So ordered. (Neiman, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
2014-04-047Summons Issued as to James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Washington D.C. Headquarters, Eric Holder, Jr, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
2014-04-248NOTICE of Appearance by Karen L. Goodwin on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Goodwin, Karen) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
2014-06-179ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni added. Judge Michael A. Ponsor no longer assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
2014-10-1010MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Serve Properly the Complaint on Defendants by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Washington D.C. Headquarters, Eric Holder, Jr, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Sady, Michael) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
2014-10-1011MEMORANDUM in Support re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Serve Properly the Complaint on Defendants filed by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Washington D.C. Headquarters, Eric Holder, Jr, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sady, Michael) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
2014-10-1412SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Ayyub Abdul-Alim. All Defendants. (Robinson, Thomas) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
2014-10-1413SUMMONS Returned Executed James B. Comey served on 4/10/2014, answer due 12/15/2014. (Robinson, Thomas) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
2014-10-2314SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ayyub Abdul-Alim. (Robinson, Thomas) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
2014-10-2315First MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/15/14 to Service of Process and file opp. to the motion to Dismiss by Ayyub Abdul-Alim. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Robinson, Thomas) Modified on 10/24/2014to delete the memorandum that was an attachment. Memorandum in support of any document should be docketed separately, not as an attachment to the document it is supporting. (Finn, Mary). Modified on 11/7/2014 to add text to the entry - and to file opp. to the motion to dismiss. (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 10/24/2014)
2014-10-2416First Opposition re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Serve Properly the Complaint on Defendants filed by Ayyub Abdul-Alim. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit) (Robinson, Thomas) Modified on 10/24/2014 to delete the memorandum that was an attachment and to docket it separatley. (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 10/24/2014)
2014-10-2417MEMORANDUM in Support re 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/15/14 to Service of Process filed by Ayyub Abdul-Alim. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
2014-10-2418MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ayyub Abdul-Alim in support of 16 Opposition to 10 MOTION to Dismiss. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
2014-10-2819Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to serve (Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
2014-10-2820NOTICE re 19 Order on Motion for Extension of Time was granted in error. Defendant's response due 11/6/2014 (Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
2014-11-0621RESPONSE to Motion re 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/15/14 to Service of Process and to serve opposiiton to the motion to dismiss filed by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Washington D.C. Headquarters, Eric Holder, Jr, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sady, Michael) Modified on 11/7/2014 to add text to the entry - and to serve opposition to the motion to dismiss. (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 11/06/2014)
2014-11-1422Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. (Calderon, Melissa) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
2014-12-0823Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.(Pelegano, Theresa) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
2014-12-1124ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. District Judge Timothy S Hillman added. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni no longer assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
2015-01-2025ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Serve Properly the Complaint on Defendants , 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/15/14 to Service of Process : Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2015 at 10:00AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
2015-02-1126Joint MOTION to Stay by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Washington D.C. Headquarters, Eric Holder, Jr, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Sady, Michael) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
2015-02-1127District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 26 Motion to Stay. The pending motions will be denied without prejudice to refiling and a status conference will be set for a date in August 2015. The hearing scheduled for 2/13/15 is hereby canceled. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
2015-02-1128ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 8/21/2015 at 2:15PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
2015-02-1129Motions No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
2015-02-1130District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying without prejudice 10 Motion to Dismiss and denying without prejudice 15 Motion for Extension of Time, if the case is not resolved. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
2015-08-1231ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Status Conference reset for 8/26/2015 at 3:00PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
2015-08-2632ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Status Conference held on 8/26/2015, Case called, Counsel appear for status conferences, Parties inform the Court of the status of the production of documents and the review process, Court sets a further status conference, ( Status Conference set for 12/3/2015 at 2:30PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman). (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Robinson/Sady) (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
2015-11-1933ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Status Conference reset for 12/22/2015 at 2:15PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
2015-12-1534Assented to MOTION to Continue status by Ayyub Abdul-Alim.(Robinson, Thomas) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
2015-12-1635District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 34 Motion to Continue. Status Conference reset for 1/22/2016 at 2:00PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
2015-12-3036ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Status Conference reset for 2/5/2016 at 3:00PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
2016-02-0537District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER Canceling Deadline. Status Conference set for 2/5/16 is hereby canceled.(Castles, Martin) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
2016-02-0938ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Status Conference reset for 2/16/2016 at 10:45AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
2016-02-1239Assented to MOTION to Continue Status Hearing by Ayyub Abdul-Alim. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Robinson, Thomas) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
2016-02-1240District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 39 Motion to Continue. Status Conference reset for 3/4/2016 at 2:00PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
2016-03-0441Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Status Conference held on 3/4/2016, Case called, Counsel appear by telephone for status conference, Plaintiff gives the Court an update of discovery, Record review process is ongoing, Govt informs the Court that case will be resolved by summary judgment motions, Parties request further status conference, Court sets a further status conference, ( Status Conference set for 5/5/2016 at 2:30PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman). (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: Robinson/Sady) (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
2016-03-0442District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER LIFTING STAY.(Castles, Martin) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
2016-05-0543First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ayyub Abdul-Alim. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Robinson, Thomas) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
2016-05-0544Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Status Conference held on 5/5/2016, Case called, Counsel appear by telephone for status, Court and counsel discuss status of case and motion to withdraw, Plaintiff is attempting to obtain successor counsel, Court sets a further telephone status conference, ( Telephone Conference set for 5/12/2016 at 3:30PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman). (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Robinson/Sady) (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
2016-05-1245Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Telephone Conference held on 5/12/2016; Case called, Counsel appear for status conference, Plaintiff's counsel informs the Court that successor counsel will be filing an appearance shortly, Court rules taking under advisement 43 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney until new counsel has appeared, Parties inform the Court that the matter will be resolved by way of summary judgment motions, Court sets a further status conference, at which a briefing schedule will be set, ( Telephone Conference set for 6/15/2016 at 2:30PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman). (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: Robinson/Sady) (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
2016-06-1546Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Telephone Conference held on 6/15/2016, Case called, Counsel appear for status conference, Plaintiff's counsel informs the Court on the status of successor counsel, New counsel is still being sought, Court sets a further telephone status conference, ( Telephone Conference set for 6/27/2016 at 3:00PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman). (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Robinson/Sady) (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
2016-06-2747ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Telephone Conference reset for 6/28/2016 at 9:30AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
2016-06-2848Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Telephone Conference held on 6/28/2016, Case called, Counsel appear for status conference, Plaintiff's counsel informs the Court that new counsel, James Krasnoo will be entering an appearance shortly, Court sets a further telephone conference, ( Telephone Conference set for 7/28/2016 at 4:30PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman). (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Robinson/Sady) (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
2016-07-2649ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Telephone Conference reset for 7/29/2016 at 3:30PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
2016-07-2850NOTICE of Appearance by James B. Krasnoo on behalf of Ayyub Abdul-Alim (Krasnoo, James) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
2016-07-2851ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Status Conference reset for 8/15/2016 at 4:30PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
2016-08-0352District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 43 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Thomas E. Robinson terminated (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
2016-08-1553Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Status Conference held on 8/15/2016, Case called, Counsel appear by telephone for status conference, Plaintiff's counsel has recently entered his appearance and he informs the Court that he is getting up to speed and requests additional time, Court sets a further telephone status conference, ( Telephone Conference set for 10/5/2016 at 2:00PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman). (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: Sady/Krasnoo) (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
2016-10-0554Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Telephone Conference held on 10/5/2016, Case called, Counsel appear for status conference, Parties inform the Court of the status of the information sought, Parties request an additional 45 days to have the FBI review the records, Court sets a further telephone status conference, ( Telephone Conference set for 12/7/2016 at 2:30PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman). (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: Sady/Krasnoo) (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
2016-12-0555ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING TIME OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Telephone Conference TIME reset for 12/7/2016 at 3:30PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
2016-12-0756Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Telephone Conference held on 12/7/2016, Case called, Counsel appear for status conference, Parties inform the Court that the case has not been resolved and that they agree the case should proceed to summary judgment, Govt to file it's motion for summary judgment by 2/15/17, Plaintiff's response due by 5/10/17, Court sets a further status conference, ( Status Conference set for 5/10/2016 at 2:30PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman). (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Sady/Krasnoo) (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
2017-02-2157Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 29, 2017 to File Motion for Summary Judgment by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Washington D.C. Headquarters, Eric Holder, Jr, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Sady, Michael) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-02-2258District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 57 Motion for Extension of Time. "Allowed. Plaintiff's response shall remain due on 5/10/17, however Plaintiff may seek an extension of up to 6 weeks by filing a motion with the court at any time prior to that date." (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-03-2959Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 4/7/17 to File Summary Judgment by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Washington D.C. Headquarters, Eric Holder, Jr, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Sady, Michael) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-03-2960District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 59 Motion for Extension of Time to file. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-04-0761Assented to MOTION for Leave to File to File Brief in Excess of Twenty Pages by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Washington D.C. Headquarters, Eric Holder, Jr, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Sady, Michael) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-0762District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 61 Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Twenty Pages. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-1063MOTION for Summary Judgment (Leave to File Granted: April 7, 2017 by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Washington D.C. Headquarters, Eric Holder, Jr, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Sady, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-1064MEMORANDUM in Support re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Leave to File Granted: April 7, 2017 filed by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Washington D.C. Headquarters, Eric Holder, Jr, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Sady, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-2765NOTICE Resetting time of Hearing. Status Conference time reset for 5/10/2017 at 2:15 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-05-0166Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 17, 2017 to File Response/Reply to Deft's Motion for Summary Judgment by Ayyub Abdul-Alim.(Krasnoo, James) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-0267District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part 66 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Response due by 7/10/2017. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-0268ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-0269District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER Canceling Deadline. The status conference set for 5/101/17 is hereby canceled. A Motion hearing has been set for 7/27/17. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-07-0870MOTION to Compel Gov't to Submit Unreacted Thirty (30) Pages to Court by Ayyub Abdul-Alim.(Krasnoo, James) (Entered: 07/08/2017)
2017-07-0871Second MOTION for Extension of Time to July 27, 2017 to File Response/Reply to Deft's Motion for Summary Judgment by Ayyub Abdul-Alim.(Krasnoo, James) (Entered: 07/08/2017)
2017-07-0972Amended MOTION to Compel Govt to Submit Unredacted Copies of Pages in Dispute (with exhibit added) by Ayyub Abdul-Alim. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit p. 220, one of 30 pages in dispute)(Krasnoo, James) (Entered: 07/09/2017)
2017-07-1073District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot 70 Motion to Compel. Amended motion filed. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-1074District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 71 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Response due by 7/27/2017 (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-1075ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing reset for 8/16/2017 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-2776Assented to MOTION to Seal Document by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Washington D.C. Headquarters, Eric Holder, Jr, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sady, Michael) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-07-2777District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 76 Motion to Seal Document. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-07-2778MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages OF Memorandum in Opposition to Summary Judgment by Ayyub Abdul-Alim.(Krasnoo, James) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-07-2779Opposition re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Leave to File Granted: April 7, 2017 filed by Ayyub Abdul-Alim. (Krasnoo, James) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-07-2780District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 78 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-07-2781Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Leave to File Granted: April 7, 2017 filed by Ayyub Abdul-Alim. (Krasnoo, James) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-07-2782AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Leave to File Granted: April 7, 2017 by James B. Krasnoo, affiant filed by Ayyub Abdul-Alim. (Attachments: # 1 Letter of Oct 15, 2014, # 2 Brief of Abdul-Alim to Appeals Court of Massachusetts, # 3 Letter of February 5, 2016, # 4 Email of April 19, 2016, # 5 Part 1 of Motion to Suppress Transcript dated November 21, 2013, # 6 Part 2 of Motion to Suppress transcript dated November 21, 2013, # 7 Email dated July 27, 2016, # 8 14 pages of Abdul-Alim's Brief to Appeals Court of Massachusetts, # 9 Transcript of testimony of FBI Special Agent dated August 9, 2016, # 10 Affidavit of Thomas E. Robinson dated August 16, 2016, # 11 Abdul-Alum's reply Brief to Appeals Court of Massachusetts, # 12 Opinion of Appeals Court of Massachusetts in Commonwealth v. Abdul-Alim, dated March 9, 2017, # 13 Thirty (30) redacted pages in dispute under cover letter dated April 7, 2017, # 14 email of James B. Krasnoo to Defendant's counsel re 2 CDs, # 15 copy of Ex L to Hardy's Decl, Hardy's ltd to Robinson dated April 24, 2014, # 16 letter of Hardy to Krasnoo dated May 15, 2017, # 17 email of paralegal to Daniel D. Kelly enclosing FBI report, # 18 copy of FBI report of meeting of December 11, 2011 between Hisgen, Abdul-Alim and Sheehan, attached to Ex "P")(Krasnoo, James) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-07-2783MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Leave to File Granted: April 7, 2017 , 78 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages OF Memorandum in Opposition to Summary Judgment filed by Ayyub Abdul-Alim. (Krasnoo, James) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-08-0184ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting TIME OF Hearing on Motion 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing REset for 8/16/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-1486ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing reset for 9/20/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-09-2087Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: Motion Hearing held on 9/20/2017 re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Washington D.C. Headquarters, James B. Comey, Eric Holder, Jr., UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, Case called, Counsel appear for motion hearing, Court hears arguments of counsel, Court rules taking under advisement 63 Motion for Summary Judgment and taking under advisement 72 Motion to Compel. (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Krasnoo/Sady) (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-09-2988District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER entered granting 63 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-0289District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT in favor of the defendants. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff